MSP Recovery Claims, Series LLC et al v. Northland Insurance Company et al
Plaintiff: MSP Recovery Claims, Series LLC, MSPA Claims 1, LLC and MAO-MSO Recovery II, LLC
Defendant: Travelers Casualty Company, Farmington Casualty Company, Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company, Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America, Charter Oak Fire Insurance Company, St. Paul Mercury Insurance Company, Phoenix Insurance Company, First Floridian Auto and Home Insurance Company, Standard Fire Insurance Company, Travelers Property Casualty Insurance Company, St. Paul Fire and Marine Insurance Company, Travelers Indemnity Company, Select Insurance Company, Northland Insurance Company and Travelers Casualty and Surety Company
Case Number: 1:2020cv24176
Filed: October 12, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Chris M McAliley
Referring Judge: Kathleen M Williams
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1395
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 1, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 NOTICE of Change of Address, Email or Law Firm Name by Michael O. Mena (Mena, Michael)
November 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #11 Motion for Extension of Time. Defendants' Responses to Complaint due 01/19/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Chris M. McAliley on 11/10/2020. (rr00)
November 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #1 Complaint,,, by Charter Oak Fire Insurance Company, Farmington Casualty Company, First Floridian Auto and Home Insurance Company, Northland Insurance Company, Phoenix Insurance Company, Select Insurance Company, St. Paul Fire and Marine Insurance Company, St. Paul Mercury Insurance Company, Standard Fire Insurance Company, Travelers Casualty Company, Travelers Casualty and Surety Company, Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America, Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company, Travelers Indemnity Company, Travelers Property Casualty Insurance Company. Attorney Laura Besvinick added to party Charter Oak Fire Insurance Company(pty:dft), Attorney Laura Besvinick added to party Farmington Casualty Company(pty:dft), Attorney Laura Besvinick added to party First Floridian Auto and Home Insurance Company(pty:dft), Attorney Laura Besvinick added to party Northland Insurance Company(pty:dft), Attorney Laura Besvinick added to party Phoenix Insurance Company(pty:dft), Attorney Laura Besvinick added to party Select Insurance Company(pty:dft), Attorney Laura Besvinick added to party St. Paul Fire and Marine Insurance Company(pty:dft), Attorney Laura Besvinick added to party St. Paul Mercury Insurance Company(pty:dft), Attorney Laura Besvinick added to party Standard Fire Insurance Company(pty:dft), Attorney Laura Besvinick added to party Travelers Casualty Company (pty:dft), Attorney Laura Besvinick added to party Travelers Casualty and Surety Company(pty:dft), Attorney Laura Besvinick added to party Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America(pty:dft), Attorney Laura Besvinick added to party Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company(pty:dft), Attorney Laura Besvinick added to party Travelers Indemnity Company(pty:dft), Attorney Laura Besvinick added to party Travelers Property Casualty Insurance Company(pty:dft). (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Besvinick, Laura)
October 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint,,, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by MSPA Claims 1, LLC, MSP Recovery Claims, Series LLC, MAO-MSO Recovery II, LLC. Charter Oak Fire Insurance Company served on 10/30/2020, answer due 11/20/2020; Farmington Casualty Company served on 10/30/2020, answer due 11/20/2020; First Floridian Auto and Home Insurance Company served on 10/30/2020, answer due 11/20/2020; Northland Insurance Company served on 10/30/2020, answer due 11/20/2020; Phoenix Insurance Company served on 10/30/2020, answer due 11/20/2020; Select Insurance Company served on 10/30/2020, answer due 11/20/2020; St. Paul Fire and Marine Insurance Company served on 10/30/2020, answer due 11/20/2020; St. Paul Mercury Insurance Company served on 10/30/2020, answer due 11/20/2020; Standard Fire Insurance Company served on 10/30/2020, answer due 11/20/2020; Travelers Casualty Company served on 10/30/2020, answer due 11/20/2020; Travelers Casualty and Surety Company served on 10/30/2020, answer due 11/20/2020; Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America served on 10/30/2020, answer due 11/20/2020; Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company served on 10/30/2020, answer due 11/20/2020; Travelers Indemnity Company served on 10/30/2020, answer due 11/20/2020; Travelers Property Casualty Insurance Company served on 10/30/2020, answer due 11/20/2020. (Ruiz, John)
October 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Summons Issued as to Charter Oak Fire Insurance Company, Farmington Casualty Company, First Floridian Auto and Home Insurance Company, Northland Insurance Company, Phoenix Insurance Company, Select Insurance Company, St. Paul Fire and Marine Insurance Company, St. Paul Mercury Insurance Company, Standard Fire Insurance Company, Travelers Casualty Company, Travelers Casualty and Surety Company, Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America, Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company, Travelers Indemnity Company, Travelers Property Casualty Insurance Company. (ls)
