Landivar et al v. Celebrity Cruises Inc.
Plaintiff: Maria Gutierrez and Alcides Landivar
Defendant: Celebrity Cruises Inc.
Case Number: 1:2021cv20815
Filed: February 27, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Cecilia M Altonaga
Referring Judge: Edwin G Torres
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 28:1333
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 16, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER SETTING DISCOVERY PROCEDURES. Signed by Magistrate Judge Edwin G. Torres on 4/16/2021. See attached document for full details. (mdc)
April 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER SETTING TRIAL AND PRE-TRIAL SCHEDULE, REQUIRING MEDIATION, AND REFERRING CERTAIN MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Jury Trial set for 3/28/2022 in Miami Division before Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga. Calendar Call set for 3/22/2022 09:00 AM in Miami Division before Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga. Amended Pleadings and Joinder of Parties due by 5/26/2021. Discovery, including Expert Discovery, due by 11/29/2021. Mediation Deadline 12/6/2021. All pre-trial and Daubert Motions due by 12/14/2021. Joint Pretrial Stipulation and In Limine Motions due by 1/11/2022. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 4/14/2021. See attached document for full details. (wc) #Pattern Jury Instruction Builder - To access the latest, up to date changes to the 11th Circuit Pattern Jury Instructions go to https://pji.ca11.uscourts.gov or click here.
April 14, 2021 Filing 13 Joint SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 16.1 by Maria Gutierrez, Alcides Landivar (Perez, Luis)
April 14, 2021 Filing 12 Defendant's Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by Celebrity Cruises Inc. identifying Corporate Parent ROYAL CARIBBEAN CRUISES LTD. for Celebrity Cruises Inc. (Gutwein, Evan)
April 14, 2021 Filing 11 Clerks Notice to Filer re #10 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement. Other Affiliates/Corporate Parents Not Entered; ERROR - The Filer failed to enter all Other Affiliates/Corporate Parents from the Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement. Filer is instructed to refile their Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement and enter the missing Other Affiliates/Corp Parents. Note - Other Affiliates/Corporate Parents do not appear on the docket sheet. (drz)
April 13, 2021 Filing 10 Defendant's Corporate Disclosure Statement and Certificate of Interested Persons by Celebrity Cruises Inc. (Gutwein, Evan)
April 13, 2021 Filing 9 Plaintiff's Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement - NONE disclosed Certificate of Interested Parties and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Maria Gutierrez, Alcides Landivar (Perez, Luis)
April 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER that the parties shall comply with the April 1, 2021 Order requiring the parties to prepare and file: (1) a joint scheduling report; (2) certificates of interested parties; and (3) corporate disclosure statements #6 by April 14, 2021, failing which the case will be dismissed. Furthermore, in their written submissions, the parties shall explain why they failed to comply with the April 1 Order, necessitating this Order. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 4/13/2021. See attached document for full details. (wc)
April 2, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Evan S. Gutwein on behalf of Celebrity Cruises Inc.. Attorney Evan S. Gutwein added to party Celebrity Cruises Inc.(pty:dft). (Gutwein, Evan)
April 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order Requiring Joint Scheduling Report and Certificate of Interested Parties by 6/11/2021 or within ten (10) days of Defendant appearing in this matter, whichever is earlier. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 4/1/2021. See attached document for full details. (ps1)
March 31, 2021 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Alcides Landivar, Maria Gutierrez. Celebrity Cruises Inc. waiver sent on 3/30/2021, answer due 6/1/2021. (Perez, Luis)
March 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER that on or before May 28, 2021, Plaintiffs shall perfect service upon Defendant or show cause why this action should not be dismissed for failure to perfect service of process. Failure to file proof of service or show good cause by May 28 will result in a dismissal without prejudice and without further notice. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 3/30/2021. See attached document for full details. (wc)
March 1, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Celebrity Cruises Inc. (bb)
February 27, 2021 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Edwin G. Torres is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (bb)
February 27, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Celebrity Cruises Inc.. Filing fees $ 402.00 receipt number AFLSDC-14462333, filed by Alcides Landivar, Maria Gutierrez. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s))(Perez, Luis)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Landivar et al v. Celebrity Cruises Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Celebrity Cruises Inc.
Represented By: Evan S. Gutwein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria Gutierrez
Represented By: Michael A. Winkleman
Represented By: Jacqueline Garcell
Represented By: Luis Alexander Perez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alcides Landivar
Represented By: Michael A. Winkleman
Represented By: Jacqueline Garcell
Represented By: Luis Alexander Perez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?