Magnum Construction Management, LLC v. WSP USA Solutions, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Magnum Construction Management, LLC and Munilla Construction Management, LLC
Defendant: AMMAN & WHITNEY, INC., THE LOUIS BERGER GROUP, INC, WSP USA Solutions, Inc. and LOUIS BERGER U.S. INC.
Case Number: 1:2020cv24684
Filed: November 13, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Cecilia M Altonaga
Referring Judge: Edwin G Torres
Nature of Suit: Prop. Damage Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 7, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER denying #20 Motion to Remand. Plaintiff shall file a response to the Motion to Dismiss Complaint [ECF No. 19] by January 21, 2021. The Clerk shall reinstate the Motion to Dismiss [ECF No. 19] as though filed on this date. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 1/7/2021. See attached document for full details. (wc)
January 7, 2021 Filing 19 MOTION TO DISMISS #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint),, FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by AMMAN & WHITNEY, INC., THE LOUIS BERGER GROUP, INC, WSP USA Solutions, Inc.. Responses due by 12/18/2020 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit NTSB Investigative Report)(Aleman, Rayda) Modified to pending per DE# 30 on 1/7/2021; original file date was 12/4/2020 (wc).
January 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER SETTING DISCOVERY PROCEDURES. Signed by Magistrate Judge Edwin G. Torres on 1/6/2021. See attached document for full details. (mdc)
January 4, 2021 Filing 28 REPLY to Response to Motion re #20 MOTION to Remand filed by Magnum Construction Management, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Malfeld, Mariela)
January 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER SETTING TRIAL AND PRE-TRIAL SCHEDULE, REQUIRINGMEDIATION, AND REFERRING CERTAIN MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE: ( Jury Trial set for 11/8/2021 before Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga., Calendar Call set for 11/2/2021 09:00 AM before Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga.), ( Mediation Deadline 7/19/2021.). Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 1/4/2021. See attached document for full details. (drz) #Pattern Jury Instruction Builder - To access the latest, up to date changes to the 11th Circuit Pattern Jury Instructions go to https://pji.ca11.uscourts.gov or click here.
December 30, 2020 Filing 26 Joint SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 16.1 by Magnum Construction Management, LLC (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Malfeld, Mariela)
December 28, 2020 Filing 25 RESPONSE in Opposition re #20 MOTION to Remand filed by AMMAN & WHITNEY, INC., THE LOUIS BERGER GROUP, INC, WSP USA Solutions, Inc.. Replies due by 1/4/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Homer Declaration, #2 Exhibit Karis Declaration)(Homer, Peter)
December 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER granting in part #23 Corrected Motion for Extension of Time to File Joint Scheduling Report; denying as moot #22 Motion for Extension of TimeJoint Scheduling Report. The parties shall submit a joint scheduling report by December 30, 2020. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 12/18/2020. See attached document for full details. (wc)
December 18, 2020 Filing 23 Corrected MOTION for Extension of Time to File Joint Scheduling Report re #10 Order on Motion for Extension of Time by Magnum Construction Management, LLC. Responses due by 1/4/2021 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Malfeld, Mariela)
December 18, 2020 Filing 22 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Joint Scheduling Report re #10 Order on Motion for Extension of Time by Magnum Construction Management, LLC. Responses due by 1/4/2021 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Malfeld, Mariela)
December 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER denying without prejudice #19 Motion to Dismiss Complaint. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 12/15/2020. See attached document for full details. (wc)
December 14, 2020 Filing 20 MOTION to Remand by Magnum Construction Management, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Malfeld, Mariela)
December 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #16 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Attorney Stacey Garbis Pagonis. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 12/1/2020. See attached document for full details. (ps1)
December 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #15 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Attorney Hariklia Karis. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 12/1/2020. See attached document for full details. (ps1)
December 1, 2020 Filing 16 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Stacey Garbis Pagonis. Filing Fee $ 200.00 Receipt # AFLSDC-13956133 by AMMAN & WHITNEY, INC., THE LOUIS BERGER GROUP, INC, WSP USA Solutions, Inc.. Responses due by 12/15/2020 (Attachments: #1 Certification, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Homer, Peter)
December 1, 2020 Filing 15 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Hariklia Karis. Filing Fee $ 200.00 Receipt # AFLSDC-13955989 by AMMAN & WHITNEY, INC., THE LOUIS BERGER GROUP, INC, WSP USA Solutions, Inc.. Responses due by 12/15/2020 (Attachments: #1 Certification, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Homer, Peter)
