Taveras et al v. Ocwen Loan Services, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Nathan S. Taveras and Eliezer Taveras
Defendant: U.S. Bank National Association, as Trustee, for the GSAMP Trust 2006-HE6 Mortgage Pass-Through Certificates, Series 2006-HEG C/O Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC 5720 Primiere Park Drive West Palm Beach, FL, Ocwen Loan Services, Inc., U.S. Bank National Assiciation, The State of Florida and U.S. Bank National Association
Case Number: 1:2021cv20660
Filed: February 17, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Jonathan Goodman
Referring Judge: Robert N Scola
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 20, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 16, 2021 Filing 33 NOTICE of Compliance re #32 Order on Emergency Motion. (A copy of the Order was mailed to the Plaintiffs) (jbs)
April 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 32 Order Granting In Part and Denying in Part #31 Emergency Motion.The Plaintiffs' alternative request for a two-day extension to respond to the motion to dismiss is granted. The response is due by no later than April 21, 2021. Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr on 4/15/2021. See attached document for full details. (jbs)
April 15, 2021 Filing 31 EMERGENCY MOTION LEAVE TO AMEND #1 Complaint by Eliezer Taveras, Nathan S. Taveras. Responses due by 4/29/2021 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(jbs)
April 15, 2021 Filing 30 NOTICE TO COURT by Eliezer Taveras, Nathan S. Taveras (jbs)
April 14, 2021 Filing 29 Clerks Notice of Docket Correction re 28 Order, deadline corrected per chambers. Plaintiffs' belated response is due by close of business on April 19, 2021.. Docket Text Modified by Clerk. (mf)
April 13, 2021 Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings as per DE 28 re #15 Defendant's MOTION TO DISMISS #1 Complaint,, FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM . Response due by 4/19/2021 (lk)
April 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 28 PAPERLESS ORDER requiring response. The Defendants in this action filed a joint motion to dismiss on March 16, 2021. The deadline to respond was March 30, 2021, however, the pro se Plaintiffs did not file a response nor did they seek an extension to do so. To avoid the Court granting the motion by default, the Plaintiffs' belated response is due by close of business on April 19, 2021. A failure to respond to the motion to dismiss will result in the Court granting the motion by default and closing the case for want of prosecution. Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr. (agn) Corrected date per chambers on 4/14/2021 (mf).
April 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 27 PAPERLESS ORDER: The Court denies #26 the Plaintiffs' motion for a temporary restraining order and preliminary injunction. The motion was filed as an emergency motion arguing that a restraining order is necessary to prevent the Defendants from foreclosing on the Plaintiffs' property. The motion fails to comply with Rule 7.1(d)(1), which requires that the motion specify a date by which a ruling is necessary and that the motion include a specific certification of facts. The Plaintiffs are cautioned that the filing of an emergency motion that fails to comply with the Local Rule may result in sanctions against the movant. Moreover, the Court strikes #25 amended complaint. The amended complaint was filed two months after the original complaint and the Plaintiffs did not seek leave from Court to file same. Accordingly, the amended complaint is stricken for violating Fed. R. Civ. P. 15. Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr. (agn)
April 13, 2021 Filing 26 EMERGENCY MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction (Responses due by 4/27/2021) by Eliezer Taveras, Nathan S. Taveras. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(jbs)
April 12, 2021 Filing 25 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Ocwen Loan Services, Inc., The State of Florida, U.S. Bank National Assiciation, U.S. Bank National Association, U.S. Bank National Association, as Trustee, for the GSAMP Trust 2006-HE6 Mortgage Pass-Through Certificates, Series 2006-HEG C/O Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC 5720 Primiere Park Drive West Palm Beach, FL, filed by Eliezer Taveras, Nathan S. Taveras.(jbs)
April 12, 2021 Filing 24 NOTICE of Striking/Instruction to Clerk re #23 Amended Complaint/Amended Notice of Removal, filed by Nathan S. Taveras, Eliezer Taveras by Eliezer Taveras, Nathan S. Taveras (jbs)
April 12, 2021 Filing 23 STRICKEN per DE #24 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Ocwen Loan Services, Inc., The State of Florida, U.S. Bank National Assiciation, U.S. Bank National Association, U.S. Bank National Association, as Trustee, for the GSAMP Trust 2006-HE6 Mortgage Pass-Through Certificates, Series 2006-HEG C/O Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC 5720 Primiere Park Drive West Palm Beach, FL, filed by Eliezer Taveras, Nathan S. Taveras.(jbs) Modified text on 4/13/2021 (jbs).
