Penniston et al v. South East Personnel Leasing, Inc.
Plaintiff: Darryl Eggler, Cody Penniston, Todd Stiff, Peter MCCANN, Plumbers Local Union No. 519 Health And Welfare Trust Fund,, Plumbers Local Union No. 519 Pension Trust Fund, Plumbers Local #519, Joint Apprentice & Training Committee, Nathaniel MARTIN, Joe Fernandez, Jeff Penniston and Wayne Orr
Defendant: South East Personnel Leasing, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv24426
Filed: October 27, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Darrin P Gayles
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1145
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 23, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #11 Defendant's Agreed Motion to Further Extend Time to File Response to Plaintiffs' Complaint. Defendant shall file a responsive pleading to Plaintiff's #1 Complaint on or before January 12, 2021. Signed by Judge Darrin P. Gayles (jsi)
December 22, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION for Extension of Time Agreed Motion to Further Extend Time to File Response to Plaintiffs Complaint re #9 Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT , #1 Complaint,, 10 Order on Motion for Extension of Time, Set/Reset Deadlines by South East Personnel Leasing, Inc.. Responses due by 1/5/2021 (Gollin, Lynn)
December 9, 2020 Reset Answer Due Deadline: South East Personnel Leasing, Inc. response due 12/23/2020. (ls)(per DE #10)
December 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #9 Defendant's Agreed Motion to Extend Time to Respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint. Defendant shall file a responsive pleading to Plaintiffs' #1 Complaint to Collect Contributions on or before December 23, 2020. Signed by Judge Darrin P. Gayles (jsi)
December 3, 2020 Filing 9 Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT by South East Personnel Leasing, Inc.. Attorney Lynn Elizabeth Mayna Gollin added to party South East Personnel Leasing, Inc.(pty:dft). Responses due by 12/17/2020 (Gollin, Lynn)
November 10, 2020 Filing 8 Clerks Notice to Filer re #7 Summons Returned Executed,. Docket Text Does Not Match Document; ERROR - The Filer failed to follow instructions when docketing the event, i.e.. ATTENTION!!! DO NOT SELECT ANY GROUPS!!! HOLD DOWN THE CONTROL BUTTON (Ctrl) AND SELECT INDIVIDUALS ONLY!!!. It is not necessary to refile the document. (ls)
November 9, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint,, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Nathaniel Martin, Plumbers Local #519, Joint Apprentice & Training Committee, Joe Fernandez, Peter McCann, Plumbers Local Union No. 519 Pension Trust Fund, Wayne Orr, Todd Stiff, Cody Penniston, Jeff Penniston, Plumbers Local Union No. 519 Health And Welfare Trust Fund,, Darryl Eggler. All Defendants. (Braswell, D.)
November 2, 2020 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to South East Personnel Leasing, Inc.. (ls)
October 31, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons(es) by Darryl Eggler, Joe Fernandez, Nathaniel MARTIN, Peter MCCANN, Wayne Orr, Cody Penniston, Jeff Penniston, Plumbers Local #519, Joint Apprentice & Training Committee, Plumbers Local Union No. 519 Health And Welfare Trust Fund,, Plumbers Local Union No. 519 Pension Trust Fund, Todd Stiff re 3 Clerks Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case, Summons(es) (Attachments: #1 Summon(s) Proposed) (Braswell, D.)
October 28, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE OF COURT PRACTICE. Unless otherwise specified by the Court, every motion shall be double-spaced in Times New Roman 12-point typeface. Multiple Plaintiffs or Defendants shall file joint motions with co-parties unless there are clear conflicts of position. If conflicts of position exist, parties shall explain the conflicts in their separate motions. Failure to comply with ANY of these procedures may result in the imposition of appropriate sanctions, including but not limited to, the striking of the motion or dismissal of this action. Signed by Judge Darrin P. Gayles (jsi)
October 28, 2020 Filing 3 Clerks Notice to Filer re: Summons cannot be issued. The party on the summons does not match the initiating documents. (pes)
October 28, 2020 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Darrin P. Gayles. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Edwin G. Torres is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (pes)
October 28, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT to Collect Delinquent Contributions against All Defendants. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number AFLSDC-13770193, filed by Nathaniel MARTIN, Plumbers Local #519, Joint Apprentice & Training Committee, Joe Fernandez, Peter MCCANN, Plumbers Local Union No. 519 Pension Trust Fund, Wayne Orr, Todd Stiff, Cody Penniston, Jeff Penniston, Plumbers Local Union No. 519 Health And Welfare Trust Fund,, Darryl Eggler. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s) Proposed)(Braswell, D.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Penniston et al v. South East Personnel Leasing, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darryl Eggler
Represented By: D. Marcus Braswell, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cody Penniston
Represented By: D. Marcus Braswell, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Todd Stiff
Represented By: D. Marcus Braswell, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Peter MCCANN
Represented By: D. Marcus Braswell, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Plumbers Local Union No. 519 Health And Welfare Trust Fund,
Represented By: D. Marcus Braswell, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Plumbers Local Union No. 519 Pension Trust Fund
Represented By: D. Marcus Braswell, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Plumbers Local #519, Joint Apprentice & Training Committee
Represented By: D. Marcus Braswell, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nathaniel MARTIN
Represented By: D. Marcus Braswell, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joe Fernandez
Represented By: D. Marcus Braswell, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeff Penniston
Represented By: D. Marcus Braswell, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wayne Orr
Represented By: D. Marcus Braswell, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: South East Personnel Leasing, Inc.
Represented By: Lynn Elizabeth Mayna Gollin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?