Deshotel et al v. OnlyMoso U S A Corp et al
Plaintiff: Dry Bayou Enterprises L L C, Bamboo Farm Enterprises L L C, Jason Dutil, Blake McManus, Jeff Hanchey, H A S C Rentals L L C, Mark Thompson, Bret Hanchey, Henry Deshotel and H A S C Bamboo L L C
Defendant: OnlyMoso U S A Corp and A B C Insurance Co
Case Number: 1:2021cv21013
Filed: March 15, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Cecilia M Altonaga
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 15, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 15, 2021 Filing 34 Bar Letter re: Admissions sent to attorney Charles M. Rush, Jon Tyler Rush, Christopher J. Piasecki, mailing date 3/15/2021, (cco)
March 15, 2021 Filing 33 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Edwin G. Torres is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (jua)
March 15, 2021 Filing 32 Case transferred in from Louisiana Western; Case Number 6:20-cv-00692. Electronic file including transfer order and docket sheet received. .(jua).
March 15, 2021 CASE TRANSFERRED OUT ELECTRONICALLY from Western District of Louisiana to Eastern District of Louisiana and Southern District of Florida. The claims of Plantation Trace Developments, LLC in this matter shall be severed and transferred to the Eastern District of Louisiana. The remaining Plaintiffs claims shall be transferred to the Southern District of Florida. Case Terminated. All future pleadings should be filed with the newly assigned court. (crt,Jordan, P)
March 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER...For the reasons given in the Court's Ruling. Signed by Judge Robert R Summerhays on 3/5/2021. (crt,Jordan, P)
March 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 30 RULING re #26 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS... IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, ADJUDGED, AND DECREED that the Magistrate JudgesReport and Recommendation ECF No. #26 is ADOPTED. The Motion to Transfer Venue ECF No. #13 filed by defendant OnlyMoso USA Corp. is GRANTED. The claims of Plantation Trace Developments, LLC in this matter shall be severed and transferred to the Eastern District of Louisiana. The remaining Plaintiffs claims shall be transferred to the Southern District of Florida.. Signed by Judge Robert R Summerhays on 3/5/2021. (crt,Jordan, P)
November 3, 2020 Filing 29 RESPONSE to Defendant's Opposition to Plaintiff's Written Objections to Magistrate Judge's Report and Recommendation by Bamboo Farm Enterprises L L C, Henry Deshotel, Dry Bayou Enterprises L L C, Jason Dutil, H A S C Bamboo L L C, H A S C Rentals L L C, Bret Hanchey, Jeff Hanchey, Blake McManus, Plantation Trace Development L L C re #28 Response in Opposition (NOT Motions), #26 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #13 MOTION to Transfer Case with certificate of service filed by OnlyMoso U S A Corp, #27 Objection to Report and Recommendations, . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(aty,Rush, Jon) Modified on 11/3/2020 to edit text (Dauterive, C).
October 30, 2020 Filing 28 RESPONSE in Opposition by OnlyMoso U S A Corp re #27 Objection to Report and Recommendations, with certificate of service. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A & B)(aty,Piasecki, Christopher)
October 23, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #26 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 10/23/2020. (crt,Dunford, T)
October 16, 2020 Filing 27 OBJECTION to #26 Report and Recommendations by Bamboo Farm Enterprises L L C, Henry Deshotel, Dry Bayou Enterprises L L C, Jason Dutil, H A S C Bamboo L L C, H A S C Rentals L L C, Bret Hanchey, Jeff Hanchey, Blake McManus, Plantation Trace Development L L C, Mark Thompson. Response to Objection to R&R due by 10/30/2020 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum / Brief Supporting Memorandum)(aty,Rush, Jon)
October 2, 2020 Filing 26 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #13 MOTION to Transfer Case with certificate of service filed by OnlyMoso U S A Corp. Considering the evidence, the law, and the arguments of the parties, and for the reasons explained below, the Court recommends that Defendant's Motion be GRANTED. Objections to R&R due by 10/16/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna on 10/2/2020. (crt,Alexander, E)
October 1, 2020 Filing 25 RESPONSE by Plantation Trace Development L L C re #23 Order, . (aty,Rush, Jon)
September 29, 2020 Filing 24 RESPONSE by OnlyMoso U S A Corp re #23 Order, with certificate of service. (aty,Piasecki, Christopher)
