McCluskey EL v. Celebrity Cruises, Inc.
Plaintiff: Tara McCluskey EL
Defendant: Celebrity Cruises, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv24706
Filed: November 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Chris M McAliley
Referring Judge: Kathleen M Williams
Nature of Suit: Marine Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1333
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 4, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 4, 2021 Filing 12 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT as to #1 Complaint, #3 Summons Issued Acknowledgment filed by Tara McCluskey EL. (scn)
January 4, 2021 Filing 11 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE as to #1 Complaint, #3 Summons Issued filed by Tara McCluskey EL. (scn)
December 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER denying #7 Motion to Appoint Special Process Server; denying #9 Motion to Appoint Special Process Server. Signed by Magistrate Judge Chris M. McAliley on 12/4/2020. See attached document for full details. (rr00)
December 3, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION for Order to have US Marshals serve Summons by Tara McCluskey EL. Responses due by 12/17/2020 (ls)
December 3, 2020 Filing 8 Clerks Notice of Docket Correction re #5 Order of Referral and Notice of Court Practice. Document Replaced Due to Error; The correct document has been attached to this notice and to D.E #5 . (ra)
December 1, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION for Appointment of Special Process Server (US Marshal) by Tara McCluskey EL. Responses due by 12/15/2020. (scn)
November 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER OF INSTRUCTIONS TO PRO SE LITIGANT. Signed by Judge Kathleen M. Williams on 11/24/2020. See attached document for full details. (scn)
November 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER OF REFERRAL AND NOTICE OF COURT PRACTICES AND PROCEDURES - ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Chris M. McAliley for Pretrial Non-Dispositive Matters. Signed by Judge Kathleen M. Williams on 11/24/2020. See attached document for full details. (scn) (Main Document 5 replaced on 12/3/2020) (ra).
November 17, 2020 Filing 4 Clerks Notice of Receipt of Filing Fee received on 11/17/2020 in the amount of $ 400.00, receipt number FLS100218421. (jcs)
November 16, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Celebrity Cruises, Inc. (pcs)
November 16, 2020 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Kathleen M. Williams. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Chris M. McAliley is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (pcs)
November 16, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Celebrity Cruises, Inc.. Filing fees $ 400.00, filed by Tara McCluskey EL. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s), #3 Routing Slip)(pcs)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McCluskey EL v. Celebrity Cruises, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Celebrity Cruises, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tara McCluskey EL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?