Gimeno v. NCHMD, Inc., et al
Plaintiff: Raniero Gimeno
Defendant: NCHMD, Inc. and NCH Healthcare System, Inc., NCHMD, Inc. and NCH Healthcare System, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv24870
Filed: November 25, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Beth Bloom
Referring Judge: Alicia M Otazo-Reyes
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 17, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 20, 2021 Filing 29 RESPONSE in Support re #20 Plaintiff's MOTION to Remand and supporting memorandum of law filed by Raniero Gimeno. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Dunaj, Sherryll)
January 19, 2021 Filing 28 RESPONSE in Support re #12 MOTION to Dismiss the State Court Complaint contained within the Notice of Removal #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint), filed by NCH Healthcare System, Inc., NCHMD, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Kalteux, David)
January 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER Scheduling Mediation before Karen Evans: Mediation Deadline 6/7/2021. Mediation Hearing set for 6/2/2021 at 10:00 AM Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 1/12/2021. See attached document for full details. (lk)
January 13, 2021 Filing 26 RESPONSE in Opposition re #20 Plaintiff's MOTION to Remand and supporting memorandum of law filed by NCH Healthcare System, Inc., NCHMD, Inc.. Replies due by 1/20/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Kalteux, David)
January 12, 2021 Filing 25 RESPONSE in Opposition re #12 MOTION to Dismiss the State Court Complaint contained within the Notice of Removal #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint), filed by Raniero Gimeno. Replies due by 1/19/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Berg v Life Insurance Co)(Dunaj, Sherryll)
January 12, 2021 Filing 24 NOTICE Of Filing Agreed Order Confirming Mediator Selection And Date For Mediation. Selected/Added Karen Evans as Mediator. Mediation Hearing set for 6/2/21 at 10 :00 a.m.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Dunaj, Sherryll) Modified text on 1/12/2021 (kpe).
January 12, 2021 Filing 23 NOTICE of Striking #21 Notice of Mediator Selection and/or Hearing filed by Karen Evans by Raniero Gimeno (Dunaj, Sherryll)
January 12, 2021 Filing 22 Clerks Notice to Filer re #21 Notice of Mediator Selection and/or Hearing. Proposed Order Docketed as Main Document; CORRECTIVE ACTION REQUIRED - Filer must File a Notice of Striking, then resubmit the proposed order as instructed in the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures. (kpe)
January 12, 2021 Filing 21 STRICKEN Agreed NOTICE of Mediator Selection and Hearing. Selected/Added Karen Evans as Mediator. Mediation Hearing set for 6/2/21 at 10 :00 a.m.. (Dunaj, Sherryll) Modified on 1/12/2021 per DE #23 Notice (kpe).
December 30, 2020 Filing 20 Plaintiff's MOTION to Remand and supporting memorandum of law by Raniero Gimeno. (Dunaj, Sherryll)
December 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #18 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Attorney Matthew Grabell. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom (ak03)
December 29, 2020 Filing 18 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Matthew Grabell. Pay.gov Agency Tracking ID FLSDC-14118463. Filing Fee $ 200.00 by NCH Healthcare System, Inc., NCHMD, Inc.. Responses due by 1/12/2021 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Kalteux, David)
December 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER SETTING TRIAL AND PRE-TRIAL SCHEDULE, REQUIRING MEDIATION, AND REFERRING CERTAIN MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE (Amended Pleadings due by 2/22/2021., Discovery due by 6/1/2021., Expert Discovery due by 6/1/2021., Joinder of Parties due by 2/22/2021., Mediation Deadline 6/15/2021., In Limine Motions due by 6/23/2021., Dispositive Motions due by 6/23/2021., Motions due by 6/23/2021., Pretrial Stipulation due by 9/13/2021., Jury Trial set for 9/27/2021 09:00 AM in Miami Division before Judge Beth Bloom., Calendar Call set for 9/21/2021 01:45 PM before Judge Beth Bloom.), Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Alicia M. Otazo-Reyes for Discovery Matters. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 12/22/2020. See attached document for full details. (jbs) #Pattern Jury Instruction Builder - To access the latest, up to date changes to the 11th Circuit Pattern Jury Instructions go to https://pji.ca11.uscourts.gov or click here.
