Bluegreen Vacations Unlimited, Inc. et al v. Timeshare Termination Team, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Bluegreen Vacations Unlimited, Inc. and Bluegreen Vacations Corporation
Defendant: Vindaloo Travel Network, LLC d/b/a Timeshare Termination Team a/k/a Timeshare Termination Team, LLC, Systema Marketing, Inc., Freedom Consumer Services, LLC d/b/a Timeshare Freedom Group d/b/a Timeshare Freedom, Molfetta Law, LLC, Harold O. Miller, Jordan Salkin, Shayna G. Schroeder, Michael A. Molfetta, Brian Stephen Wilbur, Timeshare Termination Team, LLC, Holly Wilbur, Vindaloo Travel Network, LLC a Colorado limited liability company doing business as Timeshare Termination Team also known as Timeshare Termination Team, LLC and Freedom Consumer Services, LLC a Nevada limited liability doing business as Timeshare Freedom Group doing business as Timeshare Freedom
Counter Claimant: Vindaloo Travel Network, LLC
Case Number: 1:2020cv25318
Filed: December 30, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Beth Bloom
Referring Judge: Alicia M Otazo-Reyes
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1125 Trademark Infringement (Lanham Act)
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 25, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 567 MOTION for Default Judgment Plaintiffs' Amended Motion for Default Judgment Against Defendants Freedom Consumer Services, LLC, Systema Marketing, Inc., and Jordan Salkin and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by Bluegreen Vacations Corporation, Bluegreen Vacations Unlimited, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Final Perm Injunction, #2 Exhibit B - Tuft Report, #3 Exhibit C - Declaration)(Rubin, Glennys)
March 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 566 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #564 Unopposed MOTION to Seal Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Exhibits to Amended Motion for Default Judgment Under Seal and Incorporated Memorandum of Law per Local Rule 5.4. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom (jg01)
March 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 565 NOTICE by Bluegreen Vacations Corporation, Bluegreen Vacations Unlimited, Inc. re #253 Order, 563 Minute Order,,, Plaintiffs' Amended Notice of Joint Liability (Rubin, Glennys)
March 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 564 Unopposed MOTION to Seal Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Exhibits to Amended Motion for Default Judgment Under Seal and Incorporated Memorandum of Law per Local Rule 5.4 by Bluegreen Vacations Corporation, Bluegreen Vacations Unlimited, Inc.. (Rubin, Glennys)
March 10, 2023 Opinion or Order SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 568 [misc] restricted/sealed until further notice. (903304)
March 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 563 Minute Order for proceedings held before Judge Beth Bloom. Messrs. Jonathan Phillip Hart and Eric Christu appeared on behalf of Plaintiff. Plaintiff will amend Plaintiffs' MOTION for Default Judgment Against Defendants Freedom Consumer Services, LLC and Systema Marketing, Inc., ECF No. #557 , to clarify the relief that Plaintiffs seek, and clarify their statements regarding the joint and several liability of Defendants Systema Marketing, Inc. and Shayna G. Schroeder, ECF No. #258 . Total time in court: 45 minutes. Court Reporter: Yvette Hernandez, 305-523-5698 / Yvette_Hernandez@flsd.uscourts.gov. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom. Court Reporter: Yvette Hernandez, 305-523-5698 / Yvette_Hernandez@flsd.uscourts.gov. (jg01)
March 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 562 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #561 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Benjamin Travis Brown representing Bluegreen Vacations Unlimited, Inc. (Plaintiff) and Bluegreen Vacations Corporation (Plaintiff) and Bluegreen Vacations Corporation (Counter Defendant); and Bluegreen Vacations Unlimited, Inc. (Counter Defendant); withdrawn from case. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom (jg01)
March 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 561 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Benjamin Travis Brown's Motion to Withdraw as Counsel for Plaintiffs by Benjamin Travis Brown for / by Bluegreen Vacations Corporation, Bluegreen Vacations Unlimited, Inc.. Responses due by 3/21/2023 (Brown, Benjamin)
March 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 560 MOTION for Default Judgment Plaintiffs' Motion for Default Judgment Against Defendant Jordan Salkin and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by Bluegreen Vacations Corporation, Bluegreen Vacations Unlimited, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Final Perm Injunction Order Salkin)(Rubin, Glennys)
March 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 559 Joint MOTION for Permanent Injunction as to Defendant, Shayna Schroeder and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by Bluegreen Vacations Corporation, Bluegreen Vacations Unlimited, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Stipulated Order on Permanent Injunction)(Rubin, Glennys)
March 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 557 Plaintiff's MOTION for Default Judgment Against Defendants Freedom Consumer Services, LLC and Systema Marketing, Inc., and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by Bluegreen Vacations Corporation, Bluegreen Vacations Unlimited, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proposed Permanent Injunction, #2 Exhibit B - Expert Report of Mark Tuft, #3 Exhibit C - Declaration of Adriana L. Pfeiffer)(Rubin, Glennys)
March 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 556 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #555 Motion for Leave to File Exhibits to Motion for Default Judgment Under Seal per Local Rule 5.4. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom (BB)
March 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 555 Unopposed MOTION to Seal Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Exhibits to Motion for Default Judgment Under Seal and Incorporated Memorandum of Law per Local Rule 5.4 by Bluegreen Vacations Corporation, Bluegreen Vacations Unlimited, Inc.. (Rubin, Glennys)
March 3, 2023 Opinion or Order SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 558 [misc] restricted/sealed until further notice. (903304)
February 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 554 NOTICE by Bluegreen Vacations Corporation, Bluegreen Vacations Unlimited, Inc. Plaintiffs' Notice Pursuant to ECF No. #551 (Rubin, Glennys)
February 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 553 TRANSCRIPT of DISCOVERY HEARING held on 02/15/2023 before Magistrate Judge Alicia M. Otazo-Reyes, 1-33 pages, Court Reporter: Bonnie Joy Lewis, 954-985-8875. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased by contacting the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 3/20/2023. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/30/2023. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/30/2023. (jes)
February 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 552 PAPERLESS ORDER denying as moot #444 Report and Recommendations on #444 Report and Recommendations. See Order at ECF No. #551 . Signed by Judge Beth Bloom (BB)
February 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 551 ORDER ON JOINT MOTION AND STIPULATION TO DISMISS WITH PREJUDICE. Denying as moot #297 Motion for Sanctions; Denying as moot #448 MOTION to Exclude the Expert Testimony; Denying as moot #449 Motion in Limine; Denying as moot 450 , 451 Sealed Motions; Denying as moot #453 Motion in Limine; 454 Sealed Motion; Denying as moot #455 MOTION to Exclude the Expert Testimony ; Denying as moot #457 Motion for Summary Judgment; Denying as moot #460 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; 461 Sealed Motion; Denying as moot #467 Motion for Sanctions. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 2/23/2023. See attached document for full details. (cds)
February 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 550 STIPULATION of Dismissal Joint Motion and Stipulation to Dismiss with Prejudice by Bluegreen Vacations Corporation, Bluegreen Vacations Unlimited, Inc. (Leger, Christian)
February 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 548 NOTICE by Michael A. Molfetta, Molfetta Law, LLC Molfetta Defendants' Notice of Filing Designations Pursuant to DE 473 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Deposition of Angela Blevins, December 1, 2022, #2 Exhibit B - Deposition of Tina Miller, December 15, 2022, #3 Exhibit C - Deposition of John Hunt, November 28, 2022) (Etra, Jonathan)
February 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 546 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #544 Expedited Motion for Leave to File Depositions Under Seal. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom (BB)
February 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 545 NOTICE by Bluegreen Vacations Corporation, Bluegreen Vacations Unlimited, Inc. Plaintiffs' Notice of Filing Deposition Designations Pursuant to ECF No. #473 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Plaintiffs' Deposition Designations Pursuant to ECF No. #473 , #2 Exhibit Deposition of Ruddy Cabral, #3 Exhibit Deposition of Irwin Campbell, #4 Exhibit Deposition of Herbert Anderson, #5 Exhibit Deposition of Bailey Perkins, #6 Exhibit Deposition of William Rodas, #7 Exhibit Deposition of Alita Webb, #8 Exhibit Deposition of Trvanda Sadafian, #9 Exhibit Deposition of Taniusca Lopez, #10 Exhibit Deposition of Leslie Hayes, #11 Exhibit Deposition of Tammy Taylor, #12 Exhibit Deposition of Steven Cunningham, #13 Exhibit Deposition of Roxana Barrios, #14 Exhibit Deposition of Mariano de los Santos, #15 Exhibit Deposition of Jade Reed, #16 Exhibit Deposition of Jennifer Colacchio, #17 Exhibit Deposition of Karan Freeman, #18 Exhibit Deposition of Joyce Madubuobi, #19 Exhibit Deposition of Joshua Kerr, #20 Exhibit Deposition of Jimmy Logan, #21 Exhibit Deposition of Jerrold Allen, #22 Exhibit Deposition of Eric Castro, #23 Exhibit Deposition of Donald Chambers, #24 Exhibit Deposition of Amanda Winfree, #25 Exhibit Deposition of Mark Tuft, #26 Exhibit Depositon of Patrick Mawhinney / Forza Consumer Group, #27 Exhibit Deposition of Jeremy Merrill Vol. I, #28 Exhibit Deposition of Jeremy Merrill AEO, #29 Exhibit Deposition of Jeremy Merrill Vol. II, #30 Exhibit Deposition of Jordan Salkin Vol. I, #31 Exhibit Deposition of Jordan Salkin Vol. II, #32 Exhibit Deposition of Harold Miller, #33 Exhibit Deposition of Michael Molfetta - Vol. I, #34 Exhibit Deposition of Michael Molfetta - Vol. II, #35 Exhibit Deposition of Michael Molfetta - Vol. III, #36 Exhibit Deposition of Michael Molfetta (WVO Matter)) (Christu, Eric)
February 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 544 Joint MOTION to Seal Joint Expedited Motion for Leave to File Under Seal per Local Rule 5.4 by Bluegreen Vacations Corporation, Bluegreen Vacations Unlimited, Inc.. (Christu, Eric)
February 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 543 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #542 Joint Expedited Motion for Clarification. The Parties shall submit their Joint Pretrial Stipulation in accordance with Local Rule 16.1(e) by February 27, 2023. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom (BB)
February 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 542 Joint EXPEDITED MOTION for Clarification of Court's Order Scheduling Trial and Order of Instructions Before Calendar Call [DE 473] by Michael A. Molfetta, Molfetta Law, LLC. (Etra, Jonathan)
February 20, 2023 Opinion or Order SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 547 [misc] restricted/sealed until further notice. (515898)
February 20, 2023 Opinion or Order SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 549 [misc] restricted/sealed until further notice. (939842)
February 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 541 ORDER Denying #533 PLAINTIFF'S EXPEDITED MOTION TO DEFER RULING ON MOLFETTA DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND TO ALLOW SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEFING AND EVIDENCE. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 2/16/2023. See attached document for full details. (cds)
February 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 540 Objection and Response to #538 Notice of Conventional Filing by Michael A. Molfetta, Molfetta Law, LLC. (Cavallo, Christopher)
February 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 539 Clerk's Notice of Filing Deficiency Re: #538 Notice of Conventional Filing filed by Bluegreen Vacations Unlimited, Inc., Bluegreen Vacations Corporation. Document(s) missing required signature(s) (Fed.R.Civ.P. 11(a)). (cds)
February 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 538 NOTICE OF CONVENTIONAL FILING (CD) by Bluegreen Vacations Corporation, Bluegreen Vacations Unlimited, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Supplement) (cds)
February 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 537 ORDER re #531 Notice re Hearing by Attorney filed by Bluegreen Vacations Unlimited, Inc., Bluegreen Vacations Corporation. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alicia M. Otazo-Reyes on 2/15/2023. See attached document for full details. (kvz)
February 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 536 PAPERLESS Minute Entry for Zoom proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Alicia M. Otazo-Reyes: Motion Hearing held on 2/15/2023 re #467 MOTION for Sanctions against Molfetta Defendants and Incorporated Memorandum of Law filed by Bluegreen Vacations Unlimited, Inc., Bluegreen Vacations Corporation. Total time in court: 1 hour(s) : 53 minutes. Attorney Appearance(s): Eric Christu, Benjamin Travis Brown and Jonathan Phillip Hart appeared on behalf of Plaintiffs. Jonathan Etra and Christopher Cole Cavallo appeared on behalf of Molfetta Defendants. Report and Recommendation to follow. (Digital Zoom Recording AOR_02_02-15-2023 and DAR Back-up 11:29:50 - 12:33:04 and 12:39:33 - 13:27:40) (sl)
February 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 535 PAPERLESS Minute Entry for Zoom proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Alicia M. Otazo-Reyes: Discovery Hearing held on 2/15/2023. Total time in court: 49 minutes. Attorney Appearance(s): Eric Christu, Benjamin Travis Brown and Jonathan Phillip Hart appeared on behalf of Plaintiffs. Jonathan Etra and Christopher Cole Cavallo appeared on behalf of Molfetta Defendants. Order to follow. (Digital Zoom Recording AOR_01_02-15-2023 and DAR Back-up 10:29:05 - 11:23:37) (sl)
February 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 534 RESPONSE in Opposition re #533 EXPEDITED MOTION Pursuant to Rule 56(d) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure to Defer Ruling on Molfetta Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment and to Allow Supplmental Briefing and Evidence filed by Michael A. Molfetta, Molfetta Law, LLC. Replies due by 2/21/2023. (Cavallo, Christopher)
February 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 533 EXPEDITED MOTION Pursuant to Rule 56(d) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure to Defer Ruling on Molfetta Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment and to Allow Supplmental Briefing and Evidence by Bluegreen Vacations Corporation, Bluegreen Vacations Unlimited, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Declaration of Eric C. Christu, Esq.)(Christu, Eric)
February 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 532 CLERK'S NOTICE re #531 Notice re Hearing by Attorney. The Discovery Hearing set for 2/15/2023 at 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Alicia M. Otazo-Reyes will be conducted by Zoom video conference. Conference instructions will be provided to counsel via e-mail. (kvz)
February 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 531 NOTICE of Hearing by ATTORNEY: Discovery Hearing set for 2/15/2023 10:30 AM in Miami Division before Magistrate Judge Alicia M. Otazo-Reyes. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Epiq Email) (Christu, Eric)
February 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 530 ORDER Denying #527 EXPEDITED JOINT MOTION FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 2/10/2023. See attached document for full details. (cds)
February 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 529 TRANSCRIPT of DISCOVERY HEARING held on 01/19/2023 before Magistrate Judge Alicia M. Otazo-Reyes, 1-12 pages, Court Reporter: Joanne Mancari, jemancari@gmail.com. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased by contacting the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 3/6/2023. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/16/2023. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/15/2023. (jes)
February 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 528 RESPONSE to #522 Supplement, by Michael A. Molfetta, Molfetta Law, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Cavallo, Christopher)
February 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 527 Joint EXPEDITED MOTION Joint Motion for Pretrial Conference and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by Bluegreen Vacations Corporation, Bluegreen Vacations Unlimited, Inc.. (Christu, Eric)
February 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 526 STIPULATION For Non-Jury Trial by Bluegreen Vacations Corporation, Bluegreen Vacations Unlimited, Inc. (Christu, Eric)
February 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 525 NOTICE by Bluegreen Vacations Corporation, Bluegreen Vacations Unlimited, Inc. re #524 Notice (Other) Plaintiffs' Amended Notice of Withdrawal of Request for Legal Relief (Monetary Damages) (Christu, Eric)
February 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 524 NOTICE by Bluegreen Vacations Corporation, Bluegreen Vacations Unlimited, Inc. of Withdrawal of Request for Legal Relief (Monetary Damages) (Christu, Eric)
February 2, 2023 Opinion or Order PAPERLESS Order Resetting Hearing on #467 MOTION for Sanctions against Molfetta Defendants and Incorporated Memorandum of Law. **TIME CHANGE ONLY**. The Motion Hearing set for 2/15/2023 is hereby reset to 11:30 AM in Miami Division before Magistrate Judge Alicia M. Otazo-Reyes by Zoom video conference. Video conference instructions will be sent to counsel via e-mail. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alicia M. Otazo-Reyes on 2/2/2023. (kvz)
January 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 522 SUPPLEMENT to #467 MOTION for Sanctions against Molfetta Defendants and Incorporated Memorandum of Law Supplemental Memorandum of Law by Bluegreen Vacations Corporation, Bluegreen Vacations Unlimited, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Examples of LOEs, #2 Exhibit B - NM-MOLF_0016653, #3 Exhibit C - NM-MOLF_0035660, #4 Exhibit D - Molfetta Law RFP Response, #5 Exhibit E - Molfetta Law Deposition Transcript)(Hart, Jonathan)
January 27, 2023 Opinion or Order SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 523 [misc] restricted/sealed until further notice. (1119252)
January 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 521 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #520 Motion to Seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alicia M. Otazo-Reyes on 1/26/2023. (kvz)
January 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 520 Unopposed MOTION to Seal Plaintiffs' Unopposed EXPEDITED Motion For Leave to File Supplemental Memorandum Under Seal and Incorporated Memorandum of Law per Local Rule 5.4 by Bluegreen Vacations Corporation, Bluegreen Vacations Unlimited, Inc.. (Rubin, Glennys)
January 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 519 NOTICE by Michael A. Molfetta, Molfetta Law, LLC Defendants' Notice of Filing Index of Exhibits Cited in Defendants' Reply Statement of Material Facts [DE 515; 516] (Etra, Jonathan)
January 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 518 Defendant's REPLY to Response to Motion re #457 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Redacted) (Defendants' CORRECTED Reply) filed by Michael A. Molfetta, Molfetta Law, LLC. (Etra, Jonathan)
January 25, 2023 Opinion or Order SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 517 [misc] restricted/sealed until further notice. (939842)
January 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 515 Statement of: Molfetta's Reply Statement of Material Facts to Bluegreen's Response Statement of Material Facts [DE 492; 493]] by Michael A. Molfetta, Molfetta Law, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Nevada Corporate Records, #2 Exhibit Molfetta Second Declaration)(Etra, Jonathan)
January 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 513 Defendant's REPLY to Response to Motion re #457 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Redacted) filed by Michael A. Molfetta, Molfetta Law, LLC. (Etra, Jonathan)
January 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 511 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #510 Joint Expedited Renewed Motion for Leave to File Under Seal. The parties may file under seal (1) Defendants unredacted Reply in support of its Rule 56.1 Statements of Material Facts [ECF No. 462]; (2) the Parties unredacted Replies in support of their respective Motions for Summary Judgment [ECF Nos. 457, 461]; and (3) exhibits supporting the foregoing. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom (jg01)
January 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 510 Joint MOTION to Seal Joint Expedited Renewed Motion for Leave to File Under Seal per Local Rule 5.4 by Bluegreen Vacations Corporation, Bluegreen Vacations Unlimited, Inc.. (Rubin, Glennys)
January 24, 2023 Opinion or Order SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 512 [misc] restricted/sealed until further notice. (1434118)
January 24, 2023 Opinion or Order SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 514 [misc] restricted/sealed until further notice. (939842)
January 24, 2023 Opinion or Order SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 516 [misc] restricted/sealed until further notice. (939842)
January 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 508 REPLY to Response to Motion re #460 Plaintiff's MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment and Incorporated Memorandum of Law filed by Bluegreen Vacations Corporation, Bluegreen Vacations Unlimited, Inc.. (Leger, Christian)
January 23, 2023 Opinion or Order SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 509 [misc] restricted/sealed until further notice. (1434118)
January 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 507 Statement of: Statement of Material Facts in Support of Bluegreen's Motion for Summary Judgment Bluegreen's Reply to Molfetta Defendants' Response Statement of Material Facts [ECF 481] by Bluegreen Vacations Corporation, Bluegreen Vacations Unlimited, Inc. re #480 Statement,, (Leger, Christian)
January 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 504 Defendant's REPLY to Response to Motion re #453 Defendant's MOTION in Limine (Redacted Pursuant to DE 442) Defendants' Reply in Support of Their Motion in Limine [DE 451;453] filed by Michael A. Molfetta, Molfetta Law, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Settlement Agreement (Placeholder))(Etra, Jonathan)
January 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 502 REPLY to #448 MOTION to Exclude the Expert Testimony and Opinion of Philip Shechter Plaintiffs' Reply Memorandum in Support of Daubert Motion to Exclude or Limit the Expert Testimony and Opinions of Philip Schechter by Bluegreen Vacations Corporation, Bluegreen Vacations Unlimited, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Corporate Rep Topics, #2 Exhibit 2 - Notice of Depo of Corp Reps, #3 Exhibit 3 - Amended Notice of Depo)(Leger, Christian)
January 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 501 REPLY to Response to Motion re #449 MOTION in Limine Plaintiffs' Motion In Limine Plaintiffs' Reply in Support of Their Motion in Limine [ECF No. 449] and Incorporated Memorandum of Law filed by Bluegreen Vacations Corporation, Bluegreen Vacations Unlimited, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Shechter Depo, #2 Exhibit 2 - Anderson Depo, #3 Exhibit 3 - Cabral Depo, #4 Exhibit 4 - Perkins Depo, #5 Exhibit 5 - Webb Depo, #6 Exhibit 6 - Campbell Depo, #7 Exhibit 7 - Solomon Depo, #8 Exhibit 8 - Colacchio Depo, #9 Exhibit 9 - Reed Depo, #10 Exhibit 10 - Forza Depo, #11 Exhibit 11 - Doc 293 Order, #12 Exhibit 12 - Hunt Depo, #13 Exhibit 13 - ML 2nd ROG Responses, #14 Exhibit 14 - 6921 Hearing Transcript, #15 Exhibit 15 - Diamond Newton Order)(Christu, Eric)
January 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 500 Defendant's REPLY to Response to Motion re #455 MOTION to Exclude the Expert Testimony and Opinion of Plaintiffs' Expert Mark Tuft filed by Michael A. Molfetta, Molfetta Law, LLC. (Etra, Jonathan)
January 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 499 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #498 Motion to Withdraw ECF No. 445 . The exhibits to Molfetta's 56.1 Statement of Material Facts for Summary Judgment were correctly refiled at ECF No. 446 . Signed by Judge Beth Bloom (BB)
January 20, 2023 Opinion or Order SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 503 [misc] restricted/sealed until further notice. (515898)
January 20, 2023 Opinion or Order SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 505 [misc] restricted/sealed until further notice. (939842)
January 20, 2023 Opinion or Order SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 506 [misc] restricted/sealed until further notice. (1434118)
January 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 498 Defendant's MOTION to Withdraw Document DE 445 by Michael A. Molfetta, Molfetta Law, LLC. Responses due by 2/2/2023 (Etra, Jonathan)
January 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 497 PAPERLESS Minute Entry for Zoom proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Alicia M. Otazo-Reyes: Motion Hearing held on 1/19/2023 re #467 MOTION for Sanctions against Molfetta Defendants and Incorporated Memorandum of Law filed by Bluegreen Vacations Unlimited, Inc., Bluegreen Vacations Corporation. The hearing was reset to 2/15/2023 at 10:30 A.M. before Magistrate Judge Alicia M. Otazo-Reyes via Zoom video conference. Video Conference instructions will be sent to counsel via e-mail. The parties shall submit supplemental briefs limited to 10 pages and limited to the LOEs and their impact on the Motion for Sanctions. Plaintiffs' supplemental brief is due 1/27/2023. The Molfetta Defendants' response brief is due 2/10/2023. Total time in court: 19 minutes. Attorney Appearance(s):Eric Christu, Benjamin Travis Brown and Jonathan Phillip Hart appeared on behalf of Plaintiffs. Christopher Cole Cavallo appeared on behalf of the Molfetta Defendants. (Digital Zoom Recording AOR_01_01-19-2023 and DAR Back-up 10:30:15 - 10:48:08) (sl)
January 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 496 PAPERLESS ORDER granting in part and denying in part #495 Motion to Strike #495 Motion to Strike #487 Response in Opposition to Motion. The Motion to Strike is denied; the Motion requesting additional pages in granted. The Plaintiff is granted permission to file a Reply of no more than 20 pages and is granted an extension to file its Reply by January 23, 2023. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom (BB)
January 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 495 MOTION to Strike #487 Response in Opposition to Motion, PLAINTIFFS EXPEDITED MOTION TO STRIKE MOLFETTAS OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS MSJ [ECF No. 487] FOR EXCEEDING PAGE LIMIT IN VIOLATION OF LOCAL RULE 7.1(c)(2) AND THIS COURTS ORDER AT ECF NO. 472, OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, MOTION FOR LEAVE TO EXCEED PAGE LIMIT AND TIME FOR REPLY MEMORANDUM, AND INCORPORATED MEMORANDUM OF LAW by Bluegreen Vacations Corporation, Bluegreen Vacations Unlimited, Inc.. Responses due by 2/1/2023 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exemplar footnote length)(Leger, Christian)
January 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 494 NOTICE by Bluegreen Vacations Corporation, Bluegreen Vacations Unlimited, Inc. Plaintiffs' Notice of Filing Index of Exhibits Cited in Plaintiffs' Response to Molfetta Defendants' Statement of Material Facts (Leger, Christian)
January 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 492 Statement of: Bluegreen's Response/Counter Statement to Molfetta Defendants' Statement of Material Facts [ECF No. 446] by Bluegreen Vacations Corporation, Bluegreen Vacations Unlimited, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Composite of Disputed Owner Exits, #2 Exhibit 2 - Depo of Tina Miller, #3 Exhibit 3 - Depo of Angela Blevins, #4 Exhibit 4 - Nevada Business Records, #5 Exhibit 5 - Depo of Herbert Anderson, #6 Exhibit 6 - Depo of Ruddy Cabral, #7 Exhibit 7 - Depo of Bailey Perkins, #8 Exhibit 8 - Depo of Alita Webb, #9 Exhibit 9 - Depo of Irvin Campbell, #10 Exhibit 10 - Depo of Sherwin Solomon, #11 Exhibit 11 - Declaration of SSchroeder, #12 Exhibit 12 - Molfetta Text Message, #13 Exhibit 13 - TFG Email Composite)(Leger, Christian)
January 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 490 RESPONSE to Motion re #457 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Redacted) Bluegreen's Response to Molfetta Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment [ECF No. 457] filed by Bluegreen Vacations Corporation, Bluegreen Vacations Unlimited, Inc.. Replies due by 1/24/2023. (Leger, Christian)
January 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 489 RESPONSE TO OBJECTION to #444 Report and Recommendations Plaintiffs' Response in Opposition to Molfetta Defendants' Objection to Magistrate Judge Otazo-Reyes' Report and Recommendations Regarding Molfetta Defendants' Motion for Rule 11 Sanctions Against Plaintiffs by Bluegreen Vacations Corporation, Bluegreen Vacations Unlimited, Inc.. (Christu, Eric)
January 17, 2023 Opinion or Order SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 491 [misc] restricted/sealed until further notice. (1434118)
January 17, 2023 Opinion or Order SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 493 [misc] restricted/sealed until further notice. (1434118)
January 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 488 NOTICE by Michael A. Molfetta, Molfetta Law, LLC Molfetta's Notice of Filing Index of Exhibits Cited in Response to Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment and Response to 56.1 Statement of Facts (Etra, Jonathan)
January 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 487 RESPONSE in Opposition re #460 Plaintiff's MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment and Incorporated Memorandum of Law filed by Michael A. Molfetta, Molfetta Law, LLC. Replies due by 1/20/2023. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Cavallo Declaration)(Etra, Jonathan)
January 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 485 RESPONSE in Opposition re #449 MOTION in Limine Plaintiffs' Motion In Limine filed by Michael A. Molfetta, Molfetta Law, LLC. Replies due by 1/20/2023. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit P. Mawhinney Declaration)(Etra, Jonathan)
January 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 483 RESPONSE in Opposition re #448 MOTION to Exclude the Expert Testimony and Opinion of Philip Shechter filed by Michael A. Molfetta, Molfetta Law, LLC. Replies due by 1/20/2023. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit April 2022 Email, #2 Exhibit Shechter Deposition Transcript)(Etra, Jonathan)
January 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 480 Statement of: Molfetta's Response/Counter Statement of Undisputed Material Facts and Additional Facts in Support of its Response in Opposition to Plaintiffs Partial Motion for Summary Judgment by Michael A. Molfetta, Molfetta Law, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Molfetta Declaration, #2 Exhibit Colacchio Declaration, #3 Exhibit Molfetta Privilege Log, #4 Exhibit Blevins Deposition Transcript, #5 Exhibit T. Miller Deposition Transcript, #6 Exhibit Shechter Blevins Deposition Transcript)(Etra, Jonathan)
January 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 479 RESPONSE in Opposition re #455 MOTION to Exclude the Expert Testimony and Opinion of Plaintiffs' Expert Mark Tuft Bluegreen Plaintiffs' Opposition to Molfetta Defendants' Daubert Motion and Incorporated Memorandum of Law filed by Bluegreen Vacations Corporation, Bluegreen Vacations Unlimited, Inc.. Replies due by 1/20/2023. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Tuft Report, #2 Exhibit 2 - Tozian Trial Testimony, #3 Exhibit 3 - Carlsbad Daubert Order, #4 Exhibit 4 - Notice of Deposition, #5 Exhibit 5 - Humphrey Sheet, #6 Exhibit 6 - Tuft Depo Excerpt)(Leger, Christian)
January 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 477 RESPONSE in Opposition re #453 Defendant's MOTION in Limine (Redacted Pursuant to DE 442) Plaintiffs' Response in Opposition to Molfetta Defendants' Motion in Limine filed by Bluegreen Vacations Corporation, Bluegreen Vacations Unlimited, Inc.. Replies due by 1/20/2023. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Plaintiffs 4th Supp Rule 26, #2 Exhibit 2 - Salkin Depo Transcript, #3 Exhibit 3 - Miller Depo Transcript)(Leger, Christian)
January 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 476 PAPERLESS ORDER granting in part and denying in part #475 Expedited Motion. The Court's Order, ECF No. 465 , is modified to permit the filing of Bluegreen's Response to the Motion for Summary Judgment by January 17, 2023. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom (BB)
January 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 475 EXPEDITED MOTION Defer Time to Respond to Molfetta Defendants' Motion For Summary Judgment EXPEDITED Motion Pursuant to Rule 56(d) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure to Defer Time to Respond to Molfetta Defendants' Motion For Summary Judgment re #457 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Redacted), #456 Statement,,,,,,,,,,, by Bluegreen Vacations Corporation, Bluegreen Vacations Unlimited, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - MQuinn Declaration)(Leger, Christian)
January 13, 2023 Opinion or Order SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 478 [misc] restricted/sealed until further notice. (1434118)
January 13, 2023 Opinion or Order SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 486 [misc] restricted/sealed until further notice. (939842)
January 13, 2023 Opinion or Order SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 481 [misc] restricted/sealed until further notice. (939842)
January 13, 2023 Opinion or Order SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 484 [misc] restricted/sealed until further notice. (939842)
January 13, 2023 Opinion or Order SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 482 [misc] restricted/sealed until further notice. (939842)
January 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 474 RESPONSE in Opposition re #467 MOTION for Sanctions against Molfetta Defendants and Incorporated Memorandum of Law filed by Michael A. Molfetta, Molfetta Law, LLC. Replies due by 1/19/2023. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M)(Cavallo, Christopher)
January 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 473 ORDER SCHEDULING TRIAL AND ORDER OF INSTRUCTIONS BEFORE CALENDAR CALL: Jury Trial set for 3/13/2023 09:00 AM in Miami Division before Judge Beth Bloom. Calendar Call set for 3/7/2023 01:45 PM before Judge Beth Bloom. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 1/9/2023. See attached document for full details. (cds) #Pattern Jury Instruction Builder - To access the latest, up to date changes to the 11th Circuit Pattern Jury Instructions go to https://pji.ca11.uscourts.gov or click here.
