Murphy v. Miami Dade Corrections & Rehabilitation TGK Detention Center Correctional Officer et al
Plaintiff: Javar C. Murphy
Defendant: Miami Dade Corrections & Rehabilitation TGK Detention Center Correctional Officer and Jackson Health and Hospital Nurse
Case Number: 1:2021cv20595
Filed: February 12, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Beth Bloom
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 29, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 29, 2021 Deadline(s)/Hearing(s) terminated Per Order Dismissing Case without Prejudice DE#5 . (drz)
March 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER DISMISSING CASE WITH OUT PREJUDICE. The Clerk is instructed to mark the case as CLOSED, and any pending motions are DENIED as moot. Closing Case. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 3/29/2021. See attached document for full details. (drz)
February 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER denying without prejudice #3 Plaintiff's Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs. On or before March 18, 2021, Plaintiff shall either pay the $402 filing fee or may renew his motion to proceed in forma pauperis. Plaintiff's Complaint, ECF No. #1 , is DISMISSED without prejudice. Consistent with the purpose of Fed. R. Civ. P. 8, Plaintiff is granted leave to file an amended complaint by March 18, 2021. (Amended Complaint due by 3/18/2021. Filing Fee due by 3/18/2021). Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 2/16/2021. See attached document for full details. (mc)
February 12, 2021 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Javar C. Murphy. (daa)
February 12, 2021 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Beth Bloom. (daa)
February 12, 2021 Filing 1 Complaint pursuant to 42 USC 1983 against Jackson Health and Hospital Nurse, Miami Dade Corrections & Rehabilitation TGK Detention Center Correctional Officer. Filing fee $ 402.00. IFP Filed, filed by Javar C. Murphy. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(daa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Murphy v. Miami Dade Corrections & Rehabilitation TGK Detention Center Correctional Officer et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Javar C. Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Miami Dade Corrections & Rehabilitation TGK Detention Center Correctional Officer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jackson Health and Hospital Nurse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?