Ramhit v. Chief Immigrant Investor Program U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services et al
Plaintiff: Christopher Dale Ramhit
Defendant: Secretary CHAD F. WOLF, Attorney General WILLIAM BARR, Division Chief Lori Mackenzie, Chief Sarah Kendall, Director Kenneth T Cuccinelli, Secretary U.S. Department of Homeland Security, Director U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, Division Chief Immigrant Investor Program U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, Chief Immigrant Investor Program U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services and Attorney General of the United States
Case Number: 1:2020cv24422
Filed: October 27, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Beth Bloom
Nature of Suit: Other Immigration Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1361
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 4, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER Granting #13 Joint Motion To Stay Proceedings. The Clerk of Court shall ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSE the case. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 12/4/2020. See attached document for full details. (kpe)
December 4, 2020 Filing 13 Joint MOTION to Stay Case by Attorney General of the United States, Chief Immigrant Investor Program U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, Director U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, Division Chief Immigrant Investor Program U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, Secretary U.S. Department of Homeland Security. Responses due by 12/18/2020 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Proposed Order)(Alinikoff, Miriam)
November 18, 2020 Filing 12 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed by Christopher Dale Ramhit. U.S. Attorney served on 11/9/2020, answer due 1/8/2021 (Hurd, Rusten) Modified text on 11/18/2020 (kpe).
November 18, 2020 Filing 11 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed by Christopher Dale Ramhit. Attorney General of the United States served on 11/16/2020, answer due 1/15/2021. (Hurd, Rusten)
November 18, 2020 Filing 10 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed by Christopher Dale Ramhit. Secretary U.S. Department of Homeland Security served on 11/9/2020, answer due 1/8/2021. (Hurd, Rusten)
November 18, 2020 Filing 9 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed by Christopher Dale Ramhit. Director U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services served on 11/9/2020, answer due 1/8/2021. (Hurd, Rusten)
November 18, 2020 Filing 8 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed by Christopher Dale Ramhit. Division Chief Immigrant Investor Program U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services served on 11/9/2020, answer due 1/8/2021. (Hurd, Rusten)
November 18, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed by Christopher Dale Ramhit. Chief Immigrant Investor Program U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services served on 11/9/2020, answer due 1/8/2021. (Hurd, Rusten)
November 18, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Miriam Alinikoff on behalf of Attorney General of the United States, Chief Immigrant Investor Program U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, Director U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, Division Chief Immigrant Investor Program U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, Secretary U.S. Department of Homeland Security. Attorney Miriam Alinikoff added to party Attorney General of the United States(pty:dft), Attorney Miriam Alinikoff added to party Chief Immigrant Investor Program U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services(pty:dft), Attorney Miriam Alinikoff added to party Director U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services(pty:dft), Attorney Miriam Alinikoff added to party Division Chief Immigrant Investor Program U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services(pty:dft), Attorney Miriam Alinikoff added to party Secretary U.S. Department of Homeland Security(pty:dft). (Alinikoff, Miriam)
November 3, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to U.S. Attorney. (kpe)
October 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Requiring Scheduling Report And Certificates Of Interested Parties. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 10/29/2020. See attached document for full details. (kpe)
October 28, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Attorney General of the United States, Chief Immigrant Investor Program U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, Director U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, Division Chief Immigrant Investor Program U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, Secretary U.S. Department of Homeland Security. (kpe)
October 27, 2020 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Beth Bloom. (kpe)
October 27, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (Complaint for Declaratory and Mandamus Relief) against WILLIAM BARR, Kenneth T Cuccinelli, Sarah Kendall, Lori Mackenzie, CHAD F. WOLF. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number AFLSDC-13768223, filed by Christopher Dale Ramhit. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s) Summon (Kendall), #3 Summon(s) Summon (Mackenzie), #4 Summon(s) Summon (Cuccinnelli), #5 Summon(s) Summon (Wolf), #6 Summon(s) Summon (Barr), #7 Summon(s) Summon (Fajardo Orshan))Case restricted pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 5.2. (Hurd, Rusten)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ramhit v. Chief Immigrant Investor Program U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Secretary CHAD F. WOLF
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Attorney General WILLIAM BARR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Division Chief Lori Mackenzie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chief Sarah Kendall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Director Kenneth T Cuccinelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Secretary U.S. Department of Homeland Security
Represented By: Noticing INS Attorney
Represented By: Miriam Alinikoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Director U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services
Represented By: Noticing INS Attorney
Represented By: Miriam Alinikoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Division Chief Immigrant Investor Program U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services
Represented By: Noticing INS Attorney
Represented By: Miriam Alinikoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chief Immigrant Investor Program U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services
Represented By: Noticing INS Attorney
Represented By: Miriam Alinikoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Attorney General of the United States
Represented By: Noticing INS Attorney
Represented By: Miriam Alinikoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Dale Ramhit
Represented By: Rusten Carlson Hurd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?