Asman v. Celebrity Cruises, Inc.
Plaintiff: Sanford Asman
Defendant: Celebrity Cruises, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv24431
Filed: October 28, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Marcia G Cooke
Referring Judge: John J O'Sullivan
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 28:1391
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 24, 2020 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Sanford Asman. Celebrity Cruises, Inc. waiver sent on 12/17/2020, answer due 2/16/2021. (Gerson, Nicholas)
December 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER OF REFERRAL AND ORDER REGARDING COURT PRACTICES AND PROCEDURES. ORDER REFERRING CASE to Ch. Magistrate Judge John J. O'Sullivan for Pretrial Non-Dispositive Matters., Notice of Court Practice. Signed by Judge Marcia G. Cooke on 12/12/2020. See attached document for full details. (amb)
October 28, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Celebrity Cruises, Inc.. (ebz)
October 28, 2020 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Marcia G. Cooke. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge John J. O'Sullivan is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (ebz)
October 28, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Celebrity Cruises, Inc.. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number AFLSDC-13772743, filed by Sanford Asman. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summon(s))(Gerson, Nicholas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Asman v. Celebrity Cruises, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Celebrity Cruises, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sanford Asman
Represented By: Nicholas I. Gerson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?