Lucius v. Diatrade LLC
Plaintiff: Windy Lucius
Defendant: Diatrade LLC doing business as EPL Diamonds
Case Number: 1:2021cv20638
Filed: February 16, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Jonathan Goodman
Referring Judge: Robert N Scola
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12182
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 28, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 6, 2021 Filing 14 MOTION for Default Judgment and Default Final Judgment and Application for Attorney's Fees, Costs, Expert Witness Fees, and Litigation Expenses and Memorandum of Law by Windy Lucius. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A- Expert Summary and CV, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B- Affidavit of J. Courtney Cunningham, Esq., #3 Text of Proposed Order, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(Cunningham, Juan)
April 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 PAPERLESS ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: This matter is before the Court upon an independent review of the record. On March 23, 2021, the Court entered its order on default judgment procedure, instructing the Plaintiff to move for default judgment by April 2, 2021. #12 . In its order, the Court warned the Plaintiff that her failure to timely seek default judgment could result in her case being dismissed without prejudice. The Court orders the Plaintiff to show cause for her failure to abide by the Courts order by April 6, 2021. Alternatively, if the Plaintiff no longer wishes to prosecute this action, or has otherwise settled the matter, the Plaintiff must immediately file a notice of voluntary dismissal in keeping with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(i). Should the Plaintiff fail to timely respond to this order, the Plaintiff is warned that the Court will dismiss this matter without prejudice, without further notice. Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr. (sda)
March 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Order on Default Judgment Procedure, Motion for Default Judgment due 4/2/2021, Diatrade LLC response due 4/2/2021. Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr on 3/23/2021. See attached document for full details. (pcs)
March 23, 2021 Filing 11 Clerks Entry of Default as to Diatrade LLC - Motions Terminated: #10 Motion for Clerks Entry of Default Signed by DEPUTY CLERK on 3/23/2021. (pcs)
March 22, 2021 Filing 10 MOTION for Clerks Entry of Default as to Diatrade LLC by Windy Lucius. (Cunningham, Juan)
March 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Order on Clerk's Default Procedure (Motion for Entry of Clerk's Default due 3/22/2021). Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr on 3/15/2021. See attached document for full details. (pcs)
March 2, 2021 Filing 8 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Windy Lucius. Diatrade LLC served on 2/19/2021, answer due 3/12/2021. (Cunningham, Juan)
February 22, 2021 Filing 7 Notice of NO Pending, Refiled, Related or Similar Actions by Windy Lucius (Cunningham, Juan)
February 22, 2021 Filing 6 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by Windy Lucius identifying Other Affiliate ADASure for Windy Lucius (Cunningham, Juan)
February 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MAGISTRATE JUDGE GOODMAN'S DISCOVERY PROCEDURES ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman on 2/17/2021. See attached document for full details. (fbn)
February 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Requiring Discovery and Scheduling Conference, Order Requiring Verified Statement in ADA Case, and Order Referring Discovery Matters to the Magistrate Judge, referring case to Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman for Discovery Matters. Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr on 2/16/2021. See attached document for full details. (pcs)
February 16, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Diatrade LLC. (pcs)
February 16, 2021 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (pcs)
February 16, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Injunctive Relief against Diatrade LLC. Filing fees $ 402.00 receipt number AFLSDC-14393071, filed by Windy Lucius. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s))(Cunningham, Juan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lucius v. Diatrade LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Diatrade LLC doing business as EPL Diamonds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Windy Lucius
Represented By: Juan Courtney Cunningham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?