January 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 472 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #471 Joint Expedited Motion For Leave to Exceed Page Limitations. The parties may file 5 additional pages, for a total of 15 pages, for the rebuttal potion of the opponent's statement of material facts, and 5 additional pages, for a total of 25 pages, for the Parties' responses to their respective summary judgment motions. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom (jg01)
January 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 471 Joint EXPEDITED MOTION for Leave to Exceed Page Limitations for Summary Judgment Response Briefings by Michael A. Molfetta, Molfetta Law, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Etra, Jonathan)
January 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 470 OBJECTIONS to #444 Report and Recommendations by Michael A. Molfetta, Molfetta Law, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Etra, Jonathan)
January 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 469 PAPERLESS ORDER Setting Hearing on #467 MOTION for Sanctions against Molfetta Defendants and Incorporated Memorandum of Law. The Motion Hearing is set for 1/19/2023 at 10:30 AM in Miami Division before Magistrate Judge Alicia M. Otazo-Reyes via Zoom video conference. Video conference instructions will be sent to counsel via e-mail. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alicia M. Otazo-Reyes on 1/3/2023. (kvz)
January 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 468 ORDER REFERRING #467 MOTION TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE FOR A REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS. Motions referred to Judge Alicia M. Otazo-Reyes. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 1/3/2023. See attached document for full details. (mab)
December 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 467 MOTION for Sanctions against Molfetta Defendants and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by Bluegreen Vacations Corporation, Bluegreen Vacations Unlimited, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. 1, #2 Exhibit Ex. 2, #3 Exhibit Ex. 3, #4 Exhibit Ex. 4, #5 Exhibit Ex. 5, #6 Exhibit Ex. 6, #7 Exhibit Ex. 7, #8 Exhibit Ex. 8, #9 Exhibit Ex. 9, #10 Exhibit Ex. 10, #11 Exhibit Ex. 11)(Rubin, Glennys)
December 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 466 TRANSCRIPT of DISCOVERY HEARING held on 12/15/2022 before Magistrate Judge Alicia M. Otazo-Reyes, 1-24 pages, Court Reporter: Joanne Mancari, jemancari@gmail.com. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased by contacting the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 1/17/2023. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/27/2023. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/27/2023. (jes)
December 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings per order de#465 as to #457 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Redacted). Responses due by 1/13/2023 (drz)
December 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 465 PAPERLESS ORDER granting in part and denying in part #464 Joint Expedited Motion to Extend Summary Judgment, Daubert, and in Limine Response Deadlines. The parties shall file their responses no later than January 13, 2023. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom (ak03)
December 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 464 Joint EXPEDITED MOTION For Extension of Summary Judgment, Daubert, and In Limine Response Deadlines by Michael A. Molfetta, Molfetta Law, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Etra, Jonathan)
December 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 463 NOTICE by Bluegreen Vacations Corporation, Bluegreen Vacations Unlimited, Inc. Plaintiffs' Notice of Filing Index of Summary Judgment Exhibits (Leger, Christian)
December 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 462 NOTICE by Michael A. Molfetta, Molfetta Law, LLC of Filing Index of Exhibits Cited in its 56.1 Statement of Undisputed Material Facts for Summary Judgment (Etra, Jonathan)
December 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 460 Plaintiff's MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by Bluegreen Vacations Corporation, Bluegreen Vacations Unlimited, Inc.. Responses due by 1/4/2023 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Rules and Regulations of the State Bar of California Pertaining to Lawyer Referral Services)(Leger, Christian)
December 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 458 Statement of: Material Facts in Support of Motion for Partial Summary Judgment Against Molfetta Defendants and Incorporated Memorandum of Law (Redacted) by Bluegreen Vacations Corporation, Bluegreen Vacations Unlimited, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Molfetta 30(b)(6) Deposition - May 16, 2022, #2 Exhibit Molfetta 30(b)(6) Deposition - June 9, 2021, #3 Exhibit Tuft Report, #4 Exhibit Salkin Deposition - Dec. 7, 2022, #5 Exhibit Composite of TFG Services Agreements, #6 Exhibit Merchant Processing Agreement, #7 Exhibit Jeremy Merrill Deposition, #8 Exhibit Oct. 5, 2020 Email Chain, #9 Exhibit CRM Chart, #10 Exhibit Salkin Deposition - Dec. 8, 2022, #11 Exhibit Mar. 24, 2020 Email Chain, #12 Exhibit Composite of Retainer Agreements, #13 Exhibit Composite of POAs, #14 Exhibit Mar 28, 2020 Email Chain, #15 Exhibit Aug. 24, 2020 Email Chain, #16 Exhibit July 9, 2020 Email Chain, #17 Exhibit Composite of Exemplar Payment Calculation Sheets, #18 Exhibit Paul Humphrey Deposition, #19 Exhibit Molfetta 30(b)(6) Deposition - Dec. 6, 2022, #20 Exhibit Mawhinney 30(b)(6) Deposition - Dec. 6, 2022, #21 Exhibit List of Certified Lawyer Referral Services)(Leger, Christian)
December 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 457 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Redacted) by Michael A. Molfetta, Molfetta Law, LLC. Responses due by 1/4/2023 (Etra, Jonathan)
December 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 456 Statement of: Undisputed Material Facts for Summary Judgment (56.1)(Redacted) by Michael A. Molfetta, Molfetta Law, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Paul Humphrey Deposition Transcript, Vol. 1 with exhibits, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B - Paul Humphrey Deposition Transcript, Vol. 2 with exhibits, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C - Paul Humphrey Deposition Transcript, Vol. 3 with exhibits, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D - Jeremy Merrill Deposition Transcript Vol 1 with exhibits, #5 Exhibit Exhibit E - Jeremy Merrill Deposition Transcript Vol 2 with exhibits, #6 Exhibit Exhibit F - Molfetta Law Responses to BVU Second Interrogatories, Resp. 23, #7 Exhibit Exhibit G - Plaintiff's Amended Rule 26 Disclosures, #8 Exhibit Exhibit H - BVU's Amended and Supplemental Interrogatory Responses, No. 1, #9 Exhibit Exhibit I - BVC's Amended and Supplemental Interrogatory Responses February, #10 Exhibit Exhibit J - BVU's Second Amended and Supp Int Responses 1-2, #11 Exhibit Exhibit K - BVC's Second Amended and Supp Int Responses (19-20), #12 Exhibit Exhibit L - BVUs Supp Answers to Second Am and Supp Responses, #13 Exhibit Exhibit M - BVC's Supp Answers to Second Amended and Supp, #14 Exhibit Exhibit N - Third Rule 26 Disclosures, #15 Exhibit Exhibit O - Email from B. Travis Brown on 2022.12.16, #16 Exhibit Exhibit P - Jordan Salkin Deposition Transcript Vol 2 with exhibits, #17 Exhibit Exhibit PP - Jordan Salkin Deposition Transcript Vol 1 with exhibits, #18 Exhibit Exhibit Q - TT Deposition Transcript with exhibits, #19 Exhibit Exhibit R - KF Deposition Transcript with exhibits, #20 Exhibit Exhibit S - EC (I) Deposition Transcript Vol. 1 with exhibits, #21 Exhibit Exhibit T - EC (II) Deposition Transcript, Vol. 2 with exhibits, #22 Exhibit Exhibit U - AW Ernst Deposition Transcript with exhibits, #23 Exhibit Exhibit V - RB Deposition Transcript with exhibits, #24 Exhibit Exhibit W - DC Deposition Transcript with exhibits, #25 Exhibit Exhibit 00X - MS Deposition Transcript with exhibits, #26 Exhibit Exhibit Y - JL Deposition Transcript with exhibits, #27 Exhibit Exhibit Z - JK Deposition Transcript with exhibits, #28 Exhibit Exhibit AA - GS Deposition Transcript with exhibits, #29 Exhibit Exhibit BB - SC Deposition Transcript with exhibits, #30 Exhibit Exhibit CC - LH Deposition Transcript with exhibits, #31 Exhibit Exhibit DD - JA Deposition Transcript with exhibits, #32 Exhibit Exhibit EE - TL Deposition Transcript with exhibits, #33 Exhibit Exhibit FF - JM Deposition Transcript with exhibits, #34 Exhibit Exhibit GG - TS Deposition Transcript with exhibits, #35 Exhibit Exhibit HH - WR Deposition Transcript with exhibits, #36 Exhibit Exhibit 0II - May 2020 Molfetta Email)(Etra, Jonathan)
December 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 455 MOTION to Exclude the Expert Testimony and Opinion of Plaintiffs' Expert Mark Tuft by Michael A. Molfetta, Molfetta Law, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Tuft Expert Report, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B - Tuft Deposition Transcript and Exhibits, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C - Email from T. Brown to Tuft)(Etra, Jonathan)
December 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 453 Defendant's MOTION in Limine (Redacted Pursuant to DE 442) by Michael A. Molfetta, Molfetta Law, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - 2.24.21 Plaintiffs Rule 26 Initial Disclosures, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B - BVC Answers to Molfetta Law 1st Interrogatories, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C - BG Amended Rule 26 Disclosures, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D - BVC Amended and Supplemental Responses to Molfetta Law 1st Interrogatories (2.1.22), #5 Exhibit Exhibit E - BG Second Amended Rule 26 Disclosures, #6 Exhibit Exhibit F - BVC 2d Amend. Interrogatory Response (4.6.22), #7 Exhibit Exhibit G - Plaintiff's Third Amended Rule 26 Disclosures, #8 Exhibit Exhibit H - April 2022 Email from Jonathan Etra, #9 Exhibit Exhibit I - Humphrey Witness Summary, #10 Exhibit Exhibit J - BVC's Supplemental Interrogatory Response (11.29.22), #11 Exhibit Exhibit K - Plaintiff's Fourth Supplemental Rule 26 Disclosures, #12 Exhibit Exhibit L - BVC Verified Second Supplemental Answers, #13 Exhibit Exhibit M - Jordan Salkin Deposition Transcript, Vol. 1, 2022.12.07 with exhibits, #14 Exhibit Exhibit N - Jordan Salkin Deposition Transcript, Vol. 2, 2022.12.08 with exhibits, #15 Exhibit Exhibit O - Audio Clip-Harbor Boulevard Conventionally Filed, #16 Exhibit Exhibit P - Audio Clip-South Coast Drive Conventionally Filed, #17 Exhibit Exhibit Q - Audio Clip-South Coast Drive 2 Conventionally Filed, #18 Exhibit Exhibit R - February 18, 2021 Molfetta Email, #19 Exhibit Exhibit S - April 29, 2021 Email from Molfetta, #20 Exhibit Exhibit T- Harold Miller Deposition Transcript)(Etra, Jonathan)
December 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 449 MOTION in Limine Plaintiffs' Motion In Limine by Bluegreen Vacations Corporation, Bluegreen Vacations Unlimited, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Expert Report of Philip Shechter, #2 Exhibit Patrick Mawhinney Report, #3 Exhibit Patrick Mawhinney Deposition Transcript, #4 Exhibit Philip Shechter Deposition Transcript, #5 Exhibit Transcript of Motion Hearing, #6 Exhibit Paul Humphrey Deposition Transcript, #7 Exhibit Third Amended Complaint, #8 Exhibit Motion to Withdraw, #9 Exhibit Order Granting Motion to Withdraw, #10 Exhibit Emergency Motion, #11 Exhibit Order re Emergency Motion)(Leger, Christian)
December 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 448 MOTION to Exclude the Expert Testimony and Opinion of Philip Shechter by Bluegreen Vacations Corporation, Bluegreen Vacations Unlimited, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Expert Report of Philip Shechter, #2 Exhibit Deposition Transcript of Philip Shechter, #3 Exhibit Deposition Transcript of Paul Humphrey, #4 Exhibit Plaintiffs' Fourth Supplemental Rule 26 Disclosures, #5 Exhibit Jonathan Etra Email)(Leger, Christian)
December 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 447 NOTICE OF CONVENTIONAL FILING (CD) by Michael A. Molfetta, Molfetta Law, LLC (cds)
December 21, 2022 Opinion or Order SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 446 [misc] restricted/sealed until further notice. (939842)
December 21, 2022 Opinion or Order SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 459 [misc] restricted/sealed until further notice. (1434118)
December 21, 2022 Opinion or Order SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 450 [motion] restricted/sealed until further notice. (939842)
December 21, 2022 Opinion or Order SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 454 [motion] restricted/sealed until further notice. (939842)
December 21, 2022 Opinion or Order SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 461 [motion] restricted/sealed until further notice. (1434118)
December 21, 2022 Opinion or Order SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 452 [misc] restricted/sealed until further notice. (kpe)
December 21, 2022 Opinion or Order SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 451 [motion] restricted/sealed until further notice. (939842)
December 20, 2022 Opinion or Order SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 445 [misc] restricted/sealed until further notice. (939842)
December 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 444 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #297 Corrected MOTION for Sanctions Corrected Amended Motion by Defendants Molfetta Law, LLC and Michael A. Molfetta for Sanctions Against Plaintiffs Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 11 filed by Molfetta Law, LLC, Michael A. Molfetta. Objections to R&R due by 1/3/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alicia M. Otazo-Reyes on 12/19/2022. See attached document for full details. (kvz)
December 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 442 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #441 Joint Expedited Motion for Leave to File Under Seal. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom (ak03)
December 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 441 Joint EXPEDITED MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal by Bluegreen Vacations Corporation, Bluegreen Vacations Unlimited, Inc.. (Rubin, Glennys)
December 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 443 PAPERLESS Minute Entry for Zoom proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Alicia M. Otazo-Reyes: Discovery Hearing held on 12/15/2022. Total time in court: 35 minutes. Attorney Appearance(s): Glennys Ortega Rubin, Benjamin Travis Brown and Jonathan Phillip Hart appeared on behalf of Plaintiffs. Jonathan Etra and Christopher Cole Cavallo appeared on behalf of the Molfetta Defendants. Order entered D.E. #440 . (Digital Zoom Recording AOR_01_12-15-2022 and DAR Back-up 12:51:42 - 13:34:51) (sl)
December 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 440 ORDER re #439 Notice re Hearing by Attorney filed by Molfetta Law, LLC, Michael A. Molfetta, #433 Notice re Hearing by Attorney filed by Bluegreen Vacations Unlimited, Inc., Bluegreen Vacations Corporation. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alicia M. Otazo-Reyes on 12/15/2022. See attached document for full details. (kvz)
December 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 439 AMENDED CROSS-NOTICE of Hearing by ATTORNEY: Discovery Hearing set for 12/15/2022 01:00 PM in Miami Division before Magistrate Judge Alicia M. Otazo-Reyes. (Cavallo, Christopher) Modified Text on 12/15/2022 (cds).
