Lee v. Frost et al
Plaintiff: Sammy Lee
Defendant: Adam Logal, Opko Health, Inc., Robert S Fishel, Richard M Krasno, Steven D Rubin, Richard C Pfenninger, Alice Lin-Tsing Yu, Jane Hsiao, Phillip Frost, Richard A Lerner, John A Paganelli and Jane H. Hsiao
Consolidated Plaintiff: Andy Yu
Case Number: 1:2021cv20885
Filed: March 5, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Cecilia M Altonaga
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 0078
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 13, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER DISMISSING and Closing Case. Signed by Chief Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 9/13/2021. See attached document for full details. (ps1)
August 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER granting #62 Motion to Dismiss. If Plaintiffs wish to file a motion for leave to file an amended complaint, they must do so on or before September 10, 2021, failing which the Court will dismiss this action without prejudice and without further notice. Signed by Chief Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 8/31/2021. See attached document for full details. (ps1)
June 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 68 REPLY to Response to Motion re #62 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice #61 Amended Complaint/Amended Notice of Removal Verified Shareholder Derivative Consolidated Amended Complaint, and Incorporated Memorandum of Law filed by Robert S Fishel, Phillip Frost, Jane H. Hsiao, Richard M Krasno, Richard A Lerner, Adam Logal, Opko Health, Inc., John A Paganelli, Richard C Pfenninger, Steven D Rubin, Alice Lin-Tsing Yu. (Miller, Brian)
June 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 67 CLERK'S NOTICE - Attorney Admissions has updated the contact information for PHV attorney Timothy W. Brown re #66 Notice of Change of Address, Email or Law Firm Name. (pt)
June 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 66 NOTICE of Change of Address, Email or Law Firm Name by Jose D. Sosa (Sosa, Jose)
June 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 65 Clerks Notice to Filer re #64 Notice of Change of Address, Email or Law Firm Name. Login/Signature Block Violation; CORRECTIVE ACTION REQUIRED - The name of attorney e-filing this document via their CM/ECF login does not match the name of attorney on the signature block of the document. The name used for login must match the typed name on signature block of the document. This filing is a violation of Section 3J(1) of CM/ECF Admin Procedures and Local Rule 5.1(b). Filer must File a Notice of Striking, then refile document pursuant to CM/ECF Admin Procedures and Local Rules. (drz)
June 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 64 NOTICE of Change of Address, Email or Law Firm Name by Jose D. Sosa (Sosa, Jose)
June 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 63 RESPONSE in Opposition re #62 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice #61 Amended Complaint/Amended Notice of Removal Verified Shareholder Derivative Consolidated Amended Complaint, and Incorporated Memorandum of Law filed by Sammy Lee, Andy Yu. Replies due by 6/21/2021. (Sosa, Jose)
May 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 62 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice #61 Amended Complaint/Amended Notice of Removal Verified Shareholder Derivative Consolidated Amended Complaint, and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by Robert S Fishel, Phillip Frost, Jane H. Hsiao, Richard M Krasno, Richard A Lerner, Adam Logal, Opko Health, Inc., John A Paganelli, Richard C Pfenninger, Steven D Rubin, Alice Lin-Tsing Yu. Responses due by 6/7/2021 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9)(Miller, Brian)
April 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 61 AMENDED COMPLAINT (Verified and Consolidated) against All Defendants, filed by Sammy Lee, Andy Yu.(Sosa, Jose)
April 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER after scheduling conference: Amended Complaint due by 4/19/2021. Combined Motion to dismiss due by 5/24/2021. Response to motion to dismiss due by 6/14/2021. Reply due by 6/21/2021. Discovery in this matter is stayed pending resolution of the motion to dismiss. Should the motion to dismiss be denied, the Court will enter a scheduling order to govern the remainder of the case. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 4/15/2021. See attached document for full details. (ps1)
April 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 59 PAPERLESS Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga: Scheduling Conference held on 4/15/2021. Total time in court: 15 minutes. Attorney Appearance(s): Brian Paul Miller, Samantha J. Kavanaugh, Jose D. Sosa, Timothy W. Brown, Court Reporter: Stephanie McCarn, 305-523-5518 / Stephanie_McCarn@flsd.uscourts.gov. (edr)
April 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 58 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #57 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga (CMA)
April 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 57 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Timothy Brown. Filing Fee $ 200.00 Receipt # AFLSDC-14605754 by Sammy Lee, Andy Yu. Responses due by 4/28/2021 (Attachments: #1 Certification Certification of Timothy Brown, Esq., #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Sosa, Jose)
April 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER SETTING HEARING: Scheduling Conference set for 4/15/2021 at 10:00 AM in Miami Division before Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 4/13/2021. See attached document for full details. (wc)
