Managed Care Advisory Group, LLC et al v. All Defendants
Plaintiff: All Plaintiffs and Managed Care Advisory Group, LLC
Defendant: All Defendants
In Re: Managed Care Litigation
Case Number: 1:2020cv24295
Filed: October 20, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Federico A Moreno
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Arbitration
Cause of Action: 09 U.S.C. ยง 0009
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 23, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 23, 2020 SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 54 [misc] restricted/sealed until further notice. (mc)
October 20, 2020 Filing 53 MDL Transfer In Case Receipt from Southern District of California. Case Number 3:20-cv-01623 with documents 1-49. Assigned FLSD Case Number 1:20-cv-24295-FAM on 10/20/2020. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 1:00-md-01334-FAM. (mc)
October 20, 2020 Filing 52 Bar Letter re: Admissions sent to attorney Anna R. Buono, mailing date October 20, 2020, (pt)
October 20, 2020 Filing 51 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Federico A. Moreno. (mc)
October 20, 2020 Filing 50 Case transferred in from California Southern; Case Number 3:20-cv-01623. Electronic file including transfer order and docket sheet received. .(mc).
October 7, 2020 Filing 49 Case transferred to District of Southern District of Florida. Files transferred electronically to: *District of Southern District of Florida*.*400 North Miami Avenue, Room 8N09**Miami, FL 33128*. Signed by Judge Marilyn L. Huff on 10/6/20. (Attachments: #1 Transfer Order) (jmo) (dlg).
October 6, 2020 Filing 48 REPLY to Response to Motion re #29 MOTION to Change Venue Notice of Motion and Motion of Managed Care Advisory Group, LLC to Transfer CIGNA Healthcare, Inc.'s Motion to Quash Pursuant to Rule 45(f) [Redacted] - Managed Care Advisory Group, LLC's Reply in Support of Its Motion to Transfer CIGNA Healthcare, Inc.'s Motion to Quash Pursuant to Rule 45(f) filed by Managed Care Advisory Group, LLC. (Selesnick, Andrew) (jmo).
October 6, 2020 Filing 47 REPLY to Response to Motion re #20 MOTION to Change Venue Notice of Motion and Motion of Managed Care Advisory Group, LLC for Transfer Pursuant to Rule 45(f) - Managed Care Advisory Group, LLC's Reply in Support of Its Motion to Transfer Pursuant to Rule 45(f) filed by Managed Care Advisory Group, LLC. (Selesnick, Andrew) (jmo).
October 5, 2020 Filing 46 NOTICE Notice of Filing Supplemental Authority in Support of Managed Care Advisory Group, LLCs Motion for Transfer Pursuant to Rule 45(F)) [D.E. 20] and Motion to Transfer Cigna Healthcare, Inc.s Motion to Quash Pursuant to Rule 45(F) [D.E. 29] by Managed Care Advisory Group, LLC (Selesnick, Andrew) (jmo).
September 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER Approving the Pro Hac Vice Application of Tim Cunningham, re #4 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Marilyn L. Huff on 9/28/2020.(rmc)
September 28, 2020 Filing 44 REPLY to Response to Motion re #11 MOTION to Quash Subpoena to David Garcia (Redacted) filed by Cigna Healthcare, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Steinberg, Marty) (jmo).
September 22, 2020 Filing 43 RESPONSE in Opposition re #20 MOTION to Change Venue Notice of Motion and Motion of Managed Care Advisory Group, LLC for Transfer Pursuant to Rule 45(f) filed by David Garcia. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Tim Cunningham, #2 Exhibit 1 to Tim Cunningham Dec., #3 Exhibit 2 to Tim Cunningham Dec., #4 Exhibit 3 to Tim Cunningham Dec.)(Buono, Anna) (sxa).
September 21, 2020 Filing 42 RESPONSE in Opposition re #29 MOTION to Change Venue Notice of Motion and Motion of Managed Care Advisory Group, LLC to Transfer CIGNA Healthcare, Inc.'s Motion to Quash Pursuant to Rule 45(f) [Redacted], #20 MOTION to Change Venue Notice of Motion and Motion of Managed Care Advisory Group, LLC for Transfer Pursuant to Rule 45(f) filed by Cigna Healthcare, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Steinberg, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit 12, #14 Exhibit 13)(Steinberg, Marty) (sxa).
September 21, 2020 Filing 41 RESPONSE in Support re 1 MOTION to Quash filed by David Garcia. (Buono, Anna) (sxa).
September 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER Granting #37 Motion to File Documents Under Seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major on 9/17/2020. (sxa)
September 15, 2020 SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 38 [misc] restricted/sealed until further notice. (mc)
September 15, 2020 Filing 37 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal (Selesnick, Andrew) (sxa).
