SOLAR ECLIPSE INVESTMENT FUND III, LLC et al v. T-Mobile USA, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: SOLAR ECLIPSE INVESTMENT FUND XXXIV, LLC, SOLAR ECLIPSE INVESTMENT FUND XI, LLC, SOLAR ECLIPSE INVESTMENT FUND XVIII, LLC, SOLAR ECLIPSE INVESTMENT FUND IV, LLC, SOLAR ECLIPSE INVESTMENT FUND VI, LLC, SOLAR ECLIPSE INVESTMENT FUND XXXIII, LLC, SOLAR ECLIPSE INVESTMENT FUND V, LLC, SOLAR ECLIPSE INVESTMENT FUND XV, LLC, SOLAR ECLIPSE INVESTMENT FUND XXIX, LLC, SOLAR ECLIPSE INVESTMENT FUND XVI, LLC, SOLAR ECLIPSE INVESTMENT FUND XXIV, LLC, SOLAR ECLIPSE INVESTMENT FUND III, LLC, SOLAR ECLIPSE INVESTMENT FUND XXI, LLC, SOLAR ECLIPSE INVESTMENT FUND XXVIII, LLC, SOLAR ECLIPSE INVESTMENT FUND X, LLC, SOLAR ECLIPSE INVESTMENT FUND XXXI, LLC, SOLAR ECLIPSE INVESTMENT FUND XXIII, LLC, SOLAR ECLIPSE INVESTMENT FUND XXX, LLC, SOLAR ECLIPSE INVESTMENT FUND XII, LLC, SOLAR ECLIPSE INVESTMENT FUND XXVI, LLC, SOLAR ECLIPSE INVESTMENT FUND XVII, LLC and SOLAR ECLIPSE INVESTMENT FUND XIX, LLC
Defendant: T-Mobile USA, Inc. and International Speedway Corporation
Case Number: 1:2020cv24012
Filed: September 30, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Darrin P Gayles
Referring Judge: Edwin G Torres
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 23, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 23, 2020 Filing 29 MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Reply to Plaintiff's Reply on Motion for Remand by International Speedway Corporation. (Folland, Robert)
November 13, 2020 Filing 28 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Joshua Thaddeus Fordin on behalf of T-Mobile USA, Inc.. Attorney Joshua Thaddeus Fordin added to party T-Mobile USA, Inc.(pty:dft). (Fordin, Joshua)
November 12, 2020 Filing 27 REPLY to #22 Response in Opposition to Motion, to Remand to State Court by Neil F. Luria, SOLAR ECLIPSE INVESTMENT FUND III, LLC, SOLAR ECLIPSE INVESTMENT FUND IV, LLC, SOLAR ECLIPSE INVESTMENT FUND V, LLC, SOLAR ECLIPSE INVESTMENT FUND VI, LLC, SOLAR ECLIPSE INVESTMENT FUND X, LLC, SOLAR ECLIPSE INVESTMENT FUND XI, LLC, SOLAR ECLIPSE INVESTMENT FUND XII, LLC, SOLAR ECLIPSE INVESTMENT FUND XIX, LLC, SOLAR ECLIPSE INVESTMENT FUND XV, LLC, SOLAR ECLIPSE INVESTMENT FUND XVI, LLC, SOLAR ECLIPSE INVESTMENT FUND XVII, LLC, SOLAR ECLIPSE INVESTMENT FUND XVIII, LLC, SOLAR ECLIPSE INVESTMENT FUND XXI, LLC, SOLAR ECLIPSE INVESTMENT FUND XXIII, LLC, SOLAR ECLIPSE INVESTMENT FUND XXIV, LLC, SOLAR ECLIPSE INVESTMENT FUND XXIX, LLC, SOLAR ECLIPSE INVESTMENT FUND XXVI, LLC, SOLAR ECLIPSE INVESTMENT FUND XXVIII, LLC, SOLAR ECLIPSE INVESTMENT FUND XXX, LLC, SOLAR ECLIPSE INVESTMENT FUND XXXI, LLC, SOLAR ECLIPSE INVESTMENT FUND XXXIII, LLC, SOLAR ECLIPSE INVESTMENT FUND XXXIV, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Lombana, Hector)
November 12, 2020 Filing 26 REPLY to #23 Response to Motion to Remand to State Court by Neil F. Luria, SOLAR ECLIPSE INVESTMENT FUND III, LLC, SOLAR ECLIPSE INVESTMENT FUND IV, LLC, SOLAR ECLIPSE INVESTMENT FUND V, LLC, SOLAR ECLIPSE INVESTMENT FUND VI, LLC, SOLAR ECLIPSE INVESTMENT FUND X, LLC, SOLAR ECLIPSE INVESTMENT FUND XI, LLC, SOLAR ECLIPSE INVESTMENT FUND XII, LLC, SOLAR ECLIPSE INVESTMENT FUND XIX, LLC, SOLAR ECLIPSE INVESTMENT FUND XV, LLC, SOLAR ECLIPSE INVESTMENT FUND XVI, LLC, SOLAR ECLIPSE INVESTMENT FUND XVII, LLC, SOLAR ECLIPSE INVESTMENT FUND XVIII, LLC, SOLAR ECLIPSE INVESTMENT FUND XXI, LLC, SOLAR ECLIPSE INVESTMENT FUND XXIII, LLC, SOLAR ECLIPSE INVESTMENT FUND XXIV, LLC, SOLAR ECLIPSE INVESTMENT FUND XXIX, LLC, SOLAR ECLIPSE INVESTMENT FUND XXVI, LLC, SOLAR ECLIPSE INVESTMENT FUND XXVIII, LLC, SOLAR ECLIPSE INVESTMENT FUND XXX, LLC, SOLAR ECLIPSE INVESTMENT FUND XXXI, LLC, SOLAR ECLIPSE INVESTMENT FUND XXXIII, LLC, SOLAR ECLIPSE INVESTMENT FUND XXXIV, LLC. (Lombana, Hector)
November 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 25 PAPERLESS ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Edwin G. Torres for a ruling on all pre-trial, non-dispositive matters and for a Report and Recommendation on any dispositive matters. Signed by Judge Darrin P. Gayles (hs01)
November 4, 2020 Filing 24 NOTICE by T-Mobile USA, Inc. NOTICE OF LACK OF SERVICE OF PROCESS (Massey, David)