April 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 55 Joint SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 16.1 by Robert S Fishel, Phillip Frost, Jane H. Hsiao, Richard M Krasno, Richard A Lerner, Adam Logal, Opko Health, Inc., John A Paganelli, Richard C Pfenninger, Steven D Rubin, Alice Lin-Tsing Yu (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Miller, Brian)
April 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 54 Plaintiff's Notice to Proceed with the Initial Complaint to #22 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer,, by Sammy Lee, Andy Yu. (Sosa, Jose)
April 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 53 Plaintiff's Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by Sammy Lee, Andy Yu (Sosa, Jose)
April 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER denying #51 Defendants' Motion for a Stay of the Deadline to File a Joint Scheduling Report. Nevertheless, the parties are granted an extension of time until April 12, 2021 to file a joint scheduling report. The deadline for the parties' submission of their certificates of interested parties remains April 5, 2021. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 4/2/2021. See attached document for full details. (wc)
April 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 51 Defendant's MOTION to Stay re #21 Order Requiring Joint Scheduling Report, by Robert S Fishel, Phillip Frost, Jane H. Hsiao, Richard M Krasno, Richard A Lerner, Adam Logal, Opko Health, Inc., John A Paganelli, Richard C Pfenninger, Steven D Rubin, Alice Lin-Tsing Yu. Responses due by 4/16/2021 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Miller, Brian)
April 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 50 Defendant's Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement - NONE disclosed by Robert S Fishel, Phillip Frost, Jane H. Hsiao, Richard M Krasno, Richard A Lerner, Adam Logal, Opko Health, Inc., John A Paganelli, Richard C Pfenninger, Steven D Rubin, Alice Lin-Tsing Yu (Miller, Brian)
April 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER granting #47 MOTION to Appoint Lead Counsel Phillip Kim, Timothy Brown. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 4/1/2021. See attached document for full details. (ps1)
March 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 48 NOTICE by Sammy Lee, Andy Yu re #47 Unopposed MOTION to Appoint Lead Counsel The Rosen Law Firm, P.A., Phillip Kim, and The Brown Law Firm, P.C., Timothy Brown (Attachments: #1 Exhibit B - The Brown Law Firm) (Sosa, Jose)
March 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 47 Unopposed MOTION to Appoint Lead Counsel The Rosen Law Firm, P.A., Phillip Kim, and The Brown Law Firm, P.C., Timothy Brown by Sammy Lee, Andy Yu. Responses due by 4/14/2021 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Rosen Law Firm Biography, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Sosa, Jose)
March 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 46 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Sammy Lee, Andy Yu. Alice Lin-Tsing Yu waiver sent on 3/24/2021, answer due 5/24/2021. (Sosa, Jose)
March 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 45 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Sammy Lee, Andy Yu. Steven D Rubin waiver sent on 3/24/2021, answer due 5/24/2021. (Sosa, Jose)
March 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 44 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Sammy Lee, Andy Yu. Richard C Pfenninger waiver sent on 3/24/2021, answer due 5/24/2021. (Sosa, Jose)
March 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 43 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Sammy Lee, Andy Yu. John A Paganelli waiver sent on 3/24/2021, answer due 5/24/2021. (Sosa, Jose)
March 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 42 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Sammy Lee, Andy Yu. Adam Logal waiver sent on 3/24/2021, answer due 5/24/2021. (Sosa, Jose)
March 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 41 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Sammy Lee, Andy Yu. Richard A Lerner waiver sent on 3/24/2021, answer due 5/24/2021. (Sosa, Jose)
March 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 40 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Sammy Lee, Andy Yu. Richard M Krasno waiver sent on 3/24/2021, answer due 5/24/2021. (Sosa, Jose)
March 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 39 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Sammy Lee, Andy Yu. Jane H. Hsiao waiver sent on 3/24/2021, answer due 5/24/2021. (Sosa, Jose)
March 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 38 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Andy Yu. Phillip Frost waiver sent on 3/24/2021, answer due 5/24/2021. (Sosa, Jose)
March 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 37 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Sammy Lee, Andy Yu. Robert S Fishel waiver sent on 3/24/2021, answer due 5/24/2021. (Sosa, Jose)
March 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 36 REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to Alice Lin-Tsing Yu on March 22, 2021 by Sammy Lee, Andy Yu. (Sosa, Jose)
March 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 35 REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to Steven Rubin on March 22, 2021 by Sammy Lee, Andy Yu. (Sosa, Jose)
March 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 34 REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to Richard Pfenniger on March 22, 2021 by Sammy Lee, Andy Yu. (Sosa, Jose)
March 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 33 REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to John Paganelli on March 22, 2021 by Sammy Lee, Andy Yu. (Sosa, Jose)