December 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 438 NOTICE of Hearing by ATTORNEY: Discovery Hearing set for 12/15/2022 01:00 PM in Miami Division before Magistrate Judge Alicia M. Otazo-Reyes. (Cavallo, Christopher)
December 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 437 CLERK'S NOTICE re #433 Notice re Hearing by Attorney. The discovery hearing set for 12/15/22 at 1:00 PM shall be conducted by Zoom video conference before Magistrate Judge Alicia M. Otazo-Reyes. Zoom video instructions will be provided to counsel via e-mail. (kvz)
December 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 436 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #434 Expedited Motion; granting #435 Expedited Motion. The parties may each file summary judgment motions up to twenty-five (25) pages in length, and statements of material facts up to fifteen (15) pages in length. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom (ak03)
December 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 435 Unopposed EXPEDITED MOTION for Leave to Exceed Page Limitations for Summary Judgment Briefing by Bluegreen Vacations Corporation, Bluegreen Vacations Unlimited, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Rubin, Glennys)
December 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 434 Unopposed EXPEDITED MOTION for Leave to Exceed Page Limitations for Summary Judgment Briefing by Michael A. Molfetta, Molfetta Law, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cavallo, Christopher)
December 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 433 NOTICE of Hearing by ATTORNEY: Discovery Hearing set for 12/15/2022 01:00 PM in Miami Division before Magistrate Judge Alicia M. Otazo-Reyes. (Rubin, Glennys)
December 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 432 SECOND Clerk's Notice of Undeliverable Mail re 422 Order Setting/Cancelling Hearing, 418 Order Setting/Cancelling Hearing. US Mail returned for: Jordan Salkin. The Court has not located an updated address for this party. After two undeliverable notices from the Court, notices will no longer be sent to this party in this case until a correct address is provided. (mp)
November 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 431 ORDER ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO STRIKE PORTION OF EXPERT REPORT AND PRECLUDE TESTIMONY OF PHILIP J. SCHECHTER, CPA/ABV, CVA:It is ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that the Motion to Strike, DE #409 , is DENIED. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 11/28/2022. See attached document for full details. (mab)
November 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Discovery Hearing Previously set before Magistrate Judge Alicia M. Otazo-Reyes on Tuesday, November 29, 2022, at 1:30 p.m. terminated. PER DE#430 (cds)
November 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 430 NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF HEARING by ATTORNEY: re 424 CLERK'S NOTICE re #423 Notice re Hearing by Attorney. The discovery hearing set for 11/29/22 at 1:30 PM shall be conducted by Zoom video conference before Magistrate Judge Otazo-Reyes. Zoom video instructions will be provided to counsel via e-mail. (kvz), #423 NOTICE of Hearing by ATTORNEY: Discovery Hearing set for 11/29/2022 01:30 PM in Miami Division before Magistrate Judge Alicia M. Otazo-Reyes. (Cavallo, Christopher) (Cavallo, Christopher)
November 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 429 PAPERLESS ORDER denying #425 Plaintiffs' Expedited Renewed Motion to Extend Deadlines in Amended Scheduling Order; denying 427 Defendants' Cross-Motion to Extend Summary Judgment and Daubert Briefing Deadlines. The parties have not shown good cause sufficient to warrant any extension of the existing deadlines in this case. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom (ak03)
November 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 428 Clerk's Notice to Filer re #426 Response in Opposition to Motion,,. Two or More Document Events Filed as One; ERROR - Only one event was selected by the Filer but more than one event was applicable to the document filed. The docket entry was corrected by the Clerk. It is not necessary to refile this document but in the future, the Filer must select all applicable events. (cds)
November 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 427 Cross-Motion to Extend Summary Judgment and Daubert Briefing Deadlines by Michael A. Molfetta, Molfetta Law, LLC. Responses due by 12/7/2022. (For Image See DE#426 ) (cds)
November 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 426 RESPONSE in Opposition re #425 Renewed MOTION for Extension of Time to Extend Deadlines in Amended Scheduling Order Plaintiffs' Expedited Renewed Moton to Extend Deadlines in Amended Scheduling Order and Incorporated Memorandum of Law re #411 Order on Motion to Amend and Cross-Motion to Extend Summary Judgment and Daubert Briefing Deadlines filed by Michael A. Molfetta, Molfetta Law, LLC. Replies due by 11/30/2022. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Text of Proposed Order Exhibit G)(Etra, Jonathan)
November 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 425 Renewed MOTION for Extension of Time to Extend Deadlines in Amended Scheduling Order Plaintiffs' Expedited Renewed Moton to Extend Deadlines in Amended Scheduling Order and Incorporated Memorandum of Law re #411 Order on Motion to Amend/Correct,, by Bluegreen Vacations Corporation, Bluegreen Vacations Unlimited, Inc.. Responses due by 12/7/2022 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(Quinn, Michael)
November 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 424 CLERK'S NOTICE re #423 Notice re Hearing by Attorney. The discovery hearing set for 11/29/22 at 1:30 PM shall be conducted by Zoom video conference before Magistrate Judge Otazo-Reyes. Zoom video instructions will be provided to counsel via e-mail. (kvz)
November 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 423 NOTICE of Hearing by ATTORNEY: Discovery Hearing set for 11/29/2022 01:30 PM in Miami Division before Magistrate Judge Alicia M. Otazo-Reyes. (Cavallo, Christopher)
November 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 422 PAPERLESS Order Cancelling Discovery Hearing set for 11/15/2022 at 2:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Otazo-Reyes in light of #421 Plaintiffs' Notice of Cancellation. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alicia M. Otazo-Reyes on 11/15/2022. (kvz)
November 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 421 NOTICE by Bluegreen Vacations Corporation, Bluegreen Vacations Unlimited, Inc. re 420 Order Setting/Cancelling Hearing, Plaintiffs' Notice of Cancellation of Discovery Hearing (Leger, Christian)
November 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 420 PAPERLESS Order Resetting Discovery Hearing on #416 Notice of Hearing for 11/15/2022 at 2:30 PM in Miami Division before Magistrate Judge Alicia M. Otazo-Reyes via Zoom video conference. Conference instructions will be provided to counsel via e-mail. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alicia M. Otazo-Reyes on 11/10/2022. (kvz)
November 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 419 REPLY to Response to Motion re #409 MOTION to Strike Plaintiffs' Motion to Strike Portion of Expert Report and Preclude Testimony of Philip J. Shechter, CPA/ABV, CVA, And Incorporated Memorandum of Law filed by Bluegreen Vacations Corporation, Bluegreen Vacations Unlimited, Inc.. (Rubin, Glennys)
November 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 418 PAPERLESS ORDER Cancelling Discovery Hearing set for 11/9/2022 at 9:30 AM, to be reset at a later date. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alicia M. Otazo-Reyes on 11/8/2022. (aa00)
November 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 417 CLERK'S NOTICE re #416 Notice re Hearing by Attorney. The discovery hearing set for 11/9/22 at 9:30 AM shall be conducted by Zoom video conference before Magistrate Judge Otazo-Reyes. Zoom video instructions will be provided to counsel via e-mail. (kvz)
November 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 416 NOTICE of Hearing by ATTORNEY: Discovery Hearing set for 11/9/2022 09:30 AM in Miami Division before Magistrate Judge Alicia M. Otazo-Reyes. (Leger, Christian)
November 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 415 ORDER granting #413 MOTION for Leave to Conduct Video Deposition of Defendant, Jordan Salkin. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alicia M. Otazo-Reyes on 11/2/2022. See attached document for full details. (kvz)
November 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 414 RESPONSE in Opposition re #409 MOTION to Strike Plaintiffs' Motion to Strike Portion of Expert Report and Preclude Testimony of Philip J. Shechter, CPA/ABV, CVA, And Incorporated Memorandum of Law filed by Michael A. Molfetta, Molfetta Law, LLC. Replies due by 11/8/2022. (Cavallo, Christopher)
November 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 413 MOTION Conduct Video Deposition of Defendant, Jordan Salkin, at the Theo Lacy Correctional Facility on a Date and Time Certain re #319 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Plaintiffs' Expedited Motion for Leave to Conduct Video Deposition of Defendant, Jordan Salkin, at the Theo Lacy Correctional Facility on a Date and Time Certain and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by Bluegreen Vacations Corporation, Bluegreen Vacations Unlimited, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Rubin, Glennys)
October 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 412 TRANSCRIPT of DISCOVERY HEARING held on 08/02/2022 before Magistrate Judge Alicia M. Otazo-Reyes, 1-14 pages, Court Reporter: Joanne Mancari, jemancari@gmail.com. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased by contacting the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 11/21/2022. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/1/2022. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/30/2023. (jes)
October 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 411 THIRD ORDER AMENDING SCHEDULING ORDER AND CERTAIN PRETRIAL DEADLINES granting in part and denying in part #410 Motion to Amend/Correct. Parties exchange rebuttal expert witness summaries or reports due by 11/11/2022. All discovery, including expert discovery due by 12/9/2022. All other deadlines in the Second Amended Scheduling Order, ECF No. #335 , and provisions of the Scheduling Order, ECF No. #32 , remain in place. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 10/19/2022. See attached document for full details. (swr)
October 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 410 Unopposed MOTION to Amend/Correct #335 Order on Expedited Motion,, Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion to Extend Deadlines in Order Amending Scheduling Order and Certain Pretrial Deadlines, ECF No. #335 , and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by Bluegreen Vacations Corporation, Bluegreen Vacations Unlimited, Inc.. Responses due by 11/1/2022 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Christu, Eric)
October 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 409 MOTION to Strike Plaintiffs' Motion to Strike Portion of Expert Report and Preclude Testimony of Philip J. Shechter, CPA/ABV, CVA, And Incorporated Memorandum of Law by Bluegreen Vacations Corporation, Bluegreen Vacations Unlimited, Inc.. Responses due by 11/1/2022 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Christu, Eric)
October 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 408 ORDER ON OBJECTION TO MAGISTRATES ORDER overruling #375 Appeal/Objection of Magistrate Judge Order to District Court. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 10/17/2022. See attached document for full details. (swr)
September 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 407 PAPERLESS Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Alicia M. Otazo-Reyes: Telephonic Discovery Hearing held on 9/26/2022. Total time in court: 13 minutes. Attorney Appearance(s): Eric Christu and Benjamin Travis Brown appeared on behalf of Plaintiffs. Christopher Cole Cavallo appeared on behalf of the Molfetta Defendants. Order entered D.E. #406 . (Digital ATT Recording AOR_01_9-26-2022 and DAR Back-Up 10:28:44 - 10:40:11) (sl)
September 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 406 ORDER re #404 Notice of Hearing by Attorney. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alicia M. Otazo-Reyes on 9/26/2022. See attached document for full details. (kvz)
September 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 405 CLERK'S NOTICE re #404 Notice re Hearing by Attorney. The dial-in instructions for the telephonic discovery hearing set for 9/26/2022 at 10:30 AM are as follows: The parties shall call the conference number 1-888-684-8852 at the appointed time, then enter access code 4791317 and security code 0926. Please dial in at least ten minutes before the hearing begins and wait until your case is called. (kvz)
September 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 404 NOTICE of Hearing by ATTORNEY: Discovery Hearing set for 9/26/2022 10:30 AM in Miami Division before Magistrate Judge Alicia M. Otazo-Reyes. (Christu, Eric)
September 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 403 Supplemental CERTIFICATE of Compliance Re Admitted Evidence for exhibit(s): 42 Supplemental Certificate of Compliance re Admitted Evidence by Christian Michael Leger on behalf of Bluegreen Vacations Corporation, Bluegreen Vacations Unlimited, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Defendant Exhibit 42) (Leger, Christian)
September 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 400 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #399 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal: (1) Unredacted Post-Hearing Brief and Closing Statement; and (2) Attorneys' Eyes Only Hearing Exhibits. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alicia M. Otazo-Reyes on 9/13/2022. (kvz)
September 13, 2022 Opinion or Order SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 401 [misc] restricted/sealed until further notice. (1258396)
September 13, 2022 Opinion or Order SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 402 [misc] restricted/sealed until further notice. (1258396)
September 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 399 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal: (1) Unredacted Post-Hearing Brief and Closing Statement; and (2) Attorneys' Eyes Only Hearing Exhibitsand (2) by Michael A. Molfetta, Molfetta Law, LLC. (Cavallo, Christopher)
September 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 398 TRIAL BRIEF Molfetta Defendants' Post-Hearing Brief and Closing Statement by Michael A. Molfetta, Molfetta Law, LLC. (Etra, Jonathan)
September 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 396 TRIAL BRIEF Plaintiffs' Closing Brief in Opposition to Molfetta Defendants' Motion For Rule 11 Sanctions by Bluegreen Vacations Corporation, Bluegreen Vacations Unlimited, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Appendix A, #2 Appendix B, #3 Appendix C, #4 Transcripts Day I, #5 Transcripts Day II, #6 Transcripts Day III, #7 Transcripts Day IV, #8 Transcripts Day V, #9 Exhibit Defendant Exhibit 12, #10 Exhibit Defendant Exhibit 85, #11 Exhibit Defendant Exhibit 91)(Christu, Eric)
September 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 395 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #394 Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Closing Brief Under Seal and Incorporated Memorandum of Law. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alicia M. Otazo-Reyes on 9/12/2022. (kvz)
September 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 394 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion For Leave to File Closing Brief Under Seal and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by Bluegreen Vacations Corporation, Bluegreen Vacations Unlimited, Inc.. (Rubin, Glennys)
September 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 393 ORDER re #390 Notice of Hearing by Attorney. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alicia M. Otazo-Reyes on 9/12/2022. See attached document for full details. (kvz)
September 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 392 PAPERLESS Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Alicia M. Otazo-Reyes: Discovery Hearing held on 9/12/2022. Attorney Appearance(s): Eric Christu, Benjamin Travis Brown, Christopher Cole Cavallo, Becky Esquenazi. (Digital 13:28:50) Total time in court: 18 minutes. (mdc)
September 12, 2022 Opinion or Order SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 397 [misc] restricted/sealed until further notice. (515898)
September 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 391 CLERK'S NOTICE re #390 Notice re Hearing by Attorney. The dial-in instructions for the telephonic discovery hearing set for 9/12/2022 at 1:30 PM are as follows: The parties shall call the conference number 1-888-684-8852 at the appointed time, then enter access code 4791317 and security code 0912. Please dial in at least ten minutes before the hearing begins and wait until your case is called. (kvz)
September 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 390 NOTICE of Hearing by ATTORNEY: Discovery Hearing set for 9/12/2022 01:30 PM in Miami Division before Magistrate Judge Alicia M. Otazo-Reyes. (Leger, Christian)
September 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 389 ORDER granting #388 Motion for Reconsideration filed by Bluegreen Vacations Unlimited, Inc. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 9/7/2022. See attached document for full details. (scn)
September 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 388 MOTION for Reconsideration re 387 Order Striking,, #386 Response/Reply (Other),, Plaintiffs' Motion for Reconsideration of Order [ECF No. 387] Striking Plaintiffs' Reply [ECF No. 386] or, in the Alternative, Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to Re-File Reply by Bluegreen Vacations Corporation, Bluegreen Vacations Unlimited, Inc.. (Rubin, Glennys)
September 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 387 PAPERLESS ORDER STRIKING #386 Plaintiffs' Reply in Support of Their Objection to Magistrate's Order Waiving All Objections to Molfetta's First Request for Production. The Local Rules state that parties may appeal a Magistrate Judge's order on a non-dispositive matter, and permit the filing of objections and responses to objections. See S.D. Fla. Mag. J. R. 4(a). The Rules, however, do not contemplate the filing of a reply to a response to objections, and therefore, the Reply is improper. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom (ak03)
September 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 386 (STRICKEN PER DE# 387 ) REPLY to #384 Response in Opposition to Motion,, #375 OBJECTION of Magistrate Judge #359 Order to District Court Plaintiffs' Objection to Magistrate's Order Waiving All Objections to Molfetta's First Request for Production Plaintiffs' Reply in Support of their Objection to Magistrate's Order [ECF No. 375] Waiving All Objections to Molfetta's First Request for Production by Bluegreen Vacations Corporation, Bluegreen Vacations Unlimited, Inc.. (Rubin, Glennys) Modified Text on 9/2/2022 (cds).
August 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 385 TRANSCRIPT of Videoconference of Continuation of the Evidentiary Hearing held on 08-18-22 before Magistrate Judge Alicia M. Otazo-Reyes, 1-151 pages, Court Reporter: Gilda Pastor-Hernandez, 305-523-5118 / Gilda_Pastor-Hernandez@flsd.uscourts.gov. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased by contacting the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 9/19/2022. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/29/2022. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/28/2022. (Pastor-Hernandez, Gilda)
August 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 384 RESPONSE in Opposition re #375 OBJECTION of Magistrate Judge #359 Order to District Court Plaintiffs' Objection to Magistrate's Order Waiving All Objections to Molfetta's First Request for Production filed by Michael A. Molfetta, Molfetta Law, LLC. Replies due by 9/2/2022. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O, #16 Exhibit P)(Cavallo, Christopher)
August 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 383 TRANSCRIPT of Continuation of Evidentiary Hearing held on 8/17/22 before Magistrate Judge Alicia M. Otazo-Reyes, 1-246 pages, Court Reporter: Diane Miller, 772-467-2337 / Diane_Miller@flsd.uscourts.gov. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased by contacting the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 9/16/2022. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/26/2022. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/25/2022. (dmr)
August 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 382 CERTIFICATE of Compliance Re Admitted Evidence for exhibit(s): Plaintiffs' Exhibits 24, 58, 61; Molfetta Defendants' Exhibits 14, 16, 24 by Christian Michael Leger on behalf of Bluegreen Vacations Corporation, Bluegreen Vacations Unlimited, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Plaintiff 24, #2 Exhibit Plaintiff 58, #3 Exhibit Plaintiff 61, #4 Exhibit Defendant 14, #5 Exhibit Defendant 16, #6 Exhibit Defendant 24) (Leger, Christian)
August 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 381 CERTIFICATE of Compliance Re Admitted Evidence for exhibit(s): Molfetta 15, 29, 31, 96, 98, 103, 104 by Christopher Cole Cavallo on behalf of Michael A. Molfetta, Molfetta Law, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 15, #2 Exhibit 29, #3 Exhibit 31, #4 Exhibit 96, #5 Exhibit 98, #6 Exhibit 103, #7 Exhibit 104) (Cavallo, Christopher)
August 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 380 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #379 Molfetta's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Objection to Magistrate's Order. Molfetta shall file his response no later than August 26, 2022. In addition, Bluegreen's rolling production deadline is extended to September 12, 2022. Responses due by 8/26/2022. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom (ak03)
August 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 379 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #375 OBJECTION of Magistrate Judge #359 Order to District Court Plaintiffs' Objection to Magistrate's Order Waiving All Objections to Molfetta's First Request for Production by Michael A. Molfetta, Molfetta Law, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cavallo, Christopher)
August 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 378 PAPERLESS Minute Entry for Zoom proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Alicia M. Otazo-Reyes: Evidentiary Hearing held on 8/18/2022 re #297 Corrected Amended Motion by Defendants Molfetta Law, LLC and Michael A. Molfetta for Sanctions Against Plaintiffs Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 11 filed by Molfetta Law, LLC, Michael A. Molfetta. Simultaneous closing briefs due 9/12/22. Briefs shall not exceed 30 pages. Total time in court: 3 hour(s) : 40 minutes. Attorney Appearance(s): Eric Christu and Christian Michael Leger appeared on behalf of Plaintiffs. Jonathan Etra, Christopher Cole Cavallo, and Becky Esquenazi appeared on behalf of the Molfetta Defendants. Court Reporter: Gilda Pastor-Hernandez, 305-523-5118 / Gilda_Pastor-Hernandez@flsd.uscourts.gov. (sl)
August 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 377 PAPERLESS Minute Entry for Zoom proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Alicia M. Otazo-Reyes: Continued Evidentiary Hearing held on 8/17/2022 re #297 Corrected Amended Motion by Defendants Molfetta Law, LLC and Michael A. Molfetta for Sanctions Against Plaintiffs Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 11 filed by Molfetta Law, LLC, Michael A. Molfetta. Matter previously set to continue on 8/18/22 at 10:30 A.M. before Magistrate Judge Otazo-Reyes. Total time in court: 4 hour(s) : 57 minutes. Eric Christu and Christian Michael Leger appeared on behalf of Plaintiffs. Jonathan Etra, Christopher Cole Cavallo, and Becky Esquenazi appeared on behalf of the Molfetta Defendants. Attorney Appearance(s): Court Reporter: Diane Miller, 772-467-2337 / Diane_Miller@flsd.uscourts.gov. (sl)
August 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 376 TRANSCRIPT of Evidentiary Hearing Transcript held on 8/4/2022 before Magistrate Judge Alicia M. Otazo-Reyes, 1-159 pages, Court Reporter: Diane Miller, 772-467-2337 / Diane_Miller@flsd.uscourts.gov. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased by contacting the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 8/29/2022. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/8/2022. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/7/2022. (dmr)
August 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 375 OBJECTION of Magistrate Judge #359 Order to District Court Plaintiffs' Objection to Magistrate's Order Waiving All Objections to Molfetta's First Request for Production (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H)(Leger, Christian)
August 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 374 PAPERLESS Minute Entry for Zoom proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Alicia M. Otazo-Reyes: Continued Evidentiary Hearing held on 8/4/2022 re #297 Corrected Amended Motion by Defendants Molfetta Law, LLC and Michael A. Molfetta for Sanctions Against Plaintiffs Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 11 filed by Molfetta Law, LLC, Michael A. Molfetta. The Evidentiary Hearing was continued to 8/17/2022 at 10:30 AM and 8/18/2022 at 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Alicia M. Otazo-Reyes. The hearing will be conducted by Zoom Conference. Conference instructions will be provided to counsel via e-mail. Counsel shall disseminate the Zoom Conference instructions to their clients and/or witnesses they intend to call to testify at the hearing. Total time in court: 3 hour(s) : 32 minutes. Attorney Appearance(s): Eric Christu and Christian Michael Leger appeared on behalf of Plaintiffs. Jonathan Etra, Christopher Cole Cavallo, and Becky Esquenazi appeared on behalf of the Molfetta Defendants. Court Reporter: Diane Miller, 772-467-2337 / Diane_Miller@flsd.uscourts.gov. (sl) .