March 16, 2021 Filing 22 Defendant's Corporate Disclosure Statement by Ocwen Loan Services, Inc., U.S. Bank National Assiciation, U.S. Bank National Association, U.S. Bank National Association, as Trustee, for the GSAMP Trust 2006-HE6 Mortgage Pass-Through Certificates, Series 2006-HEG C/O Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC 5720 Primiere Park Drive West Palm Beach, FL identifying Corporate Parent US BANCORP for U.S. Bank National Assiciation, U.S. Bank National Association, U.S. Bank National Association, as Trustee, for the GSAMP Trust 2006-HE6 Mortgage Pass-Through Certificates, Series 2006-HEG C/O Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC 5720 Primiere Park Drive West Palm Beach, FL ; Corporate Parent Ocwen Financial Corporation (NYSE:OCN), Other Affiliate PHH Mortgage Corporation, a New Jersey corporation and successor by merger to Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC, a limited liability corporation organized under the laws of the state of Florida for Ocwen Loan Services, Inc. (Romero, Ezequiel)
March 16, 2021 Filing 21 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint,, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Eliezer Taveras, Nathan S. Taveras. U.S. Bank National Assiciation served on 2/23/2021, answer due 3/16/2021. (jbs)
March 16, 2021 Filing 20 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint,, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Eliezer Taveras, Nathan S. Taveras. Ocwen Loan Services, Inc. served on 2/23/2021, answer due 3/16/2021. (jbs)
March 16, 2021 Filing 19 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint,, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Eliezer Taveras, Nathan S. Taveras. U.S. Bank National Association served on 2/23/2021, answer due 3/16/2021. (jbs)
March 16, 2021 Filing 18 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint,, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Eliezer Taveras, Nathan S. Taveras. U.S. Bank National Association, as Trustee, for the GSAMP Trust 2006-HE6 Mortgage Pass-Through Certificates, Series 2006-HEG C/O Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC 5720 Primiere Park Drive West Palm Beach, FL served on 2/23/2021, answer due 3/16/2021. (jbs)
March 16, 2021 Filing 17 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint,, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Eliezer Taveras, Nathan S. Taveras. The State of Florida served on 3/3/2021, answer due 3/24/2021. (jbs)
March 16, 2021 Filing 16 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by William Bard Brockman on behalf of Ocwen Loan Services, Inc., U.S. Bank National Assiciation, U.S. Bank National Association, U.S. Bank National Association, as Trustee, for the GSAMP Trust 2006-HE6 Mortgage Pass-Through Certificates, Series 2006-HEG C/O Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC 5720 Primiere Park Drive West Palm Beach, FL. Attorney William Bard Brockman added to party Ocwen Loan Services, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney William Bard Brockman added to party U.S. Bank National Assiciation(pty:dft), Attorney William Bard Brockman added to party U.S. Bank National Association(pty:dft), Attorney William Bard Brockman added to party U.S. Bank National Association, as Trustee, for the GSAMP Trust 2006-HE6 Mortgage Pass-Through Certificates, Series 2006-HEG C/O Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC 5720 Primiere Park Drive West Palm Beach, FL (pty:dft). (Brockman, William)
March 16, 2021 Filing 15 Defendant's MOTION TO DISMISS #1 Complaint,, FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Ocwen Loan Services, Inc., U.S. Bank National Assiciation, U.S. Bank National Association, U.S. Bank National Association, as Trustee, for the GSAMP Trust 2006-HE6 Mortgage Pass-Through Certificates, Series 2006-HEG C/O Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC 5720 Primiere Park Drive West Palm Beach, FL. Responses due by 3/30/2021 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Consent Final Judgment of Foreclosure, #2 Exhibit Amended Motion to Set Aside Consent Final Judgment, #3 Exhibit Order Denying Motion to Set Aside Consent Final Judgment of Foreclosure, #4 Exhibit Notice of Appeal, #5 Exhibit Order on Dismissal of Appeal)(Romero, Ezequiel)
March 16, 2021 Filing 14 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Ezequiel Joseph Romero on behalf of Ocwen Loan Services, Inc., U.S. Bank National Assiciation, U.S. Bank National Association, U.S. Bank National Association, as Trustee, for the GSAMP Trust 2006-HE6 Mortgage Pass-Through Certificates, Series 2006-HEG C/O Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC 5720 Primiere Park Drive West Palm Beach, FL. Attorney Ezequiel Joseph Romero added to party Ocwen Loan Services, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Ezequiel Joseph Romero added to party U.S. Bank National Assiciation(pty:dft), Attorney Ezequiel Joseph Romero added to party U.S. Bank National Association(pty:dft), Attorney Ezequiel Joseph Romero added to party U.S. Bank National Association, as Trustee, for the GSAMP Trust 2006-HE6 Mortgage Pass-Through Certificates, Series 2006-HEG C/O Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC 5720 Primiere Park Drive West Palm Beach, FL (pty:dft). (Romero, Ezequiel)
