Rodriguez v. Social Security
Plaintiff: Bradley Judas Rodriguez
Defendant: Social Security
Case Number: 1:2021cv20041
Filed: January 6, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Marcia G Cooke
Referring Judge: John J O'Sullivan
Nature of Suit: Social Security: HIA
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 0205
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 20, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER directing the plaintiff to submit additional summonses (to the U.S. Attorney General and to the U.S. Attorney's office) to the Clerk of Court. Signed by Ch. Magistrate Judge John J. O'Sullivan on 2/4/2021. See attached document for full details. (tro)
January 15, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Compliance re #6 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. (Package Prepared for service by the Marshals) (amb)
January 15, 2021 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to Social Security. (amb) (Main Document 8 replaced on 1/15/2021) (amb).
January 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER denying #4 Motion to Appoint Counsel. Signed by Ch. Magistrate Judge John J. O'Sullivan on 1/7/2021. See attached document for full details. (tro)
January 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Granting to the extent that the plaintiff need not prepay even a partial filing fee in this case, or to prepay costs such as for service of process. USM Service Ordered by 2/4/21 and Summonses NOT provided for USM Service. Signed by Ch. Magistrate Judge John J. O'Sullivan on 1/7/2021. See attached document for full details. (tro)
January 6, 2021 Filing 5 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Ch. Magistrate Judge John J. O'Sullivan. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge John J. O'Sullivan is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pursuant to the Clerks directive of this cause, this matter is referred to the Magistrate Judge for a ruling on all pre-trial, non-dispositive matters and for a Report and Recommendation on any dispositive matters. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (drz)
January 6, 2021 Filing 4 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Bradley Judas Rodriguez. Responses due by 1/20/2021 (drz)
January 6, 2021 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Bradley Judas Rodriguez. (drz)
January 6, 2021 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Marcia G. Cooke. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge John J. O'Sullivan is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (drz)
January 6, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Social Security. Filing fees $ 402.00. IFP Filed, filed by Bradley Judas Rodriguez. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit)Case restricted pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 5.2. (drz)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rodriguez v. Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security
Represented By: Noticing Social Security US Attorney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bradley Judas Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?