September 15, 2020 Filing 36 RESPONSE in Opposition re #11 MOTION to Quash Subpoena to David Garcia (Redacted) Managed Care Advisory Group, LLC's Opposition to CIGNA Healthcare's Motion to Quash Subpoena [Redacted] filed by Managed Care Advisory Group, LLC. (Selesnick, Andrew) (sxa).
September 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER Continuing Motion to Transfer of Venue. The two motions to transfer venue will be heard Monday, 10/13/2020 at 10:30 AM. Signed by Judge Marilyn L. Huff on 9/10/2020.(sxa)
September 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER: (1) Granting #30 MCAG'S Motion to File Documents Under Seal; and (2) Directing the Clerk to File Proposed Documents under Seal. Signed by Judge Marilyn L. Huff on 9/10/2020. (sxa)
September 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER Approving the Pro Hac Vice Application of Jeffrey Gutchess, re #25 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Marilyn L. Huff on 9/10/2020.(rmc)
September 9, 2020 SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 31 [misc] restricted/sealed until further notice. (mc)
September 9, 2020 Filing 30 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal (With attachments)(Selesnick, Andrew) (sxa).
September 9, 2020 Filing 29 MOTION to Change Venue Notice of Motion and Motion of Managed Care Advisory Group, LLC to Transfer CIGNA Healthcare, Inc.'s Motion to Quash Pursuant to Rule 45(f) [Redacted] by Managed Care Advisory Group, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Andrew H. Selesnick in Support of Managed Care Advisory Group, LLC's Motion to Transfer CIGNA Healthcare, Inc.'s Motion to Quash Pursuant to Rule 45(f) [Exhibit 1 Redacted in Its Entirety])(Selesnick, Andrew) (sxa).
September 8, 2020 Filing 28 Response in Opposition to Motion re 1 MOTION to Quash Managed Care Advisory Group, LLC's Opposition to David Garcia's Motion to Quash Subpoena filed by Managed Care Advisory Group, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Andrew H. Selesnick in Support of Managed Care Advisory Group, LLC's Opposition to David Garcia's Motion to Quash Subpoena, #2 Exhibit 1)(Selesnick, Andrew) (sxa). Modified on 9/9/2020 edit text to reflect response in opposition from attorney (dlg).
September 8, 2020 Filing 27 NOTICE Notice of Striking Re ECF No. 26 by Managed Care Advisory Group, LLC re #26 Response in Opposition to Motion, (Selesnick, Andrew) (sxa).
September 8, 2020 Filing 26 RESPONSE in Opposition re #11 MOTION to Quash Subpoena to David Garcia (Redacted) Managed Care Advisory Group, LLC's Opposition to David Garcia's Motion to Quash Subpoena filed by Managed Care Advisory Group, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Andrew H. Selesnick in Support of Managed Care Advisory Group, LLC's Opposition to David Garcia's Motion to Quash Subpoena, #2 Exhibit 1)(Selesnick, Andrew) (sxa).
September 8, 2020 Filing 25 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee received: $ 206 receipt number ACASDC-14466818.) (Application to be reviewed by Clerk.) (Gutchess, Jeffrey) (rmc).
September 4, 2020 Filing 24 NOTICE Notice of Correction Re: ECF No. 20 (Notice of Motion and Motion of Managed Care Advisory Group, LLC for Transfer Pursuant to Rule 45(f)) by Managed Care Advisory Group, LLC re #20 MOTION to Change Venue Notice of Motion and Motion of Managed Care Advisory Group, LLC for Transfer Pursuant to Rule 45(f) (Selesnick, Andrew) (sxa).
September 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER Approving the Pro Hac Vice Application of Gerald Greenberg, re #19 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Marilyn L. Huff on 9/4/2020.(rmc)
September 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER Granting #16 Ex Parte Motion for Extension of Briefing Schedule. The Court GRANTS MCAG's motion and sets the following: 1. Any opposition to the motion must be filed on or before September 15, 2020. 2. Any reply must be filed on or before September 29, 2020. Upon completion of the briefing, the Court will take the matter under submission pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7.1(d)(1) and no personal appearances will be required. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major on 9/4/2020. (tcf)
September 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER Approving the Pro Hac Vice Application of Martin Steinberg, re #13 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Marilyn L. Huff on 9/3/2020.(rmc)
September 3, 2020 Filing 20 MOTION to Change Venue Notice of Motion and Motion of Managed Care Advisory Group, LLC for Transfer Pursuant to Rule 45(f) by Managed Care Advisory Group, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Andrew H. Selesnick in Support of Managed Care Advisory Group, LLC's Motion for Transfer Pursuant to Rule 45(f), #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4)(Selesnick, Andrew) (tcf).