November 4, 2020 Filing 23 RESPONSE to Motion re #9 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by T-Mobile USA, Inc.. Replies due by 11/12/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Massey, David)
November 4, 2020 Filing 22 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #9 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by International Speedway Corporation. Replies due by 11/12/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 Declaration of Joel Chitwood, #2 Exhibit 2 Declaration of Frank Kelleher, #3 Affidavit Exhibit A, #4 Affidavit Exhibit B, #5 Affidavit Exhibit C, #6 Affidavit Exhibit D)(Folland, Robert) Modified docket text on 11/5/2020 (nc).
October 27, 2020 Set Deadlines per DE 21 Order as to #9 MOTION. Responses due by 11/4/2020. (kpe)
October 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #18 Defendant T-Mobile USA Inc.'s Motion for Extension of Time and #20 Defendant International Speedway Corporation's Motion for Extension of Time. Defendants shall respond to the Motion to Remand on or before November 4, 2020. Signed by Judge Darrin P. Gayles (hs01)
October 26, 2020 Filing 20 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #9 MOTION to Remand to State Court by International Speedway Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Motion for Remand)(Folland, Robert)
October 26, 2020 Filing 19 Defendant's Corporate Disclosure Statement by T-Mobile USA, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent T-Mobile US, Inc., Other Affiliate Deutsche Telekom Holding B.V. for T-Mobile USA, Inc. (Massey, David)
October 26, 2020 Filing 18 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #9 MOTION to Remand to State Court by T-Mobile USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Massey, David)
October 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #15 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Donald A. Rea may appear and participate in this action on behalf of International Speedway Corporation. The Clerk shall provide electronic notification ofall electronic filings to Donald A. Rea, at don.rea@saul.com. Signed by Judge Darrin P. Gayles (hs01)
October 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #14 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Ashley N. Fellona may appear and participate in this action on behalf of International Speedway Corporation. The Clerk shall provide electronic notification ofall electronic filings to Ashley N. Fellona, at ashley.fellona@saul.com Signed by Judge Darrin P. Gayles (hs01)
October 23, 2020 Filing 15 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Donald A. Rea. Filing Fee $ 200.00 Receipt # AFLSDC-13747194 by International Speedway Corporation. Responses due by 11/6/2020 (Attachments: #1 Certification Certification, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Folland, Robert)
October 23, 2020 Filing 14 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Ashley N. Fellona. Filing Fee $ 200.00 Receipt # BFLSDC-13747128 by International Speedway Corporation. Responses due by 11/6/2020 (Attachments: #1 Certification Certification, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Folland, Robert)
October 20, 2020 Filing 13 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by International Speedway Corporation identifying Corporate Parent Nascar, Inc. for International Speedway Corporation (Folland, Robert)
October 20, 2020 Filing 12 Clerks Notice to Filer re #11 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement. Other Affiliates/Corporate Parents Not Entered; ERROR - The Filer failed to enter all Other Affiliates/Corporate Parents from the Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement. Filer is instructed to refile their Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement and enter the missing Other Affiliates/Corp Parents. Note - Other Affiliates/Corporate Parents do not appear on the docket sheet. (nc)
October 19, 2020 Filing 11 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by International Speedway Corporation (Folland, Robert)
October 19, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of REMOVAL by International Speedway Corporation re #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint), (Folland, Robert) Modified docket text on 10/20/2020 (nc).