February 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 PAPERLESS ORDER: The Court denies the pro se Plaintiff's #12 motion to register on CM/ECF. Pro Se parties are not permitted to register for CM/ECF accounts or file case documents electronically. However, pro se litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of the Court's website. Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr (agn)
February 23, 2021 Filing 12 MOTION Request for Authorization to Register to CM/ECF by Eliezer Taveras. (jbs)
February 23, 2021 Filing 11 Notice of Pending, Refiled, Related or Similar Actions by Eliezer Taveras, Nathan S. Taveras (jbs)
February 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MAGISTRATE JUDGE GOODMAN'S DISCOVERY PROCEDURES ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman on 2/22/2021. See attached document for full details. (fbn)
February 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER PROVIDING INSTRUCTIONS TO PRO SE LITIGANT. Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr on 2/19/2021. See attached document for full details. (lk)
February 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Order Requiring Discovery and Scheduling Conference and Order Referring Discovery Matters to the Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman. Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr on 2/19/2021. See attached document for full details. (jbs)
February 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga recused. Case reassigned to Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr for all further proceedings. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 2/17/2021. See attached document for full details. (vjk)
February 17, 2021 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to U.S. Bank National Assiciation, U.S. Bank National Association. (jbs)
February 17, 2021 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Ocwen Loan Services, Inc., The State of Florida, U.S. Bank National Association, as Trustee, for the GSAMP Trust 2006-HE6 Mortgage Pass-Through Certificates, Series 2006-HEG C/O Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC 5720 Primiere Park Drive West Palm Beach, FL, 33407. (cds)
February 17, 2021 Filing 4 Clerks Notice of Receipt of Filing Fee received on 2/17/2021 in the amount of $ 402.00, receipt number FLS100223818. (vt)
February 17, 2021 Filing 3 Consent by Pro Se Litigant (Non-Prisoner) Nathan S. Taveras to receive Notices of Electronic Filing at email address: nathantaveras799@hotmail.com (cds)
February 17, 2021 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Edwin G. Torres is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (cds)
February 17, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Ocwen Loan Services, Inc., The State of Florida, U.S. Bank National Assiciation, U.S. Bank National Association, U.S. Bank National Association, as Trustee, for the GSAMP Trust 2006-HE6 Mortgage Pass-Through Certificates, Series 2006-HEG C/O Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC 5720 Primiere Park Drive West Palm Beach, FL,. Filing fees $ 402.00 (Not Paid/No IFP), filed by Eliezer Taveras, Nathan S. Taveras. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit, #3 Summon(s))(cds)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Taveras et al v. Ocwen Loan Services, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Bank National Association, as Trustee, for the GSAMP Trust 2006-HE6 Mortgage Pass-Through Certificates, Series 2006-HEG C/O Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC 5720 Primiere Park Drive West Palm Beach, FL
Represented By: Ezequiel Joseph Romero
Represented By: William Bard Brockman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ocwen Loan Services, Inc.
Represented By: Ezequiel Joseph Romero
Represented By: William Bard Brockman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Bank National Assiciation
Represented By: Ezequiel Joseph Romero
Represented By: William Bard Brockman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The State of Florida
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Bank National Association
Represented By: Ezequiel Joseph Romero
Represented By: William Bard Brockman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nathan S. Taveras
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eliezer Taveras
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?