Petersen v. AutoZone, Inc.
Plaintiff: AISHIA PETERSEN
Defendant: AutoZone, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv25086
Filed: December 14, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Cecilia M Altonaga
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12182
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 25, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSING CASE. Any pending motions are DENIED AS MOOT. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 1/25/2021. See a ttached document for full details. (wc)
January 25, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Settlement , Stipulation will be filed within 45 days by Aishia Petersen (Barros, Acacia)
January 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #6 Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Enlargement of Time to Respond to Plaintiffs Complaint. Defendant shall have up to and including February 2, 2021, in which to file a response to Plaintiff's Complaint. The time for compliance with the Order entered on December 29, 2020 [ECF No. 5] will not be extended. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 1/11/2021. See attached document for full details. (wc)
January 11, 2021 Filing 6 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #1 Complaint by AutoZone, Inc.. Attorney Paul J DeBoe added to party AutoZone, Inc.(pty:dft). (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(DeBoe, Paul)
December 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order Requiring Joint Scheduling Report and Certificates of Interested Parties by 1/26/2021. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 12/29/2020. See attached document for full details. (ps1)
December 28, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by AISHIA PETERSEN. AutoZone, Inc. served on 12/22/2020, answer due 1/12/2021. (Barros, Acacia)
December 15, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to AutoZone, Inc. (scn)
December 14, 2020 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Edwin G. Torres is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (scn)
December 14, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Injunctive Relief against AutoZone, Inc.. Filing fees $ 402.00 receipt number AFLSDC-14033207, filed by AISHIA PETERSEN. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s) to be issued)(Barros, Acacia)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Petersen v. AutoZone, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AISHIA PETERSEN
Represented By: Acacia Regina Silva Barros
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AutoZone, Inc.
Represented By: Paul J DeBoe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?