October 14, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Neil F. Luria, SOLAR ECLIPSE INVESTMENT FUND III, LLC, SOLAR ECLIPSE INVESTMENT FUND IV, LLC, SOLAR ECLIPSE INVESTMENT FUND V, LLC, SOLAR ECLIPSE INVESTMENT FUND VI, LLC, SOLAR ECLIPSE INVESTMENT FUND X, LLC, SOLAR ECLIPSE INVESTMENT FUND XI, LLC, SOLAR ECLIPSE INVESTMENT FUND XII, LLC, SOLAR ECLIPSE INVESTMENT FUND XIX, LLC, SOLAR ECLIPSE INVESTMENT FUND XV, LLC, SOLAR ECLIPSE INVESTMENT FUND XVI, LLC, SOLAR ECLIPSE INVESTMENT FUND XVII, LLC, SOLAR ECLIPSE INVESTMENT FUND XVIII, LLC, SOLAR ECLIPSE INVESTMENT FUND XXI, LLC, SOLAR ECLIPSE INVESTMENT FUND XXIII, LLC, SOLAR ECLIPSE INVESTMENT FUND XXIV, LLC, SOLAR ECLIPSE INVESTMENT FUND XXIX, LLC, SOLAR ECLIPSE INVESTMENT FUND XXVI, LLC, SOLAR ECLIPSE INVESTMENT FUND XXVIII, LLC, SOLAR ECLIPSE INVESTMENT FUND XXX, LLC, SOLAR ECLIPSE INVESTMENT FUND XXXI, LLC, SOLAR ECLIPSE INVESTMENT FUND XXXIII, LLC, SOLAR ECLIPSE INVESTMENT FUND XXXIV, LLC. Attorney Hector J. Lombana added to party Neil F. Luria(pty:rc). (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Neil Luria with Exhibits 1-4)(Lombana, Hector)
October 8, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Reginald Cuyler, Jr on behalf of T-Mobile USA, Inc.. Attorney Reginald Cuyler, Jr added to party T-Mobile USA, Inc.(pty:dft). (Cuyler, Reginald)
October 8, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Martin Leonard Steinberg on behalf of T-Mobile USA, Inc. (Steinberg, Martin)
October 7, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE OF COURT PRACTICE. Unless otherwise specified by the Court, every motion shall be double-spaced in Times New Roman 12-point typeface. Multiple Plaintiffs or Defendants shall file joint motions with co-parties unless there are clear conflicts of position. If conflicts of position exist, parties shall explain the conflicts in their separate motions. Failure to comply with ANY of these procedures may result in the imposition of appropriate sanctions, including but not limited to, the striking of the motion or dismissal of this action. Signed by Judge Darrin P. Gayles (hs01)
October 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #4 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Mark R. Owens may appear and participate in this action on behalf of International Speedway Corporation. The Clerk shall provide electronic notification of all electronic filings to Mark R. Owens, at mark.owens@btlaw.com. Signed by Judge Darrin P. Gayles (hs01)
October 5, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Mark R. Owens. Filing Fee $ 200.00 Receipt # AFLSDC-13634255 by International Speedway Corporation. Responses due by 10/19/2020 (Attachments: #1 Certification, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Folland, Robert)
October 5, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Robert C. Folland on behalf of International Speedway Corporation. Attorney Robert C. Folland added to party International Speedway Corporation(pty:dft). (Folland, Robert)
September 30, 2020 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Darrin P. Gayles. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Edwin G. Torres is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (kpe)
September 30, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (STATE COURT COMPLAINT - COMPLAINT) Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number AFLSDC-13612697, filed by T-Mobile USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - Complaint, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I)(Massey, David) No answer/motion to dismiss filed. Modified text on 10/1/2020 (kpe).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SOLAR ECLIPSE INVESTMENT FUND III, LLC et al v. T-Mobile USA, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T-Mobile USA, Inc.
