Zelewski et al v. Robinhood Markets, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Richard Conley, Allen Zelewski, James Hill and Dillon Rogers
Defendant: Robinhood Markets, Inc., Robinhood Financial LLC and Robinhood Securities, LLC
Case Number: 1:2021cv21445
Filed: April 15, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Cecilia M Altonaga
Nature of Suit: Contract Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 16, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 SEVENTH ORDER OF CONSOLIDATION AND ADMINISTRATIVE CLOSE-OUT. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 4/16/2021. See attached document for full details. (mc)
April 16, 2021 Filing 17 MDL Transfer In Case Receipt from Middle District of Florida. Case Number 8:21-cv-00329 with documents 1-14. Assigned FLSD Case Number 1:21-cv-21445-CMA on 4/15/2021. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 1:21-md-02989-CMA. (mc)
April 15, 2021 Filing 16 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga. (mc)
April 15, 2021 Filing 15 Case transferred in from Florida Middle; Case Number 8:21-cv-00329. Electronic file including transfer order and docket sheet received. .(mc).
April 13, 2021 Filing 14 MULTIDISTRICT LITIGATION panel (CTO-1) Order transferring case to: Southern District of Florida re: MDL case number: 2989. (AG)
March 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ENDORSED ORDER granting #12 Joint Motion for Stay Pending MDL Status. The proceedings are STAYED and the Clerk is directed to ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSE this case pending the Joint Panel on Multidistrict Litigation's resolution of the pending motion to transfer in In re Short Squeeze Antitrust Litigation (MDL No. 2989). If the case is not transferred, Defendant shall file its answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint within thirty (30) days of the date the motion to transfer is denied. Signed by Judge Susan C. Bucklew on 3/10/2021. (DMB)
March 3, 2021 Filing 12 Joint MOTION to Stay Pending MDL Status by All Defendants. (Webb, Joshua)
February 11, 2021 Filing 11 WAIVER of service returned executed on 02/11/2021 by Allen Zelewski, Richard Conley, James Hill, Dillon Rogers as to Robinhood Securities, LLC. (Powell, Matthew)
February 11, 2021 Filing 10 WAIVER of service returned executed on 02/11/2021 by Allen Zelewski, Richard Conley, James Hill, Dillon Rogers as to Robinhood Financial, LLC. (Powell, Matthew)
February 11, 2021 Filing 9 WAIVER of service returned executed on 02/11/2021 by Allen Zelewski, Richard Conley, James Hill, Dillon Rogers as to Robinhood Markets, Inc.. (Powell, Matthew)
February 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 STANDING ORDER regarding discovery motions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson on 2/1/2021. (DMS)
February 11, 2021 Filing 7 SUMMONS issued as to Robinhood Financial, LLC, Robinhood Markets, Inc., and Robinhood Securities, LLC. (JLD)
February 11, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE REGARDING CASE MANAGEMENT DEADLINES (CAB)
February 11, 2021 Filing 5 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Susan C. Bucklew and Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson. New case number: 8:21-cv-0329-SCB-TGW. (SJB)
February 10, 2021 Filing 4 PROPOSED summons to be issued by Richard Conley, James Hill, Dillon Rogers, Allen Zelewski. (Powell, Matthew)
February 10, 2021 Filing 3 PROPOSED summons to be issued by Richard Conley, James Hill, Dillon Rogers, Allen Zelewski. (Powell, Matthew)
February 10, 2021 Filing 2 PROPOSED summons to be issued by Richard Conley, James Hill, Dillon Rogers, Allen Zelewski. (Powell, Matthew)
February 10, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Against All Defendants against All Plaintiffs with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 113A-17872407) filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 to Complaint)(Powell, Matthew) Modified on 2/11/2021 (JLD).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Zelewski et al v. Robinhood Markets, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robinhood Markets, Inc.
Represented By: Joshua Clark Webb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robinhood Financial LLC
Represented By: Joshua Clark Webb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robinhood Securities, LLC
Represented By: Joshua Clark Webb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Conley
Represented By: Matthew Douglas Powell
Represented By: Dario D. Diaz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Allen Zelewski
Represented By: Matthew Douglas Powell
Represented By: Dario D. Diaz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Hill
Represented By: Matthew Douglas Powell
Represented By: Dario D. Diaz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dillon Rogers
Represented By: Matthew Douglas Powell
Represented By: Dario D. Diaz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?