Diamond v. Robinhood Financial, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Jonathan Diamond
Defendant: John Does (1-10), Robinhood Markets, Inc., Robinhood Financial LLC and Robinhood Securities, LLC
Case Number: 1:2021cv21263
Filed: April 2, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Cecilia M Altonaga
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 0077
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 28, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER that Consol Jonathan Diamond is dismissed from this action without prejudice re (271 in case 1:21-md-02989-CMA) Notice of Voluntary Dismissal. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 4/28/2021. Clerks Note: JPML notified. Related Cases: 1:21-md-02989-CMA, 1:21-cv-21263-CMA. See attached document for full details. (mc)
April 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER OF CONSOLIDATION AND ADMINISTRATIVE CLOSE-OUT. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 4/6/2021. See attached document for full details. (mc)
April 2, 2021 Filing 16 MDL Transfer In Case Receipt from Middle District of Florida. Case Number 6:21-cv-00207 with documents 1-13. Assigned FLSD Case Number 1:21-cv-21263-CMA on 4/2/2021. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 1:21-md-02989-CMA. (mc)
April 2, 2021 Filing 15 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga. (mc)
April 2, 2021 Filing 14 Case transferred in from Florida Middle; Case Number 6:21-cv-00207. Electronic file including transfer order and docket sheet received. .(mc).
April 2, 2021 Filing 13 MULTIDISTRICT LITIGATION panel order transferring case to: Southern District of Florida. Transferee court case number: 1:21-md-02989-CMA MDL case number: 2989 (Attachments: #1 MDL Letter) (ALL)
March 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #11 Joint Motion to Stay Pending MDL Status. Signed by Judge Wendy W. Berger on 3/18/2021. (MDJ)
March 18, 2021 Set deadline: Status Report due by 4/27/2021. (LDJ)
March 15, 2021 Filing 11 Joint MOTION to Stay Action Pending MDL Status by Robinhood Financial, LLC, Robinhood Markets, Inc., Robinhood Securities, LLC. (Webb, Joshua)
February 19, 2021 Filing 10 POSSIBLE MDL Tag Along case for MDL Case Number 2989, In re: January 2021 Short Squeeze Trading Litigation. Information emailed to MDL Panel on 2/19/21, including cover letter, copy of complaint, and docket sheet. (Attachments: #1 Docket Sheet, #2 Complaint) (LDJ)
February 2, 2021 Filing 9 WAIVER of service returned executed on 02/02/2021 by Jonathan Diamond as to Robinhood Securities, LLC. (Varnell, Janet)
February 2, 2021 Filing 8 WAIVER of service returned executed on 02/02/2021 by Jonathan Diamond as to Robinhood Markets, Inc.. (Varnell, Janet)
February 2, 2021 Filing 7 WAIVER of service returned executed on 02/02/2021 by Jonathan Diamond as to Robinhood Financial, LLC. (Varnell, Janet)
February 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 STANDING ORDER ON DISCOVERY MOTIONS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick on 2/1/2021. (RN)
February 1, 2021 Filing 5 SUMMONS issued as to Robinhood Financial, LLC, Robinhood Markets, Inc., Robinhood Securities, LLC. (LDJ)
February 1, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Local Rule 3.02(a)(2), which requires the parties in every civil proceeding, except those described in subsection (d), to file a case management report (CMR) using the uniform form at www.flmd.uscourts.gov. The CMR must be filed (1) within forty days after any defendant appears in an action originating in this court, (2) within forty days after the docketing of an action removed or transferred to this court, or (3) within seventy days after service on the United States attorney in an action against the United States, its agencies or employees. Judges may have a special CMR form for certain types of cases listed in Rule 3.02(d). These forms can be found at www.flmd.uscourts.gov under the Forms tab for each judge. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (RMF)ctp
February 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 NOTICE TO COUNSEL AND PARTIES: The Middle District of Florida's revised Local Rules become effective February 1, 2021 and can be found on the Court's public website https://www.flmd.uscourts.gov/local-rules. For a just and efficient resolution of this case, the parties are DIRECTED to read and comply with the Middle District of Florida's Local Rules. See Local Rule 1.01(a). Failure to comply with ANY Local Rules or Court Orders may result in the imposition of sanctions including, but not limited to, the dismissal of this action or entry of default without further notice. Signed by Judge Wendy W. Berger on 2/1/2021. (RMF)ctp
February 1, 2021 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Wendy W. Berger and Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick. New case number: 6:21-cv-0207-WWB-DCI(SJB) Modified on 2/1/2021 to correct docket text (SJB).
January 29, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 113A-17828112) filed by Jonathan Diamond. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Proposed Summons)(Varnell, Janet)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Diamond v. Robinhood Financial, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jonathan Diamond
Represented By: Matthew Peterson
Represented By: Janet Robards Varnell
Represented By: Erika Roxanne Willis
Represented By: Brian William Warwick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does (1-10)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robinhood Markets, Inc.
Represented By: Joshua Clark Webb
Represented By: Dennis Parker Waggoner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robinhood Financial LLC
Represented By: Joshua Clark Webb
Represented By: Dennis Parker Waggoner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robinhood Securities, LLC
Represented By: Joshua Clark Webb
Represented By: Dennis Parker Waggoner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?