August 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 373 ORDER re #366 Notice re Hearing by Attorney. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alicia M. Otazo-Reyes on 8/2/2022. See attached document for full details. (kvz)
August 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 372 PAPERLESS Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Alicia M. Otazo-Reyes: Telephonic Discovery Hearing held on 8/2/2022. Total time in court: 18 minutes. Attorney Appearance(s): Eric Christu and Christian Michael Leger appeared on behalf of Plaintiffs. Jonathan Etra and Christopher Cole Cavallo appeared on behalf of the Molfetta Defendants. Order to follow. (Digital ATT Recording AOR_02_8-2-2022 and DAR Back-Up 15:28:24 - 15:45:54) (sl)
August 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 371 MEDIATOR'S REPORT by Gary S. Salzman. Disposition: No Agreement was reached. (cds)
August 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 370 TRANSCRIPT of Discovery Hearing held on 7/25/2022 before Magistrate Judge Alicia M. Otazo-Reyes, 1-13 pages, Court Reporter: Joanne Mancari, 305-523-5635. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased by contacting the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 8/22/2022. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/1/2022. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/31/2022. (kpe)
August 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 369 NOTICE by Bluegreen Vacations Corporation, Bluegreen Vacations Unlimited, Inc. Joint Notice Regarding Mediation Status (Rubin, Glennys)
August 1, 2022 Opinion or Order SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 368 [misc] restricted/sealed until further notice. (pes)
July 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 367 CLERK'S NOTICE re #366 Notice of Hearing by Attorney. The dial-in instructions for the telephonic discovery hearing set for 8/2/2022 at 3:30 PM are as follows: The parties shall call the conference number 1-888-684-8852 at the appointed time, then enter access code 4791317 and security code 0802. Please dial in at least ten minutes before the hearing begins and wait until your case is called. (kvz)
July 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 366 NOTICE of Hearing by ATTORNEY: Discovery Hearing set for 8/2/2022 03:30 PM in Miami Division before Magistrate Judge Alicia M. Otazo-Reyes. (Leger, Christian)
July 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 365 TRANSCRIPT of Zoom evidentiary hearing held on 7-21-22 before Magistrate Judge Alicia M. Otazo-Reyes, Volume Number 1 of 1, 1-260 pages, Court Reporter: Vernita Allen-Williams, 305-523-5048 / Vernita_Allen-Williams@flsd.uscourts.gov. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased by contacting the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 8/18/2022. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/29/2022. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/26/2022. (vas)
July 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 364 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Becky Esquenazi on behalf of Michael A. Molfetta, Molfetta Law, LLC. Attorney Becky Esquenazi added to party Michael A. Molfetta(pty:dft), Attorney Becky Esquenazi added to party Molfetta Law, LLC(pty:dft). (Esquenazi, Becky)
July 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 363 CERTIFICATE of Compliance Re Admitted Evidence for exhibit(s): 1-4, 7, 9-10, 5-6, 8, 11, 13-14, 30-32 Certificate of Compliance Re Admitted Evidence by Eric Christu on behalf of Bluegreen Vacations Corporation, Bluegreen Vacations Unlimited, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 13, #13 Exhibit 14, #14 Exhibit 15, #15 Exhibit 30, #16 Exhibit 31, #17 Exhibit 32) (Christu, Eric)
July 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 362 NOTICE OF CONVENTIONAL FILING (CD) by Michael A. Molfetta, Molfetta Law, LLC (cds)
July 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 361 CERTIFICATE of Compliance Re Admitted Evidence for exhibit(s): Molfetta 1-6, 8, 10, 23, 24, 27, 34, 35, 41, 52, 53, 57, 80, 81, 86-89, 92-94A by Christopher Cole Cavallo on behalf of Michael A. Molfetta, Molfetta Law, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Molfetta 1, #2 Exhibit Molfetta 2, #3 Exhibit Molfetta 3, #4 Exhibit Molfetta 4, #5 Exhibit Molfetta 5, #6 Exhibit Molfetta 6, #7 Exhibit Molfetta 8, #8 Exhibit Molfetta 10, #9 Exhibit Molfetta 23, #10 Exhibit Molfetta 24, #11 Exhibit Molfetta 27, #12 Exhibit Molfetta 34, #13 Exhibit Molfetta 35, #14 Exhibit Molfetta 41, #15 Exhibit Molfetta 53, #16 Exhibit Molfetta 57, #17 Exhibit Molfetta 80, #18 Exhibit Molfetta 81, #19 Exhibit Molfetta 86, #20 Exhibit Molfetta 87, #21 Exhibit Molfetta 88, #22 Exhibit Molfetta 89, #23 Exhibit Molfetta 92, #24 Exhibit Molfetta 93, #25 Exhibit Molfetta 94, #26 Exhibit Molfetta 94A) (Cavallo, Christopher)
July 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 360 PAPERLESS Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Alicia M. Otazo-Reyes: Telephonic Discovery Hearing held on 7/25/2022. See order D.E. #359 . Total time in court: 15 minutes. Attorney Appearance(s): Christian Michael Leger, Eric Christu, Jonathan Etra, Christopher Cole Cavallo. (Digital 15:21:07) (aw)
July 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 359 ORDER re #354 Notice of Hearing by Attorney filed by Molfetta Law, LLC, Michael A. Molfetta. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alicia M. Otazo-Reyes on 7/25/2022. See attached document for full details. (kvz)
July 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 358 PAPERLESS Minute Entry for Zoom proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Alicia M. Otazo-Reyes: Continued Evidentiary Hearing held on 7/21/2022 re #297 Corrected Amended Motion by Defendants Molfetta Law, LLC and Michael A. Molfetta for Sanctions Against Plaintiffs Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 11 filed by Molfetta Law, LLC, Michael A. Molfetta. The Evidentiary Hearing was continued to 8/4/2022 at 1:30 P.M. before Magistrate Judge Alicia M. Otazo-Reyes. The hearing will be conducted by Zoom Conference. Conference instructions will be provided to counsel via e-mail. Counsel shall disseminate the Zoom Conference instructions to their clients and/or witnesses they intend to call to testify at the hearing. Total time in court: 5 hour(s) : 35 minutes. Attorney Appearance(s): Eric Christu and Christian Michael Leger appeared on behalf of Plaintiffs. Jonathan Etra and Christopher Cole Cavallo appeared on behalf of the Molfetta Defendants. Court Reporter: Vernita Allen-Williams, 305-523-5048 / Vernita_Allen-Williams@flsd.uscourts.gov. (sl)
July 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 357 TRANSCRIPT of Evidentiary Hearing held on 6/21/2022 before Magistrate Judge Alicia M. Otazo-Reyes, 1-155 pages, Court Reporter: Joanne Mancari, 305-523-5635. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased by contacting the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 8/4/2022. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/15/2022. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/12/2022. (kpe)
July 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 356 TRANSCRIPT of Motion Hearing Transcribed from Digital Audio Recording held on 6/21/2022 before Magistrate Judge Alicia M. Otazo-Reyes, 1-15 pages, Court Reporter: Joanne Mancari, 305-523-5635. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased by contacting the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 8/4/2022. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/15/2022. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/12/2022. (kpe)
July 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 355 CLERK'S NOTICE re #354 Notice of Hearing by Attorney. The dial-in instructions for the telephonic discovery hearing set for 7/25/2022 at 3:30 PM are as follows: the parties shall call the conference number 1-888-684-8852 at the appointed time, then enter access code 4791317 and security code 0725. Please dial in at least ten minutes before the hearing begins and wait until your case is called. (kvz)
July 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 354 NOTICE of Hearing by ATTORNEY: Discovery Hearing set for 7/25/2022 03:30 PM in Miami Division before Magistrate Judge Alicia M. Otazo-Reyes. (Cavallo, Christopher)
June 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 353 Clerk's Notice of Filing Deficiency Re: #352 Notice of Conventional Filing filed by Molfetta Law, LLC, Michael A. Molfetta. Document(s) missing required signature(s) (Fed.R.Civ.P. 11(a)). (cds)
June 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 352 NOTICE OF CONVENTIONAL FILING (CD) by Michael A. Molfetta, Molfetta Law, LLC (cds)
June 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 351 CERTIFICATE of Compliance Re Admitted Evidence for exhibit(s): Molfetta 9, 12, 13, 63, 64, 69, 70, 72, 73, 74, 75, 77, 79, 90 by Christopher Cole Cavallo on behalf of Michael A. Molfetta, Molfetta Law, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Molfetta 9, #2 Exhibit Molfetta 12, #3 Exhibit Molfetta 13, #4 Exhibit Molfetta 63, #5 Exhibit Molfetta 64, #6 Exhibit Molfetta 69, #7 Exhibit Molfetta 70, #8 Exhibit Molfetta 72, #9 Exhibit Molfetta 73, #10 Exhibit Molfetta 74, #11 Exhibit Molfetta 75, #12 Exhibit Molfetta 77, #13 Exhibit Molfetta 79, #14 Exhibit Molfetta 90) (Cavallo, Christopher)
June 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 350 CERTIFICATE of Compliance Re Admitted Evidence for exhibit(s): 36, 38, 41, 43, 49, 50, 53, 54 Certificate of Compliance Re Admitted Evidence by Eric Christu on behalf of Bluegreen Vacations Corporation, Bluegreen Vacations Unlimited, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 36, #2 Exhibit 38, #3 Exhibit 41, #4 Exhibit 43, #5 Exhibit 49, #6 Exhibit 50, #7 Exhibit 53, #8 Exhibit 54) (Christu, Eric)
June 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 347 PAPERLESS ORDER Setting Continued Hearing on #297 Corrected MOTION for Sanctions for 7/21/2022 at 10:30 AM in Miami Division before Magistrate Judge Alicia M. Otazo-Reyes. The hearing will be conducted by Zoom Conference. Conference instructions will be provided to counsel via e-mail. Counsel shall disseminate the Zoom Conference instructions to their clients and/or witnesses they intend to call to testify at the hearing. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alicia M. Otazo-Reyes on 6/22/2022. (kvz)
June 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 349 PAPERLESS Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Alicia M. Otazo-Reyes: Evidentiary Motion Hearing held via zoom on 6/21/2022 re #297 Corrected MOTION for Sanctions. The following witnesses were sworn and testifed: Tina Miller, Trish Anazalone, James Owen, Vanessa Perez, Jessie Daniels Stevens. Charles Adair Bledsoe also appeared as a witness but testimony was not required. Hearing will be commenced to 7/21/22. Attorney Appearance(s): Eric Christu, Michael James Quinn, Christian Michael Leger and Michael Quinn -Counsel for the Plaintiff; Christopher Cole Cavallo -Counsel for the Defendant. Other appearances: Becky Esqvenazi, Mark Tuft. Total time in court: 3 hour(s) : 42 minutes. (Digital 14:10:12; 17:52:21) (kan)
June 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 348 PAPERLESS Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Alicia M. Otazo-Reyes: Telephonic Discovery Hearing re D.E. 327 held on 6/21/2022. Order to follow. Attorney Appearance(s): Eric Christu and Christian Michael Leger -Counsel for the Plaintiff; Christopher Cole Cavallo -Counsel for the Defendant. Total time in court: 23 minutes. (Digital 9:38:37) (kan)
June 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 346 ORDER re #336 Notice of Hearing by Attorney. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alicia M. Otazo-Reyes on 6/21/2022. See attached document for full details. (kvz)
June 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 345 PAPERLESS ORDER denying #343 Motion to Continue. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alicia M. Otazo-Reyes on 6/21/2022. (kvz)
June 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 344 RESPONSE in Opposition re #343 MOTION to Continue Plaintiffs Expedited Motion to Continue Hearing Scheduled For June 21, 2022 [D.E. 327], and Incorporated Memorandum of Law re 327 Order on Motion to Continue,, filed by Michael A. Molfetta, Molfetta Law, LLC. Replies due by 6/28/2022. (Etra, Jonathan)
June 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 343 MOTION to Continue Plaintiffs Expedited Motion to Continue Hearing Scheduled For June 21, 2022 [D.E. 327], and Incorporated Memorandum of Law re 327 Order on Motion to Continue,, by Bluegreen Vacations Corporation, Bluegreen Vacations Unlimited, Inc.. Responses due by 7/5/2022 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Leger, Christian)
June 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 342 Exhibit List Plaintiffs' Amended Exhibit List by Bluegreen Vacations Corporation, Bluegreen Vacations Unlimited, Inc... (Leger, Christian)
June 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 341 Witness List Plaintiffs' Amended Witness List by Bluegreen Vacations Corporation, Bluegreen Vacations Unlimited, Inc... (Leger, Christian)
June 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 340 Exhibit List Plaintiffs' Exhibit List by Bluegreen Vacations Corporation, Bluegreen Vacations Unlimited, Inc... (Leger, Christian)
June 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 339 Witness List Plaintiffs' Witness List by Bluegreen Vacations Corporation, Bluegreen Vacations Unlimited, Inc... (Leger, Christian)
June 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 338 Exhibit and Witness List for June 21, 2022 Evidentiary Hearing by Michael A. Molfetta, Molfetta Law, LLC.. (Cavallo, Christopher)
June 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 337 CLERK'S NOTICE re #336 Notice of Hearing by Attorney. The Discovery Hearing set for 6/21/2022 at 9:30 AM will be conducted telephonically. The dial-in instructions for the telephonic discovery hearing are as follows: the parties shall call the conference number 1-888-684-8852 at the appointed time, then enter access code 4791317 and security code 0621. Please dial in at least ten minutes before the hearing begins and wait until your case is called. (kvz)
June 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 336 NOTICE of Hearing by ATTORNEY: Discovery Hearing set for 6/21/2022 09:30 AM in Miami Division before Magistrate Judge Alicia M. Otazo-Reyes. (Cavallo, Christopher)
June 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 335 ORDER AMENDING SCHEDULING ORDER AND CERTAIN PRETRIAL DEADLINES. Granting #331 Expedited Motion to Extend Deadlines. Discovery due by 11/23/2022. Expert Discovery due by 11/23/2022. Dispositive Motions due by 12/21/2022. In Limine Motions due by 12/21/2022. Motions due by 12/21/2022. Pretrial Stipulation due by 2/21/2023. Calendar Call set for 3/7/2023 01:45 PM in Miami Division before Judge Beth Bloom. Jury Trial set for 3/13/2023 09:00 AM in Miami Division before Judge Beth Bloom. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 6/7/2022. See attached document for full details. (cds)
June 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 334 REPLY to Response to Motion re #331 EXPEDITED MOTION to Extend Deadlines in Amended Scheduling Order and Notice of Plaintiffs' Consent to the Relief Sought filed by Michael A. Molfetta, Molfetta Law, LLC. (Cavallo, Christopher)
June 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 333 RESPONSE to Motion re #331 EXPEDITED MOTION to Extend Deadlines in Amended Scheduling Order Plaintiffs' Response to Molfetta Defendants' Expedited Motion to Extend Deadlines in Amended Scheduling Order filed by Bluegreen Vacations Corporation, Bluegreen Vacations Unlimited, Inc.. Replies due by 6/13/2022. (Leger, Christian)
May 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 332 PAPERLESS ORDER requiring Plaintiffs' expedited response to ECF No. #331 , Molfetta Defendants' Expedited Motion to Extend Deadlines in Amended Scheduling Order. Plaintiffs shall file their response no later than June 6, 2022. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom (ak03)
May 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 331 EXPEDITED MOTION to Extend Deadlines in Amended Scheduling Order by Michael A. Molfetta, Molfetta Law, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I)(Etra, Jonathan)
May 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 330 TRANSCRIPT of Motion Hearing held on 3/30/22 before Magistrate Judge Alicia M. Otazo-Reyes, 1-46 pages, Court Reporter: Joanne Mancari, 305-523-5635. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased by contacting the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 6/21/2022. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/1/2022. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/29/2022. (hh)
May 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Set Deadlines as to #331 EXPEDITED MOTION to Extend Deadlines in Amended Scheduling Order . Responses due by 6/6/2022. PER DE# 332 (cds)
May 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 329 ORDER Granting in Part and Denying in Part #277 Plaintiffs' Motion to Strike Certain Defendants Molfetta Law, LLC and Michael A. Molfetta's Affirmative Defenses and Treat Others as Denials, and Incorporated Memorand. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 5/26/2022. See attached document for full details. (cds)
April 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 328 TRANSCRIPT of Discovery Hearing held on 4/11/22 before Magistrate Judge Alicia M. Otazo-Reyes, 1-41 pages, Court Reporter: Joanne Mancari, 305-523-5635. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased by contacting the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 5/18/2022. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/31/2022. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/26/2022. (hh) Text Modified on 4/27/2022 (hh).
April 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 327 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #326 Motion to Continue. The hearing on #297 Corrected MOTION for Sanctions is RESET for 6/21/2022 at 2:00 PM in Miami Division before Magistrate Judge Alicia M. Otazo-Reyes. The hearing will be conducted by Zoom Conference. Conference instructions will be provided to counsel via e-mail. Counsel shall disseminate the Zoom Conference instructions to their clients and/or witnesses they intend to call to testify at the hearing. A witness and exhibit list shall be filed three (3) days prior to the evidentiary hearing. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alicia M. Otazo-Reyes on 4/20/2022. (kvz)
April 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 326 Joint MOTION to Continue Rule 11 Evidentiary Hearing Date re 323 Order on Motion to Continue,, by Michael A. Molfetta. Responses due by 5/4/2022 (Etra, Jonathan)
April 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 325 ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AS TO HAROLD O. MILLER Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 4/19/2022. See attached document for full details. (pcs)
April 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 324 STIPULATION of Dismissal JOINT Stipulation for Dismissal With Prejudice of All Claims Against Defendant Harold O. Miller by Bluegreen Vacations Corporation, Bluegreen Vacations Unlimited, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Rubin, Glennys)
April 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 323 PAPERLESS ORDER granting in part #321 Motion to Continue. The Hearing on #297 Corrected MOTION for Sanctions is RESET for 6/6/2022 at 10:30 AM in Miami Division before Magistrate Judge Alicia M. Otazo-Reyes. The hearing will be conducted by Zoom Conference. Conference instructions will be provided to counsel via e-mail. Counsel shall disseminate the Zoom Conference instructions to their clients and/or witnesses they intend to call to testify at the hearing. A witness and exhibit list shall be filed three (3) days prior to the evidentiary hearing. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alicia M. Otazo-Reyes on 4/15/2022. (kvz)
April 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 322 REPLY to Response to Motion re #297 Corrected MOTION for Sanctions Corrected Amended Motion by Defendants Molfetta Law, LLC and Michael A. Molfetta for Sanctions Against Plaintiffs Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 11 filed by Michael A. Molfetta, Molfetta Law, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H)(Etra, Jonathan)
April 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 321 Unopposed MOTION to Continue Plaintiffs' Unopposed Expedited Motion to Continue Hearing Scheduled for April 25, 2022, and to Establish a Deadline for the Filing of Witness and Exhibit Lists in Advance of Hearing, and Incorporated Memorandum of Law re 314 Order Setting Hearing on Motion,, by Bluegreen Vacations Corporation, Bluegreen Vacations Unlimited, Inc.. Responses due by 4/28/2022 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Deposition Notices, #2 Exhibit 2 - Tina Miller Declaration)(Leger, Christian)
April 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 320 PAPERLESS Minute Entry for telephonic proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Alicia M. Otazo-Reyes: Motion Hearing held on 4/11/2022 re #286 Plaintiffs' Unopposed, In Part, Motion to Exceed Deposition Limit and Incorporated Memorandum of Law filed by Bluegreen Vacations Unlimited, Inc., Bluegreen Vacations Corporation. Total time in court: 1 hour(s) : 05 minutes. Attorney Appearance(s): Eric Christu, Benjamin Travis Brown and Jonathan Phillip Hart appeared on behalf of Plaintiffs. Christian Michael Leger and Christopher Cole Cavallo appeared on behalf of Defendants. Order entered D.E. #319 . (Digital ATT Recording AOR_01_4-11-2022 - DAR Back-up 15:31:03 - 16:35:59) (sl)
April 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 319 ORDER granting in part #286 Motion to Exceed Deposition Limit and Incorporated Memorandum of Law. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alicia M. Otazo-Reyes on 4/11/2022. See attached document for full details. (kvz)
April 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 318 REPLY to Response to Motion re #286 MOTION to Exceed Deposition Limit Plaintiffs' Unopposed, In Part, Motion to Exceed Deposition Limit and Incorporated Memorandum of Law Reply to Response to Bluegreen's Motion to Exceed Deposition Limits filed by Bluegreen Vacations Corporation, Bluegreen Vacations Unlimited, Inc.. (Leger, Christian)
April 11, 2022 Opinion or Order PAPERLESS Order resetting Telephonic Hearing on #286 MOTION to Exceed Deposition Limit. **TIME CHANGE ONLY** The Telephonic Motion Hearing set for 4/11/2022 is RESET to 3:30 PM in Miami Division before Magistrate Judge Alicia M. Otazo-Reyes. The dial-in instructions for the telephonic hearing are as follows: The parties shall call the conference number 1-888-684-8852 at the appointed time, then enter access code 4791317 and security code 0411. Please dial in at least ten minutes before the hearing begins and wait until your case is called. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alicia M. Otazo-Reyes on 4/11/2022. (kvz)
April 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 317 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #315 Motion for Extension of Time. Plaintiffs shall comply with paragraph five of the Court's March 18, 2022 Order [DE 284] by April 13, 2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alicia M. Otazo-Reyes on 4/10/2022. (kvz)
April 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 316 RESPONSE in Opposition re #286 MOTION to Exceed Deposition Limit Plaintiffs' Unopposed, In Part, Motion to Exceed Deposition Limit and Incorporated Memorandum of Law filed by Michael A. Molfetta, Molfetta Law, LLC. Replies due by 4/15/2022. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Cavallo, Christopher)
April 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 315 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Comply with Deadline in Discovery Order Plaintiffs' Unopposed Expedited Motion for Extension of Time to Comply With Deadline in Discovery Order re #284 Order by Bluegreen Vacations Corporation, Bluegreen Vacations Unlimited, Inc.. Responses due by 4/22/2022 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Leger, Christian)
April 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 314 PAPERLESS ORDER Setting Hearing on #297 Corrected MOTION for Sanctions for 4/25/2022 at 10:30 AM in Miami Division before Magistrate Judge Alicia M. Otazo-Reyes. The hearing will be conducted by Zoom Conference. Conference instructions will be provided to counsel via e-mail. Counsel shall disseminate the Zoom Conference instructions to their clients and/or witnesses they intend to call to testify at the hearing. A witness and exhibit list shall be filed prior to the evidentiary hearing. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alicia M. Otazo-Reyes on 4/7/2022. (kvz)
April 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 313 PAPERLESS ORDER REFERRING #297 Corrected MOTION for Sanctions Corrected Amended Motion by Defendants Molfetta Law, LLC and Michael A. Molfetta for Sanctions Against Plaintiffs Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 11 filed by Molfetta Law, LLC, Michael A. Molfetta. Motions referred to Judge Alicia M. Otazo-Reyes. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom (ak03)
April 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 312 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #311 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply in Support of Corrected Amended Motion for Sanctions. Molfetta shall file its Reply by 4/14/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alicia M. Otazo-Reyes on 4/6/2022. (kvz)
April 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 311 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #297 Corrected MOTION for Sanctions Corrected Amended Motion by Defendants Molfetta Law, LLC and Michael A. Molfetta for Sanctions Against Plaintiffs Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 11 Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply in Support by Michael A. Molfetta, Molfetta Law, LLC. (Cavallo, Christopher)
April 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 309 AMENDED PAPERLESS ORDER granting #304 Plaintiffs' Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal. Plaintiffs may file under seal a Composite Exhibit to their Response to Molfetta Defendants' Amended Corrected Motion for Sanctions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alicia M. Otazo-Reyes on 4/5/2022. (kvz)
April 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 308 STIPULATED FINAL PERMANENT INJUNCTION ORDER AS TO DEFENDANT HAROLD O. MILLER, ESQ. granting #305 Motion for Permanent Injunction. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 4/5/2022. See attached document for full details. (pcs)
April 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 307 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #304 Motion for Leave to File. Clerks Notice: Filer must separately re-file the amended pleading pursuant to Local Rule 15.1, unless otherwise ordered by the Judge. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alicia M. Otazo-Reyes on 4/5/2022. (kvz)
April 5, 2022 Opinion or Order SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 310 [misc] restricted/sealed until further notice. (903304)
April 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 306 RESPONSE in Opposition re #297 Corrected MOTION for Sanctions Corrected Amended Motion by Defendants Molfetta Law, LLC and Michael A. Molfetta for Sanctions Against Plaintiffs Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 11 Plaintiffs' Response in Opposition to Molfetta Defendants' Rule 11 Motion for Sanctions and Incorporated Memorandum of Law filed by Bluegreen Vacations Corporation, Bluegreen Vacations Unlimited, Inc.. Replies due by 4/11/2022. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K)(Rubin, Glennys)
April 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 305 Joint MOTION for Permanent Injunction Joint Motion for Entry of Stipulated Final Permanent Injunction Order as to Defendant Harold O. Miller, Esq. and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by Bluegreen Vacations Corporation, Bluegreen Vacations Unlimited, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Rubin, Glennys)
April 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 304 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Under Seal a Composite Exhibit to Plaintiffs' Response to Molfetta Defendants Amended Corrected Motion for Sanctions Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 11 by Bluegreen Vacations Corporation, Bluegreen Vacations Unlimited, Inc.. (Leger, Christian)
April 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 303 REPLY to Response to Motion re #277 Plaintiff's MOTION to Strike #273 Answer to Amended Complaint Plaintiffs' Motion to Strike Certain Defendants Molfetta Law, LLC and Michael A. Molfetta's Affirmative Defenses and Treat Others as Denials, and Incorporated Memorand Plaintiffs' Reply in Support of Their Motion to Strike Certain of Defendants Molfetta Law, LLC and Michael A. Molfetta's Affirmative Defenses and Treat Others as Denials and Incorporated Memorandum of Law filed by Bluegreen Vacations Corporation, Bluegreen Vacations Unlimited, Inc.. (Rubin, Glennys)
April 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 302 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #301 Motion for Extension of Time. Plaintiffs shall comply with the deadlines set forth in the Court's March 18, 2022 Order #284 by April 6, 2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alicia M. Otazo-Reyes on 4/1/2022. (kvz)
March 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 301 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Comply with Deadlines in Court's Discovery Order re #284 Order by Bluegreen Vacations Corporation, Bluegreen Vacations Unlimited, Inc.. Responses due by 4/14/2022 (Leger, Christian)
March 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 300 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #299 Motion for Clarification. Plaintiffs SHALL RESPOND to #297 Corrected Motion for Sanctions by 4/4/22. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alicia M. Otazo-Reyes on 3/31/2022. (kvz)
March 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 299 MOTION for clarification #297 Corrected MOTION for Sanctions Corrected Amended Motion by Defendants Molfetta Law, LLC and Michael A. Molfetta for Sanctions Against Plaintiffs Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 11 Plaintiffs' EXPEDITED Motion For Clarification Or, In The Alternative, Unopposed Motion for Brief Extension of Time to File Response to Molfetta Defendant's Motion for Sanctions by Bluegreen Vacations Corporation, Bluegreen Vacations Unlimited, Inc.. Responses due by 4/14/2022 (Rubin, Glennys)
March 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 298 PAPERLESS ORDER denying as moot #275 Motion for Sanctions. See Corrected Motion at ECF No. #297 . Signed by Judge Beth Bloom (BB)
March 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 297 Corrected MOTION for Sanctions Corrected Amended Motion by Defendants Molfetta Law, LLC and Michael A. Molfetta for Sanctions Against Plaintiffs Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 11 by Michael A. Molfetta, Molfetta Law, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N)(Etra, Jonathan)
March 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 296 PAPERLESS ORDER denying #291 Plaintiffs' MOTION to Strike, subject to the following requirement: Defendants shall refile their #275 Amended MOTION for Sanctions instanter in compliance with the 20 page limitation, as proposed in Paragraph 3 of their #295 RESPONSE in Opposition. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alicia M. Otazo-Reyes on 3/30/2022. (aa00)
March 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 295 RESPONSE in Opposition re #291 MOTION to Strike #275 Amended MOTION for Sanctions Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 11 Plaintiffs' EXPEDITED Motion to Strike Molfetta Defendants' Amended Motion for Sanctions for Exceeding Page Limit in Local Rule 7.1(c)(2) and Inco filed by Michael A. Molfetta, Molfetta Law, LLC. Replies due by 4/6/2022. (Etra, Jonathan)
March 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 294 ORDER re #285 Notice of Hearing. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alicia M. Otazo-Reyes on 3/30/2022. See attached document for full details. (kvz)
March 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 293 PAPERLESS Minute Entry for telephonic proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Alicia M. Otazo-Reyes: Discovery Hearing held on 3/30/2022. Total time in court: 1 hour(s) : 11 minutes. Attorney Appearance(s): Benjamin Travis Brown and Christian Michael Leger appeared on behalf of Plaintiffs. Jonathan Etra and Christopher Cole Cavallo appeared on behalf of the Molfetta Defendants. Order to follow. (Digital ATT Recording AOR_01_330-2022 - DAR Back-Up 13:28:52 - 14:38:13) (sl) Modified on 3/30/2022 (sl).
March 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 292 PAPERLESS ORDER REQUIRING EXPEDITED RESPONSE to #291 MOTION to Strike by close of business on 3/30/22. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alicia M. Otazo-Reyes on 3/30/2022. (kvz)
March 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 291 MOTION to Strike #275 Amended MOTION for Sanctions Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 11 Plaintiffs' EXPEDITED Motion to Strike Molfetta Defendants' Amended Motion for Sanctions for Exceeding Page Limit in Local Rule 7.1(c)(2) and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by Bluegreen Vacations Corporation, Bluegreen Vacations Unlimited, Inc.. Responses due by 4/13/2022 (Leger, Christian)
March 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 290 PAPERLESS ORDER Setting Telephonic Hearing on #286 MOTION to Exceed Deposition Limit for 4/11/2022 at 3:00 PM in Miami Division before Magistrate Judge Alicia M. Otazo-Reyes. The dial-in instructions for the telephonic hearing are as follows: The parties shall call the conference number 1-888-684-8852 at the appointed time, then enter access code 4791317 and security code 0411. Please dial in at least ten minutes before the hearing begins and wait until your case is called. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alicia M. Otazo-Reyes on 3/29/2022. (kvz)
March 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 289 CLERK'S NOTICE re #285 Notice of Hearing. The dial-in instructions for the telephonic discovery hearing set for 3/30/2022 at 1:30 PM are as follows: The parties shall call the conference number 1-888-684-8852 at the appointed time, then enter access code 4791317 and security code 0330. Please dial in at least ten minutes before the hearing begins and wait until your case is called. (kvz)
March 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 288 ORDER REFERRING #286 MOTION TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE FOR DISPOSITION. Motions referred to Judge Alicia M. Otazo-Reyes. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 3/28/2022. See attached document for full details. (lbc)
March 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 287 RESPONSE in Opposition re #277 Plaintiff's MOTION to Strike #273 Answer to Amended Complaint Plaintiffs' Motion to Strike Certain Defendants Molfetta Law, LLC and Michael A. Molfetta's Affirmative Defenses and Treat Others as Denials, and Incorporated Memorand filed by Michael A. Molfetta, Molfetta Law, LLC. Replies due by 4/1/2022. (Cavallo, Christopher)
March 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 286 MOTION to Exceed Deposition Limit Plaintiffs' Unopposed, In Part, Motion to Exceed Deposition Limit and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by Bluegreen Vacations Corporation, Bluegreen Vacations Unlimited, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Leger, Christian)
March 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 285 NOTICE of Hearing by ATTORNEY: Discovery Hearing set for 3/30/2022 01:30 PM in Miami Division before Magistrate Judge Alicia M. Otazo-Reyes. (Cavallo, Christopher)
March 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 284 ORDER re #278 Notice of Hearing. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alicia M. Otazo-Reyes on 3/18/2022. See attached document for full details. (kvz)
March 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 283 PAPERLESS Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Alicia M. Otazo-Reyes: Discovery Hearing held on 3/18/2022. Order to follow. TRANSCRIPT OF THESE PROCEEDINGS SEALED. Total time in court: 2 hour(s) : 15 minutes. Attorney Appearance(s): Benjamin Travis Brown, Christian Michael Leger, Jonathan Etra, Christopher Cole Cavallo, (Digital 15:06:35) (OTAZO-REYES 01 03-18-22 SEALED ZOOM) (br) Modified on 3/21/2022 (br).
