Levi et al v. Office of the US Trustee et al
In Re: 5Barz International Inc.
Appellant: Andrew K. Levi and Mark Migdal & Hayden LLC
Appellee: Office of the US Trustee, US Securities and Exchange Commission and Joel L. Tabas
Case Number: 1:2020cv24889
Filed: November 30, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Darrin P Gayles
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 0158
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 25, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 25, 2021 Filing 22 RESPONSE in Opposition re #8 MOTION to Stay Pending Appeal filed by Joel L. Tabas. Replies due by 2/1/2021. (Tabas, Joel)
January 25, 2021 Filing 21 Objection/RESPONSE in Opposition re #8 MOTION to Stay Pending Appeal filed by Office of the US Trustee. Replies due by 2/1/2021. (Kelso, Jill) Text Modified on 1/25/2021 (cds).
January 8, 2021 Filing 20 Bankruptcy Notice of Entry pursuant to Rule 8018 and NOTICE TO ATTORNEY - Pursuant to the Southern District of Florida Local Rules, and the Federal Rule of Bankruptcy Procedure, the Appellant has 30 days after the docketing of the Bankruptcy Transmittal of Designated Record to District Court to serve and file a brief. The Appellee shall serve and file a response brief within 30 days after service of Appellant's brief. The Appellant shall serve and file a reply brief within 14 days after service of the Appelle's brief. Appellant Brief due by 2/8/2021. (jc)
January 8, 2021 Filing 19 BANKRUPTCY TRANSCRIPT of Hearing held on 10/21/20 before Judge Robert A. Mark, 36 pages, Court Reporter: Oullette and Mauldin. Telephone number: (305) 358-8875. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased by contacting the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 1/26/2021. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/5/2021. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/5/2021. (dcn)
January 8, 2021 Filing 18 BANKRUPTCY TRANSCRIPT of Hearing held on 9/10/2020 before Judge Robert A. Mark, 41 pages, Court Reporter: Oullette and Mauldin. Telephone number: (305) 358-8875. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased by contacting the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 1/26/2021. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/5/2021. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/5/2021. (dcn)
January 8, 2021 Filing 17 BANKRUPTCY TRANSCRIPT of Hearing held on 8/25/2020 before Judge Robert A. Mark, 64 pages, Court Reporter: Oullette and Mauldin. Telephone number: (305) 358-8875. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased by contacting the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 1/26/2021. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/5/2021. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/5/2021. (dcn)
January 8, 2021 Filing 16 BANKRUPTCY TRANSCRIPT of Hearing held on 11/20/2020 before Judge Robert A. Mark, 53 pages, Court Reporter: Oulette and Mauldin. Telephone number: (305) 358-8875. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased by contacting the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 1/8/2021. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/19/2021. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/18/2021. (dcn)
January 8, 2021 Filing 15 Bankruptcy Transmittal of Designated Record to District Court re #1 Bankruptcy Appeal filed by Andrew K. Levi, Mark Migdal & Hayden LLC (Attachments: #1 Docket Sheet, #2 Appellant's List of Designated Items, #3 Appellant's Designation Part 1 [ECF #1-ECF #44], #4 Appellant's Designation Part 2 [ECF #49], #5 Appellant's Designation Part 3 [ECF #52-#287], #6 Appellee's Designation)(dcn)
January 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #12 Unopposed Motion to Extend Time for Appellee, Joel L. Tabas, Chapter 7 Trustee, to Respond to Appellants' Motion for Stay Pending Appeal. Appellee Joel L. Tabas shall file his response to the Appellants' motion for stay pending appeal on or before January 25, 2021. Signed by Judge Darrin P. Gayles (mcy)
January 4, 2021 Filing 13 Clerks Notice to Filer re #12 MOTION for Extension of Time for Appellee Joel L. Tabas Chapter 7 Trustee to Respond to Appellants' Motion for Stay Pending Appeal re #8 MOTION to Stay Pending Appeal. Wrong Motion Relief(s) Selected; ERROR - The Filer selected the wrong motion relief(s) when docketing the motion. The correction was made by the Clerk. It is not necessary to refile this document but future motions filed must include applicable reliefs. (ls)
December 31, 2020 Filing 12 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #8 MOTION to Stay Pending Appeal by Joel L. Tabas. Attorney Joshua D Silver added to party Joel L. Tabas(pty:e). Responses due by 1/14/2021 (Silver, Joshua) Modified Relief on 1/4/2021 (ls).
