Innovative Sports Management, Inc. v. STERN et al
Plaintiff: Innovative Sports Management,Inc. doing business as Intergrated Sports Media
Defendant: 900 Aventura Restaurant, LLC doing business as Novecento, Brickell 1414 Restaurant, LLC, 900 Doral LLC, 900 Doral LLC doing business as Novecento, Aliosha Stern Individually, and as officers, directors, shareholders, principals, managers and/or members of 900 AVENTURA RESTAURANT, LLC d/b/a NOVECENTO, ANDREI STERN and Brickell 1414 Restaurant, LLC doing business as Novecento
Case Number: 1:2021cv21059
Filed: March 19, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Chris M McAliley
Referring Judge: Raag Singhal
2 Judge: Ursula Ungaro
Nature of Suit: Cable/Satellite TV
Cause of Action: 47 U.S.C. ยง 0605 Unauthorized publication or use of communications
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 17, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE. Closing Case. Signed by Judge Raag Singhal on 6/17/2021. See attached document for full details. (cds)
June 16, 2021 Filing 27 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE by Innovative Sports Management,Inc. (Danz, Alan)
June 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER SETTING TRIAL AND PRE-TRIAL SCHEDULE, REQUIRING MEDIATION, AND REFERRING CERTAIN MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE: ( Jury Trial set for 5/9/2022 09:00 AM in Fort Lauderdale Division before Judge Raag Singhal., Calendar Call set for 5/6/2022 10:00 AM in Fort Lauderdale Division before Judge Raag Singhal., Amended Pleadings due by 7/30/2021., Discovery due by 1/14/2022., Expert Discovery due by 1/14/2022., Joinder of Parties due by 7/30/2021., Mediation Deadline 1/20/2022., In Limine Motions due by 1/24/2022., Dispositive Motions due by 1/24/2022., Motions due by 1/24/2022., Pretrial Stipulation due by 4/26/2022.), ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediation. ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Chris M. McAliley for Discovery Matters. Signed by Judge Raag Singhal on 6/4/2021. See attached document for full details. (cds) #Pattern Jury Instruction Builder - To access the latest, up to date changes to the 11th Circuit Pattern Jury Instructions go to https://pji.ca11.uscourts.gov or click here.
June 4, 2021 Filing 25 NOTICE OF COURT PRACTICEUnless otherwise specified by the Court, every motion, legal memorandum, brief, and otherwise shall: be double-spaced, in justified alignment, in 12-point font, using either Times New Roman or Arial typeface. This Notice does not supplant the requirements and provisions of Local Rule 7.1(c). The Court cautions parties against excessive use of footnotes.Multiple Plaintiffs or Defendants shall file joint motions with co-parties unless there are clear conflicts of position. If conflicts of position exist, parties shall explain the conflicts in their separate motions.Parties are encouraged to seek extensions of time in a timely fashion. "A motion for extension of time is not self-executing; no motion is, unless expressly provided for by the applicable rule. Yet, by filing these motions on or near the last day, and then sitting idle pending the Court's disposition of the motion, parties essentially grant their own motion. The Court will not condone this." Compere v. Nusret Miami, LLC, 2020 WL 2844888, at *2 (S.D. Fla. May 7, 2020) (internal citations omitted).Local Rule 16.4, Local Rules for the United States District Court for the Southern District of Florida, requires that a Notice of Settlement "shall be filed and served jointly by counsel for all parties to the settlement." A unilateral notice of settlement will not stay pre-trial deadlines or hearings.Failure to comply with any of these procedures may result in the imposition of appropriate sanctions. Signed by Judge Raag Singhal on 6/4/2021. (jhy)
June 3, 2021 Active Hearings Before Prior Presider Deadline(s)/Hearing(s) terminated. (ch1)
June 2, 2021 Filing 24 CLERKS NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT OF CASE pursuant to Administrative Order 2021-52. Case reassigned to Judge Raag Singhal for all further proceedings. Judge Ursula Ungaro no longer assigned to case. (vjk)
May 10, 2021 Filing 23 ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint by 900 Aventura Restaurant, LLC, 900 Doral LLC, Brickell 1414 Restaurant, LLC, ANDREI STERN, Aliosha Stern. (Gallup, Dana)
May 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER RESETTING INITIAL PLANNING AND SCHEDULING CONFERENCE. Initial Planning and Scheduling Conference set for 6/25/2021 10:30 AM before Judge Ursula Ungaro. Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 5/6/2021. See attached document for full details. (cds)
April 23, 2021 Filing 21 Joint SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 16.1 by 900 Aventura Restaurant, LLC, 900 Doral LLC, Brickell 1414 Restaurant, LLC, ANDREI STERN, Aliosha Stern (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Gallup, Dana)
April 22, 2021 Filing 20 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Innovative Sports Management,Inc.. (Danz, Alan)
April 22, 2021 Filing 19 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Innovative Sports Management,Inc.. 900 Aventura Restaurant, LLC served on 4/12/2021, answer due 5/10/2021. (Danz, Alan)
April 22, 2021 Filing 18 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Innovative Sports Management,Inc.. Brickell 1414 Restaurant, LLC served on 4/12/2021, answer due 5/10/2021. (Danz, Alan)
April 22, 2021 Filing 17 SERVICE (Proof) by Publication by Innovative Sports Management,Inc.. ( Last Publication date 4/12/2021., Claims/Positions/Written Defenses/Answers/etc., due by 5/12/2021.), SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Innovative Sports Management,Inc.. 900 Doral LLC served on 4/12/2021, answer due 5/10/2021. (Danz, Alan)
April 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER Granting #15 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Attorney Lisa L. Clay. Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 4/21/2021. See attached document for full details. (cds)