March 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 282 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #281 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response by March 31, 2022. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom (BB)
March 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 281 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #275 Amended MOTION for Sanctions Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 11 Plaintiffs' Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to Molfetta Defendants' Motion for Rule 11 Sanctions by Bluegreen Vacations Corporation, Bluegreen Vacations Unlimited, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Leger, Christian)
March 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 280 AMENDED CLERK'S NOTICE re #278 Notice of Hearing. The discovery hearing set for 3/18/22 at 3:00 PM will be conducted by Zoom Video Conference. Conference instructions will be provided to counsel via e-mail. (kvz)
March 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 279 CLERK'S NOTICE re #278 Notice of Hearing. The dial-in instructions for the telephonic discovery hearing set for 3/18/2022 at 3:00 PM are as follows: The parties shall call the conference number 1-888-684-8852 at the appointed time, then enter access code 4791317 and security code 0318. Please dial in at least ten minutes before the hearing begins and wait until your case is called. (kvz)
March 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 278 NOTICE of Hearing by ATTORNEY: Discovery Hearing set for 3/18/2022 03:00 PM in Miami Division before Magistrate Judge Alicia M. Otazo-Reyes. (Cavallo, Christopher)
March 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 277 Plaintiff's MOTION to Strike #273 Answer to Amended Complaint Plaintiffs' Motion to Strike Certain Defendants Molfetta Law, LLC and Michael A. Molfetta's Affirmative Defenses and Treat Others as Denials, and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by Bluegreen Vacations Corporation, Bluegreen Vacations Unlimited, Inc.. Responses due by 3/25/2022 (Rubin, Glennys)
March 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 276 PAPERLESS ORDER REFERRING #275 Amended Motion for Sanctions to Magistrate Judge Alicia M. Otazo-Reyes. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 3/8/2022. (jd01)
March 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 275 Amended MOTION for Sanctions Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 11 by Michael A. Molfetta, Molfetta Law, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N)(Etra, Jonathan)
February 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 274 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #272 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Omar Mustafa Saleh representing Molfetta Law, LLC (Defendant) is permitted to withdraw from case. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom (BB)
February 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 273 ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Amended Complaint with Jury Demand by Michael A. Molfetta, Molfetta Law, LLC. (Cavallo, Christopher)
February 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 272 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Omar M. Saleh for / by Michael A. Molfetta. Responses due by 3/4/2022 (Saleh, Omar)
February 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 271 FIRST Clerk's Notice of Undeliverable Mail re #262 Order on Appeal/Objection of Magistrate Judge Order to District Court. US Mail returned for: Jordan Salkin. The Court has not located an updated address for this party. After two undeliverable notices from the Court, notices will no longer be sent to this party in this case until a correct address is provided. (pgz)
February 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 270 First AMENDED COMPLAINT First Amended Complaint for Damages and Injunctive Relief against All Defendants filed in response to Order Granting Motion for Leave, filed by Bluegreen Vacations Corporation, Bluegreen Vacations Unlimited, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5)(Christu, Eric)
February 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 269 PAPERLESS ORDER denying as moot #265 Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Answer and Affirmative Defenses. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 2/4/2022. (jd01)
February 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 268 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #267 Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint. Per Local Rule 15.1, Plaintiff must separately re-file the amended pleading. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 2/4/2022. (jd01)
February 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 267 MOTION for Leave to File Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File First Amended Complaint and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by Bluegreen Vacations Corporation, Bluegreen Vacations Unlimited, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Rubin, Glennys)
January 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 266 ORDER granting #179 Plaintiffs' MOTION for Sanctions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alicia M. Otazo-Reyes on 1/31/2022. See attached document for full details. (kvz)
January 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 265 MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Answer and Affirmative Defenses by Michael A. Molfetta, Molfetta Law, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Proposed Second Amended Answer and Affirmative Defenses), #2 Exhibit B (Redline))(Cavallo, Christopher)
January 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 264 ORDER re #204 Statement of Reasonable Fees and Costs. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alicia M. Otazo-Reyes on 1/25/2022. See attached document for full details. (kvz)
January 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 263 TRANSCRIPT of Motion Hearing held on 12/7/2021 before Magistrate Judge Alicia M. Otazo-Reyes, 1-54 pages, Court Reporter: Joanne Mancari, 305-523-5635. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased by contacting the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 2/8/2022. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/18/2022. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/18/2022. (apz)
January 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 262 ORDER ON OBJECTIONS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE'S ORDER overruling #199 Appeal/Objection of Magistrate Judge Order to District Court. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 1/15/2022. See attached document for full details. (pcs)
January 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 261 NOTICE by Michael A. Molfetta, Molfetta Law, LLC re 256 Order,, Joint Submission by Plaintiffs and Molfetta Defendants on Status of Objection [DE 199] (Cavallo, Christopher)
January 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 260 NOTICE by Michael A. Molfetta, Molfetta Law, LLC re #199 OBJECTION of Magistrate Judge #84 Order, #194 Order, to District Court Notice of Filing Corrected Exhibits B-E (Attachments: #1 Exhibit B - Corrected, #2 Exhibit C - Corrected, #3 Exhibit D - Corrected, #4 Exhibit E - Corrected) (Cavallo, Christopher)
January 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 259 FIRST Clerk's Notice of Undeliverable Mail re 246 Order to Show Cause,,. US Mail returned for: Jordan Salkin. The Court has not located an updated address for this party. After two undeliverable notices from the Court, notices will no longer be sent to this party in this case until a correct address is provided. (pgz)
January 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 258 NOTICE by Bluegreen Vacations Corporation, Bluegreen Vacations Unlimited, Inc. re #253 Order Plaintiffs' Notice of Joint Liability of Defendants Systema Marketing, Inc. and Shayna G. Schroeder (Leger, Christian)
January 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 257 SECOND Clerk's Notice of Undeliverable Mail re 245 Clerk's Notice of Undeliverable Mail, 246 Order to Show Cause,,. US Mail returned for: Freedom Consumer Services, LLC. The Court has not located an updated address for this party. After two undeliverable notices from the Court, notices will no longer be sent to this party in this case until a correct address is provided. (pgz)
January 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 256 AMENDED PAPERLESS ORDER. THIS CAUSE is before the Court upon a sua sponte review of the record. Following the #199 objections to Magistrate Judge Otazo-Reyes's October 6, 2021 #194 discovery order and #163 ESI order, the parties have agreed to several modifications of the ESI order, which appear to moot the objections. See ECF Nos. #227 , #242 . No later than January 7, 2022, the parties shall file a joint notice advising what objections remain live. If none do, then the Court will deny the objections as moot. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 1/4/2022. (jd01)
January 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 255 PAPERLESS ORDER. THIS CAUSE is before the Court upon a sua sponte review of the record. Following the #199 objections to Magistrate Judge Otazo-Reyes's October 6, 2021 #194 discovery order and #163 ESI order, the parties have agreed to several modifications of the ESI order, which appear to moot the objections. See ECF Nos. #227 , #242 . No later than January 7, 2021, the parties shall file a joint notice advising what objections remain live. If none do, then the Court will deny the objections as moot. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 1/4/2022. (jd01)
December 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 254 ORDER Scheduling Mediation before Gary S. Salzman Mediation Hearing set for 7/28/2022 10:00 AM Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 12/27/2021. See attached document for full details. (pcs)
December 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 253 ORDER ON DEFAULT JUDGMENT PROCEDURE (Motion for Default Final Judgment or Notice of Joint Liability due 1/6/2022). Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 12/23/2021. See attached document for full details. (pcs)
December 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 252 Clerks Entry of Default as to Systema Marketing, Inc., Shayna G. Schroeder per Order Directing Clerk to Enter Default. Signed by DEPUTY CLERK on 12/23/2021. (kpe)
December 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 251 ORDER Directing Entry of Clerk's Default as to Shayna G. Schroeder, Systema Marketing, Inc. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 12/22/2021. See attached document for full details. (kpe)
December 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 250 NOTICE by Bluegreen Vacations Corporation, Bluegreen Vacations Unlimited, Inc. re 249 Order on Motion for Extension of Time Joint Notice of Scheduling Mediation (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Leger, Christian)
December 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 249 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #248 Motion for Extension of Time. On or before December 22, 2021, the parties shall file a joint notice scheduling mediation. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom (jd01)
December 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 248 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Joint Notice Scheduling Mediation Plaintiffs' Consent and Unopposed, In Part, Motion For Extension of Time To File Joint Notice Scheduling Mediation and Incorporated Memorandum of Law re #224 Order on Motion for Extension of Time by Bluegreen Vacations Corporation, Bluegreen Vacations Unlimited, Inc.. Responses due by 12/30/2021 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Rubin, Glennys)
December 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 247 ORDER denying in part #206 MOTION to Overrule Molfetta Defendants' Privilege Objections. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alicia M. Otazo-Reyes on 12/15/2021. See attached document for full details. (kvz)
December 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 246 PAPERLESS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. The Court ordered Defendant Shayna G. Schroeder to either retain counsel or notify the Court of her intention to proceed pro se by December 6, 2021. ECF No. #232 . The Court also ordered Defendant Systema Marketing, Inc. to retain counsel by the same date. ECF No. #232 . To date, Defendants have not complied. No later than December 21, 2021, Defendants shall comply with the Court's order. Failure by Defendants to comply will result in the entry of default without further warning. Show Cause Response due by 12/21/2021. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom (jd01)
December 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 245 FIRST Clerk's Notice of Undeliverable Mail re #227 Order. US Mail returned for: Freedom Consumer Services, LLC. The Court has not located an updated address for this party. After two undeliverable notices from the Court, notices will no longer be sent to this party in this case until a correct address is provided. (pgz)
December 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 244 PAPERLESS Minute Order for Zoom proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Alicia M. Otazo-Reyes: Motion Hearing held on 12/7/2021 re #206 MOTION to Overrule Molfetta Defendants' Privilege Objections and, Alternatively, For In Camera Review of Documents so as to Make Such a Determination Plaintiffs' Motion to Overrule Molfetta Defendants' Privilege Objections and, Alt filed by Bluegreen Vacations Unlimited, Inc., Bluegreen Vacations Corporation. Total time in court: 1 hour(s) : 22 minutes. Attorney Appearance(s): Eric Christu and Christian Michael Leger appeared on behalf of Plaintiffs. Christopher Cole Cavallo appeared on behalf of the Molfetta Defendants. Defendants to submit, for in camera review, a sample of documents in their privilege log by Friday, December 10, 2021. (Zoom Recording AOR_01_12-07-2021 - DAR back-up 10:29:44 - 11:50:36) (sl)
December 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 243 ORDER granting #242 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alicia M. Otazo-Reyes on 12/6/2021. See attached document for full details. (kvz)
December 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 242 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Phase I Review re #227 Order by Michael A. Molfetta, Molfetta Law, LLC. Responses due by 12/20/2021 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cavallo, Christopher)
December 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 241 ORDER denying #237 Defendant's MOTION. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alicia M. Otazo-Reyes on 12/3/2021. See attached document for full details. (kvz)
December 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 240 RESPONSE in Support re #237 Defendant's MOTION for Leave to File SUPPLEMENT THE RECORD ON THE EXISTENCE OF THE ATTORNEY-CLIENT RELATIONSHIP OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, FOR LEAVE TO FILE SURREPLY, AND FOR CONTINUATION OF THE HEARING filed by Michael A. Molfetta, Molfetta Law, LLC. (Etra, Jonathan)
December 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 239 RESPONSE in Opposition re #237 Defendant's MOTION for Leave to File SUPPLEMENT THE RECORD ON THE EXISTENCE OF THE ATTORNEY-CLIENT RELATIONSHIP OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, FOR LEAVE TO FILE SURREPLY, AND FOR CONTINUATION OF THE HEARING filed by Bluegreen Vacations Corporation, Bluegreen Vacations Unlimited, Inc.. Attorney Christian Michael Leger added to party Bluegreen Vacations Corporation(pty:cd), Attorney Christian Michael Leger added to party Bluegreen Vacations Corporation(pty:cd), Attorney Christian Michael Leger added to party Bluegreen Vacations Corporation(pty:cd), Attorney Christian Michael Leger added to party Bluegreen Vacations Unlimited, Inc.(pty:cd), Attorney Christian Michael Leger added to party Bluegreen Vacations Unlimited, Inc.(pty:cd), Attorney Christian Michael Leger added to party Bluegreen Vacations Unlimited, Inc.(pty:cd). Replies due by 12/8/2021. (Leger, Christian)
December 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 238 NOTICE by Michael A. Molfetta, Molfetta Law, LLC re #237 Defendant's MOTION for Leave to File SUPPLEMENT THE RECORD ON THE EXISTENCE OF THE ATTORNEY-CLIENT RELATIONSHIP OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, FOR LEAVE TO FILE SURREPLY, AND FOR CONTINUATION OF THE HEARING NOTICE OF RESOLUTION OF SCHEDULING CONFLICT REGARDING MOLFETTAS MOTION FOR LEAVE TO SUPPLEMENT THE RECORD AND FOR OTHER RELIEF (Etra, Jonathan)
November 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 237 Defendant's MOTION for Leave to File SUPPLEMENT THE RECORD ON THE EXISTENCE OF THE ATTORNEY-CLIENT RELATIONSHIP OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, FOR LEAVE TO FILE SURREPLY, AND FOR CONTINUATION OF THE HEARING by Michael A. Molfetta, Molfetta Law, LLC. (Etra, Jonathan)
November 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 236 PAPERLESS ORDER Setting Hearing on #206 MOTION to Overrule Molfetta Defendants' Privilege Objections for 12/7/2021 at 10:30 AM in Miami Division before Magistrate Judge Alicia M. Otazo-Reyes. The hearing will be conducted by Zoom Conference. Conference instructions will be provided to counsel via e-mail. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alicia M. Otazo-Reyes on 11/29/2021. (kvz)
November 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 235 ORDER ON MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE EARLY MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT denying #212 Motion for Leave to File an Early Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 11/24/2021. See attached document for full details. (pcs)
November 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 234 REPLY to Response to Motion re #206 MOTION to Overrule Molfetta Defendants' Privilege Objections and, Alternatively, For In Camera Review of Documents so as to Make Such a Determination Plaintiffs' Motion to Overrule Molfetta Defendants' Privilege Objections and, Alt Plaintiffs' Reply Memorandum in Support of Motion to Overrule Molfetta Defendants' Privilege Objections and, Alternatively, for In Camera Review of Documents filed by Bluegreen Vacations Corporation, Bluegreen Vacations Unlimited, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Leger, Christian)
November 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 233 REPLY to Response to Motion re #212 MOTION for Leave to File Early Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Michael A. Molfetta, Molfetta Law, LLC. (Cavallo, Christopher)
November 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 232 ORDER ON MOTION TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL FOR DEFENDANTS SYSTEMA MARKETING, INC. AND SHAYNA G. SCHROEDER granting #210 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Shannon L. Zetrouer representing Systema Marketing, Inc. (Defendant) and Schroeder, Shayna G. (Defendant) withdrawn from case. Deadline to obtain new counsel 12/6/2021. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 11/19/2021. See attached document for full details. (pcs)
November 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 231 RESPONSE in Opposition re #212 MOTION for Leave to File Early Motion for Summary Judgment Plaintiffs' Response in Opposition to Motion by Defendants Molfetta Law and Michael A. Molfetta For Leave to File Early Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Bluegreen Vacations Corporation, Bluegreen Vacations Unlimited, Inc.. Replies due by 11/29/2021. (Rubin, Glennys)
November 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 230 RESPONSE in Opposition re #206 MOTION to Overrule Molfetta Defendants' Privilege Objections and, Alternatively, For In Camera Review of Documents so as to Make Such a Determination Plaintiffs' Motion to Overrule Molfetta Defendants' Privilege Objections and, Alt (re-filed per Clerk's Notice D.E. 228) filed by Michael A. Molfetta, Molfetta Law, LLC. Replies due by 11/24/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H)(Etra, Jonathan)
November 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 229 NOTICE of Striking #225 Response in Opposition to Motion,, filed by Molfetta Law, LLC, Michael A. Molfetta pursuant to Clerk's Notice of Corrective Action by Michael A. Molfetta, Molfetta Law, LLC (Cavallo, Christopher)
November 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 228 Clerks Notice to Filer re #225 Response in Opposition to Motion,,. Login/Signature Block Violation; CORRECTIVE ACTION REQUIRED - The name of attorney e-filing this document via their CM/ECF login does not match the name of attorney on the signature block of the document. The name used for login must match the typed name on signature block of the document. This filing is a violation of Section 3J(1) of CM/ECF Admin Procedures and Local Rule 5.1(b). Filer must File a Notice of Striking, then refile document pursuant to CM/ECF Admin Procedures and Local Rules. (jas)
November 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 227 Order Setting Forth New Timelines For Phase I Search Pursuant to the ESI Sanctions Order #163 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Alicia M. Otazo-Reyes on 11/17/2021. See attached document for full details. (kvz)
November 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 226 TRANSCRIPT of Discovery Hearing held on 11/4/21 before Magistrate Judge Alicia M. Otazo-Reyes, 1-50 pages, Court Reporter: Joanne Mancari, 305-523-5635. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased by contacting the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 12/7/2021. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/17/2021. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/14/2022. (hh)
November 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 225 RESPONSE in Opposition re #206 MOTION to Overrule Molfetta Defendants' Privilege Objections and, Alternatively, For In Camera Review of Documents so as to Make Such a Determination Plaintiffs' Motion to Overrule Molfetta Defendants' Privilege Objections and, Alt filed by Michael A. Molfetta, Molfetta Law, LLC. Replies due by 11/23/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H)(Cavallo, Christopher)
November 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 224 ORDER ON UNOPPOSED MOTION TO EXTEND DEADLINE FOR MEDIATION REPORT. Miscellaneous Deadline 12/16/2021. Responses due by 11/19/2021 Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 11/16/2021. See attached document for full details. (lbc)
November 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 223 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Christian Michael Leger on behalf of Bluegreen Vacations Corporation, Bluegreen Vacations Unlimited, Inc.. Attorney Christian Michael Leger added to party Bluegreen Vacations Corporation(pty:pla), Attorney Christian Michael Leger added to party Bluegreen Vacations Unlimited, Inc.(pty:pla). (Leger, Christian)
November 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 222 PAPERLESS ORDER denying #218 Motion for Leave to File Sur-reply. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 11/16/2021. (jd01)
November 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 221 MOTION for Extension of Time to Extend Deadline for Mediation Report Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion to Extend Deadline for Mediation Report and Memorandum of Law re #106 Scheduling Order,,, by Bluegreen Vacations Corporation, Bluegreen Vacations Unlimited, Inc.. Responses due by 11/29/2021 (Rubin, Glennys)
November 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 220 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #217 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time. Defendants' response in opposition to #206 Plaintiffs' MOTION to Overrule is due by November 16, 2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alicia M. Otazo-Reyes on 11/15/2021. (kvz)
November 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 219 RESPONSE in Opposition re #210 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Shannon L. Zetrouer for / Plaintiffs' Response in Opposition to Withdraw as Counsel for Defendants Systema Marketing, Inc. and Shayna G. Schroeder filed by Bluegreen Vacations Corporation, Bluegreen Vacations Unlimited, Inc.. Replies due by 11/19/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Rubin, Glennys)
November 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 218 MOTION for Leave to File Plaintiffs' Motion to File Sur-Reply in Opposition to Objection of Magistrate Otazo-Reyes' October 7, 2021 Non-Dispositive Order and For Relief on Tax and Financial Information by Bluegreen Vacations Corporation, Bluegreen Vacations Unlimited, Inc.. (Rubin, Glennys)
November 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 217 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #206 MOTION to Overrule Molfetta Defendants' Privilege Objections and, Alternatively, For In Camera Review of Documents so as to Make Such a Determination Plaintiffs' Motion to Overrule Molfetta Defendants' Privilege Objections and, Alt by Michael A. Molfetta, Molfetta Law, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cavallo, Christopher)
November 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 216 REPLY to #204 Statement, Plaintiffs' Reply in Support of Plaintiffs' Statement of Reasonable Fees and Costs and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by Bluegreen Vacations Corporation, Bluegreen Vacations Unlimited, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Rubin, Glennys)
November 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 215 REPLY to #208 Response/Reply (Other), #199 OBJECTION of Magistrate Judge #84 Order, #194 Order, to District Court by Michael A. Molfetta, Molfetta Law, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Cavallo, Christopher)
November 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 214 PAPERLESS ORDER REQUIRING PLAINTIFFS' EXPEDITED RESPONSE. Plaintiffs shall file their response to ECF No. #210 , Motion to Withdraw as Counsel for Defendants Systema Marketing, Inc. and Shayna G. Schroeder, no later than November 12, 2021. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom (ak03)
November 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 213 ORDER re #205 NOTICE of Hearing and Continued Telephonic Discovery Hearing pursuant to #203 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Alicia M. Otazo-Reyes on 11/4/2021. See attached document for full details. (kvz)
November 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 212 MOTION for Leave to File Early Motion for Summary Judgment by Michael A. Molfetta, Molfetta Law, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)(Cavallo, Christopher)
November 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 211 PAPERLESS Minute Order for telephonic proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Alicia M. Otazo-Reyes: Discovery Hearing held on 11/4/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alicia M. Otazo-Reyes on 11/4/2021. Total time in court: 1 hour(s) : 16 minutes. Attorney Appearance(s): Eric Christu and Benjamin Travis Brown appeared on behalf of Plaintiffs. Jonathan Etra and Christopher Cole Cavallo appeared on behalf of Molfetta Defendants. Order to follow. (AT&T AOR_01_11-4-2021 (DAR Back-up 14:28:26 - 15:45:21)) (sl)
November 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 210 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Shannon L. Zetrouer for / by Shayna G. Schroeder, Systema Marketing, Inc.. Responses due by 11/18/2021 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Zetrouer, Shannon)
November 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 209 RESPONSE to #204 Statement, in Opposition by Michael A. Molfetta, Molfetta Law, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Cavallo, Christopher)
November 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 208 RESPONSE to #199 OBJECTION of Magistrate Judge #84 Order, #194 Order, to District Court Plaintiffs' Response in Opposition to Objection of Molfetta Law, LLC and Michael Molfetta to Magistrate Judge Otazo-Reyes' October 27, 2021 Non-Dispositive Order and For Relief on Tax and Financial Discovery by Bluegreen Vacations Corporation, Bluegreen Vacations Unlimited, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Christu, Eric)
November 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 207 TRANSCRIPT of Discovery Hearing (Via Zoom) held on 10/21/21 before Magistrate Judge Alicia M. Otazo-Reyes, 1-20 pages, Court Reporter: Bonnie J. Lewis, 305-523-5635. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased by contacting the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 11/24/2021. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/6/2021. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/1/2022. (hh)
October 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 206 MOTION to Overrule Molfetta Defendants' Privilege Objections and, Alternatively, For In Camera Review of Documents so as to Make Such a Determination Plaintiffs' Motion to Overrule Molfetta Defendants' Privilege Objections and, Alternatively, For In Camera Review of Documents so as to Make Such a Determination and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by Bluegreen Vacations Corporation, Bluegreen Vacations Unlimited, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Rubin, Glennys)
October 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 205 NOTICE of Hearing by ATTORNEY: Discovery Hearing set for 11/4/2021 02:30 PM in Miami Division before Magistrate Judge Alicia M. Otazo-Reyes. (Cavallo, Christopher)
October 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 204 Statement/Motion of: Reasonable Fees and Costs Awarded in Order Plaintiffs Statement of Reasonable Fees and Costs Awarded in Order at [ECF 163] by Bluegreen Vacations Corporation, Bluegreen Vacations Unlimited, Inc. re #163 Order (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Rubin, Glennys) Modified text/status per Chambers on 1/25/2022 (sk).