October 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons(es) by MAO-MSO Recovery II, LLC, MSP Recovery Claims, Series LLC, MSPA Claims 1, LLC re #1 Complaint,,, filed by MSP Recovery Claims, Series LLC, MAO-MSO Recovery II, LLC, MSPA Claims 1, LLC (Attachments: #1 Summon(s) (The) Travelers Casualty Company, #2 Summon(s) Farmington Casualty Company, #3 Summon(s) Travelers Casualty and Surety Company, #4 Summon(s) (The) Standard Fire Insurance Company, #5 Summon(s) Select Insurance Company, #6 Summon(s) St. Paul Fire and Marine Insurance Company, #7 Summon(s) St. Paul Mercury Insurance Company, #8 Summon(s) (The) Charter Oak Fire Insurance Company, #9 Summon(s) Phoenix Insurance Company, #10 Summon(s) Travelers Indemnity Company, #11 Summon(s) Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America, #12 Summon(s) Travelers Property Casualty Insurance Company, #13 Summon(s) Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company, #14 Summon(s) First Floridian Auto and Home Insurance Company) (Ruiz, John)
October 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER OF REFERRAL AND NOTICE OF COURT PRACTICES AND PROCEDURES. ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Chris M. McAliley for Pretrial Non-Dispositive Matters. Signed by Judge Kathleen M. Williams on 10/19/2020. See attached document for full details. (scn)
October 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Plaintiff's Corporate Disclosure Statement by MAO-MSO Recovery II, LLC identifying Other Affiliate MSP Recovery, LLC for MAO-MSO Recovery II, LLC (Ruiz, John)
October 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Clerks Notice to Filer re #4 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement,. Other Affiliate Not Entered; ERROR - The Filer failed to enter all Other Affiliates from the Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement. Filer is instructed to refile their Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement and enter the missing Other Affiliate. Note - Other Affiliate do not appear on the docket sheet. (ls)
October 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Plaintiff's Corporate Disclosure Statement by MAO-MSO Recovery II, LLC, MSP Recovery Claims, Series LLC, MSPA Claims 1, LLC identifying Other Affiliate MSP Recovery Services, LLC for MSPA Claims 1, LLC; Other Affiliate VRM MSP Recovery Partners, LLC, a Delaware limited liability company for MSP Recovery Claims, Series LLC; Other Affiliate RD Legal Finance, LLC for MAO-MSO Recovery II, LLC (Ruiz, John)
October 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Clerks Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case. Parties Not Added. The Filer failed to add all plaintiffs associated with the case. Filer is instructed to add the additional parties by filing a Notice of Entry of Parties. It is not necessary to re-file this document. (scn)
October 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Kathleen M. Williams. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Chris M. McAliley is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (scn)
October 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT (Class Action for Damages) against Charter Oak Fire Insurance Company, Farmington Casualty Company, First Floridian Auto and Home Insurance Company, Northland Insurance Company, Phoenix Insurance Company, Select Insurance Company, St. Paul Fire and Marine Insurance Company, St. Paul Mercury Insurance Company, Standard Fire Insurance Company, Travelers Casualty Company, Travelers Casualty and Surety Company, Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America, Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company, Travelers Indemnity Company, Travelers Property Casualty Insurance Company. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number AFLSDC-13677326, filed by MSPA Claims 1, LLC, MSP Recovery Claims, Series LLC, MAO-MSO Recovery II, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Ruiz, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MSP Recovery Claims, Series LLC et al v. Northland Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Travelers Casualty Company
Represented By: Laura Besvinick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Farmington Casualty Company
Represented By: Laura Besvinick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company
Represented By: Laura Besvinick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America
Represented By: Laura Besvinick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charter Oak Fire Insurance Company
Represented By: Laura Besvinick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: St. Paul Mercury Insurance Company
Represented By: Laura Besvinick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Phoenix Insurance Company
Represented By: Laura Besvinick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: First Floridian Auto and Home Insurance Company
Represented By: Laura Besvinick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Standard Fire Insurance Company
Represented By: Laura Besvinick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Travelers Property Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By: Laura Besvinick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: St. Paul Fire and Marine Insurance Company
Represented By: Laura Besvinick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Travelers Indemnity Company
Represented By: Laura Besvinick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Select Insurance Company
Represented By: Laura Besvinick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Northland Insurance Company
Represented By: Laura Besvinick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Travelers Casualty and Surety Company
Represented By: Laura Besvinick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MSP Recovery Claims, Series LLC
Represented By: John Hasan Ruiz
Represented By: Michael O. Mena
Represented By: Francesco Antonio Zincone, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MSPA Claims 1, LLC
Represented By: John Hasan Ruiz
Represented By: Michael O. Mena
Represented By: Francesco Antonio Zincone, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MAO-MSO Recovery II, LLC
Represented By: John Hasan Ruiz
Represented By: Michael O. Mena
Represented By: Francesco Antonio Zincone, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?