April 20, 2021 Filing 15 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Lisa L. Clay, Esq.. Filing Fee $ 200.00 Receipt # AFLSDC-14619786 by 900 Aventura Restaurant, LLC, 900 Doral LLC, Brickell 1414 Restaurant, LLC, ANDREI STERN, Aliosha Stern. Responses due by 5/4/2021 (Attachments: #1 Certification, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Gallup, Dana)
April 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER Granting in Part #13 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Answer to a Complaint or Other Case Initiating Document 900 Aventura Restaurant, LLC. Answer due 5/10/2021; 900 Doral LLC. Answer due 5/10/2021; Brickell 1414 Restaurant, LLC. Answer due 5/10/2021; ANDREI STERN. Answer due 5/10/2021; Aliosha Stern. Answer due 5/10/2021. Scheduling Conference set for 6/4/2021 10:30 AM via videoconference before Judge Ursula Ungaro. Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 4/19/2021. See attached document for full details. (cds)
April 18, 2021 Filing 13 Defendant's MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #1 Complaint, by 900 Aventura Restaurant, LLC, 900 Doral LLC, Brickell 1414 Restaurant, LLC, ANDREI STERN, Aliosha Stern. (Gallup, Dana)
April 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER Granting #11 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Attorney Julie Cohen Lonstein. Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 4/15/2021. See attached document for full details. (cds)
April 15, 2021 Filing 11 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Julie Cohen Lonstein. Filing Fee $ 200.00 Receipt # AFLSDC-14608870 by Innovative Sports Management,Inc.. Responses due by 4/29/2021 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Order in PDF)(Danz, Alan)
April 15, 2021 Filing 10 Clerks Notice to Filer re #8 Summons Returned Executed,,. Incorrect Service Date Entered; ERROR - The incorrect service date was entered. The correction was made by the Clerk and filing was re-docketed, See DE# 9 . It is not necessary to refile this document. (cds)
April 15, 2021 Filing 9 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Innovative Sports Management,Inc.. Aliosha Stern served on 3/29/2021, answer due 4/19/2021., Summons (Affidavit) Returned Unexecuted by Innovative Sports Management,Inc. as to 900 Aventura Restaurant, LLC; 900 Doral LLC; Brickell 1414 Restaurant, LLC; ANDREI STERN. (For Image See DE#8 ) (cds)
April 15, 2021 Filing 8 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Innovative Sports Management,Inc.. 900 Aventura Restaurant, LLC served on 4/3/2021, answer due 4/26/2021; 900 Doral LLC served on 4/3/2021, answer due 4/26/2021; Brickell 1414 Restaurant, LLC served on 4/3/2021, answer due 4/26/2021; ANDREI STERN served on 4/3/2021, answer due 4/26/2021; Aliosha Stern served on 3/30/2021, answer due 4/20/2021. (Danz, Alan)
April 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER REQUIRING PLAINTIFF TO SHOW CAUSE. Show Cause Response due by 4/23/2021. Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 4/9/2021. See attached document for full details. (cds)
April 9, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Dana Mason Gallup on behalf of 900 Aventura Restaurant, LLC, 900 Doral LLC, Brickell 1414 Restaurant, LLC, ANDREI STERN, Aliosha Stern. Attorney Dana Mason Gallup added to party 900 Aventura Restaurant, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Dana Mason Gallup added to party 900 Doral LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Dana Mason Gallup added to party Brickell 1414 Restaurant, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Dana Mason Gallup added to party ANDREI STERN(pty:dft), Attorney Dana Mason Gallup added to party Aliosha Stern(pty:dft). (Gallup, Dana)
March 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 STANDING ORDER ON ZOOM AND OTHER VIDEO-CONFERENCE HEARINGS Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 3/22/2021. See attached document for full details. (cqs)
March 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER SETTING INITIAL PLANNING AND SCHEDULING CONFERENCE, ( Joint Scheduling Report due by 4/23/2021, Scheduling Conference set for 5/7/2021 10:00 AM before Judge Ursula Ungaro.) Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 3/22/2021. See attached document for full details. (cqs)
March 19, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to 900 Aventura Restaurant, LLC, 900 Doral LLC, Brickell 1414 Restaurant, LLC, ANDREI STERN, Aliosha Stern. (cds)
March 19, 2021 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Ursula Ungaro. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (cds)
March 19, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants. Filing fees $ 402.00 receipt number AFLSDC-14537185, filed by Innovative Sports Management, Inc. d/b/a Integrated Sports Media,. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Interested Parties and Corp Disc Statement, #2 Summon(s), #3 Summon(s), #4 Summon(s), #5 Summon(s), #6 Summon(s), #7 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Danz, Alan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Innovative Sports Management, Inc. v. STERN et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 900 Aventura Restaurant, LLC doing business as Novecento, Brickell 1414 Restaurant, LLC, 900 Doral LLC
Represented By: Dana Mason Gallup
Represented By: Lisa Lynelle Clay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 900 Doral LLC doing business as Novecento
Represented By: Dana Mason Gallup
Represented By: Lisa Lynelle Clay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aliosha Stern Individually, and as officers, directors, shareholders, principals, managers and/or members of 900 AVENTURA RESTAURANT, LLC d/b/a NOVECENTO
Represented By: Dana Mason Gallup
Represented By: Lisa Lynelle Clay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ANDREI STERN
Represented By: Dana Mason Gallup
Represented By: Lisa Lynelle Clay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brickell 1414 Restaurant, LLC doing business as Novecento
Represented By: Dana Mason Gallup
Represented By: Lisa Lynelle Clay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Innovative Sports Management,Inc. doing business as Intergrated Sports Media
Represented By: Alan David Danz
Represented By: Julie Cohen Lonstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?