October 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 203 Order re #200 NOTICE of Hearing. A continued telephonic discovery hearing is SET for 11/4/2021 at 02:30 PM in Miami Division before Magistrate Judge Alicia M. Otazo-Reyes. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alicia M. Otazo-Reyes on 10/21/2021. See attached document for full details, including dial-in instructions. (kvz)
October 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 202 PAPERLESS Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Alicia M. Otazo-Reyes: Telephonic Discovery Hearing held on 10/21/2021. Total time in court: 30 minutes. Order to Follow. Attorney Appearance(s): Benjamin Travis Brown, Jonathan Etra, Christopher Cole Cavallo, (Digital 13:31:46) (yha)
October 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 201 CLERK'S NOTICE re #200 NOTICE of Hearing. The dial-in instructions for the telephonic discovery hearing set for 10/21/2021 at 1:30 PM are as follows: The parties shall call the conference number 1-888-684-8852 at the appointed time, then enter access code 4791317 and security code 1021. Please dial in at least ten minutes before the hearing begins and wait until your case is called. (kvz)
October 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 200 NOTICE of Hearing by ATTORNEY: Discovery Hearing set for 10/21/2021 01:30 PM in Miami Division before Magistrate Judge Alicia M. Otazo-Reyes. (Rubin, Glennys) Modified to correct Judge per chambers on 10/21/2021 (mf).
October 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Reset Hearing to correct Judge re: DE #200 Discovery Hearing set for 10/21/2021 01:30 PM in Miami Division before Magistrate Judge Alicia M. Otazo-Reyes. (mf)
October 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 199 OBJECTION of Magistrate Judge #84 Order, #194 Order, to District Court (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O, #16 Exhibit P, #17 Exhibit Q)(Cavallo, Christopher)
October 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 198 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re #179 Plaintiffs' MOTION for Sanctions. Show Cause Response due by 11/18/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alicia M. Otazo-Reyes on 10/19/2021. See attached document for full details. (kvz)
October 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 197 NOTICE by Bluegreen Vacations Corporation, Bluegreen Vacations Unlimited, Inc. re #179 Plaintiff's MOTION for Sanctions Plaintiffs' Motion for Rule 37 Sanctions and for an Order for Defendant Jordan Salkin to Show Cause why he should not be held in contempt of court and incorporated memorandum of law Plaintiffs' Notice of Filing Declaration of Service Attendant to Plaintiffs' Motion for Sanctions Against Jordan Salkin (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Rubin, Glennys)
October 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 196 TRANSCRIPT of Telephonic Discovery Hearing (Transcribed from the Audio Recording) held on October 6, 2021, before Magistrate Judge Alicia M. Otazo-Reyes, 1-31 pages, Court Reporter: Lisa Edwards, 305-439-7168 / reporterlisaedwards@gmail.com. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased by contacting the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 10/28/2021. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/8/2021. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/5/2022. (le)
October 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 195 PAPERLESS Minute Entry for telephonic proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Alicia M. Otazo-Reyes: Discovery Hearing held on 10/6/2021. Total time in court: 46 minutes. Attorney Appearance(s): Eric Christu and Benjamin Travis Brown appeared on behalf of Plaintiffs. Jonathan Etra and Christopher Cole Cavallo appeared on behalf of the Molfetta Defendants. Shannon L. Zetrouer appeared on behalf of Defendants Systema Marketing, Inc. and Shayna G. Schroeder. Order entered D.E. #194 . (ATT_AOR_10-06-2021_01) (sl) .
October 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 194 ORDER re #184 Notice of Hearing by Bluegreen Vacations Unlimited, Inc., Bluegreen Vacations Corporation, #186 Notice re Hearing by Attorney filed by Molfetta Law, LLC, Michael A. Molfetta. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alicia M. Otazo-Reyes on 10/6/2021. See attached document for full details. (kvz)
October 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 193 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #191 MOTION for Extension of Time to file Statement of Reasonable Fees and Costs. Plaintiffs' Statement of Reasonable Fees and Costs are due by October 27, 2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alicia M. Otazo-Reyes on 10/6/2021. (kvz)
October 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 192 ORDER granting #190 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time. See attached document for full details regarding amended deadlines. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alicia M. Otazo-Reyes on 10/6/2021. (kvz)
October 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 191 MOTION for Extension of Time to file Statement of Reasonable Fees and Costs Plaintiffs' Consent and Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Statement of Reasonable Fees and Costs and Incorporated Memorandum of Law re #163 Order by Bluegreen Vacations Corporation, Bluegreen Vacations Unlimited, Inc.. Responses due by 10/20/2021 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Rubin, Glennys)
October 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 190 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time Regarding Deadlines in Order Appointing Epiq Systems, Inc. re #182 Order on Motion for Extension of Time, #163 Order by Michael A. Molfetta, Molfetta Law, LLC. Responses due by 10/20/2021 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cavallo, Christopher)
October 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 189 TRANSCRIPT of Discovery Hearing (Via Zoom) held on 4/27/21 before Magistrate Judge Alicia M. Otazo-Reyes, 1-12 pages, Court Reporter: Bonnie J. Lewis, 305-523-5635. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased by contacting the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 10/25/2021. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/4/2021. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/3/2022. (hh)
October 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 188 ORDER CANCELING HEARING AND STAYING CASE AGAINST TTT DEFENDANTS denying as moot #164 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 10/4/2021. See attached document for full details. (pcs)
October 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 187 NOTICE by Bluegreen Vacations Corporation, Bluegreen Vacations Unlimited, Inc. Plaintiffs' Notice of Filing of Advisement of Bankruptcy (Christu, Eric)
October 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 186 NOTICE of Hearing by ATTORNEY: Discovery Hearing set for 10/6/2021 09:30 AM in Miami Division before Magistrate Judge Alicia M. Otazo-Reyes. (Cavallo, Christopher)
October 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 185 PAPERLESS Order Cancelling Discovery Hearing set for 10/4/2021 at 12:30 PM in light of #184 . See 180 CLERK'S NOTICE for dial-in instructions for the Discovery Hearing set for 10/6/2021 at 9:30 AM. The new security code is 1006. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alicia M. Otazo-Reyes on 10/1/2021. (kvz)
September 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 184 NOTICE of Hearing by ATTORNEY: Discovery Hearing set for 10/6/2021 09:30 AM in Miami Division before Magistrate Judge Alicia M. Otazo-Reyes. (Rubin, Glennys)
September 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 183 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jonathan Phillip Hart on behalf of Bluegreen Vacations Corporation, Bluegreen Vacations Unlimited, Inc.. Attorney Jonathan Phillip Hart added to party Bluegreen Vacations Corporation(pty:pla), Attorney Jonathan Phillip Hart added to party Bluegreen Vacations Unlimited, Inc.(pty:pla). (Hart, Jonathan)
September 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 182 ORDER granting #181 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time. Epiq shall complete its imaging of all electronic sources, as called for in #163 , by October 6, 2021. The remaining deadlines in #163 are also extended by 7 days. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alicia M. Otazo-Reyes on 9/29/2021. See attached document for full details. (kvz)
September 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 181 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time Regarding Deadlines in Order Appointing Epiq Systems, Inc. re #163 Order by Michael A. Molfetta, Molfetta Law, LLC. Responses due by 10/12/2021 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Cavallo, Christopher)
September 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 180 CLERK'S NOTICE re #178 NOTICE of Hearing. The dial-in instructions for the telephonic discovery hearing set for 10/4/2021 at 12:30 PM are as follows: The parties shall call the conference number 1-888-684-8852 at the appointed time, then enter access code 4791317 and security code 1004. Please dial in at least ten minutes before the hearing begins and wait until your case is called. (kvz)
September 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 179 Plaintiff's MOTION for Sanctions Plaintiffs' Motion for Rule 37 Sanctions and for an Order for Defendant Jordan Salkin to Show Cause why he should not be held in contempt of court and incorporated memorandum of law by Bluegreen Vacations Corporation, Bluegreen Vacations Unlimited, Inc.. (Rubin, Glennys)
September 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 178 NOTICE of Hearing by ATTORNEY: Discovery Hearing set for 10/4/2021 12:30 PM in Miami Division before Magistrate Judge Alicia M. Otazo-Reyes. (Rubin, Glennys)
September 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Attorney Mishaal Kirit Patel representing Freedom Consumer Services, LLC (Defendant) and Salkin, Jordan (Defendant) terminated per DE #117 (mr1)
September 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 177 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #176 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Statement of Reasonable Fees and Costs. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alicia M. Otazo-Reyes on 9/16/2021. (kvz)
September 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 176 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Statement of Reasonable Fees and Costs and Incorporated Memorandum of Law Plaintiffs' Consent and Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Statement of Reasonable Fees and Costs and Incorporated Memorandum of Law re #163 Order by Bluegreen Vacations Corporation, Bluegreen Vacations Unlimited, Inc.. Responses due by 9/29/2021 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Rubin, Glennys)
September 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 175 REPLY to Response to Motion re #164 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction Against Defendants Timeshare Termination Team, LLC, Vindaloo Travel Network, LLC, Brian Wilbur and Holly Wilbur Enjoining Them From Dissipating Certain Assets, and Plaintiffs' Reply in Support of Motion for Preliminary Injunction Against Defendants Timeshare Termination Team, LLC, Vindaloo Travel Network, LLC, Brian Wilbur and Holly Wilbur Enjoining Them From Dissipating Certain Assets, and, in Connection Therewith, Freezing Such Assets filed by Bluegreen Vacations Corporation, Bluegreen Vacations Unlimited, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Rubin, Glennys)
September 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 174 PAPERLESS ORDER Setting Hearing on Motion #164 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction Against Defendants Timeshare Termination Team, LLC, Vindaloo Travel Network, LLC, Brian Wilbur and Holly Wilbur Enjoining Them From Dissipating Certain Assets. Motion Hearing set for 10/4/2021 at 09:30 AM via Zoom video conference before Judge Beth Bloom. The link to join is https://www.zoomgov.com/j/1611501980?pwd=ZytFeWZGWk1SMmNKOTZzcUZ5TGVoUT09. Alternatively, the Meeting ID is 161 150 1980, and the Passcode is 915195. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom (ak03)
September 8, 2021 Opinion or Order PAPERLESS Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings as to #164 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction Against Defendants Timeshare Termination Team, LLC, Vindaloo Travel Network, LLC, Brian Wilbur and Holly Wilbur Enjoining Them From Dissipating Certain Assets. **TIME CHANGE ONLY** Motion Hearing set for 10/4/2021 at 01:00 PM via Zoom video conference before Judge Beth Bloom. The link to join is https://www.zoomgov.com/j/1611501980?pwd=ZytFeWZGWk1SMmNKOTZzcUZ5TGVoUT09. Alternatively, the Meeting ID is 161 150 1980, and the Passcode is 915195. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom (ak03)
September 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 173 ORDER ON PLAINTIFFS' MOTIONS TO STRIKE DEFENDANTS BRIAN STEPHEN WILBUR AND HOLLY WILBURS AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES granting in part and denying in part #162 Motion to Strike #162 MOTION to Strike 141 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer, Plaintiffs' Motion to Strike Defendants Brian Stephen Wilbur and Holly Wilbur's Affirmative Defenses and Incorporated Memorandum of Law. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 9/7/2021. See attached document for full details. (pcs)
September 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 172 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Christopher Cole Cavallo on behalf of Michael A. Molfetta, Molfetta Law, LLC. Attorney Christopher Cole Cavallo added to party Michael A. Molfetta(pty:dft), Attorney Christopher Cole Cavallo added to party Molfetta Law, LLC(pty:dft). (Cavallo, Christopher)
September 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 171 Clerk's Notice of Filing Deficiency Re: #170 Response to Motion, filed by Brian Stephen Wilbur, Holly Wilbur. Document(s) missing required signature(s) (Fed.R.Civ.P. 11(a)). (pcs)
September 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 170 RESPONSE to Motion re #164 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction Against Defendants Timeshare Termination Team, LLC, Vindaloo Travel Network, LLC, Brian Wilbur and Holly Wilbur Enjoining Them From Dissipating Certain Assets, and filed by Brian Stephen Wilbur, Holly Wilbur. Replies due by 9/10/2021. (pcs)
September 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 169 NOTICE of Change of Address, Email or Law Firm Name by Jonathan Etra (Etra, Jonathan)
August 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 168 ORDER APPROVING STIPULATED CONFIDENTIALITY AGREEMENT. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alicia M. Otazo-Reyes on 8/30/2021. See attached document for full details. (apa)
August 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 167 MOTION For Approval of Stipulated Confidentiality Agreement re #163 Order Plaintiffs' Consent and Unopposed Motion for Approval of Stipulated Confidentiality Agreement by Bluegreen Vacations Corporation, Bluegreen Vacations Unlimited, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Christu, Eric)
August 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 166 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Mark Francis Raymond on behalf of Michael A. Molfetta, Molfetta Law, LLC. Attorney Mark Francis Raymond added to party Michael A. Molfetta(pty:dft), Attorney Mark Francis Raymond added to party Molfetta Law, LLC(pty:dft). (Raymond, Mark)
August 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 165 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jonathan Etra on behalf of Michael A. Molfetta, Molfetta Law, LLC. Attorney Jonathan Etra added to party Michael A. Molfetta(pty:dft), Attorney Jonathan Etra added to party Molfetta Law, LLC(pty:dft). (Etra, Jonathan)
August 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 164 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction Against Defendants Timeshare Termination Team, LLC, Vindaloo Travel Network, LLC, Brian Wilbur and Holly Wilbur Enjoining Them From Dissipating Certain Assets, and, in Connection Therewith, Freezing Such Assets and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by Bluegreen Vacations Corporation, Bluegreen Vacations Unlimited, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O, #16 Exhibit P, #17 Exhibit Q, #18 Exhibit R, #19 Exhibit S, #20 Exhibit T, #21 Exhibit U, #22 Exhibit V, #23 Exhibit W, #24 Exhibit X)(Christu, Eric)
August 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 163 ORDER re #142 NOTICE of Hearing. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alicia M. Otazo-Reyes on 8/25/2021. See attached document for full details. (apa)
August 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 162 MOTION to Strike 141 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer, Plaintiffs' Motion to Strike Defendants Brian Stephen Wilbur and Holly Wilbur's Affirmative Defenses and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by Bluegreen Vacations Corporation, Bluegreen Vacations Unlimited, Inc.. Responses due by 9/3/2021 (Rubin, Glennys)
August 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 161 CORRECTED Clerks Entry of Default as to Freedom Consumer Services LLC - Motions Terminated: #153 Motion for Clerks Entry of Default, Signed by DEPUTY CLERK on 8/16/2021. (ail)
August 16, 2021 Opinion or Order SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 160 [order] restricted/sealed until further notice. (ail)
August 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 159 ORDER OF INSTRUCTIONS TO PRO SE LITIGANT Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 8/13/2021. See attached document for full details. (cqs)
August 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 158 PAPERLESS ORDER denying Motion for Clerk's Entry of Default as to Defendant's Brian Wilbur and Holly Wilbur based upon the filing of the Notices, ECF Nos. #156 , #157 . Signed by Judge Beth Bloom (ak03)
August 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 157 NOTICE by Brian Stephen Wilbur Of representing himself Pro Se. (cqs)
August 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 156 NOTICE by Holly Wilbur Of Representing Herself Pro Se. (cqs)
August 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 155 ORDER granting #149 Motion to Strike #149 MOTION to Strike #123 Answer to Complaint,, Counterclaim, #114 Answer to Complaint,, Counterclaim, Plaintiffs' Motion to Strike Timeshare Termination Team, LLC's Amended Counterclaim and TTT Entities' Answer and Affirmative D. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 8/12/2021. See attached document for full details. (cqs)
August 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 154 Plaintiff's MOTION for Clerks Entry of Default Plaintiffs' Motion for Entry of Clerk's Default as to Defendant Brian Wilbur and Holly Wilbur and Incorporated Memorandum of Law as to Brian Stephen Wilbur, Holly Wilbur by Bluegreen Vacations Corporation, Bluegreen Vacations Unlimited, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Letters, #2 Exhibit B - Proof of Service)(Rubin, Glennys)
August 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 153 Plaintiff's MOTION for Clerks Entry of Default Plaintiffs' Motion for Entry of Clerk's Default as to Defendant Freedom Consumer Services, LLC and Incorporated Memorandum of Law as to Freedom Consumer Services, LLC by Bluegreen Vacations Corporation, Bluegreen Vacations Unlimited, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proof of Delivery)(Rubin, Glennys) Modified on 8/16/2021 (ail).
August 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 152 PAPERLESS Minute Entry for telephonic proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Alicia M. Otazo-Reyes: Discovery Hearing held on 8/9/2021. Total time in court: 24 minutes. Attorney Appearance(s): Benjamin Travis Brown and Eric Christu appeared on behalf of Plaintiffs. Omar Mustafa Saleh appeared on behalf of Defendant Michael Molfetta. Order to follow. (Digital 14:41:47 - 15:04:22) (sl)
August 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 151 PAPERLESS ORDER REQUIRING EXPEDITED RESPONSE to ECF No. #149 , Plaintiffs' Motion to Strike Amended Counterclaim and Answer and Affirmative Defenses. Timeshare Termination Team, LLC and Vindaloo Travel Network LLC d/b/a Timeshare Termination Team, LLC's ("TTT Entities") shall file their response to the Motion to Strike no later than August 11, 2021. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom (ak03)
August 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 150 CLERK'S NOTICE re #142 NOTICE of Hearing. The Discovery Hearing will be conducted telephonically. Ten minutes before the Hearing is scheduled to commence, counsel shall call the conference number 1-888-684-8852, enter access code 4791317 and security code 0809, and then wait for the case to be called. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alicia M. Otazo-Reyes on 8/6/2021. (apa)
August 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 149 MOTION to Strike #123 Answer to Complaint,, Counterclaim, #114 Answer to Complaint,, Counterclaim, Plaintiffs' Motion to Strike Timeshare Termination Team, LLC's Amended Counterclaim and TTT Entities' Answer and Affirmative Defenses and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by Bluegreen Vacations Corporation, Bluegreen Vacations Unlimited, Inc.. Responses due by 8/19/2021 (Rubin, Glennys)
August 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 148 ORDER ON DEFAULT PROCEDURES (Motion for Entry of Clerk's Default due 8/12/2021). Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 8/5/2021. See attached document for full details. (pcs)
August 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 147 ORDER ON MOTION TO DISMISS AMENDED COUNTERCLAIMS denying as moot #124 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 8/5/2021. See attached document for full details. (pcs)
August 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 146 Clerks Entry of Default as to Timeshare Termination Team, LLC, Vindaloo Travel Network, LLC - Motions Terminated: #145 Motion for Clerks Entry of Default per Order DE #126 Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney,. Signed by DEPUTY CLERK on 8/3/2021. (pcs)
August 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 145 Plaintiff's MOTION for Clerks Entry of Default as to Timeshare Termination Team, LLC, Vindaloo Travel Network, LLC by Bluegreen Vacations Corporation, Bluegreen Vacations Unlimited, Inc.. (Rubin, Glennys)
July 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 144 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #143 MOTION for Extension of Time. Plaintiffs shall file their Statement of Reasonable Fees and Costs attendant to the Notice of Discovery Hearing (Doc. 103) on or before the date two weeks after the discovery dispute with Michael A. Molfetta and Molfetta Law, LLC is resolved. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alicia M. Otazo-Reyes on 7/21/2021. (apa)
July 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 143 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Statement of Reasonable Fees and Costs Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Statement of Reasonable Fees and Costs and Incorporated Memorandum of Law re #119 Order, #142 Notice re Hearing by Attorney, 137 Order on Motion for Extension of Time by Bluegreen Vacations Corporation, Bluegreen Vacations Unlimited, Inc.. Responses due by 8/3/2021 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Rubin, Glennys)
July 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 142 NOTICE of Hearing by ATTORNEY: Discovery Hearing set for 8/9/2021 02:30 PM in Miami Division before Magistrate Judge Alicia M. Otazo-Reyes. (Rubin, Glennys)
July 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 141 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #140 Plaintiffs' Motion for Extension of Time to File Motion to Strike Unrepresented TTT Defendants' Amended Affirmative Defenses. Plaintiffs may file their motion to strike no later than one week after the TTT Defendants obtain new counsel, or the individual Defendants advise the Court of their intention to proceed pro se. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom (ak03)
July 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 140 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #123 Answer to Complaint,, Counterclaim, Plaintiffs' Motion for Extension of Time to File Motion to Strike Unrepresented TTT Defendants' Amended Affirmative Defenses and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by Bluegreen Vacations Corporation, Bluegreen Vacations Unlimited, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Rubin, Glennys)
July 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 139 SECOND Clerk's Notice of Undeliverable Mail re 122 Order on Motion for Extension of Time, 118 Discovery Hearing,, #117 Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney,. US Mail returned for: Jordan Salkin. The Court has not located an updated address for this party. After two undeliverable notices from the Court, notices will no longer be sent to this party in this case until a correct address is provided. (pgz)
July 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 138 FIRST Clerk's Notice of Undeliverable Mail re #119 Order. US Mail returned for: Jordan Salkin. The Court has not located an updated address for this party. After two undeliverable notices from the Court, notices will no longer be sent to this party in this case until a correct address is provided. (pgz)
July 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 137 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #136 Motion for Extension of Time to File Statement of Reasonable Fees and Costs by July 20, 2021. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom (BB)
July 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 136 MOTION for Extension of Time to file Statement of Reasonable Fees and Costs and Incorporated Memorandum of Law Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion For Extension of Time to File Statement of Reasonable Fees and Costs and Incorporated Memorandum of Law re 122 Order on Motion for Extension of Time, #119 Order by Bluegreen Vacations Corporation, Bluegreen Vacations Unlimited, Inc.. Responses due by 7/20/2021 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Rubin, Glennys)
July 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 135 ORDER ON EXPEDITED MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION OF THE COURTS ORDER ON PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 7/2/2021. See attached document for full details. (lbc)
July 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 134 RESPONSE in Opposition re #133 EXPEDITED MOTION For Reconsideration of the Court's Order on Plaintiffs' Motion for Reconsideration re #129 Order on Motion for Reconsideration, Plaintiffs' Memorandum of Law in Opposition to TTT Defendants' Motion for Reconsideration filed by Bluegreen Vacations Corporation, Bluegreen Vacations Unlimited, Inc.. Replies due by 7/9/2021. (Quinn, Michael)
July 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 133 EXPEDITED MOTION For Reconsideration of the Court's Order on Plaintiffs' Motion for Reconsideration re #129 Order on Motion for Reconsideration, by Hogan Lovells US LLP. Attorney Mark Richard Cheskin added to party Hogan Lovells US LLP(pty:mov). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Text of Proposed Order)(Cheskin, Mark)
July 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 132 TRANSCRIPT of Discovery Hearing held on 6/15/2021 before Magistrate Judge Alicia M. Otazo-Reyes, 1-86 pages, Court Reporter: Bonnie Joy Lewis, 954-985-8875. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased by contacting the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 7/23/2021. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/2/2021. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/30/2021. (apz)
July 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 131 PAPERLESS ORDER granting in part and denying in part #130 Motion for Extension of Time to Comply with Court Order. The Defendants must comply with the Court's Order regarding discovery by July 5, 2021. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom (BB)
June 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 130 Defendant's MOTION for Extension of Time comply with Court order D.E. 119 re #119 Order by Michael A. Molfetta, Molfetta Law, LLC. Responses due by 7/14/2021 (Saleh, Omar)
June 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 129 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #128 MOTION for Reconsideration re #126 Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney Plaintiffs' Motion for Reconsideration of Order on Motion to Withdraw as Counsel for the TTT Defendants Due to Potential Destruction of Evidence and Incorp filed by Bluegreen Vacations Unlimited, Inc., Bluegreen Vacations Corporation. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom See attached document for full details. (ak03)
June 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Attorney Mark Richard Cheskin representing Timeshare Termination Team, LLC (Defendant) and Vindaloo Travel Network, LLC (Defendant) and Wilbur, Brian Stephen (Defendant); and Wilbur, Holly (Defendant); and Timeshare Termination Team, LLC (Counter Claimant); and Wilbur, Brian Stephen (Counter Claimant); and Wilbur, Holly (Counter Claimant); and Vindaloo Travel Network, LLC (Counter Claimant); and Wilbur, Brian Stephen (Counter Claimant); and Timeshare Termination Team, LLC (Counter Claimant); and Wilbur, Holly (Counter Claimant); and Vindaloo Travel Network, LLC (Counter Claimant); and Wilbur, Brian Stephen (Counter Claimant); and Timeshare Termination Team, LLC (Counter Claimant); and Wilbur, Holly (Counter Claimant); and Vindaloo Travel Network, LLC (Counter Claimant); ; Attorney Mishaal Kirit Patel representing Freedom Consumer Services, LLC (Defendant) and Salkin, Jordan (Defendant); ; Attorney Clayton James Schmitt representing Timeshare Termination Team, LLC (Defendant) and Vindaloo Travel Network, LLC (Defendant); and Wilbur, Brian Stephen (Defendant); and Wilbur, Holly (Defendant); and Timeshare Termination Team, LLC (Counter Claimant); and Wilbur, Brian Stephen (Counter Claimant); and Wilbur, Holly (Counter Claimant); and Vindaloo Travel Network, LLC (Counter Claimant); and Wilbur, Brian Stephen (Counter Claimant); and Timeshare Termination Team, LLC (Counter Claimant); and Wilbur, Holly (Counter Claimant); and Vindaloo Travel Network, LLC (Counter Claimant); and Wilbur, Brian Stephen (Counter Claimant); and Timeshare Termination Team, LLC (Counter Claimant); and Wilbur, Holly (Counter Claimant); and Vindaloo Travel Network, LLC (Counter Claimant); Activated. (ak03)
June 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 128 MOTION for Reconsideration re #126 Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney,,,,,,, Plaintiffs' Motion for Reconsideration of Order on Motion to Withdraw as Counsel for the TTT Defendants Due to Potential Destruction of Evidence and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by Bluegreen Vacations Corporation, Bluegreen Vacations Unlimited, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Quinn, Michael)
June 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 127 TRANSCRIPT of Motion hearing via the Zoom platform held on 6/9/2021 before Judge Beth Bloom, 1 - 42 pages, Court Reporter: Yvette Hernandez, 305-523-5698 / Yvette_Hernandez@flsd.uscourts.gov. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased by contacting the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 7/20/2021. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/30/2021. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/27/2021. (yhz)
June 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 126 ORDER ON MOTION TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL FOR THE TTT DEFENDANTS, granting #125 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Mark Richard Cheskin representing Timeshare Termination Team, LLC (Defendant) and Vindaloo Travel Network, LLC (Defendant) and Wilbur, Brian Stephen (Defendant); and Wilbur, Holly (Defendant); and Timeshare Termination Team, LLC (Counter Claimant); and Wilbur, Brian Stephen (Counter Claimant); and Wilbur, Holly (Counter Claimant); and Vindaloo Travel Network, LLC (Counter Claimant); and Wilbur, Brian Stephen (Counter Claimant); and Timeshare Termination Team, LLC (Counter Claimant); and Wilbur, Holly (Counter Claimant); and Vindaloo Travel Network, LLC (Counter Claimant); and Wilbur, Brian Stephen (Counter Claimant); and Timeshare Termination Team, LLC (Counter Claimant); and Wilbur, Holly (Counter Claimant); and Vindaloo Travel Network, LLC (Counter Claimant); ; Attorney Clayton James Schmitt representing Timeshare Termination Team, LLC (Defendant) and Vindaloo Travel Network, LLC (Defendant); and Wilbur, Brian Stephen (Defendant); and Wilbur, Holly (Defendant); and Timeshare Termination Team, LLC (Counter Claimant); and Wilbur, Brian Stephen (Counter Claimant); and Wilbur, Holly (Counter Claimant); and Vindaloo Travel Network, LLC (Counter Claimant); and Wilbur, Brian Stephen (Counter Claimant); and Timeshare Termination Team, LLC (Counter Claimant); and Wilbur, Holly (Counter Claimant); and Vindaloo Travel Network, LLC (Counter Claimant); and Wilbur, Brian Stephen (Counter Claimant); and Timeshare Termination Team, LLC (Counter Claimant); and Wilbur, Holly (Counter Claimant); and Vindaloo Travel Network, LLC (Counter Claimant); withdrawn from case. Deadline to obtain new counsel 7/29/2021. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 6/29/2021. See attached document for full details. (pcs)
June 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 125 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Mark R. Cheskin, Clayton J. Schmitt and Hogan Lovells US LLP for / by Timeshare Termination Team, LLC, Vindaloo Travel Network, LLC, Brian Stephen Wilbur, Holly Wilbur. Responses due by 7/13/2021 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cheskin, Mark)
June 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 124 MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice #114 Answer to Complaint,, Counterclaim, Plaintiffs/Counter-Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Defendants/Counter-Plaintiffs Timeshare Termination Team, LLC's Amended Counterclaims and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by Bluegreen Vacations Corporation(a Florida corporation), Bluegreen Vacations Unlimited, Inc.(a Florida corporation). Responses due by 7/12/2021 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Rubin, Glennys)
June 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 123 (STRICKEN PER DE#155) ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint with Jury Demand (Amended), Amended COUNTERCLAIM against Bluegreen Vacations Corporation, Bluegreen Vacations Unlimited, Inc. by Brian Stephen Wilbur, Timeshare Termination Team, LLC, Holly Wilbur, Vindaloo Travel Network, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Cheskin, Mark) Modified on 8/13/2021 (cqs).