Represented By: David B Massey
Represented By: Martin Leonard Steinberg
Represented By: Reginald Cuyler, Jr.
Represented By: Joshua Thaddeus Fordin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: International Speedway Corporation
Represented By: Mark R. Owens
Represented By: Ashley N. Fellona
Represented By: Donald A. Rea
Represented By: Robert C. Folland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SOLAR ECLIPSE INVESTMENT FUND XXXIV, LLC
Represented By: Hector J. Lombana
Represented By: Steven William Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SOLAR ECLIPSE INVESTMENT FUND XI, LLC
Represented By: Hector J. Lombana
Represented By: Steven William Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SOLAR ECLIPSE INVESTMENT FUND XVIII, LLC
Represented By: Hector J. Lombana
Represented By: Steven William Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SOLAR ECLIPSE INVESTMENT FUND IV, LLC
Represented By: Hector J. Lombana
Represented By: Steven William Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SOLAR ECLIPSE INVESTMENT FUND VI, LLC
Represented By: Hector J. Lombana
Represented By: Steven William Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SOLAR ECLIPSE INVESTMENT FUND XXXIII, LLC
Represented By: Hector J. Lombana
Represented By: Steven William Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SOLAR ECLIPSE INVESTMENT FUND V, LLC
Represented By: Hector J. Lombana
Represented By: Steven William Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SOLAR ECLIPSE INVESTMENT FUND XV, LLC
Represented By: Hector J. Lombana
Represented By: Steven William Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SOLAR ECLIPSE INVESTMENT FUND XXIX, LLC
Represented By: Hector J. Lombana
Represented By: Steven William Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SOLAR ECLIPSE INVESTMENT FUND XVI, LLC
Represented By: Hector J. Lombana
Represented By: Steven William Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SOLAR ECLIPSE INVESTMENT FUND XXIV, LLC
Represented By: Hector J. Lombana
Represented By: Steven William Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SOLAR ECLIPSE INVESTMENT FUND III, LLC
Represented By: Hector J. Lombana
Represented By: Steven William Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SOLAR ECLIPSE INVESTMENT FUND XXI, LLC
Represented By: Hector J. Lombana
Represented By: Steven William Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SOLAR ECLIPSE INVESTMENT FUND XXVIII, LLC
Represented By: Hector J. Lombana
Represented By: Steven William Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SOLAR ECLIPSE INVESTMENT FUND X, LLC
Represented By: Hector J. Lombana
Represented By: Steven William Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SOLAR ECLIPSE INVESTMENT FUND XXXI, LLC
Represented By: Hector J. Lombana
Represented By: Steven William Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SOLAR ECLIPSE INVESTMENT FUND XXIII, LLC
Represented By: Hector J. Lombana
Represented By: Steven William Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SOLAR ECLIPSE INVESTMENT FUND XXX, LLC
Represented By: Hector J. Lombana
Represented By: Steven William Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SOLAR ECLIPSE INVESTMENT FUND XII, LLC
Represented By: Hector J. Lombana
Represented By: Steven William Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SOLAR ECLIPSE INVESTMENT FUND XXVI, LLC
Represented By: Hector J. Lombana
Represented By: Steven William Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SOLAR ECLIPSE INVESTMENT FUND XVII, LLC
Represented By: Hector J. Lombana
Represented By: Steven William Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SOLAR ECLIPSE INVESTMENT FUND XIX, LLC
Represented By: Hector J. Lombana
Represented By: Steven William Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?