Social Life Network, Inc. v. Peak One Opportunity Fund, L.P. et al
Plaintiff: Social Life Network, Inc.
Defendant: Peak One Opportunity Fund, L.P. and Jason Goldstein
Case Number: 1:2021cv21373
Filed: April 9, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Darrin P Gayles
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 0078
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 16, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 27 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #21 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. M. Jonathan Seibald s permitted to appear before this Court on behalf of Defendants for all purposes relating to this action. The clerk is directed to provide Notice of Electronic Filings to Mr. Goldsmith at jseibald@gibsondunn.com. Signed by Judge Darrin P. Gayles (hs01)
May 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 26 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #22 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Brian Richman is permitted to appear before this Court on behalf of Defendants for all purposes relating to this action. The clerk is directed to provide Notice of Electronic Filings to Mr. Richman at brichman@gibsondunn.com. Signed by Judge Darrin P. Gayles (hs01)
May 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 25 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #23 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Barry Goldsmith is permitted to appear before this Court on behalf of Defendants for all purposes relating to this action. The clerk is directed to provide Notice of Electronic Filings to Mr. Goldsmith at bgoldsmith@gibsondunn.com. Signed by Judge Darrin P. Gayles (hs01)
May 13, 2021 Filing 24 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Jason Goldstein, Peak One Opportunity Fund, L.P. identifying Corporate Parent Peak One Opportunity Fund, L.P. for Jason Goldstein, Peak One Opportunity Fund, L.P. (Resnick, Aaron)
May 13, 2021 Filing 23 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Barry Goldsmith. Filing Fee $ 200.00 Receipt # AFLSDC-14684961 by Jason Goldstein, Peak One Opportunity Fund, L.P.. Responses due by 5/27/2021 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Resnick, Aaron)
May 13, 2021 Filing 22 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Brian Richman. Filing Fee $ 200.00 Receipt # AFLSDC-14684952 by Jason Goldstein, Peak One Opportunity Fund, L.P.. Responses due by 5/27/2021 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Resnick, Aaron)
May 13, 2021 Filing 21 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for M. Jonathan Seibald. Filing Fee $ 200.00 Receipt # AFLSDC-14684926 by Jason Goldstein, Peak One Opportunity Fund, L.P.. Responses due by 5/27/2021 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Resnick, Aaron)
May 7, 2021 Filing 20 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Aaron Rene Resnick on behalf of Jason Goldstein, Peak One Opportunity Fund, L.P.. Attorney Aaron Rene Resnick added to party Jason Goldstein(pty:dft), Attorney Aaron Rene Resnick added to party Peak One Opportunity Fund, L.P.(pty:dft). (Resnick, Aaron)
April 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #9 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Catherine Gretschel is permitted to appear before this Court on behalf of Plaintiff for all purposes relating to this action. The clerk is directed to provide Notice of Electronic Filings to Ms. Gretschel at cat@thebasilelawfirm.com. Signed by Judge Darrin P. Gayles (hs01)
April 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #8 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Eric Benzenberg is permitted to appear before this Court on behalf of Plaintiff for all purposes relating to this action. The clerk is directed to provide Notice of Electronic Filings to Mr. Benzenberg at eric@thebasilelawfirm.com. Signed by Judge Darrin P. Gayles (hs01)
April 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #7 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Gustave Passanante is permitted to appear before this Court on behalf of Plaintiff for all purposes relating to this action. The clerk is directed to provide Notice of Electronic Filings to Mr. Passanante at gus@thebasilelawfirm.com. Signed by Judge Darrin P. Gayles (hs01)
April 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #6 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Mark R. Basile is permitted to appear before this Court on behalf of Plaintiff for all purposes relating to this action. The clerk is directed to provide Notice of Electronic Filings to Mr. Basile at mark@thebasilelawfirm.com. Signed by Judge Darrin P. Gayles (hs01)
April 12, 2021 Filing 15 NOTICE OF COURT PRACTICE. Unless otherwise specified by the Court, every motion shall be double-spaced in Times New Roman 12-point typeface. Multiple Plaintiffs or Defendants shall file joint motions with co-parties unless there are clear conflicts of position. If conflicts of position exist, parties shall explain the conflicts in their separate motions. Failure to comply with ANY of these procedures may result in the imposition of appropriate sanctions, including but not limited to, the striking of the motion or dismissal of this action. Signed by Judge Darrin P. Gayles (hs01)
April 12, 2021 Filing 14 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Social Life Network, Inc.. Jason Goldstein waiver sent on 4/12/2021, answer due 6/11/2021. (Hamilton, Brenda)
April 12, 2021 Filing 13 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Social Life Network, Inc.. Peak One Opportunity Fund, L.P. waiver sent on 4/12/2021, answer due 6/11/2021. (Hamilton, Brenda)
April 12, 2021 Filing 12 Summons Issued as to Jason Goldstein, Peak One Opportunity Fund, L.P.. (kpe)
April 12, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons(es) by Social Life Network, Inc. (Hamilton, Brenda)
April 12, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons(es) by Social Life Network, Inc. (Hamilton, Brenda)
April 9, 2021 Filing 9 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Catherine Gretschel. Filing Fee $ 200.00 Receipt # AFLSDC-14595155 by Social Life Network, Inc.. Responses due by 4/23/2021 (Hamilton, Brenda)
April 9, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Eric J. Benzenberg. Filing Fee $ 200.00 Receipt # AFLSDC-14595144 by Social Life Network, Inc.. Responses due by 4/23/2021 (Hamilton, Brenda)
April 9, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Gustave P. Passanante. Filing Fee $ 200.00 Receipt # AFLSDC-14595136 by Social Life Network, Inc.. Responses due by 4/23/2021 (Hamilton, Brenda)
April 9, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Mark R. Basile. Filing Fee $ 200.00 Receipt # AFLSDC-14595129 by Social Life Network, Inc.. Responses due by 4/23/2021 (Hamilton, Brenda)
April 9, 2021 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Social Life Network, Inc. (Hamilton, Brenda)
April 9, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE by Social Life Network, Inc. Civil Cover Sheet (Hamilton, Brenda)
April 9, 2021 Filing 3 Clerks Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case. No Civil Cover Sheet. Filer is instructed to file a Notice (Other) with the Civil Cover Sheet attached within 24 hours of the notice. (kpe)
April 9, 2021 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Darrin P. Gayles. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Edwin G. Torres is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (kpe)
April 9, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Jason Goldstein, Peak One Opportunity Fund, L.P.. Filing fees $ 402.00 receipt number AFLSDC-14593677, filed by Social Life Network, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Debenture, #2 Exhibit Warrant, #3 Exhibit Securities Purchase Agreement)(Hamilton, Brenda)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Social Life Network, Inc. v. Peak One Opportunity Fund, L.P. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Social Life Network, Inc.
Represented By: Brenda Hamilton
Represented By: Mark R. Basile
Represented By: Catherine Gretschel
Represented By: Eric J. Benzenberg
Represented By: Gustave P. Passanante
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peak One Opportunity Fund, L.P.
Represented By: Brian Richman
Represented By: Aaron Rene Resnick
Represented By: Barry Goldsmith
Represented By: M. Jonathan Seibald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jason Goldstein
Represented By: Brian Richman
Represented By: Aaron Rene Resnick
Represented By: Barry Goldsmith
Represented By: M. Jonathan Seibald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?