June 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 122 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #121 MOTION for Extension of Time. Plaintiffs' Statement of Reasonable Fees and Costs due by 7/6/2021. Objections to Plaintiffs' Statement of Reasonable Fees and Costs due by 7/13/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alicia M. Otazo-Reyes on 6/23/2021. (apa)
June 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 121 MOTION for Extension of Time to file Statement of Reasonable Fees and Costs Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Statement of Reasonable Fees and Costs and Incorporated Memorandum of Law re #119 Order by Bluegreen Vacations Corporation, Bluegreen Vacations Unlimited, Inc.. Responses due by 7/6/2021 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Rubin, Glennys)
June 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 120 OMNIBUS ORDER ON PLAINTIFFS' MOTIONS TO STRIKE DEFENDANTS' AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES granting in part and denying in part #57 Motion to Strike #57 MOTION to Strike #48 Answer to Complaint Plaintiffs' Unopposed In Part and Opposed In Part Motion to Strike Affirmative Defenses from Systema Marketing, Inc., and Shayna G. Schroeder's Answer and Incorporated Memorandum of Law, #62 MOTION to Strike #34 Answer to Complaint Plaintiffs' Motion to Strike Defendant Harold O. Miller's Affirmative Defenses and Incorporated Memorandum of Law, #89 MOTION to Strike #74 Answer to Complaint,, Counterclaim, Plaintiffs' Motion to Strike Defendant Vindaloo Travel Network, LLC, Timeshare Termination Team, LLC, Brian Stephen Wilbur, and Holly Wilbur's Affirmative Defenses and Incorpo ; granting in part and denying in part #62 Motion to Strike #57 MOTION to Strike #48 Answer to Complaint Plaintiffs' Unopposed In Part and Opposed In Part Motion to Strike Affirmative Defenses from Systema Marketing, Inc., and Shayna G. Schroeder's Answer and Incorporated Memorandum of Law, #62 MOTION to Strike #34 Answer to Complaint Plaintiffs' Motion to Strike Defendant Harold O. Miller's Affirmative Defenses and Incorporated Memorandum of Law, #89 MOTION to Strike #74 Answer to Complaint,, Counterclaim, Plaintiffs' Motion to Strike Defendant Vindaloo Travel Network, LLC, Timeshare Termination Team, LLC, Brian Stephen Wilbur, and Holly Wilbur's Affirmative Defenses and Incorpo ; granting in part and denying in part #89 Motion to Strike #57 MOTION to Strike #48 Answer to Complaint Plaintiffs' Unopposed In Part and Opposed In Part Motion to Strike Affirmative Defenses from Systema Marketing, Inc., and Shayna G. Schroeder's Answer and Incorporated Memorandum of Law, #62 MOTION to Strike #34 Answer to Complaint Plaintiffs' Motion to Strike Defendant Harold O. Miller's Affirmative Defenses and Incorporated Memorandum of Law, #89 MOTION to Strike #74 Answer to Complaint,, Counterclaim, Plaintiffs' Motion to Strike Defendant Vindaloo Travel Network, LLC, Timeshare Termination Team, LLC, Brian Stephen Wilbur, and Holly Wilbur's Affirmative Defenses and Incorpo. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 6/17/2021. See attached document for full details. (pcs)
June 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 119 ORDER re #103 NOTICE of Hearing; #104 NOTICE of Hearing; #110 NOTICE of Hearing; #111 NOTICE of Hearing. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alicia M. Otazo-Reyes on 6/16/2021. See attached document for full details. (apa)
June 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 117 ORDER ON MOTION TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL FOR DEFENDANTS granting #116 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Mishaal Kirit Patel representing Freedom Consumer Services, LLC (Defendant) and Salkin, Jordan (Defendant) withdrawn from case. Deadline to obtain new counsel 7/15/2021. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 6/16/2021. See attached document for full details. (pcs)
June 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 118 PAPERLESS Minute Entry for telephonic proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Alicia M. Otazo-Reyes: Discovery Hearing held on 6/15/2021. Total time in court: 2 hour(s) : 12 minutes. Attorney Appearance(s): Michael James Quinn and Benjamin Travis Brown appeared on behalf of the Plaintiffs. Mark Richard Cheskin and Clayton James Schmitt appeared on behalf of Defendants Timeshare Termination Team, LLC, Vindaloo Travel Network, LLC and Brian and Holly Wilbur. Omar Mustafa Saleh appeared on behalf of Defendants Michael Molfetta and Molfetta Law, LLC. Mishaal Patel appeared on behalf of Defendants Freedom Consumer Services, LLC and Jordan Salkin. Order to follow. (Digital 15:30:42 - 17:41:09) (sl)
June 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 116 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney for Jordan Salkin and Freedom Consumer Services LLC by Mishaal Patel for / by Freedom Consumer Services, LLC, Jordan Salkin. Responses due by 6/29/2021 (Patel, Mishaal)
June 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 115 NOTICE by Timeshare Termination Team, LLC re #114 Answer to Complaint,, Counterclaim, of Filing Exhibits to Amended Counterclaims (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B) (Schmitt, Clayton)
June 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 114 (STRICKEN PER DE#155) ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint with Jury Demand , Amended COUNTERCLAIM against Bluegreen Vacations Corporation, Bluegreen Vacations Unlimited, Inc. by Brian Stephen Wilbur, Timeshare Termination Team, LLC, Holly Wilbur, Vindaloo Travel Network, LLC. (Schmitt, Clayton) Modified on 8/13/2021 (cqs).
June 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 113 CLERK'S NOTICE re the Discovery Hearing set for 6/15/2021 at 3:30 P.M. The Discovery Hearing will be conducted telephonically. Ten minutes before the Hearing is scheduled to commence, counsel shall call the conference number 1-888-684-8852, enter access code 4791317 and security code 0615, and then wait for the case to be called. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alicia M. Otazo-Reyes on 6/14/2021. (apa)
June 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 112 PAPERLESS Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Beth Bloom. Motion Hearing held on 6/9/2021 re #88 Plaintiffs/Counter-Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Defendants/Counter-Plaintiffs Timeshare Termination Team, LLC's Counterclaims. The Motion is GRANTED with leave to amend. Timeshare Termination Team, LLC shall file its amended counterclaim no later than June 14, 2021. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom. Total time in court: 1 hour(s) : 5 minutes. Attorney Appearance(s): Eric Christu, Benjamin Travis Brown, Mark Richard Cheskin, Clayton James Schmitt. Court Reporter: Yvette Hernandez, 305-523-5698 / Yvette_Hernandez@flsd.uscourts.gov. (ak03)
June 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 111 NOTICE of Hearing by ATTORNEY: Discovery Hearing set for 6/15/2021 03:30 PM in Miami Division before Magistrate Judge Alicia M. Otazo-Reyes. (Rubin, Glennys)
June 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 110 NOTICE of Hearing by ATTORNEY: Discovery Hearing set for 6/15/2021 03:30 PM in Miami Division before Magistrate Judge Alicia M. Otazo-Reyes. (Cheskin, Mark)
June 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 109 TRANSCRIPT of Discovery Hearing held on 5/25/2021 before Magistrate Judge Alicia M. Otazo-Reyes, 1-26 pages, Court Reporter: Joanne Mancari, 305-523-5635. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased by contacting the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 6/25/2021. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/6/2021. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/2/2021. (apz)
June 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 108 REPLY to Response to Motion re #89 MOTION to Strike #74 Answer to Complaint,, Counterclaim, Plaintiffs' Motion to Strike Defendant Vindaloo Travel Network, LLC, Timeshare Termination Team, LLC, Brian Stephen Wilbur, and Holly Wilbur's Affirmative Defenses and Incorpo Plaintiffs' Reply in Support of Motion to Strike Defendant Vindaloo Travel Network, LLC, Timeshare Termination Team, LLC, Brian Stephen Wilbur, and Holly Wilbur's Affirmative Defenses and Incorporated Memorandum of Law filed by Bluegreen Vacations Corporation, Bluegreen Vacations Unlimited, Inc.. (Rubin, Glennys)
June 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 107 PAPERLESS ORDER Setting Hearing on #88 Plaintiffs/Counter-Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Defendants/Counter-Plaintiff's Timeshare Termination Team, LLC's Counterclaims and Incorporated Memorandum of Law. Motion Hearing set for 6/9/2021 at 11:30 AM via Zoom video conference before Judge Beth Bloom. The link to join is https://www.zoomgov.com/j/1605592517?pwd=U0V2ak1mOTVrRExSaU9OeFJSV29jQT09. Alternatively, the Meeting ID is 160 559 2517, and the Passcode is 223347. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom (ak03)
May 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 106 ORDER AMENDING SCHEDULING ORDER AND CERTAIN PRETRIAL DEADLINES granting #93 MOTION to Amend/Correct #32 Scheduling Order, Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge, Order Referring Case to Mediation, Plaintiffs' Consent and Agreed, in Part, Motion to Extend Deadlines in Scheduling Order and Incorporate filed by Bluegreen Vacations Unlimited, Inc., Bluegreen Vacations Corporation. ( Discovery due by 8/9/2022., Expert Discovery due by 8/9/2022., Mediation Deadline 8/23/2022., In Limine Motions due by 8/31/2022., Dispositive Motions due by 8/31/2022., Motions due by 8/31/2022., Pretrial Stipulation due by 11/21/2022., Jury Trial set for 12/5/2022 09:00 AM in Miami Division before Judge Beth Bloom., Calendar Call set for 11/29/2022 01:45 PM in Miami Division before Judge Beth Bloom.) Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 5/28/2021. See attached document for full details. (pcs)
May 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 105 REPLY to Response to Motion re #93 MOTION to Amend/Correct #32 Scheduling Order,,,,, Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge,,,,, Order Referring Case to Mediation,,,, Plaintiffs' Consent and Agreed, in Part, Motion to Extend Deadlines in Scheduling Order and Incorporate Plaintiffs' Reply in Support of Motion to Extend Deadlines in Scheduling Order and Incorporated Memorandum of Law filed by Bluegreen Vacations Corporation, Bluegreen Vacations Unlimited, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Rubin, Glennys)
May 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 104 NOTICE of Hearing by ATTORNEY: Discovery Hearing set for 6/15/2021 03:30 PM in Miami Division before Magistrate Judge Alicia M. Otazo-Reyes. (Rubin, Glennys)
May 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 103 NOTICE of Hearing by ATTORNEY: Discovery Hearing set for 6/15/2021 03:30 PM in Miami Division before Magistrate Judge Alicia M. Otazo-Reyes. (Rubin, Glennys)
May 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 102 REPLY to Response to Motion re #88 MOTION to Dismiss #74 Answer to Complaint,, Counterclaim, Plaintiffs/Counter-Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Defendants/Counter-Plaintiffs Timeshare Termination Team, LLC's Counterclaims and Incorporated Memorandum of Law Plaintiffs'/Counter-Defendants' Reply in Support of Motion to Dismiss Defendants/Counter-Plaintiffs TTT's Counterclaims and Supporting Memorandum of Law filed by Bluegreen Vacations Corporation, Bluegreen Vacations Unlimited, Inc.. (Rubin, Glennys)
May 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 101 RESPONSE to Motion re #93 MOTION to Amend/Correct #32 Scheduling Order,,,,, Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge,,,,, Order Referring Case to Mediation,,,, Plaintiffs' Consent and Agreed, in Part, Motion to Extend Deadlines in Scheduling Order and Incorporate filed by Timeshare Termination Team, LLC, Brian Stephen Wilbur, Holly Wilbur. Replies due by 6/2/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K)(Cheskin, Mark)
May 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 100 PAPERLESS Minute Entry for telephonic proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Alicia M. Otazo-Reyes: Discovery Hearing held on 5/25/2021. Total time in court: 42 minutes. Attorney Appearance(s): Michael James Quinn and Benjamin Travis Brown appeared on behalf of the Plaintiffs. Mark Richard Cheskin and Clayton James Schmitt appeared on behalf of the Defendants Timeshare Termination Team, LLC, Vindaloo Travel Network, LLC, Brian Wilbur and Holly Wilbur. Order entered D.E. #99 . (Digital 15:30:00 - 16:13:41) (sl) .
May 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 99 ORDER re #87 NOTICE of Hearing. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alicia M. Otazo-Reyes on 5/25/2021. See attached document for full details. (apa)
May 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 98 RESPONSE in Opposition re #89 MOTION to Strike #74 Answer to Complaint,, Counterclaim, Plaintiffs' Motion to Strike Defendant Vindaloo Travel Network, LLC, Timeshare Termination Team, LLC, Brian Stephen Wilbur, and Holly Wilbur's Affirmative Defenses and Incorpo filed by Vindaloo Travel Network, LLC Timeshare Termination Team, LLC, Brian Stephen Wilbur, Holly Wilbur. Replies due by 6/1/2021. (Cheskin, Mark) Modified to add filer on 5/25/2021 (pcs).
May 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 97 CLERK'S NOTICE re #87 NOTICE of Hearing. The Discovery Hearing will be conducted telephonically. Ten minutes before the Discovery Hearing is scheduled to begin, Counsel shall call the conference number 1-888-684-8852, enter access code 4791317 and security code 0525, and then wait for the case to be called. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alicia M. Otazo-Reyes on 5/24/2021. (apa)
May 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 96 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #94 Plaintiffs' Consent Motion For Extension of Time For Plaintiffs to File Reply in Support of Motion to Dismiss Timeshare Termination Team, LLC's Counterclaims. Plaintiffs shall file their reply no later than May 28, 2021. Reply due by 5/28/2021. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom (ak03)
May 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 95 PAPERLESS ORDER requiring expedited response to #93 Plaintiffs' Consent and Agreed, In Part, Motion to Extend Deadlines in Scheduling Order. Defendants Timeshare Termination Team, LLC, Vindaloo Travel Network, LLC, Brian Stephen Wilbur, and Holly Wilbur shall file their response to the Motion no later May 26, 2021. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom (ak03)
May 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 94 MOTION for Extension of Time For Plaintiffs to File Reply in Support of Motion to Dismiss Timeshare Termination Team, LLC's Counterclaims Plaintiffs' Consent Motion For Extension of Time For Plaintiffs to File Reply in Support of Motion to Dismiss Timeshare Termination Team, LLC's Counterclaims re #88 MOTION to Dismiss #74 Answer to Complaint,, Counterclaim, Plaintiffs/Counter-Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Defendants/Counter-Plaintiffs Timeshare Termination Team, LLC's Counterclaims and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by Bluegreen Vacations Corporation, Bluegreen Vacations Unlimited, Inc.. Responses due by 6/4/2021 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Rubin, Glennys)
May 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 93 MOTION to Amend/Correct #32 Scheduling Order,,,,, Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge,,,,, Order Referring Case to Mediation,,,, Plaintiffs' Consent and Agreed, in Part, Motion to Extend Deadlines in Scheduling Order and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by Bluegreen Vacations Corporation, Bluegreen Vacations Unlimited, Inc.. Responses due by 6/4/2021 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Rubin, Glennys)
May 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 92 RESPONSE in Opposition re #88 MOTION to Dismiss #74 Answer to Complaint,, Counterclaim, Plaintiffs/Counter-Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Defendants/Counter-Plaintiffs Timeshare Termination Team, LLC's Counterclaims and Incorporated Memorandum of Law filed by Timeshare Termination Team, LLC. Replies due by 5/27/2021. (Cheskin, Mark)
May 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 91 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #90 Defendants Vindaloo Travel Network, LLC, Timeshare Termination Team LLC, Brian Wilbur, and Holly Wilbur's Unopposed Motion for an Enlargement of Time to Respond to Plaintiffs' Motion to Dismiss and Motion to Strike. Defendants shall file their response to the Motion to Dismiss the Counterclaim no later than May 21, 2021 and their response to the Motion to Strike Affirmative Defenses no later than May 24, 2021. Responses due by 5/21/2021. Responses due by 5/24/2021. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom (ak03)
May 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 90 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #89 MOTION to Strike #74 Answer to Complaint,, Counterclaim, Plaintiffs' Motion to Strike Defendant Vindaloo Travel Network, LLC, Timeshare Termination Team, LLC, Brian Stephen Wilbur, and Holly Wilbur's Affirmative Defenses and Incorpo, #88 MOTION to Dismiss #74 Answer to Complaint,, Counterclaim, Plaintiffs/Counter-Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Defendants/Counter-Plaintiffs Timeshare Termination Team, LLC's Counterclaims and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by Timeshare Termination Team, LLC, Vindaloo Travel Network, LLC, Brian Stephen Wilbur, Holly Wilbur. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cheskin, Mark)
May 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 89 MOTION to Strike #74 Answer to Complaint,, Counterclaim, Plaintiffs' Motion to Strike Defendant Vindaloo Travel Network, LLC, Timeshare Termination Team, LLC, Brian Stephen Wilbur, and Holly Wilbur's Affirmative Defenses and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by Bluegreen Vacations Corporation, Bluegreen Vacations Unlimited, Inc.. Responses due by 5/17/2021 (Rubin, Glennys)
April 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 88 MOTION to Dismiss #74 Answer to Complaint,, Counterclaim, Plaintiffs/Counter-Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Defendants/Counter-Plaintiffs Timeshare Termination Team, LLC's Counterclaims and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by Bluegreen Vacations Corporation, Bluegreen Vacations Unlimited, Inc.. Responses due by 5/14/2021 (Rubin, Glennys)
April 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 87 NOTICE of Hearing by ATTORNEY: Discovery Hearing set for 5/25/2021 03:30 PM in Miami Division before Magistrate Judge Alicia M. Otazo-Reyes. (Cheskin, Mark)
April 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ORDER ON PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO STRIKE DEFENDANTS MICHAEL A. MOLFETTA AND MOLFETTA LAS, LLC'S AMENDED AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSE granting #71 Motion to Strike #71 MOTION to Strike #69 Answer to Complaint Plaintiffs' Motion to Strike Defendants Michael A. Molfetta and Molfetta Law, LLC's Amended Affirmative Defense and Incorporated Memorandum of Law. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 4/28/2021. See attached document for full details. (pcs)
April 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 85 NOTICE by Bluegreen Vacations Corporation, Bluegreen Vacations Unlimited, Inc. re #71 MOTION to Strike #69 Answer to Complaint Plaintiffs' Motion to Strike Defendants Michael A. Molfetta and Molfetta Law, LLC's Amended Affirmative Defense and Incorporated Memorandum of Law Plaintiffs' Notice of Filing Supplement to Local Rule 7.1(a)(3) Certification Regarding Plaintiffs Motion to Strike (Rubin, Glennys)
April 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER re #70 NOTICE of Hearing. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alicia M. Otazo-Reyes on 4/27/2021. See attached document for full details. (apa)
April 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 83 PAPERLESS Minute Entry for telephonic proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Alicia M. Otazo-Reyes: Discovery Hearing held on 4/27/2021. Total time in court: 18 minutes. Attorney Appearance(s): Benjamin Travis Brown appeared on behalf of the Plaintiffs. Omar Mustafa Saleh appeared on behalf of Defendants Michael A. Molfetta and Molfetta Law, LLC. Tyson Pulsifer appeared on behalf of Defendants Shayna G. Schroeder and Systema Marketing, Inc. Order to follow. (Digital 15:29:47 - 15:46:25) (sl)
April 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 82 REPLY to Response to Motion re #62 MOTION to Strike #34 Answer to Complaint Plaintiffs' Motion to Strike Defendant Harold O. Miller's Affirmative Defenses and Incorporated Memorandum of Law Reply Memorandum in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion to Strike Defendant Harold O. Miller's Affirmative Defenses and Incorporated Memorandum of Law filed by Bluegreen Vacations Corporation, Bluegreen Vacations Unlimited, Inc.. (Rubin, Glennys)
April 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 81 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Benjamin Travis Brown on behalf of Bluegreen Vacations Corporation, Bluegreen Vacations Unlimited, Inc.. Attorney Benjamin Travis Brown added to party Bluegreen Vacations Corporation(pty:pla), Attorney Benjamin Travis Brown added to party Bluegreen Vacations Unlimited, Inc.(pty:pla). (Brown, Benjamin)
April 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 80 CLERK'S NOTICE re #70 NOTICE of Hearing. The Discovery Hearing will be conducted telephonically. Ten minutes before the hearing is scheduled to begin, Counsel shall call the conference number 1-888-684-8852, enter access code 4791317 and security code 0427, and then wait for the case to be called. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alicia M. Otazo-Reyes on 4/26/2021. (apa)
April 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 79 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #78 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Motion to Dismiss Vinadoo Defendants' Counterclaims. Plaintiffs may file their response to the counterclaims by April 30, 2021. Responses due by 4/30/2021. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom (ak03)
April 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 78 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time To File Motion to Dismiss Defendants Vindaloo Travel Network, LLC, Timeshare Termination Team, LLC, Brian Stephen Wilbur, and Holly Wilbur's Counterclaims Unopposed Motion For Extension of Time to File Motion to Dismiss Defendants Vindaloo Travel Network, LLC, Timeshare Termination Team, LLC, Brian Stephen Wilbur, and Holly Wilbur's Counterclaims re #74 Answer to Complaint,, Counterclaim, by Bluegreen Vacations Corporation, Bluegreen Vacations Unlimited, Inc.. Responses due by 5/6/2021 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Rubin, Glennys)
April 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 77 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #76 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time. The Molfetta Defendants shall file their response to #71 Motion to Strike Amended Affirmative Defense on or before April 28, 2021. Response due by 4/28/2021. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom (ak03)
April 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 76 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #71 MOTION to Strike #69 Answer to Complaint Plaintiffs' Motion to Strike Defendants Michael A. Molfetta and Molfetta Law, LLC's Amended Affirmative Defense and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by Michael A. Molfetta, Molfetta Law, LLC. (Saleh, Omar)
April 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 75 RESPONSE to Motion re #62 MOTION to Strike #34 Answer to Complaint Plaintiffs' Motion to Strike Defendant Harold O. Miller's Affirmative Defenses and Incorporated Memorandum of Law filed by Harold O. Miller. Replies due by 4/26/2021. (Hoepker, Todd)
April 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint with Jury Demand , COUNTERCLAIM against Bluegreen Vacations Corporation, Bluegreen Vacations Unlimited, Inc. by Timeshare Termination Team, LLC, Brian Stephen Wilbur, Holly Wilbur, Vindaloo Travel Network, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Cheskin, Mark)
April 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 73 PAPERLESS ORDER granting in part and denying in part #72 Motion for Extension of Time. Defendant Harold O. Miller shall file his response to Plaintiff's Motion to Strike Affirmative Defendants, ECF No. #62 , on or before April 19, 2021. Response due by 4/19/2021. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom (ak03)
April 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 72 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to file his response and memorandum in opposition to the Motion to Strike Defendant Harold O. Miller's Affirmative Defenses re #62 MOTION to Strike #34 Answer to Complaint Plaintiffs' Motion to Strike Defendant Harold O. Miller's Affirmative Defenses and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by Harold O. Miller. Responses due by 4/23/2021 (Hoepker, Todd)
April 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 71 MOTION to Strike #69 Answer to Complaint Plaintiffs' Motion to Strike Defendants Michael A. Molfetta and Molfetta Law, LLC's Amended Affirmative Defense and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by Bluegreen Vacations Corporation, Bluegreen Vacations Unlimited, Inc.. Responses due by 4/21/2021 (Rubin, Glennys)
April 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 70 NOTICE of Hearing by ATTORNEY: Discovery Hearing set for 4/27/2021 03:30 PM in Miami Division before Magistrate Judge Alicia M. Otazo-Reyes. (Rubin, Glennys)
April 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 69 Amended ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint with Jury Demand by Michael A. Molfetta, Molfetta Law, LLC. (Saleh, Omar)
