Southern Corporate Packers, Inc. et al v. American Fruit & Produce Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Southern Corporate Packers, Inc., Florida Veg Investments LLC and Florida Veg Investments LLC doing business as Mr.Greens Produce
Defendant: Joelle Lynne Ader, Marshalls Place, Inc., Daniel Arthur Acosta, David Acosta, Yainis Acosta, Rachelle Glantz, American Fruit & Produce Corporation, Desky Maria Acosta, Esmeralda Espitia, Michael Acosta, Joelle Acosta, Marshall L. Glantz, Chary Pino, Tanya Lynne Acosta and Hugo J Acosta, Jr.
Case Number: 1:2021cv21147
Filed: March 25, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Beth Bloom
Nature of Suit: Agriculture Acts
Cause of Action: 07 U.S.C. ยง 0499
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 5, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE. Denied as moot: #10 Joint MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Florida Veg Investments LLC, Southern Corporate Packers, Inc. The Temporary Restraining Order, ECF No. #11 , is VACATED. Closing Case. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 4/5/2021. See attached document for full details. (mee)
April 2, 2021 Filing 14 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal With Prejudice, Request to Vacate TRO and Cancel PI Hearing by Florida Veg Investments LLC, Southern Corporate Packers, Inc. (Esquivel, Katy)
April 2, 2021 Filing 13 CLERK'S NOTICE of Compliance by Unsealing #11 pursuant to #12 Order (nc)
April 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER Granting #11 Ex Parte Motion for Ex Parte Temporary Restraining Order. Any response or opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction, ECF NO. #10 , must be filed and served on Plaintiffs' counsel by April 14, 2021. Preliminary Injunction Hearing set for Friday, April 16, 2021 03:00 PM. The hearing shall take place via Zoom video conference before Judge Beth Bloom. The Motion for Ex Parte Temporary Restraining Order, ECF No. #11 , and the supporting materials shall be unsealed and this Order shall not be filed under seal. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 4/2/2021. See attached document for full details. (nc)
March 31, 2021 Filing 11 VACATED-EX PARTE MOTION for Ex Parte Temporary Restraining Order by Florida Veg Investments LLC, Southern Corporate Packers, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certification of Counsel, #2 Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion for TRO and PI, #3 Affidavit of Jorge Pedraza, #4 Affidavit of Brian Arrigo, #5 Text of Proposed Order Proposed TRO) (Esquivel, Katy) Modified by Unsealing Document per #12 Order on 4/2/2021 (nc). Text Modified on 4/5/2021 (mee). Per d.e. #15 .
March 31, 2021 Filing 10 Joint MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Florida Veg Investments LLC, Southern Corporate Packers, Inc.. (Esquivel, Katy)
March 31, 2021 SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 9 [order] restricted/sealed until further notice. (ra)
March 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER REQUIRING SCHEDULING REPORT AND CERTIFICATES OF INTERESTED PARTIES. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 3/30/2021. See attached document for full details. (mee)
March 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Senior Judge James Lawrence King recused. Case reassigned to Judge Beth Bloom for all further proceedings. Signed by Senior Judge James Lawrence King on 3/30/2021. See attached document for full details. (vjk)
March 29, 2021 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE of Counsel ATTORNEY CERTIFICATION WHY NOTICE SHOULD NOT BE REQUIRED PURSUANT TO RULE 65(b)(1)(B) by Katy Koestner Esquivel on behalf of Florida Veg Investments LLC, Southern Corporate Packers, Inc. (Esquivel, Katy)
March 29, 2021 Filing 4 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement - NONE disclosed by Florida Veg Investments LLC, Southern Corporate Packers, Inc. (Esquivel, Katy)
March 29, 2021 SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 5 [motion] restricted/sealed until further notice. (801222)
March 26, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (mee)
March 25, 2021 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Senior Judge James Lawrence King. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Becerra is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (mee)
March 25, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants. Filing fees $ 402.00 receipt number AFLSDC-14553993, filed by Florida Veg Investments LLC, Southern Corporate Packers, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (SCP Invoices), #2 Exhibit B (Mr. Greens Invoices), #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Summon(s) American Fruit & Produce Corporation, #5 Summon(s) Marshalls Place, Inc., #6 Summon(s) Hugo J. Acosta, Jr., #7 Summon(s) Desky Maria Acosta, #8 Summon(s) Marshall L. Glantz, #9 Summon(s) Rachelle Glantz, #10 Summon(s) Michael Acosta, #11 Summon(s) Esmeralda Espitia, #12 Summon(s) David Acosta, #13 Summon(s) Yainis Acosta, #14 Summon(s) Daniel Arthur Acosta, #15 Summon(s) Tanya Lynne Acosta, #16 Summon(s) Chary Pino, #17 Summon(s) Joelle Lynne Ader Fka Joelle Acosta)(Esquivel, Katy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Southern Corporate Packers, Inc. et al v. American Fruit & Produce Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joelle Lynne Ader
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marshalls Place, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel Arthur Acosta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Acosta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yainis Acosta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rachelle Glantz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Fruit & Produce Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Desky Maria Acosta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Esmeralda Espitia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Acosta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joelle Acosta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marshall L. Glantz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chary Pino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tanya Lynne Acosta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hugo J Acosta, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Southern Corporate Packers, Inc.
Represented By: Katy Koestner Esquivel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Florida Veg Investments LLC
Represented By: Katy Koestner Esquivel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Florida Veg Investments LLC doing business as Mr.Greens Produce
Represented By: Katy Koestner Esquivel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?