Mugaburu v. Akima Global Services, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Alejandro Mugaburu
Defendant: Akima Global Services, LLC, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement and Department of Homeland Security
Case Number: 1:2020cv24462
Filed: October 29, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Chris M McAliley
Referring Judge: Kathleen M Williams
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12182
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 11, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 11, 2020 Filing 14 REPLY to Response to Motion re #10 MOTION to Dismiss #1 Complaint, MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment in Support filed by Akima Global Services, LLC. (Crow, Heather)
December 4, 2020 Filing 13 Statement of: Material Facts by Alejandro Mugaburu re #10 MOTION to Dismiss #1 Complaint, MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment (Ayala Maura, Eduardo)
December 4, 2020 Filing 12 RESPONSE in Opposition re #10 MOTION to Dismiss #1 Complaint, MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Alejandro Mugaburu. Replies due by 12/11/2020. (Ayala Maura, Eduardo)
November 23, 2020 Filing 11 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Akima Global Services, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Akima, LLC, Corporate Parent NANA Regional Corporation for Akima Global Services, LLC (Crow, Heather)
November 23, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION to Dismiss #1 Complaint, , MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment by Akima Global Services, LLC. Attorney Heather Folsom Crow added to party Akima Global Services, LLC(pty:dft). Responses due by 12/7/2020 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Statement of Undisputed Material Facts in support of Alternative MSJ, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Proposed Order)(Crow, Heather)
November 10, 2020 Filing 9 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Alejandro Mugaburu. Akima Global Services, LLC served on 11/4/2020, answer due 11/25/2020. (Ayala Maura, Eduardo)
November 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER Of Referral And Notice Of Court Practices And Procedures. Signed by Judge Kathleen M. Williams on 11/4/2020. See attached document for full details. (kpe)
October 30, 2020 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (nc)
October 30, 2020 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Akima Global Services, LLC. (nc)
October 29, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons(es) by Alejandro Mugaburu re #1 Complaint, filed by Alejandro Mugaburu (Attachments: #1 Summon(s) AGS, #2 Summon(s) DHS, #3 Summon(s) ICE) (Ayala Maura, Eduardo)
October 29, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Filing Civil Cover Sheet by Alejandro Mugaburu re #1 Complaint, 3 Clerks Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Ayala Maura, Eduardo) Modified docket text on 10/30/2020 (nc).
October 29, 2020 Filing 3 Clerks Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case. No Civil Cover Sheet. Filer is instructed to file a Notice (Other) with the Civil Cover Sheet attached within 24 hours of the notice. (kpe)
October 29, 2020 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Kathleen M. Williams. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Chris M. McAliley is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (kpe)
October 29, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Immigration and customs enforcemen, akima global services. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number AFLSDC-13780572, filed by Alejandro Mugaburu. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Ayala Maura, Eduardo)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mugaburu v. Akima Global Services, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Akima Global Services, LLC
Represented By: Heather Folsom Crow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of Homeland Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alejandro Mugaburu
Represented By: Eduardo Ayala Maura
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?