September 3, 2020 Filing 19 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee received: $ 206 receipt number ACASDC-14449724.) (Application to be reviewed by Clerk.) (Greenberg, Gerald) (rmc).
September 3, 2020 Filing 18 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Managed Care Advisory Group, LLC identifying Corporate Parent 777 Partners LLC for Managed Care Advisory Group, LLC. (Selesnick, Andrew) (tcf).
September 3, 2020 Filing 17 NOTICE of Party With Financial Interest by Managed Care Advisory Group, LLC Managed Care Advisory Group, LLC's Notice of Party with Financial Interest. Identifying Corporate Parent 777 Partners LLC for Managed Care Advisory Group, LLC. (Selesnick, Andrew) (tcf).
September 3, 2020 Filing 16 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #11 MOTION to Quash Subpoena to David Garcia (Redacted) Unopposed Ex Parte Motion for Extension of Time of Managed Care Advisory Group, LLC by Managed Care Advisory Group, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Andrew H. Selesnick in Support of Unopposed Ex Parte Motion for Extension of Time of Managed Care Advisory Group, LLC)(Selesnick, Andrew) (tcf).
September 3, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance of Andrew H. Selesnick by Andrew Howard Selesnick on behalf of Managed Care Advisory Group, LLC (Selesnick, Andrew)Attorney Andrew Howard Selesnick added to party Managed Care Advisory Group, LLC(pty:pla) (tcf).
September 3, 2020 Filing 14 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee received: $ 206 receipt number ACASDC-14446583.) (Application to be reviewed by Clerk.) (Massey, David) (rmc).
September 2, 2020 Filing 13 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee received: $ 206 receipt number ACASDC-14439690.) (Application to be reviewed by Clerk.) (Steinberg, Marty) (rmc).
September 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER Granting #7 Motion to File Documents Under Seal and Issuing Briefing Schedule. Any opposition to the motion must be filed on or before 9/8/2020. Any reply must be filed on or before9/22/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major on 9/1/2020. (sxa)
August 31, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION to Quash Subpoena to David Garcia (Redacted) by Cigna Healthcare, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities, #2 Declaration of Marty L. Steinberg, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit 5, #8 Exhibit 6, #9 Exhibit 7, #10 Exhibit 8, #11 Exhibit 9, #12 Exhibit 10, #13 Exhibit 11 through 22, #14 Exhibit 23, #15 Exhibit 24 through 26)(Turrill, Michael) (sxa).
August 27, 2020 SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 8 [misc] restricted/sealed until further notice. (mc)
August 27, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Party With Financial Interest by Cigna Healthcare, Inc. . Identifying Corporate Parent David Garcia, Other Affiliate Cigna Corporation, Other Affiliate Connecticut General Corporation, Other Affiliate CIGNA Holdings, Inc., Other Affiliate Managed Care Advisory Group, LLC, Other Affiliate Epiq Systems, Inc., Other Affiliate Cigna Healthcare Holdings, Inc. for Cigna Healthcare, Inc.. (Turrill, Michael)(sxa).
August 27, 2020 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Cigna Healthcare, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Cigna Healthcare Holdings, Inc., Other Affiliate Cigna Corporation, Other Affiliate Connecticut General Corporation, Other Affiliate CIGNA Holdings, Inc. for Cigna Healthcare, Inc. (Turrill, Michael) (sxa).
August 27, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal (With attachments)(Turrill, Michael) (sxa).
August 24, 2020 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by David Garcia re #5 Order Setting Briefing Schedule (Buono, Anna) (sxa).
August 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER Setting Briefing Schedule : Any opposition to the motion must be filed on or before 9/8/2020. Any reply must be filed on or before 9/22/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major on 8/24/2020.(sxa)
August 24, 2020 Filing 4 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee received: $ 206 receipt number ACASDC-14381298.) (Application to be reviewed by Clerk.) (Cunningham, Tim) (rmc).
August 21, 2020 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by David Garcia re #2 Notice of Party With Financial Interest, 1 MOTION to Quash, 1 Motion to Quash Out of District Subpoena,, (Buono, Anna) (sxa).
August 20, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Party With Financial Interest by David Garcia. Identifying Other Affiliate Epiq Systems, Inc., Other Affiliate Document Technologies, LLC. for David Garcia. (zda) (sjt).
August 20, 2020 Filing 1 MOTION to Quash Out of District Subpoena by David Garcia. (no document attached) (zda) (sjt).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Managed Care Advisory Group, LLC et al v. All Defendants
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: All Defendants
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
In re: Managed Care Litigation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: All Plaintiffs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Managed Care Advisory Group, LLC
Represented By: Gerald Edward Greenberg
Represented By: Andrew H. Selesnick
Represented By: Jeffrey W. Gutchess
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?