April 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 68 RESPONSE in Opposition re #57 MOTION to Strike #48 Answer to Complaint Plaintiffs' Unopposed In Part and Opposed In Part Motion to Strike Affirmative Defenses from Systema Marketing, Inc., and Shayna G. Schroeder's Answer and Incorporated Memorandum of Law filed by Shayna G. Schroeder, Systema Marketing, Inc.. Replies due by 4/9/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Zetrouer, Shannon)
April 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 67 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Clayton James Schmitt on behalf of Timeshare Termination Team, LLC, Vindaloo Travel Network, LLC, Brian Stephen Wilbur, Holly Wilbur. Attorney Clayton James Schmitt added to party Timeshare Termination Team, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Clayton James Schmitt added to party Vindaloo Travel Network, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Clayton James Schmitt added to party Brian Stephen Wilbur(pty:dft), Attorney Clayton James Schmitt added to party Holly Wilbur(pty:dft). (Schmitt, Clayton)
March 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 66 PAPERLESS ORDER denying as moot #56 Plaintiffs' Motion to Strike Defendants Michael A. Molfetta and Molfetta Law, LLC's Affirmative Defenses, based upon the Court's granting the Molfetta Defendants leave to file an Amended Answer and Affirmative Defenses. See ECF No. 64 . Signed by Judge Beth Bloom (ak03)
March 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER ON MOTION FOR A MORE DEFINITE STATEMENT denying #22 Motion for More Definite Statement. Re: #22 MOTION for More Definite Statement filed by Brian Stephen Wilbur, Timeshare Termination Team, LLC, Holly Wilbur, Vindaloo Travel Network, LLC. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 3/26/2021. See attached document for full details. (pcs)
March 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 64 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #58 Motion for Leave to File Amended Answer and Affirmative Defenses. The Molfetta Defendants shall file their Amended Answer and Affirmative Defenses no later than April 5, 2021. Clerks Notice: Filer must separately re-file the amended pleading pursuant to Local Rule 15.1, unless otherwise ordered by the Judge. The duplicate Motion for Leave to File, ECF No. #59 , is denied as moot. Amended Answer Deadline 4/5/2021. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom (ak03)
March 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 63 NOTICE of Compliance by Michael A. Molfetta, Molfetta Law, LLC re 60 Order,, (Saleh, Omar)
March 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 62 MOTION to Strike #34 Answer to Complaint Plaintiffs' Motion to Strike Defendant Harold O. Miller's Affirmative Defenses and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by Bluegreen Vacations Corporation, Bluegreen Vacations Unlimited, Inc.. Responses due by 4/9/2021 (Rubin, Glennys)
March 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 61 NOTICE by Bluegreen Vacations Corporation, Bluegreen Vacations Unlimited, Inc. re #56 MOTION to Strike #37 Answer to Complaint, 55 Order on Motion for Leave to File, Plaintiffs' Motion to Strike Defendant Michael A. Molfetta and Molfetta Law, LLC's Affirmative Defenses and Incorporated Memorandum of Law Plaintiffs' Notice of Filing Supplement to Local Rule 7.1(a)(3) Certification (Rubin, Glennys)
March 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 60 PAPERLESS ORDER directing Defendants Molfetta Law, LLC and Michael A. Molfetta ("Molfetta Defendants") to confer with counsel for Plaintiffs and file notice informing the Court whether Plaintiffs are opposed to the relief sought in their Motion for Leave to File Amended Answer and Affirmative Defenses. The Molfetta Defendants shall file their notice no later than March 26, 2021. Re #58 MOTION to Amend/Correct #37 Answer to Complaint, filed by Molfetta Law, LLC, Michael A. Molfetta. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom (ak03)
March 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 59 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Answer and Affirmative Defenses by Michael A. Molfetta, Molfetta Law, LLC. (Saleh, Omar)
March 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 58 MOTION to Amend/Correct #37 Answer to Complaint, by Michael A. Molfetta, Molfetta Law, LLC. Responses due by 4/7/2021 (Saleh, Omar)
March 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 57 MOTION to Strike #48 Answer to Complaint Plaintiffs' Unopposed In Part and Opposed In Part Motion to Strike Affirmative Defenses from Systema Marketing, Inc., and Shayna G. Schroeder's Answer and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by Bluegreen Vacations Corporation, Bluegreen Vacations Unlimited, Inc.. Responses due by 4/2/2021 (Rubin, Glennys)
March 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 56 MOTION to Strike #37 Answer to Complaint, 55 Order on Motion for Leave to File, Plaintiffs' Motion to Strike Defendant Michael A. Molfetta and Molfetta Law, LLC's Affirmative Defenses and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by Bluegreen Vacations Corporation, Bluegreen Vacations Unlimited, Inc.. Responses due by 3/24/2021 (Rubin, Glennys)
March 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 55 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #54 Plaintiffs' Consent/Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Motion to Strike Affirmative Defenses from Michael A. Molfetta and Molfetta Law, LLC's Answer Two Days Past Deadline. Plaintiffs may file their Motion to Strike on or before March 10, 2021. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom (ak03)
March 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 54 MOTION for Leave to File Plaintiffs' Consent/Unopposed Motion For Leave To File Motion To Strike Affirmative Defenses From Michael A. Molfetta and Molfetta Law, LLC's Answer Two Days Past Deadline and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by Bluegreen Vacations Corporation, Bluegreen Vacations Unlimited, Inc.. (Rubin, Glennys)
March 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 53 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #52 Motion for Extension of Time to File a Motion to Strike Affirmative Defenses in Defendant Harold O. Miller's Answer by March 26, 2021. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom (BB)
March 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 52 Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time For Plaintiff's to File Motion to Strike Certain Affirmative Defenses as Contained in Defendant Harold O. Miller's Answer and Memorandum of Law in Support by Bluegreen Vacations Corporation, Bluegreen Vacations Unlimited, Inc.. Responses due by 3/19/2021 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Rubin, Glennys)
March 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER Scheduling Mediation before Gary S. Salzman Mediation Hearing set for 11/11/2021 10:00 AM Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 3/4/2021. See attached document for full details. (pcs)
March 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 50 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by Systema Marketing, Inc. (Zetrouer, Shannon)
March 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 49 NOTICE of Mediator Selection and Hearing. Notice Regarding Mediation Selected/Added Gary S. Salzman as Mediator. Mediation Hearing set for 11/11/2021 at 10:00 a.m.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Rubin, Glennys)
February 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint with Jury Demand by Shayna G. Schroeder, Systema Marketing, Inc.. (Zetrouer, Shannon)
February 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 47 PAPERLESS ORDER denying #46 Motion for Leave to File Sur-Reply. The issue Plaintiffs seek to address is not relevant to the Court's determination of whether a more definite statement may be warranted in this case. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom (ak03)
February 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 46 MOTION for Leave to File Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File Sur-Reply and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by Bluegreen Vacations Corporation, Bluegreen Vacations Unlimited, Inc.. (Rubin, Glennys)
February 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 45 REPLY to Response to Motion re #22 MOTION for More Definite Statement filed by Timeshare Termination Team, LLC, Vindaloo Travel Network, LLC, Brian Stephen Wilbur, Holly Wilbur. (Cheskin, Mark)
February 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 44 Clerks Non-Entry of Default as to Freedom Consumer Services, LLC, Jordan Salkin - Motions Terminated: #42 Motion for Clerks Entry of Default,. Reason: Responsive pleading (i.e. Motion for Extention of Time to File Answer to Complaint, Motion to Dismiss Complaint, etc) has been filed Signed by DEPUTY CLERK on 2/22/2021. (pcs)
February 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 43 Defendant Salkin and Freedom Consumer Services LLC ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint with Jury Demand by Freedom Consumer Services, LLC, Jordan Salkin. Attorney Mishaal Kirit Patel added to party Freedom Consumer Services, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Mishaal Kirit Patel added to party Jordan Salkin(pty:dft). (Patel, Mishaal)
February 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 42 MOTION for Clerks Entry of Default Plaintiffs' Motion For Entry of Clerk's Default As To Defendants Freedom Consumer Services, LLC and Jordan Salkin and Memorandum of Law as to Freedom Consumer Services, LLC, Jordan Salkin by Bluegreen Vacations Corporation, Bluegreen Vacations Unlimited, Inc.. (Rubin, Glennys)
February 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 41 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #40 Defendants Shayna G. Schroeder and Systema Marketing, Inc.'s Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File a Response to Plaintiffs' Complaint. Defendants shall file their response on or before February 26, 2021. Shayna G. Schroeder Answer due 2/26/2021; Systema Marketing, Inc. Answer due 2/26/2021. Re: #1 Complaint, filed by Bluegreen Vacations Unlimited, Inc., Bluegreen Vacations Corporation. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom (ak03)
February 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 40 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #1 Complaint,,, by Shayna G. Schroeder, Systema Marketing, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Zetrouer, Shannon)
February 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 39 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Shannon L. Zetrouer on behalf of Shayna G. Schroeder, Systema Marketing, Inc.. Attorney Shannon L. Zetrouer added to party Shayna G. Schroeder(pty:dft), Attorney Shannon L. Zetrouer added to party Systema Marketing, Inc.(pty:dft). (Zetrouer, Shannon)
February 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 38 RESPONSE in Opposition re #22 MOTION for More Definite Statement Plaintiffs' Response in Opposition to Defendants Vindaloo Travel Network, LLC, Timeshare Termination Team LLC, Brian Wilbur, and Holly Wilbur's Motion for a More Definite Statement (DE 22) And Incorporated Memorandum of Law filed by Bluegreen Vacations Corporation, Bluegreen Vacations Unlimited, Inc.. Replies due by 2/23/2021. (Rubin, Glennys)
February 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint with Jury Demand by Michael A. Molfetta, Molfetta Law, LLC. Attorney Omar Mustafa Saleh added to party Michael A. Molfetta(pty:dft), Attorney Omar Mustafa Saleh added to party Molfetta Law, LLC(pty:dft). (Saleh, Omar)
February 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 36 Clerk's Notice of Filing Deficiency Re: #33 Notice of Attorney Appearance filed by Harold O. Miller, #34 Answer to Complaint filed by Harold O. Miller, #35 Notice of Conventional Filing filed by Harold O. Miller. Document(s) missing required signature(s) (Fed.R.Civ.P. 11(a)). (pcs)
February 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 35 MILLER'S NOTICE OF CONVENTIONAL FILING of #34 Answer to Complaint by Harold O. Miller (pcs)
February 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint with Jury Demand by Harold O. Miller. (pcs)
February 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 33 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Todd Michael Hoepker on behalf of Harold O. Miller. Attorney Todd Michael Hoepker added to party Harold O. Miller(pty:dft). (pcs)
February 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER SETTING TRIAL AND PRE-TRIAL SCHEDULE, REQUIRING MEDIATION, AND REFERRING CERTAIN MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE: (Amended Pleadings due by 4/12/2021., Discovery due by 11/16/2021., Expert Discovery due by 11/16/2021., Joinder of Parties due by 4/12/2021., Mediation Deadline 11/30/2021., In Limine Motions due by 12/8/2021., Dispositive Motions due by 12/8/2021., Motions due by 12/8/2021., Pretrial Stipulation due by 2/28/2022., Jury Trial set for 3/14/2022 09:00 AM in Miami Division before Judge Beth Bloom., Calendar Call set for 3/8/2022 01:45 PM in Miami Division before Judge Beth Bloom.), ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Alicia M. Otazo-Reyes for Discovery Matters. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 2/10/2021. See attached document for full details. (pcs) #Pattern Jury Instruction Builder - To access the latest, up to date changes to the 11th Circuit Pattern Jury Instructions go to https://pji.ca11.uscourts.gov or click here.
February 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 31 Amended Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement Plaintiffs' Amended Certificate of Interested Parties And Corporate Disclosure Statement by Bluegreen Vacations Corporation, Bluegreen Vacations Unlimited, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Bluegreen Vacations Holding Corporation for Bluegreen Vacations Corporation (Rubin, Glennys)
February 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 30 Clerks Notice to Filer re #28 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement,. Other Affiliates/Corporate Parents Not Entered; ERROR - The Filer failed to enter all Other Affiliates/Corporate Parents from the Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement. Filer is instructed to refile their Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement and enter the missing Other Affiliates/Corp Parents. Note - Other Affiliates/Corporate Parents do not appear on the docket sheet. (pcs)
February 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 29 Defendant's Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by Timeshare Termination Team, LLC, Vindaloo Travel Network, LLC, Brian Stephen Wilbur, Holly Wilbur (Cheskin, Mark)
February 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 28 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement Plaintiffs' Certificate of Interested Parties and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Bluegreen Vacations Corporation, Bluegreen Vacations Unlimited, Inc. (Rubin, Glennys)
February 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 27 Election to Jurisdiction for Final Disposition of Motions Election To Jurisdiction By A United States Magistrate Judge For Final Disposition of Motions. Filed by Bluegreen Vacations Corporation, Bluegreen Vacations Unlimited, Inc. (Rubin, Glennys)
February 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 26 Joint SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 16.1 by Bluegreen Vacations Corporation, Bluegreen Vacations Unlimited, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Rubin, Glennys)
February 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 25 RESPONSE to #23 Order,,, Set Answer Due Deadline,, Court's Order on Default Procedures by Timeshare Termination Team, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Cheskin, Mark)
February 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 24 NOTICE of Compliance Bluegreen Plaintiffs' Notice of Compliance With This Court's Order on Default Procedures (DE 23) by Bluegreen Vacations Corporation, Bluegreen Vacations Unlimited, Inc. re #23 Order,,, Set Answer Due Deadline,, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Rubin, Glennys)
February 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER ON DEFAULT PROCEDURES, Freedom Consumer Services, LLC response due 2/14/2021; Harold O. Miller response due 2/14/2021; Michael A. Molfetta response due 2/14/2021; Molfetta Law, LLC response due 2/14/2021; Jordan Salkin response due 2/14/2021; Shayna G. Schroeder response due 2/14/2021; Systema Marketing, Inc. response due 2/14/2021; Timeshare Termination Team, LLC response due 2/14/2021. Motion for Entry of Clerk's Default due 2/21/2021. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 2/1/2021. See attached document for full details. (pcs)
February 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 MOTION for More Definite Statement by Timeshare Termination Team, LLC, Vindaloo Travel Network, LLC, Brian Stephen Wilbur, Holly Wilbur. Attorney Mark Richard Cheskin added to party Timeshare Termination Team, LLC(pty:dft). (Cheskin, Mark)
February 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 NOTICE of Compliance Bluegreen Plaintiffs' Notice of Compliance With This Court's Order to File Proof Service by Bluegreen Vacations Corporation, Bluegreen Vacations Unlimited, Inc. re #9 Order (Rubin, Glennys)
February 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint,,, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Bluegreen Vacations Corporation, Bluegreen Vacations Unlimited, Inc.. Molfetta Law, LLC served on 1/4/2021, answer due 1/25/2021. (Rubin, Glennys)
February 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint,,, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Bluegreen Vacations Corporation, Bluegreen Vacations Unlimited, Inc.. Michael A. Molfetta served on 1/4/2021, answer due 1/25/2021. (Rubin, Glennys)
February 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint,,, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Bluegreen Vacations Corporation, Bluegreen Vacations Unlimited, Inc.. Freedom Consumer Services, LLC served on 12/31/2020, answer due 1/21/2021. (Rubin, Glennys)
February 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint,,, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Bluegreen Vacations Corporation, Bluegreen Vacations Unlimited, Inc.. Systema Marketing, Inc. served on 12/31/2020, answer due 1/21/2021. (Rubin, Glennys)
February 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint,,, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Bluegreen Vacations Corporation, Bluegreen Vacations Unlimited, Inc.. Holly Wilbur served on 12/31/2020, answer due 1/21/2021. (Rubin, Glennys)
February 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint,,, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Bluegreen Vacations Corporation, Bluegreen Vacations Unlimited, Inc.. Timeshare Termination Team, LLC served on 1/4/2021, answer due 1/25/2021. (Rubin, Glennys)
February 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint,,, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Bluegreen Vacations Corporation, Bluegreen Vacations Unlimited, Inc.. Vindaloo Travel Network, LLC served on 1/5/2021, answer due 1/26/2021. (Rubin, Glennys)
February 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint,,, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Bluegreen Vacations Corporation, Bluegreen Vacations Unlimited, Inc.. Brian Stephen Wilbur served on 12/31/2020, answer due 1/21/2021. (Rubin, Glennys)
February 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint,,, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Bluegreen Vacations Corporation, Bluegreen Vacations Unlimited, Inc.. Shayna G. Schroeder served on 12/31/2020, answer due 1/21/2021. (Rubin, Glennys)
February 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint,,, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Bluegreen Vacations Corporation, Bluegreen Vacations Unlimited, Inc.. Jordan Salkin served on 12/31/2020, answer due 1/21/2021. (Rubin, Glennys)
February 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint,,, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Bluegreen Vacations Corporation, Bluegreen Vacations Unlimited, Inc.. Harold O. Miller served on 1/4/2021, answer due 1/25/2021. (Rubin, Glennys)
February 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 2/1/2021. See attached document for full details. (pcs)
January 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Answer to Complaint by February 1, 2021. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom (BB)
January 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #1 Complaint,,, by Vindaloo Travel Network, LLC, Brian Stephen Wilbur, Holly Wilbur. Attorney Mark Richard Cheskin added to party Vindaloo Travel Network, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Mark Richard Cheskin added to party Brian Stephen Wilbur(pty:dft), Attorney Mark Richard Cheskin added to party Holly Wilbur(pty:dft). (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cheskin, Mark)
January 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER REQUIRING SCHEDULING REPORT AND CERTIFICATES OF INTERESTED PARTIES Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 12/31/2020. See attached document for full details. (pcs)
December 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Clerks Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case. Party(ies) Improperly Formatted. The Filer failed to enter the party name(s) in accordance with the CM/ECF Format for Adding Parties for Attorneys Guide. The correction was made. It is not necessary to re-file the document. (pcs)
December 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 FORM AO 120 SENT TO DIRECTOR OF U.S. PATENT AND TRADEMARK (pcs)
December 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Freedom Consumer Services, LLC, Harold O. Miller, Michael A. Molfetta, Molfetta Law, LLC, Jordan Salkin, Shayna G. Schroeder, Systema Marketing, Inc., Timeshare Termination Team, LLC, Vindaloo Travel Network, LLC, Brian Stephen Wilbur, Holly Wilbur. (pcs)
December 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Beth Bloom. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Alicia M. Otazo-Reyes is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (pcs)
December 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT Complaint for Damages and Injunctive Relief against Freedom Consumer Services, LLC d/b/a Timeshare Freedom Group d/b/a Timeshare Freedom, Harold O. Miller, Michael A. Molfetta, Molfetta Law, LLC, Jordan Salkin, Shayna G. Schroeder, Systema Marketing, Inc., Timeshare Termination Team, LLC, Vindaloo Travel Network, LLC d/b/a Timeshare Termination Team a/k/a Timeshare Termination Team, LLC, Brian Stephen Wilbur, Holly Wilbur. Filing fees $ 402.00 receipt number AFLSDC-14126908, filed by Bluegreen Vacations Corporation, Bluegreen Vacations Unlimited, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5 Part 1, #6 Exhibit 5 Part 2, #7 Civil Cover Sheet, #8 Summon(s), #9 Summon(s), #10 Summon(s), #11 Summon(s), #12 Summon(s), #13 Summon(s), #14 Summon(s), #15 Summon(s), #16 Summon(s), #17 Summon(s), #18 Summon(s))(Christu, Eric)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bluegreen Vacations Unlimited, Inc. et al v. Timeshare Termination Team, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vindaloo Travel Network, LLC d/b/a Timeshare Termination Team a/k/a Timeshare Termination Team, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Systema Marketing, Inc.
Represented By: Shannon L. Zetrouer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Freedom Consumer Services, LLC d/b/a Timeshare Freedom Group d/b/a Timeshare Freedom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Molfetta Law, LLC
Represented By: Omar Mustafa Saleh
Represented By: Jonathan Etra
Represented By: Mark Francis Raymond
Represented By: Christopher Cole Cavallo
Represented By: Becky Esquenazi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harold O. Miller
Represented By: Todd Michael Hoepker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jordan Salkin
Represented By: Mishaal Kirit Patel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shayna G. Schroeder
Represented By: Shannon L. Zetrouer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael A. Molfetta
Represented By: Omar Mustafa Saleh
Represented By: Mark Francis Raymond
Represented By: Christopher Cole Cavallo
Represented By: Jonathan Etra
Represented By: Becky Esquenazi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Stephen Wilbur
Represented By: Mark Richard Cheskin
Represented By: Clayton James Schmitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Timeshare Termination Team, LLC
Represented By: Mark Richard Cheskin
Represented By: Clayton James Schmitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Holly Wilbur
Represented By: Mark Richard Cheskin
Represented By: Clayton James Schmitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vindaloo Travel Network, LLC a Colorado limited liability company doing business as Timeshare Termination Team also known as Timeshare Termination Team, LLC
Represented By: Mark Richard Cheskin
Represented By: Clayton James Schmitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Freedom Consumer Services, LLC a Nevada limited liability doing business as Timeshare Freedom Group doing business as Timeshare Freedom
Represented By: Mishaal Kirit Patel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bluegreen Vacations Unlimited, Inc.
Represented By: Eric Christu
Represented By: Alfred Joseph Bennington, Jr.
Represented By: Glennys Ortega Rubin
Represented By: Michael James Quinn
Represented By: Benjamin Travis Brown
Represented By: Christian Michael Leger
Represented By: Jonathan Phillip Hart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bluegreen Vacations Corporation
Represented By: Eric Christu
Represented By: Alfred Joseph Bennington, Jr.
Represented By: Glennys Ortega Rubin
Represented By: Michael James Quinn
Represented By: Benjamin Travis Brown
Represented By: Christian Michael Leger
Represented By: Jonathan Phillip Hart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: Vindaloo Travel Network, LLC
Represented By: Mark Richard Cheskin
Represented By: Clayton James Schmitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?