Tarajano v. Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith, Inc.
Plaintiff: Eduardo Tarajano, Sr.
Defendant: Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv24409
Filed: October 27, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Jose E Martinez
Nature of Suit: Stockholders Suits
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 24, 2020 Case Stayed. Administratively Closing Case. PER DE#9 . (cds)
November 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER COMPELLING ARBITRATION. Granting #8 Motion to Compel. Signed by Judge Jose E. Martinez on 11/24/2020. See attached document for full details. (cds)
November 9, 2020 Filing 8 Defendant's MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Stay Proceedings and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith, Inc.. Responses due by 11/23/2020 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - 162-14N01, #2 Exhibit B - MLPA Enrollment Documents)(Olin, Keith)
November 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer to #1 Plaintiff's Complaint. Defendant shall file its answer on November 9, 2020. Signed by Judge Jose E. Martinez on 11/9/2020. (cvl)
November 9, 2020 Filing 6 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint), Complaint by Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith, Inc.. (Olin, Keith)
November 4, 2020 Filing 5 STATUS REPORT REMOVAL STATUS REPORT by Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith, Inc. (Olin, Keith)
November 4, 2020 Filing 4 State court record Court Record for date(s) of 9/15/2020 - 10/28/2020, Number of Pages 54 (Olin, Keith)
October 28, 2020 Filing 3 Notice of Court Practice In Removal Cases, (Removal Status Report due by 11/11/2020.) Signed by Judge Jose E. Martinez on 10/28/2020. See attached document for full details. (cqs)
October 27, 2020 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Jose E. Martinez. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Becerra is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (pcs)
October 27, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (STATE COURT COMPLAINT - Complaint) Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number CFLSDC-13766101, filed by Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Exh A - Summons and Complaint)(Olin, Keith) No Answer/Motion to Dismiss filed. Modified on 10/27/2020 (pcs).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tarajano v. Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Merrill Lynch, Pierce, Fenner & Smith, Inc.
Represented By: Keith Olin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eduardo Tarajano, Sr.
Represented By: Nathaniel Mark Edenfield
Represented By: Eric Matthew Sodhi
Represented By: Joshua Lee Spoont
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?