March 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 32 REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to Adam Logal on March 22, 2021 by Sammy Lee, Andy Yu. (Sosa, Jose)
March 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 31 REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to Richard Lerner on March 22, 2021 by Sammy Lee, Andy Yu. (Sosa, Jose)
March 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 30 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Sammy Lee, Andy Yu. Richard M Krasno waiver sent on 3/22/2021, answer due 5/24/2021. (Sosa, Jose)
March 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 29 REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to Richard Krasno on March 22, 2021 by Sammy Lee, Andy Yu. (Sosa, Jose)
March 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 28 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Sammy Lee, Andy Yu. Jane H. Hsiao waiver sent on 3/22/2021, answer due 5/24/2021. (Sosa, Jose)
March 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 27 REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to Jane Hsiao on March 22, 2021 by Sammy Lee, Andy Yu. (Sosa, Jose)
March 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 26 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Sammy Lee, Andy Yu. Phillip Frost waiver sent on 3/22/2021, answer due 5/24/2021. (Sosa, Jose)
March 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 25 REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to Philip Frost on March 22, 2021 by Sammy Lee, Andy Yu. (Sosa, Jose)
March 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 24 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Andy Yu. Robert S Fishel waiver sent on 3/22/2021, answer due 5/24/2021. (Sosa, Jose)
March 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 23 REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to Robert Fishel on March 22, 2021 by Sammy Lee, Andy Yu. (Sosa, Jose)
March 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER granting #20 Nominal Defendant OPKO Health, Inc.'s Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File a Response to Plaintiff's Complaint. Plaintiffs have until April 9, 2021 to file their consolidated complaint or file a notice they intend to proceed with the Complaint [ECF No. 1]. All Defendants shall file a single combined response or their separate answers to the Complaint by May 24, 2021. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 3/25/2021. See attached document for full details. (wc)
March 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER REQUIRING SCHEDULING REPORT AND CERTIFICATES OF INTERESTED PARTIES. Joint Scheduling Report and Certificates of Interested Parties due by 4/5/2021. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 3/25/2021. See attached document for full details. (wc)
March 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #1 Complaint Nominal Defendant OPKO Health, Inc. to File a Joint Response, with all Defendants, to Plaintiff's Complaint by Robert S Fishel, Phillip Frost, Jane Hsiao, Richard M Krasno, Richard A Lerner, Adam Logal, Opko Health, Inc., John A Paganelli, Richard C Pfenninger, Steven D Rubin, Alice Lin-Tsing Yu. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Miller, Brian)
March 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 Corporate Disclosure Statement Of Nominal Defendant OPKO Health, Inc. by Robert S Fishel, Phillip Frost, Jane Hsiao, Richard M Krasno, Richard A Lerner, Adam Logal, Opko Health, Inc., John A Paganelli, Richard C Pfenninger, Steven D Rubin, Alice Lin-Tsing Yu (Miller, Brian)
March 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Samantha J. Kavanaugh on behalf of Robert S Fishel, Phillip Frost, Jane Hsiao, Richard M Krasno, Richard A Lerner, Adam Logal, Opko Health, Inc., John A Paganelli, Richard C Pfenninger, Steven D Rubin, Alice Lin-Tsing Yu. Attorney Samantha J. Kavanaugh added to party Robert S Fishel(pty:dft), Attorney Samantha J. Kavanaugh added to party Phillip Frost(pty:dft), Attorney Samantha J. Kavanaugh added to party Jane Hsiao(pty:dft), Attorney Samantha J. Kavanaugh added to party Richard M Krasno(pty:dft), Attorney Samantha J. Kavanaugh added to party Richard A Lerner(pty:dft), Attorney Samantha J. Kavanaugh added to party Adam Logal(pty:dft), Attorney Samantha J. Kavanaugh added to party Opko Health, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Samantha J. Kavanaugh added to party John A Paganelli(pty:dft), Attorney Samantha J. Kavanaugh added to party Richard C Pfenninger(pty:dft), Attorney Samantha J. Kavanaugh added to party Steven D Rubin(pty:dft), Attorney Samantha J. Kavanaugh added to party Alice Lin-Tsing Yu(pty:dft). (Kavanaugh, Samantha)
March 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Brian Paul Miller on behalf of Robert S Fishel, Phillip Frost, Jane Hsiao, Richard M Krasno, Richard A Lerner, Adam Logal, Opko Health, Inc., John A Paganelli, Richard C Pfenninger, Steven D Rubin, Alice Lin-Tsing Yu. Attorney Brian Paul Miller added to party Robert S Fishel(pty:dft), Attorney Brian Paul Miller added to party Phillip Frost(pty:dft), Attorney Brian Paul Miller added to party Jane Hsiao(pty:dft), Attorney Brian Paul Miller added to party Richard M Krasno(pty:dft), Attorney Brian Paul Miller added to party Richard A Lerner(pty:dft), Attorney Brian Paul Miller added to party Adam Logal(pty:dft), Attorney Brian Paul Miller added to party Opko Health, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Brian Paul Miller added to party John A Paganelli(pty:dft), Attorney Brian Paul Miller added to party Richard C Pfenninger(pty:dft), Attorney Brian Paul Miller added to party Steven D Rubin(pty:dft), Attorney Brian Paul Miller added to party Alice Lin-Tsing Yu(pty:dft). (Miller, Brian)