December 23, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Joel Lloyd Tabas on behalf of Joel L. Tabas. Attorney Joel Lloyd Tabas added to party Joel L. Tabas(pty:e). (Tabas, Joel)
December 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #9 Unopposed Motion to Extend Time for Appellee United States Trustee to Respond to Appellants' Motion for Stay Pending Appeal. Appellee United States Trustee shall file her response to the Appellants' motion for stay pending appeal on or before January 25, 2021. Signed by Judge Darrin P. Gayles (mcy)
December 23, 2020 Filing 9 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Appellants' Motion for Stay Pending Appeal re #8 MOTION to Stay Pending Appeal by Office of the US Trustee. Responses due by 1/6/2021 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kelso, Jill)
December 21, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION to Stay Pending Appeal by Andrew K. Levi, Mark Migdal & Hayden LLC. Responses due by 1/4/2021 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Aron, Maia)
December 21, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Maia Aron on behalf of Andrew K. Levi, Mark Migdal & Hayden LLC. Attorney Maia Aron added to party Andrew K. Levi(pty:a), Attorney Maia Aron added to party Mark Migdal & Hayden LLC(pty:a). (Aron, Maia)
December 11, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jill Ellen Kelso on behalf of Office of the US Trustee. Attorney Jill Ellen Kelso added to party Office of the US Trustee(pty:e). (Kelso, Jill)
November 30, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE OF COURT PRACTICE. Unless otherwise specified by the Court, every motion shall be double-spaced in Times New Roman 12-point typeface. Multiple Plaintiffs or Defendants shall file joint motions with co-parties unless there are clear conflicts of position. If conflicts of position exist, parties shall explain the conflicts in their separate motions. Failure to comply with ANY of these procedures may result in the imposition of appropriate sanctions, including but not limited to, the striking of the motion or dismissal of this action. Signed by Judge Darrin P. Gayles (mcy)
November 30, 2020 Filing 4 New Bankruptcy Appeal Case Filed - Clerk's Notice to Parties Re Administrative Order 2015-9 and Amendments to Federal Bankruptcy Rules and Local Rule 87.4 Re Processing of Bankruptcy Appeals (jc)
November 30, 2020 Filing 3 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Darrin P. Gayles. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (jc)
November 30, 2020 Filing 2 Bankruptcy Transmittal of re #1 Bankruptcy Appeal filed by Andrew K. Levi, Mark Migdal & Hayden LLC (Attachments: #1 Docket Sheet)(dcn)
November 30, 2020 Filing 1 Notice of APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT (received), Bankruptcy Court case number 20-14866-RAM, filed by Andrew K. Levi, Mark Migdal & Hayden LLC.(dcn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Levi et al v. Office of the US Trustee et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
In re: 5Barz International Inc.
Represented By: Nathan G. Mancuso
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Andrew K. Levi
Represented By: Isaac Meyer Marcushamer
Represented By: Maia Aron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Mark Migdal & Hayden LLC
Represented By: Isaac Meyer Marcushamer
Represented By: Maia Aron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Office of the US Trustee
Represented By: Steven D. Schneiderman
Represented By: Jill Ellen Kelso
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: US Securities and Exchange Commission
Represented By: Aleida Martinez-Molina
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Joel L. Tabas
Represented By: Joshua D Silver
Represented By: Joel Lloyd Tabas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?