Schottenstein v. J.P. Morgan Securities, LLC et al
Petitioner: Beverley B. Schottenstein
Respondent: Avi E. Schottenstein, J.P. Morgan Securities, LLC and Evan A. Schottenstein
Case Number: 1:2021cv20521
Filed: February 5, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Beth Bloom
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Arbitration
Cause of Action: 09 U.S.C. ยง 0009
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 9, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSING CASE. The above-styled action is administratively CLOSED without prejudice to the parties to file a settlement agreement for the Courts consideration and/or appropriate dismissal documentation. The Clerk of Court shall CLOSE this case for administrative purposes only. To the extent not otherwise disposed of, any hearings are CANCELED, all pending motions are DENIED AS MOOT, and all deadlines are TERMINATED. Motions terminated: #6 MOTION to Vacate Arbitration Award and Opposition to Petition to Confirm filed by Evan A. Schottenstein, Avi E. Schottenstein, #14 Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer filed by Beverley B. Schottenstein. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 3/18/2021. See attached document for full details. (amb)
March 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer by Beverley B. Schottenstein. (Ilgenfritz, Scott)
March 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #10 Motion for Extension of Time to File an opposition memorandum of law and a reply memorandum of law into one memorandum to be filed by March 22, 2021. The page limit is extended to 30 pages. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom (BB)
March 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 PAPERLESS ORDER granting in part and denying in part #11 Motion to Seal and Motion to File Excess Pages. The Court grants leave to file the Motion to Vacate and supporting documents under seal per Local Rule 5.4. The page limit is extended to 30 pages. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom (BB)
March 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Amended MOTION to Seal and Motion to File Excess Pages per Local Rule 5.4 by Avi E. Schottenstein, Evan A. Schottenstein. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Confidentiality Stipulation) (Fruin, Peter)
March 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #6 MOTION to Vacate Arbitration Award and Opposition to Petition to Confirm by Beverley B. Schottenstein. (Ilgenfritz, Scott)
March 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 3/10/2021. See attached document for full details. (amb)
March 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 PAPERLESS ORDER denying without prejudice #5 Motion to Seal for lack of proper conferral pursuant to Local Rule 7.1(a)(3). Signed by Judge Beth Bloom (ks01)
March 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT in Support of Motion to Vacate Arbitration Award signed by: Peter S. Fruin by Avi E. Schottenstein, Evan A. Schottenstein (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Statement of Claim, #2 Exhibit B - Evan Schottensteins Answer, #3 Exhibit C - Klein v. Drexel, #4 Exhibit D - Avi Schottensteins Answer, #5 Exhibit E - JPMS Ex. 56, #6 Exhibit F - JPMS Ex. 62, #7 Exhibit G - Rs Ex. 133, #8 Exhibit H - JPMS Ex. 42, #9 Exhibit I - Hearing Transcripts, #10 Exhibit J - Arbitration Agreement, #11 Exhibit K - Respondents Opposition to Zoom Motion, #12 Exhibit L - 8/18/2020 Panel Order, #13 Exhibit M - 10/5/2020 Letter from J. Brennan to L. Lasher, #14 Exhibit N - 10/13/2020 Letter from L. Lasher, #15 Exhibit O - 10/14/2020 Letter to FINRA, #16 Exhibit P - 10/15/2020 Letter to FINRA, #17 Exhibit Q - 10/15/2020 Director Denial, #18 Exhibit R - 10/15/2020 FINRA Letter, #19 Exhibit S - Respondents 10/15/2020 Letter to FINRA, #20 Exhibit T - Respondents 10/16/2020 Letter to FINRA, #21 Exhibit U - 10/16/2020 FINRA Letter, #22 Exhibit V - 10/22/2020 Disclosure from Scutti, #23 Exhibit W - 10/23/2020 Letter, #24 Exhibit X - 10/26/2020 Letter, #25 Exhibit Y - 10/26/2020 FINRA Letter, #26 Exhibit Z - Cs Ex. 205, #27 Exhibit AA - Rs Ex. 192, #28 Exhibit BB - Motion for Chase Bank Subpoena, #29 Exhibit CC - Cl.s 3/23/2020 Opp., #30 Exhibit DD - 4/20/2020 Decision, #31 Exhibit EE - Rs Ex. 100, #32 Exhibit FF - Solomon Complaint, #33 Exhibit GG - Solomon 11/9/2020 Disclosure Report, #34 Exhibit HH - Rich Docket, #35 Exhibit II - Rich 8/28/2020 Disclosure Report, #36 Exhibit JJ - 9/15/2020 Subpoena, #37 Exhibit KK - 10/9/2020 Email from David Weintraub, #38 Exhibit LL - 9/23/2020 Wells Fargo Subpoena, #39 Exhibit MM - 6/24/2020 Motion for Wells Fargo Subpoena, #40 Exhibit NN - 10/19/2020 Petition to Enforce Arbitration Subpoenas, #41 Exhibit OO - Alexis Mot. to Dismiss, #42 Exhibit PP - Wells Fargo Opp., #43 Exhibit QQ - Rs Ex. 125, #44 Exhibit RR - Rs Ex. 127, #45 Exhibit SS - Rs Ex. 128, #46 Exhibit TT - Rs Ex. 130, #47 Exhibit UU - Arbitrator Misconduct Log, #48 Exhibit VV - Arbitrator Rich Off-Camera Video, #49 Exhibit WW - Arbitrator Rich Sleeping Video, #50 Exhibit XX - Chairperson Solomon Sleeping Video, #51 Exhibit YY - Arbitrator Scutti Phone Use Video, #52 Exhibit AAA - Cs Ex. 171, #53 Exhibit BBB - Panel Order, #54 Exhibit CCC - George H. Friedman Letter to the Editor, #55 Exhibit DDD - FINRA Arbitrator Resource Guide for Virtual Hearings, #56 Exhibit EEE - FINRA Arbitrators Guide, #57 Exhibit FFF - Scutti 10/14/2020 Disclosure Report)(Fruin, Peter)
March 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MOTION to Vacate Arbitration Award and Opposition to Petition to Confirm by Avi E. Schottenstein, Evan A. Schottenstein. Responses due by 3/22/2021 (Fruin, Peter)
March 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MOTION to Seal Motion to Vacate Arbitration Award and Motion to File Excess Pages per Local Rule 5.4 by Avi E. Schottenstein, Evan A. Schottenstein. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Confidentiality Stipulation) (Fruin, Peter)
February 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REQUIRING SCHEDULING REPORT AND CERTIFICATES OF INTERESTED PARTIES. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 2/8/2021. See attached document for full details. (amb)
February 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Summons Issued as to J.P. Morgan Securities, LLC, Avi E. Schottenstein, Evan A. Schottenstein. (mee)
February 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Beth Bloom. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Alicia M. Otazo-Reyes is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (mee)
February 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 Motion (Complaint) to Confirm Arbitration Award. Filing fee $402.00 receipt number AFLSDC-14345714, filed by Beverley B. Schottenstein. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s) J.P. Morgan Securities, LLC, #3 Summon(s) Evan A. Schottenstein, #4 Summon(s) Avi E. Schottenstein)(Burns, Guy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Schottenstein v. J.P. Morgan Securities, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Avi E. Schottenstein
Represented By: Peter Sean Fruin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: J.P. Morgan Securities, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Evan A. Schottenstein
Represented By: Peter Sean Fruin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Beverley B. Schottenstein
Represented By: Guy Millard Burns
Represented By: Scott Carter Ilgenfritz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?