Lucius v. Etro U.S.A. Inc.
Plaintiff: Windy Lucius
Defendant: Etro U.S.A. Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv25229
Filed: December 23, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Jonathan Goodman
Referring Judge: Robert N Scola
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12182
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 10, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Order of Dismissal. Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr on 2/10/2021. See attached document for full details. (cds)
February 10, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal with Prejudice by Windy Lucius (Cunningham, Juan)
January 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Order Administratively Closing Case upon Notice of Settlement. By February 9, 2021, the Plaintiff must file a notice of dismissal, under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(i), or a stipulation of dismissal, under Rule 41(a)(1) (A)(ii). The Court will administratively close this case in the meantime. Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr on 1/12/2021. See attached document for full details. (cds)
January 12, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Settlement by Windy Lucius (Cunningham, Juan)
January 4, 2021 Filing 8 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Windy Lucius. Etro U.S.A. Inc. served on 12/24/2020, answer due 1/14/2021. (Cunningham, Juan)
December 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MAGISTRATE JUDGE GOODMAN'S DISCOVERY PROCEDURES ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman on 12/28/2020. See attached document for full details. (fbn)
December 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order Requiring Discovery and Scheduling Conference and ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman for Discovery Matters. Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr. on 12/23/2020. See attached document for full details. (pes)
December 23, 2020 Filing 5 Notice of NO Pending, Refiled, Related or Similar Actions by Windy Lucius (Cunningham, Juan)
December 23, 2020 Filing 4 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by Windy Lucius identifying Other Affiliate ADASure for Windy Lucius (Cunningham, Juan)
December 23, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Etro U.S.A. Inc.. (cds)
December 23, 2020 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (cds)
December 23, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Injunctive Relief against Etro U.S.A. Inc.. Filing fees $ 402.00 receipt number AFLSDC-14090710, filed by Windy Lucius. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s))(Cunningham, Juan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lucius v. Etro U.S.A. Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Etro U.S.A. Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Windy Lucius
Represented By: Juan Courtney Cunningham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?