September 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER re #13 MOTION to Transfer Case filed by OnlyMoso U S A Corp. IT IS ORDERED that the parties shall advise the Court in a pleading responsive to this Order within ten (10) days whether they will stipulate to maintain Plantation Trace L L C's case with the ten other Plaintiffs' cases. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna on 9/21/2020. (crt,Alexander, E)
September 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 MINUTES for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna: TELEPHONE CONFERENCE held on 9/21/2020. The parties discussed Defendants pending #23 Motion to Transfer Venue. A separate order will be issued. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna on 9/21/2020. (crt,Alexander, E)
September 11, 2020 Set Deadlines as to #13 MOTION to Transfer Case with certificate of service. Telephone hearing set for 9/21/2020 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna. (crt,Alexander, E)
September 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ELECTRONIC ORDER - A telephone hearing on Defendant's Motion to Transfer (Rec. Doc. 13) is hereby SET for September 21, 2020 at 10:30 a.m. Counsel shall access the call by dialing 888-684-8852, access code 5910394. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna on 9/11/2020. (crt,Coreil, H)
September 1, 2020 Filing 20 REPLY to Response to Motion re #13 MOTION to Transfer Case with certificate of service filed by OnlyMoso U S A Corp. (aty,Piasecki, Christopher) Modified on 9/2/2020 to edit text (Dauterive, C).
August 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting #18 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #13 MOTION to Transfer Case. Replies due by 9/1/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna on 8/28/2020. (crt,Alexander, E)
August 26, 2020 Filing 18 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #13 MOTION to Transfer Case with consent by OnlyMoso U S A Corp. Motions referred to Patrick J Hanna. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 8/26/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order)(aty,Piasecki, Christopher) Modified on 8/26/2020 to edit text (Dauterive, C).
August 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ELECTRONIC ORDER - The hearing on Defendant's Motion to Transfer (Rec. Doc. 13), previously set for September 10, 2020, is hereby CANCELLED. The Court shall issue a written ruling in due course. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna on 8/25/2020. (crt,Coreil, H)
August 20, 2020 Filing 16 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #13 MOTION to Transfer Case with certificate of service filed by Bamboo Farm Enterprises L L C, Henry Deshotel, Dry Bayou Enterprises L L C, Jason Dutil, H A S C Bamboo L L C, H A S C Rentals L L C, Bret Hanchey, Jeff Hanchey, Blake McManus, Plantation Trace Development L L C, Mark Thompson. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(aty,Rush, Jon) Modified to remove duplicate docket text on 8/20/2020 (Thomas, T).
July 30, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE of Motion Setting with oral argument regarding: #13 MOTION to Transfer Case. Motion day set for 9/10/2020 09:30 AM in Lafayette, Courtroom 7 before Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna. (crt,Dunford, T)
July 30, 2020 Filing 14 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by OnlyMoso U S A Corp; no corporate parent. (aty,Piasecki, Christopher) Modified text on 7/30/2020 (Dunford, T).
July 30, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION to Transfer Case with certificate of service by OnlyMoso U S A Corp. Motions referred to Patrick J Hanna. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum / Brief, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Proposed order)(aty,Piasecki, Christopher)
June 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #11 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint. OnlyMoso U S A Corp answer due 7/30/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna on 6/29/2020. (crt,Alexander, E)
June 26, 2020 Filing 11 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by OnlyMoso U S A Corp. Motions referred to Patrick J Hanna. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 6/26/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order)(Attorney Christopher J Piasecki added to party OnlyMoso U S A Corp(pty:dft))(aty,Piasecki, Christopher) Modified on 6/26/2020 to modify docket text. (Crick, S).