March 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER CONSOLIDATING CASES re #15 Stipulation and [Proposed] Order to Consolidate Related Shareholder Derivative Actions filed by Sammy Lee. Case numbers 21-20885-CIV and 21-20972-CIV are CONSOLIDATED. Once all Defendants have been properly served or have waived service in accordance with the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the Court will instruct Defendants to file separate answers or a combined response within the time permitted by the applicable rules. The Court will also, at the appropriate time and by separate order, instruct the parties to file a joint scheduling report as well as certificates of interested parties and corporate disclosure statements. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 3/19/2021. See attached document for full details. (wc)
March 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MOTION to Consolidate Cases and Establish A Ladership Structure (Stipulation) by Sammy Lee. Responses due by 4/1/2021 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Rosen Law Firm Biography, #2 Exhibit B - Brown Law Firm Biography, #3 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Sosa, Jose)
March 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re #12 Order to Show Cause, by Sammy Lee. (Sosa, Jose)
March 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Sammy Lee. Opko Health, Inc. served on 3/8/2021, answer due 3/29/2021. (Sosa, Jose)
March 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER that Plaintiffs show cause why these cases should not be consolidated by March 18, 2021. If Plaintiffs fail to file an opposition by that date, the Court will consolidate the cases. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 3/12/2021. See attached document for full details. (wc)
March 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Summons Issued as to Opko Health, Inc. (jao)
March 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons(es) to Opko Health, Inc. by Sammy Lee re 9 Clerks Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case, Summons(es) (Sosa, Jose)
March 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Clerks Notice to Filer re: Summons(es) cannot be issued. Summons NOT issued for the following reason - AO 440 form was not used. (jao)
March 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Summons Issued as to Opko Health, Inc. (jao) Modified on 3/8/2021 to restrict document, issued in error (jao).
March 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons(es) to Opko Health, Inc. by Sammy Lee re 6 Clerks Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case, Summons(es) (Sosa, Jose)
March 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Clerks Notice to Filer re: Summons(es) cannot be issued. The number of days to respond to the Summons(es) is incorrect (jao)
March 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTICE by Sammy Lee re 3 Clerks Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case Civil Cover Sheet (Sosa, Jose)
March 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons(es) as to Opko Health, Inc. by Sammy Lee (Sosa, Jose)
March 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Clerks Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case. No Civil Cover Sheet. Filer is instructed to file a Notice (Other) with the Civil Cover Sheet attached within 24 hours of the notice. (jao)
March 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Edwin G. Torres is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (jao)
March 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants. Filing fees $ 402.00 receipt number BFLSDC-14495967, filed by Sammy Lee.(Sosa, Jose)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lee v. Frost et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adam Logal
Represented By: Brian Paul Miller
Represented By: Samantha J. Kavanaugh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Opko Health, Inc.
Represented By: Brian Paul Miller
Represented By: Samantha J. Kavanaugh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert S Fishel
Represented By: Brian Paul Miller
Represented By: Samantha J. Kavanaugh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard M Krasno
Represented By: Brian Paul Miller
Represented By: Samantha J. Kavanaugh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven D Rubin
Represented By: Brian Paul Miller
Represented By: Samantha J. Kavanaugh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard C Pfenninger
Represented By: Brian Paul Miller
Represented By: Samantha J. Kavanaugh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alice Lin-Tsing Yu
Represented By: Brian Paul Miller
Represented By: Samantha J. Kavanaugh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Hsiao
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Phillip Frost
Represented By: Brian Paul Miller
Represented By: Samantha J. Kavanaugh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard A Lerner
Represented By: Brian Paul Miller
Represented By: Samantha J. Kavanaugh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John A Paganelli
Represented By: Brian Paul Miller
Represented By: Samantha J. Kavanaugh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane H. Hsiao
Represented By: Brian Paul Miller
Represented By: Samantha J. Kavanaugh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sammy Lee
Represented By: Jose D. Sosa
Represented By: Timothy W. Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Andy Yu
Represented By: Jose D. Sosa
Represented By: Timothy W. Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?