December 1, 2020 Filing 14 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement and Certificate of Interested Parties by AMMAN & WHITNEY, INC., THE LOUIS BERGER GROUP, INC, WSP USA Solutions, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Berger Group Holdings, Inc. for AMMAN & WHITNEY, INC., THE LOUIS BERGER GROUP, INC; Corporate Parent WSP USA, Inc., Corporate Parent WSP USA Buildings, Inc., Corporate Parent WSP USA Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent WSP Group Holding, Inc., Corporate Parent WSP Global, Inc., Corporate Parent WSP Group Consulting, Inc. for WSP USA Solutions, Inc. (Homer, Peter)
December 1, 2020 Filing 13 Clerks Notice to Filer re #12 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement. Other Affiliates/Corporate Parents Not Entered; ERROR - The Filer failed to enter all Other Affiliates/Corporate Parents from the Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement. Filer is instructed to refile their Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement and enter the missing Other Affiliates/Corp Parents. Note - Other Affiliates/Corporate Parents do not appear on the docket sheet. (drz)
November 30, 2020 Filing 12 Corporate Disclosure Statement and Certificate of Interested Parties by AMMAN & WHITNEY, INC., THE LOUIS BERGER GROUP, INC, WSP USA Solutions, Inc. (Aleman, Rayda)
November 30, 2020 Filing 11 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Magnum Construction Management, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Strongcore Group, LLC for Magnum Construction Management, LLC (Malfeld, Mariela)
November 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time. The parties have until December 18, 2020 to file a joint scheduling report. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 11/30/2020. See attached document for full details. (ps1)
November 30, 2020 Filing 9 STATUS REPORT RE. Removal by AMMAN & WHITNEY, INC., THE LOUIS BERGER GROUP, INC, WSP USA Solutions, Inc. (Homer, Peter)
November 25, 2020 Filing 8 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Joint Scheduling Report re #4 Order Requiring Joint Scheduling Report, by Magnum Construction Management, LLC. Responses due by 12/9/2020 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Malfeld, Mariela)
November 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint. Defendants shall submit a single combined response or separate answers by December 4, 2020. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 11/20/2020. See attached document for full details. (wc)
November 19, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer by AMMAN & WHITNEY, INC., THE LOUIS BERGER GROUP, INC, WSP USA Solutions, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Aleman, Rayda)
November 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER. Removal Status Report due by 11/30/2020. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 11/16/2020. See attached document for full details. (wc)
November 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REQUIRING SCHEDULING REPORT AND CERTIFICATES OF INTERESTED PARTIES. Joint Scheduling Report and Certificates of Interested Parties due by 11/30/2020. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 11/16/2020. See attached document for full details. (wc)
November 16, 2020 Filing 3 Clerks Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case. Alias Not Added. The Filer failed to add the alias information for the party(ies). The correction was made. It is not necessary to re-file this document. (drz)
November 13, 2020 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Edwin G. Torres is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (drz)
November 13, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (STATE COURT COMPLAINT - MAGNUM CONSTRUCTION MGMT, LLC v. WSP USA SOLUTIONS, INC., et al) Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number AFLSDC-13865769, filed by THE LOUIS BERGER GROUP, INC, AMMAN & WHITNEY, INC., WSP USA Solutions, Inc., LOUIS BERGER U.S. INC.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Complaint, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit)(Homer, Peter) Modified on 11/16/2020 (drz). ( No Answer, Affirmative Defense or Motion to Dismiss Filed in State Court).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Magnum Construction Management, LLC v. WSP USA Solutions, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AMMAN & WHITNEY, INC.
Represented By: Peter W. Homer
Represented By: Stacey Garbis Pagonis
Represented By: Rayda Aleman
Represented By: Hariklia Karis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THE LOUIS BERGER GROUP, INC
Represented By: Peter W. Homer
Represented By: Stacey Garbis Pagonis
Represented By: Rayda Aleman
Represented By: Hariklia Karis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WSP USA Solutions, Inc.
Represented By: Peter W. Homer
Represented By: Stacey Garbis Pagonis
Represented By: Rayda Aleman
Represented By: Hariklia Karis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LOUIS BERGER U.S. INC.
Represented By: Peter W. Homer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Magnum Construction Management, LLC
Represented By: Mariela Melissa Malfeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Munilla Construction Management, LLC
Represented By: Mariela Melissa Malfeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?