Drake v. Celebrity Cruises, Inc.
Plaintiff: John M. Drake
Defendant: Celebrity Cruises, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv25158
Filed: December 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Jonathan Goodman
Referring Judge: Robert N Scola
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 14, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 14, 2021 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by John M. Drake. Celebrity Cruises, Inc. waiver sent on 1/12/2021, answer due 3/15/2021. (Black, Stefanie)
December 30, 2020 Filing 7 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re #4 Order Striking,, Order to Show Cause,, Set/Reset Deadlines, by John M. Drake. (Black, Stefanie)
December 30, 2020 Filing 6 Plaintiff's AMENDED COMPLAINT against Celebrity Cruises, Inc., filed by John M. Drake.(Black, Stefanie)
December 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MAGISTRATE JUDGE GOODMAN'S DISCOVERY PROCEDURES ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman on 12/22/2020. See attached document for full details. (fbn)
December 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Requiring Amended Complaint And To Show Cause, striking #1 Complaint filed by John M. Drake (Show Cause Response due by 12/30/2020, Amended Complaint due by 12/30/2020.) Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr on 12/21/2020. See attached document for full details. (pcs)
December 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order Requiring Discovery and Scheduling Conference and Order Referring Discovery Matters to the Magistrate Judge, referring case to Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman for Discovery Matters. Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr on 12/18/2020. See attached document for full details. (pcs)
December 18, 2020 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (amb)
December 18, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Celebrity Cruises, Inc.. Filing fees $ 402.00 receipt number AFLSDC-14064007, filed by John M. Drake. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Black, Stefanie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Drake v. Celebrity Cruises, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Celebrity Cruises, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John M. Drake
Represented By: Michael A. Winkleman
Represented By: Stefanie Alicia Black
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?