Eugene v. HOME DEPOT U.S.A., INC.
Plaintiff: Natalie Eugene
Defendant: HOME DEPOT U.S.A., INC.
Case Number: 1:2021cv20567
Filed: February 10, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Donald L Graham
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1442
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 30, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 NOTICE OF COURT PRACTICE UPON NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT AND ORDER CLOSING CASE. Signed by Senior Judge Donald L. Graham on 3/30/2021. See attached document for full details. (mee)
March 18, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Settlement by Natalie Eugene. Attorney Max Lloyd Horowitz added to party Natalie Eugene (pty:pla). (Horowitz, Max)
February 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER/NOTICE Setting Status Conference: Telephonic Status Conference set for 4/7/2021 02:00 PM in Miami Division before Senior Judge Donald L. Graham. Signed by Senior Judge Donald L. Graham on 2/19/21. See attached document for full details. (gfw)
February 17, 2021 Filing 5 Defendant's ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint re the Notice of Removal by HOME DEPOT U.S.A., INC.. (Pena, Kelly)
February 16, 2021 Filing 4 Defendant's Corporate Disclosure Statement by HOME DEPOT U.S.A., INC. identifying Corporate Parent The Home Depot, Inc. for HOME DEPOT U.S.A., INC. (Pena, Kelly)
February 15, 2021 Filing 3 Plaintiff's Certificate of Other Affiliates by Natalie Eugene (Georges-Pierre, Anthony)
February 10, 2021 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Senior Judge Donald L. Graham. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Chris M. McAliley is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (mee)
February 10, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (STATE COURT COMPLAINT - State Court Complaint) Filing fee $ 402.00 receipt number AFLSDC-14365051, no answer/affirmative defenses filed by HOME DEPOT U.S.A., INC.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B)(Pena, Kelly)Text Modified on 2/10/2021 (mee).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Eugene v. HOME DEPOT U.S.A., INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Natalie Eugene
Represented By: Anthony Maximillien Georges-Pierre
Represented By: Max Lloyd Horowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HOME DEPOT U.S.A., INC.
Represented By: Christopher Patrick Hammon
Represented By: Kelly Marie Pena
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?