HILL v. Miami-Dade County School Board
Plaintiff: KENTREL HILL
Defendant: Miami-Dade County School Board
Case Number: 1:2021cv20129
Filed: January 12, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Jonathan Goodman
Referring Judge: Robert N Scola
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 42:12182
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 27, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 10, 2021 Filing 15 REPLY to Response to Motion re #6 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice #1 Complaint filed by Miami-Dade County School Board. (Madrigal, Jordan)
March 3, 2021 Filing 14 RESPONSE in Opposition re #6 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice #1 Complaint filed by KENTREL HILL. Replies due by 3/10/2021. (Smukler, Aron)
March 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Scheduling Order and Order of Referral to Mediation: ( Jury Trial set for 1/31/2022 before Judge Robert N. Scola Jr.., Calendar Call set for 1/25/2022 09:00 AM in Miami Division before Judge Robert N. Scola Jr..), ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediation. Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr on 3/1/2021. See attached document for full details. (cds) #Pattern Jury Instruction Builder - To access the latest, up to date changes to the 11th Circuit Pattern Jury Instructions go to https://pji.ca11.uscourts.gov or click here.
February 26, 2021 Filing 12 Joint SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 26(f) by Miami-Dade County School Board (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Joint Proposed Scheduling Order)(Madrigal, Jordan)
February 17, 2021 Reset Deadlines Per DE#11. Responses due by 3/3/2021 (cqs)
February 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 PAPERLESS ORDER: granting the Plaintiff's unopposed motion for extension of time to file her response to the Defendant's motion to dismiss. #10 . The response is now due March 3, 2021. Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr. (sda)
February 16, 2021 Filing 10 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #6 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice #1 Complaint by KENTREL HILL. (Smukler, Aron)
February 8, 2021 Filing 9 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by KENTREL HILL (Smukler, Aron)
February 8, 2021 Filing 8 Notice of NO Pending, Refiled, Related or Similar Actions by KENTREL HILL (Smukler, Aron)
February 3, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jordan Alexander Madrigal on behalf of Miami-Dade County School Board (Madrigal, Jordan)
February 3, 2021 Filing 6 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice #1 Complaint by Miami-Dade County School Board. Attorney Jordan Alexander Madrigal added to party Miami-Dade County School Board(pty:dft). Responses due by 2/17/2021 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Madrigal, Jordan)
January 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MAGISTRATE JUDGE GOODMAN'S DISCOVERY PROCEDURES ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman on 1/14/2021. See attached document for full details. (fbn)
January 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Requiring Discovery and Scheduling Conference and Order Referring Discovery Matters to the Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman. Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr on 1/13/2021. See attached document for full details. (cds)
January 13, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Miami-Dade County School Board. (cds)
January 12, 2021 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (cds)
January 12, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants. Filing fees $ 402.00 receipt number AFLSDC-14199216, filed by KENTREL HILL. (Attachments: #1 Summon(s), #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Walls, Tanesha)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: HILL v. Miami-Dade County School Board
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KENTREL HILL
Represented By: Tanesha LaShay Marie Walls
Represented By: Ruben Martin Saenz
Represented By: Aron Smukler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Miami-Dade County School Board
Represented By: Jordan Alexander Madrigal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?