June 10, 2020 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Bamboo Farm Enterprises L L C, Jason Dutil, Blake McManus, H A S C Rentals L L C, Dry Bayou Enterprises L L C, Mark Thompson, Henry Deshotel, Bret Hanchey, H A S C Bamboo L L C, Plantation Trace Development L L C, Jeff Hanchey. OnlyMoso U S A Corp served on 6/9/2020, answer due 6/30/2020. ADMINISTRATIVE ENTRY to capture correct filing event which calculates appropriate answer due date. See pdf document filed as #10 Affidavit of Service. (crt,Dauterive, C)
June 10, 2020 Filing 10 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons for Onlymoso U S A Corp served on Jessica Oquendo on June 9, 2020, filed by Bamboo Farm Enterprises L L C, Henry Deshotel, Dry Bayou Enterprises L L C, Jason Dutil, H A S C Bamboo L L C, H A S C Rentals L L C, Bret Hanchey, Jeff Hanchey, Blake McManus, Plantation Trace Development L L C, Mark Thompson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Executed Summons Onlymoso USA Corp)(aty,Rush, Jon)
June 8, 2020 Filing 9 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Plantation Trace Development L L C. (aty,Rush, Jon)
June 8, 2020 Filing 8 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by H A S C Rentals L L C. (aty,Rush, Jon)
June 8, 2020 Filing 7 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by H A S C Bamboo L L C. (aty,Rush, Jon)
June 8, 2020 Filing 6 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Dry Bayou Enterprises L L C. (aty,Rush, Jon)
June 8, 2020 Filing 5 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Bamboo Farm Enterprises L L C. (aty,Rush, Jon)
June 4, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS REISSUED as to OnlyMoso U S A Corp. (crt,Dauterive, C)
June 3, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement re: #1 Complaint sent to Jon Tyler Rush on behalf of Bamboo Farm Enterprises L L C, Dry Bayou Enterprises L L C, H A S C Bamboo L L C, H A S C Rentals L L C and Plantation Trace Development L L C. Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 6/17/2020. (crt,Dauterive, C)
June 3, 2020 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to OnlyMoso U S A Corp. (crt,Dauterive, C)
June 2, 2020 CASE Assigned to Judge Robert R Summerhays and Magistrate Judge Patrick J Hanna. (crt,Dauterive, C)
June 2, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against A B C Insurance Co and OnlyMoso U S A Corp. (Filing fee $400, receipt number ALAWDC-4280836) filed by Bamboo Farm Enterprises L L C, Jason Dutil, Blake McManus, H A S C Rentals L L C, Dry Bayou Enterprises L L C, Mark Thompson, Henry Deshotel, Brent Hanchey, Plantation Trace Development L L C, H A S C Bamboo L L C and Jeff Hanchey. (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Attorney Jon Tyler Rush added to party Bamboo Farm Enterprises, LLC(pty:pla), Attorney Jon Tyler Rush added to party Henry Deshotel(pty:pla), Attorney Jon Tyler Rush added to party Dry Bayou Enterprises, LLC(pty:pla), Attorney Jon Tyler Rush added to party Jason Dutil (pty:pla), Attorney Jon Tyler Rush added to party H A S C Bamboo L L C (pty:pla), Attorney Jon Tyler Rush added to party HASC Rentals, LLC(pty:pla), Attorney Jon Tyler Rush added to party Jeff Hanchey(pty:pla), Attorney Jon Tyler Rush added to party Bret Hanchey (pty:pla), Attorney Jon Tyler Rush added to party Blake McManus(pty:pla), Attorney Jon Tyler Rush added to party Plantation Trace Development, LLC(pty:pla), Attorney Jon Tyler Rush added to party Mark Thompson(pty:pla))(aty,Rush, Jon) Modified on 6/3/2020 to edit text (Dauterive, C).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Deshotel et al v. OnlyMoso U S A Corp et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dry Bayou Enterprises L L C
Represented By: Charles M. Rush
Represented By: Jon Tyler Rush
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bamboo Farm Enterprises L L C
Represented By: Charles M. Rush
Represented By: Jon Tyler Rush
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jason Dutil
Represented By: Charles M. Rush
Represented By: Jon Tyler Rush
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Blake McManus
Represented By: Charles M. Rush
Represented By: Jon Tyler Rush
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeff Hanchey
Represented By: Charles M. Rush
Represented By: Jon Tyler Rush
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: H A S C Rentals L L C
Represented By: Charles M. Rush
Represented By: Jon Tyler Rush
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Thompson
Represented By: Charles M. Rush
Represented By: Jon Tyler Rush
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bret Hanchey
Represented By: Charles M. Rush
Represented By: Jon Tyler Rush
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Henry Deshotel
Represented By: Charles M. Rush
Represented By: Jon Tyler Rush
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: H A S C Bamboo L L C
Represented By: Charles M. Rush
Represented By: Jon Tyler Rush
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OnlyMoso U S A Corp
Represented By: Christopher J. Piasecki
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A B C Insurance Co
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?