HUGHES v. CARNIVAL CORPORATION
Plaintiff: HOWARD HUGHES
Defendant: CARNIVAL CORPORATION
Case Number: 1:2020cv24540
Filed: November 4, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Beth Bloom
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 7, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 12/7/2020. See attached document for full details. (jbs)
November 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER REQUIRING SCHEDULING REPORT AND CERTIFICATES OF INTERESTED PARTIES Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 11/5/2020. See attached document for full details. (jbs)
November 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Judge Joan A. Lenard recused. Case reassigned to Judge Beth Bloom for all further proceedings Signed by Judge Joan A. Lenard on 11/5/2020. See attached document for full details. (jc)
November 5, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to CARNIVAL CORPORATION. (jbs)
November 4, 2020 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Joan A. Lenard. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Lauren F. Louis is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (jbs)
November 4, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against CARNIVAL CORPORATION. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number AFLSDC-13812419, filed by HOWARD HUGHES. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s))(Perez, Luis)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: HUGHES v. CARNIVAL CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CARNIVAL CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HOWARD HUGHES
Represented By: Luis Alexander Perez
Represented By: Jacqueline Garcell
Represented By: Jason Robert Margulies
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?