Krumenacker v. Robinhood Financial, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Jordan Krumenacker
Defendant: Robinhood Markets, Inc., Charles Schwab & Co. Inc., Robinhood Financial LLC and Robinhood Securities, LLC
Case Number: 1:2021cv21343
Filed: April 7, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Cecilia M Altonaga
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 0078
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 8, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 27 THIRD ORDER OF CONSOLIDATION AND ADMINISTRATIVE CLOSE-OUT. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 4/8/2021. See attached document for full details. (mc)
April 8, 2021 Filing 26 MDL Transfer In Case Receipt from Northern District of California. Case Number 4:21-cv-00838 with documents 1-23. Assigned FLSD Case Number 1:21-cv-21343-CMA on 4/7/2021. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 1:21-md-02989-CMA. (mc)
April 7, 2021 Filing 25 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga. (mc)
April 7, 2021 Filing 24 Case transferred in from California Northern; Case Number 4:21-cv-00838. Electronic file including transfer order and docket sheet received. .(mc).
April 2, 2021 Filing 23 MDL TRANSFER ORDER NO. 2989: Transferring case to the U.S.District Court, Southern District of Florida (Miami). Signed by The Judicial Panel onMultidistrict Litigation, on 04/02/2021. (Attachments: #1 MDL Clerk's Letter re Transmission of Cases Pursuant to MDL No. 2989)(jlmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/2/2021)
April 2, 2021 Case electronically transferred to the U.S. District Court, Southern District of Florida (Miami). Counsel notified. (jlmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/2/2021)
March 22, 2021 Filing 22 CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Notice is hereby given that a Case Management Conference has been set for May 18, 2021, before Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr., at 2:00 p.m. Case Management Statement due by May 11th. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/22/2021) Modified on 3/22/2021 to remove location(ndrS, COURT STAFF).
March 11, 2021 Filing 21 Certificate of Interested Entities by Robinhood Financial, LLC, Robinhood Markets, Inc., Robinhood Securities, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Robinhood Markets, Inc., Other Affiliate Index Ventures, Other Affiliate Robinhood Financial LLC, Other Affiliate Robinhood Securities, LLC, Other Affiliate Baiju Bhatt, Other Affiliate Vladimir Tenev for Robinhood Markets, Inc.. (Wisoff, Carl) (Filed on 3/11/2021)
March 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Haywood S Gilliam, Jr for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler no longer assigned to case,. Signed by Clerk on 03/10/2021. (mbcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/10/2021)
March 10, 2021 Filing 19 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/10/2021)
March 9, 2021 Filing 18 STIPULATION to Extend Deadline to Move or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Robinhood Financial, LLC, Robinhood Markets, Inc., Robinhood Securities, LLC. (Wisoff, Carl) (Filed on 3/9/2021)
March 9, 2021 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Eric D. Monek Anderson (Monek Anderson, Eric) (Filed on 3/9/2021)
March 9, 2021 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Carl Brandon Wisoff (Wisoff, Carl) (Filed on 3/9/2021)
March 9, 2021 Filing 15 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Jordan Krumenacker.. (Fisher, L.) (Filed on 3/9/2021)
March 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER RELATING CASES. The parties agree that the cases should be related. (ECF Nos. 9, 14.) The cases are related because they concern substantially the same parties, property, transaction or event, and it appears likely that there will be an unduly burdensome duplication of labor and expense or conflicting results if the cases are conducted before different judges. Civ. L. R. 3-12(a). The attached order relates the cases. There is also the issue of consent: the court needs consent from all parties before it can address the cases on their merits. Williams v. King, 875 F.3d 500, 50305 (9th Cir. 2017). There have been declinations in some of the related cases, and they have been reassigned to district judges. The defendants in those cases have the option of consenting to the magistrate jurisdiction. N.D. Cal. Gen. Order 44(E)(4); N.D. Cal. Local R. 73-1(b). The plaintiff here has not consented either. The court asks the parties to confer on the issue of consent in three business days. Any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The effect of this related-case order will be that the case will be reassigned absent consent of the parties to the undersigneds jurisdiction. The court also apologizes for the late response to the motion: it did not hit the court's radar until relatively recently, and it took some time to look at the related cases. Signed by Judge Laurel Beeler on 03/05/2021. (ejkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/8/2021)