December 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #15 Agreed Motion for Enlargement of Time to Respond to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss. Plaintiff shall file his response to the Motion to Dismiss on or before January 12, 2021. Re: #12 MOTION to Dismiss the State Court Complaint contained within the Notice of Removal #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint), filed by NCHMD, Inc., NCH Healthcare System, Inc. Response due by 1/12/2021. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom (ak03)
December 22, 2020 Filing 15 Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to respond to motion to dismiss to 1/12/21 re #13 Memorandum, #12 MOTION to Dismiss the State Court Complaint contained within the Notice of Removal #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint), by Raniero Gimeno. Responses due by 1/5/2021 (Dunaj, Sherryll)
December 16, 2020 Filing 14 Joint SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 16.1 by Raniero Gimeno (Dunaj, Sherryll)
December 15, 2020 Filing 13 MEMORANDUM in Support re #12 MOTION to Dismiss the State Court Complaint contained within the Notice of Removal #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint), by NCH Healthcare System, Inc., NCHMD, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Kalteux, David)
December 15, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION to Dismiss the State Court Complaint contained within the Notice of Removal #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint), by NCH Healthcare System, Inc., NCHMD, Inc.. Responses due by 12/29/2020 (Kalteux, David)
December 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 PAPERLESS ORDER denying #10 Agreed Motion for Enlargement of Defendants' Time to Respond to Complaint. The Motion is premature, as Plaintiff has not yet filed a motion for remand. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom (ak03)
December 10, 2020 Filing 10 Unopposed MOTION for Enlargement of Time of Defendants' to Respond to Complaint by NCH Healthcare System, Inc., NCHMD, Inc.. (Kalteux, David)
December 10, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Tammie L. Rattray on behalf of NCH Healthcare System, Inc., NCHMD, Inc. (Rattray, Tammie)
December 9, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by David Michael Kalteux on behalf of NCH Healthcare System, Inc., NCHMD, Inc. (Kalteux, David)
December 1, 2020 Filing 7 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by NCH Healthcare System, Inc., NCHMD, Inc. (Rattray, Tammie)
December 1, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE by NCH Healthcare System, Inc., NCHMD, Inc. re #3 Order Requiring Joint Scheduling Report,,, Set Answer Due Deadline,, (Rattray, Tammie)
November 30, 2020 Set/Reset Answer Due Deadline as per DE 5 : NCH Healthcare System, Inc. response due 12/15/2020; NCHMD, Inc. response due 12/15/2020. (lk)
November 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #4 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Answer to Complaint by December 15, 2020. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom (BB)
November 30, 2020 Filing 4 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint), by NCH Healthcare System, Inc., NCHMD, Inc.. (Rattray, Tammie)
November 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER ON POST-REMOVAL PROCEDURES, AND REQUIRING SCHEDULING REPORT AND CERTIFICATES OF INTERESTED PARTIES On or before December 14, 2020, the parties shall comply with Local Rule 7.2 to the extent there are any motions pending in the Circuit Court Action, and shall separately re-file the motion, relevant memoranda of law in support of or opposition to those motions., (Joint Scheduling Report due by 12/21/2020), NCH Healthcare System, Inc. response due 12/7/2020; NCHMD, Inc. response due 12/7/2020. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 11/30/2020. See attached document for full details. (jbs)
November 25, 2020 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Beth Bloom. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Alicia M. Otazo-Reyes is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (jbs)
November 25, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (STATE COURT COMPLAINT - Raniero Gimeno v. NCHMD, Inc. and NCH Healthcare System, Inc.) Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number AFLSDC-13929076, filed by NCHMD, Inc. and NCH Healthcare System, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Civil Cover Sheet)(Rattray, Tammie)(No Answer/Motion to Dismiss Filed) Modified text on 11/30/2020 (jbs).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gimeno v. NCHMD, Inc., et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NCHMD, Inc. and NCH Healthcare System, Inc.
Represented By: Tammie L. Rattray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NCHMD, Inc.
Represented By: Tammie L. Rattray
Represented By: Matthew D. Grabell
Represented By: David Michael Kalteux
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NCH Healthcare System, Inc.
Represented By: Tammie L. Rattray
Represented By: Matthew D. Grabell
Represented By: David Michael Kalteux
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raniero Gimeno
Represented By: Sherryll Martens Dunaj
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?