Prince v. Miami Dade County et al
Plaintiff: Ingrid Prince
Defendant: Jane Doe, John Doe, Asst. State Attorney Yovanna, City of Chicago, Miami Dade County, State of Illinois, Hertz Rental Car, Officer Giovanni and Officer Rojas
Case Number: 1:2020cv24129
Filed: October 8, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Jacqueline Becerra
Referring Judge: Paul C Huck
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 18, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 18, 2020 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to City of Chicago, Miami Dade County, State of Illinois. (cds)
October 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER Granting #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Granting to the extent that the plaintiff need not prepay even a partial filing fee in this case, or to prepay costs such as for service of process. USM Service Ordered and Summonses NOT provided for USM Service. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Becerra on 10/29/2020. See attached document for full details. (cds)
October 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER OF REFERENCE #3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Ingrid Prince. Motions referred to Judge Jacqueline Becerra. Signed by Senior Judge Paul C. Huck on 10/21/2020. See attached document for full details. (cds)
October 8, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Ingrid Prince. (jao)
October 8, 2020 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Senior Judge Paul C. Huck. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Becerra is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (jao)
October 8, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against City of Chicago, Jane Doe, John Doe, Giovanni, Hertz Rental Car, Miami Dade County, Rojas, State of Illinois, Yovanna. Filing fees $ 400.00. IFP Filed, filed by Ingrid Prince. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(jao)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Prince v. Miami Dade County et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Asst. State Attorney Yovanna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Chicago
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Miami Dade County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Illinois
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hertz Rental Car
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Giovanni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Rojas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ingrid Prince
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?