PayRange, Inc. v. Kiosoft Technologies, LLC et al
Plaintiff: PayRange, Inc.
Defendant: KIOSOFT TECHNOLOGIES, LLC and TECHTREX, INC.
Case Number: 1:2020cv24342
Filed: October 21, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Jonathan Goodman
Referring Judge: Robert N Scola
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1126
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 18, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 PAPERLESS ORDER: The Court grants #10 counsel's Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Attorney James C. Yoon is given permission to appear and participate in this matter on behalf of the Plaintiff. The Clerk is directed to provide this attorney with notification of all electronic filings via the email address set forth in the Motion. Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr. (sbn)
November 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 PAPERLESS ORDER: The Court grants #9 counsel's Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Attorney Ryan R. Smith is given permission to appear and participate in this matter on behalf of the Plaintiff. The Clerk is directed to provide this attorney with notification of all electronic filings via the email address set forth in the Motion. Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr. (sbn)
November 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 PAPERLESS ORDER: The Court grants #8 counsel's Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Attorney George Edward Powell III is given permission to appear and participate in this matter on behalf of the Plaintiff. The Clerk is directed to provide this attorney with notification of all electronic filings via the email address set forth in the Motion. Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr. (sbn)
November 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 PAPERLESS ORDER: The Court grants #7 counsel's Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Attorney Jamie Y. Otto is given permission to appear and participate in this matter on behalf of the Plaintiff. The Clerk is directed to provide this attorney with notification of all electronic filings via the email address set forth in the Motion. Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr. (sbn)
November 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 PAPERLESS ORDER: The Court grants #6 counsel's Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Attorney Neil N. Desai is given permission to appear and participate in this matter on behalf of the Plaintiff. The Clerk is directed to provide this attorney with notification of all electronic filings via the email address set forth in the Motion. Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr. (sbn)
November 20, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for James C. Yoon. Filing Fee $ 200.00 Receipt # AFLSDC-13906941 by PayRange, Inc.. Responses due by 12/4/2020 (Attachments: #1 Certification, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Englander, Joseph)
November 20, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Ryan R. Smith. Filing Fee $ 200.00 Receipt # AFLSDC-13906907 by PayRange, Inc.. Responses due by 12/4/2020 (Attachments: #1 Certification, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Englander, Joseph)
November 20, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for George Edward Powell III. Filing Fee $ 200.00 Receipt # AFLSDC-13906876 by PayRange, Inc.. Responses due by 12/4/2020 (Attachments: #1 Certification, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Englander, Joseph)
November 20, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Jamie Y. Otto. Filing Fee $ 200.00 Receipt # AFLSDC-13906816 by PayRange, Inc.. Responses due by 12/4/2020 (Attachments: #1 Certification, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Englander, Joseph)
November 20, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Neil N. Desai. Filing Fee $ 200.00 Receipt # AFLSDC-13906722 by PayRange, Inc.. Responses due by 12/4/2020 (Attachments: #1 Certification, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Englander, Joseph)
October 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MAGISTRATE JUDGE GOODMAN'S DISCOVERY PROCEDURES ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman on 10/27/2020. See attached document for full details. (fbn)
October 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Requiring Discovery and Scheduling Conference and Order Referring Discovery Matters to the Magistrate Judge. Patent Rules. Protective Order. Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr on 10/22/2020. See attached document for full details. (kpe)
October 22, 2020 Filing 3 FORM AO 120 SENT TO DIRECTOR OF U.S. PATENT AND TRADEMARK (kpe)
October 21, 2020 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (kpe)
October 21, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants. Filing fees $ 400.00. Pay.gov Agency Tracking ID FLSDC-13736043, payment transferred from : PayRange v. Kiosoft Technologies, LLC and Techtrex, Inc.l, filed by PayRange, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Englander, Joseph)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: PayRange, Inc. v. Kiosoft Technologies, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KIOSOFT TECHNOLOGIES, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TECHTREX, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PayRange, Inc.
Represented By: Joseph Robert Englander
Represented By: George Edward Powell, III
Represented By: James C. Yoon
Represented By: Neil N. Desai
Represented By: Jamie Y. Otto
Represented By: Ryan R. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?