Correll v. Iconic Mortgage Corp.
Plaintiff: Kirsten Correll
Defendant: Iconic Mortgage Corp.
Case Number: 1:2020cv24858
Filed: November 25, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Cecilia M Altonaga
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 25, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 25, 2020 Filing 26 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Avi Robert Kaufman on behalf of Kirsten Correll. Attorney Avi Robert Kaufman added to party Kirsten Correll(pty:pla). (Kaufman, Avi)
November 25, 2020 Filing 25 Bar Letter re: Admissions sent to attorney Amy Brown Doolittle, mailing date November 25, 2020. (cw)
November 25, 2020 Filing 24 Bar Letter re: Admissions sent to attorney William Peter Robinson, III, mailing date November 25, 2020. (cw)
November 25, 2020 Filing 23 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Edwin G. Torres is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (bb)
November 25, 2020 Filing 22 Case transferred in from Virginia Eastern; Case Number 2:20-cv-00426. Electronic file including transfer order and docket sheet received. .(bb).
November 24, 2020 Case transferred to District of Southern District of FL. Original file, certified copy of transfer order, and docket sheet sent. (afar)
November 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER - Stipulation Regarding Transfer of Venue to the Southern District of Florida. The stipulation is AP-PROVED and it is hereby ORDERED that this case be transferred to the Southern District of Florida. All pending motions are DENIED without prejudice to refiling after transfer. Signed by District Judge Arenda L. Wright Allen on 11/24/20. (afar)
November 12, 2020 Filing 20 STIPULATION by Kirsten Correll. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Robinson, William)
November 12, 2020 Notice of Correction re 19 Stipulation: Document number 19 Main Document Should not be an Order/Stipulation. Please reflie with the main document being a Motion, Letter or Notice and attach the Stipulation to the main document. The document has been removed. (afar)
November 10, 2020 Filing 19 STIPULATION re #11 MOTION to Dismiss or, in the Alternative, to Transfer Venue, and Brief in Support of Motion, #13 MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending the Supreme Courts Decision in Facebook Inc. v. Duguid, Case No. 19-511, and Brief in Support of Motion, #12 MOTION to Strike or Dismiss the Nationwide Class Allegations, and Brief in Support of Motion by Kirsten Correll. (Robinson, William)
November 3, 2020 Notice of Correction re #18 First Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Avi Robert Kaufman and Certification of Local Counsel William P. Robinson FIRST. The motion does not contain the signature of the applicant. Local counsel should file a corrected motion that includes the written signature of the applicant. Counsel should pay the filing fee. (tlev, )
October 29, 2020 Filing 18 First Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Avi Robert Kaufman and Certification of Local Counsel William P. Robinson FIRST by Kirsten Correll. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Robinson, William)
October 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that Plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply #16 is GRANTED. Plaintiff shall file her responses to the motions on or before November 10, 2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert J. Krask on 10/26/2020. (bboy, )
October 23, 2020 Filing 16 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Plaintiff Motion for Extension by Kirsten Correll. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Iconic Plaintiff's Proposed Consent Order on First Request)(Robinson, William)
October 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that Iconic Mortgage Corp's Motion #10 is GRANTED. Defendant Iconic Mortgage Corp. shall file its responsive pleading on or before October 27, 2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert J. Krask on 10/13/2020. (bboy, )
October 13, 2020 Filing 14 Request for Hearing re #11 MOTION to Dismiss or, in the Alternative, to Transfer Venue, and Brief in Support of Motion, #13 MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending the Supreme Courts Decision in Facebook Inc. v. Duguid, Case No. 19-511, and Brief in Support of Motion, #12 MOTION to Strike or Dismiss the Nationwide Class Allegations, and Brief in Support of Motion by Iconic Mortgage Corp.. (Doolittle, Amy)
October 13, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending the Supreme Courts Decision in Facebook Inc. v. Duguid, Case No. 19-511, and Brief in Support of Motion by Iconic Mortgage Corp.. (Doolittle, Amy)
October 13, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION to Strike or Dismiss the Nationwide Class Allegations, and Brief in Support of Motion by Iconic Mortgage Corp.. (Doolittle, Amy)
October 13, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION to Dismiss or, in the Alternative, to Transfer Venue, and Brief in Support of Motion by Iconic Mortgage Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Alex Vayshelboym)(Doolittle, Amy)
October 13, 2020 MOTIONS REFERRED to Magistrate Judge: Robert J. Krask. #10 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint (bboy, )
October 12, 2020 Filing 10 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Iconic Mortgage Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Doolittle, Amy)
September 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 CONSENT ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that Iconic Mortgage Corp.'s Motion #7 is GRANTED. Defendant Iconic Mortgage Corp shall file its responsive pleading on or before October 13, 2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert J. Krask on 09/08/2020. (bboy, )
September 8, 2020 MOTIONS REFERRED to Magistrate Judge: Robert J. Krask. #7 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint (bboy, )
September 4, 2020 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Iconic Mortgage Corp.. (Doolittle, Amy)
September 4, 2020 Filing 7 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Iconic Mortgage Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Agreed)(Doolittle, Amy)
September 4, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Amy Brown Doolittle on behalf of Iconic Mortgage Corp. (Doolittle, Amy)
August 25, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kirsten Correll Iconic Mortgage Corp. served on 8/21/2020, answer due 9/11/2020 (Robinson, William)
August 18, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Iconic Mortgage Corp. NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Print out two electronically issued summons and one copy of the attachments for each defendant to be served with the complaint. (Attachments: #1 Civil Motions Procedures)(epri, )
August 18, 2020 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Arenda L. Wright Allen and Magistrate Judge Robert J. Krask. (epri, )
August 18, 2020 Filing 3 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Kirsten Correll. (Robinson, William)
August 18, 2020 Filing 2 Proposed Summons re #1 Complaint by Kirsten Correll. (Robinson, William)
August 18, 2020 Filing 1 Complaint ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0422-7357119.), filed by Kirsten Correll. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Robinson, William)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Correll v. Iconic Mortgage Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kirsten Correll
Represented By: Avi Robert Kaufman
Represented By: William Peter Robinson, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Iconic Mortgage Corp.
Represented By: Amy Brown Doolittle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?