Euclid Plaza Association, Inc. v. Aspen Specialty Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Euclid Plaza Association, Inc.
Defendant: Aspen Specialty Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2021cv20463
Filed: February 3, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Jonathan Goodman
Referring Judge: Robert N Scola
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 30, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Scheduling Order and Order of Referral to Mediation: ( Jury Trial set for 3/14/2022 before Judge Robert N. Scola Jr.., Calendar Call set for 3/8/2022 09:00 AM in Miami Division before Judge Robert N. Scola Jr..) Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr on 3/29/2021. See attached document for full details. (kpe) #Pattern Jury Instruction Builder - To access the latest, up to date changes to the 11th Circuit Pattern Jury Instructions go to https://pji.ca11.uscourts.gov or click here.
March 23, 2021 Filing 7 Joint SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 16.1 by Aspen Specialty Insurance Company (Rumbley, Charles)
March 22, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Igor Hernandez on behalf of Euclid Plaza Association, Inc.. Attorney Igor Hernandez added to party Euclid Plaza Association, Inc.(pty:pla). (Hernandez, Igor)
February 10, 2021 Filing 5 ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint re the Notice of Removal with Jury Demand by Aspen Specialty Insurance Company. (Rumbley, Charles)
February 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 MAGISTRATE JUDGE GOODMAN'S DISCOVERY PROCEDURES ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman on 2/9/2021. See attached document for full details. (fbn)
February 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order Requiring Discovery and Scheduling Conference and Order Referring Discovery Matters to Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr on 2/5/2021. See attached document for full details. (ebz)
February 3, 2021 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (ebz)
February 3, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (STATE COURT COMPLAINT - Complaint) Filing fee $ 402.00 receipt number AFLSDC-14330467, filed by Aspen Specialty Insurance Company. No Motion to Dismiss and/or Answer has been attached. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - Complaint, Summons, #3 Corporate Disclosure Statement)(Rumbley, Charles)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Euclid Plaza Association, Inc. v. Aspen Specialty Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Euclid Plaza Association, Inc.
Represented By: Michael Abraham Citron
Represented By: Igor Hernandez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aspen Specialty Insurance Company
Represented By: Benjamin Joseph Russell
Represented By: Charles R. Rumbley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?