March 8, 2021 Case Reassigned to Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler. Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers no longer assigned to the case. (asS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/8/2021)
February 25, 2021 Filing 13 EXHIBITS re #11 Stipulation to Extend Time for Defendant Charles Schwab & Co., Inc. to Respond to Complaint filed byCharles Schwab & Co., Inc.. (Related document(s) #11 ) (Lutz, Brian) (Filed on 2/25/2021)
February 25, 2021 #Electronic filing error. No title Page. Exhibits e-filed separately and not as an attachment, require a title page. Please refer to Civil Local Rules 3-4 re first page requirement . [err201] This filing will not be processed by the clerks office. Please re-file in its entirety. Re: #12 Exhibits filed by Charles Schwab & Co., Inc. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/25/2021)
February 24, 2021 Filing 12 ***PDF ERROR, DOCUMENT REFILED AT #13 *** EXHIBITS re #11 Stipulation filed byCharles Schwab & Co., Inc.. (Related document(s) #11 ) (Lutz, Brian) (Filed on 2/24/2021) Modified on 2/26/2021 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
February 24, 2021 Filing 11 STIPULATION to Extend Time for Defendant Charles Schwab & Co., Inc. to Respond to Complaint filed by Charles Schwab & Co., Inc., Jordan Krumenacher. (Lutz, Brian) (Filed on 2/24/2021) Modified on 2/25/2021 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).
February 24, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian Michael Lutz (Lutz, Brian) (Filed on 2/24/2021)
February 18, 2021 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jordan Krumenacker. Charles Schwab & Co., Inc. served on 2/4/2021, answer due 2/25/2021. (Fisher, L.) (Filed on 2/18/2021)
February 3, 2021 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Jordan Krumenacker. Service waived by Robinhood Securities, LLC waiver sent on 2/3/2021, answer due 4/5/2021. (Fisher, L.) (Filed on 2/3/2021)
February 3, 2021 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Jordan Krumenacker. Service waived by Robinhood Markets, Inc. waiver sent on 2/3/2021, answer due 4/5/2021. (Fisher, L.) (Filed on 2/3/2021)
February 3, 2021 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Jordan Krumenacker. Service waived by Robinhood Financial, LLC waiver sent on 2/3/2021, answer due 4/5/2021. (Fisher, L.) (Filed on 2/3/2021)
February 3, 2021 Filing 5 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Case Management Statement due by 5/3/2021. Initial Case Management Conference set for 5/10/2021 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 1, 4th Floor. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/3/2021)
February 3, 2021 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Charles Schwab & Co., Inc., Robinhood Financial, LLC, Robinhood Markets, Inc., Robinhood Securities, LLC. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/3/2021)
February 3, 2021 Filing 3 Case assigned to Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. (mbcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/3/2021)
February 2, 2021 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Fisher, L.) (Filed on 2/2/2021)
February 2, 2021 Filing 1 CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT (with jury demand) against Charles Schwab & Co., Inc., Robinhood Financial, LLC, Robinhood Markets, Inc., Robinhood Securities, LLC ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0971-15526018). Filed by Jordan Krumenacker. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Fisher, L.) (Filed on 2/2/2021) Modified on 2/3/2021 (cjlS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Krumenacker v. Robinhood Financial, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robinhood Markets, Inc.
Represented By: Eric D. Monek Anderson
Represented By: Carl Brandon Wisoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles Schwab & Co. Inc.
Represented By: Brian Michael Lutz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robinhood Financial LLC
Represented By: Eric D. Monek Anderson
Represented By: Carl Brandon Wisoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robinhood Securities, LLC
Represented By: Eric D. Monek Anderson
Represented By: Carl Brandon Wisoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jordan Krumenacker
Represented By: Lawrence Timothy Fisher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?