Fox et al v. Ally Financial Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Preenon Huq and Julie Fox
Defendant: Square Inc., Trading 212 LTD., Citadel Enterprise Americas, LLC, Freetrade Ltd., Barclays Bank P.L.C., Robinhood Securities, LLC, E*Trade Securities LLC, Stash Financial, Inc., Robinhood Financial LLC, Fumi Holdings, Inc., WeBull Financial LLC, Ally Financial Inc., Morgan Stanley Smith Barney LLC, Cash App Investing LLC, TD Ameritrade, Inc., Interactive Brokers LLC, Dough LLC, The Depository Trust & Clearing Corporation, Melvin Capital Management, LP, M1 Finance LLC, E*TRADE Financial Holdings, LLC, Alpaca Securities LLC, The Charles Schwab Corporation, Open to the Public Investing, Inc., Sequoia Capital Operations LLC, Tastyworks Inc., Citadel Securities LLC, APEX CLEARING CORPORATION, IG Group Holdings PLC, Robinhood Markets, Inc., eToro USA Securities, Inc., Trading 212 UK Ltd., Charles Schwab & Co. Inc., E*Trade Financial Corporation and FF Trade Republic Growth, LLC
Case Number: 1:2021cv21478
Filed: April 16, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Cecilia M Altonaga
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15:0001
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 19, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 19, 2021 Filing 16 Clerks Notice to Filer re #14 Notice of Attorney Appearance. Attorney Did Not Associate Themselves; ERROR - Filing attorney neglected to associate themselves to all applicable parties in the case. The Clerk has added the attorney to the party Preenon Huq. It is not necessary to refile this document future filings must comply with the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures and Local Rules by filing a Notice of Attorney Appearance and linking themselves to the case. (pcs)
April 16, 2021 Filing 15 MDL Transfer In Case Receipt from District of Minnesota. Case Number 0:21-cv-00689 with documents 1-11. Assigned FLSD Case Number 1:21-cv-21478-CMA on 4/16/2021. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 1:21-md-02989-CMA. (mc)
April 16, 2021 Filing 14 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Scott David Hirsch on behalf of Julie Fox. Attorney Scott David Hirsch added to party Julie Fox(pty:pla). (Hirsch, Scott)
April 16, 2021 Filing 13 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga. (mc)
April 16, 2021 Filing 12 Case transferred in from Minnesota; Case Number 0:21-cv-00689. Electronic file including transfer order and docket sheet received. .(mc).
April 13, 2021 Filing 11 CERTIFIED COPY OF CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-1) transferring case to the Southern District of Florida per the MDL Panel for coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings. Case assigned to the Honorable Cecilia M. Altonaga.(MMP)
March 16, 2021 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Preenon Huq, Julie Fox. Robinhood Securities, LLC waiver sent on 3/11/2021, answer due 5/10/2021. (Goodwin, David)
March 16, 2021 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Preenon Huq, Julie Fox. Robinhood Markets, Inc. waiver sent on 3/11/2021, answer due 5/10/2021. (Goodwin, David)
March 16, 2021 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Preenon Huq, Julie Fox. Robinhood Financial LLC waiver sent on 3/11/2021, answer due 5/10/2021. (Goodwin, David)
March 12, 2021 Filing 7 (Text-Only): Notice re: Non-Admitted AttorneyWe have received documents listing Scott D. Hirsch as counsel of record. If he or she wishes to be listed as an attorney of record in this case, he or she must be admitted to the bar of the U.S. District Court of Minnesota in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (a), (b) and (c) or temporarily admitted pro hac vice in accordance with #Local Rule 83.5 (d) or (e).For more admissions information and forms, please see the Attorney Forms Section of the courts website at #www.mnd.uscourts.gov/forms/all-forms#. (KNK)
March 12, 2021 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Apex Clearing Corporation, Citadel Securities LLC, Melvin Capital Management LP, Sequoia Capital Operations LLC, The Depository Trust & Clearing Corporation. (KNK)
March 12, 2021 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Barclays Bank PLC, Charles Schwab & Co. Inc., Citadel Enterprise Americas, LLC, FF Trade Republic Growth, LLC, Fumi Holdings, Inc., Stash Financial, Inc., The Charles Schwab Corporation, Trading 212 Ltd., Trading 212 UK Ltd., Webull Financial LLC. (KNK)
March 12, 2021 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Freetrade, LTD., IG Group Holdings PLC, Interactive Brokers LLC, M1 Finance, LLC, Open to the Public Investing, Inc., Robinhood Financial LLC, Robinhood Markets, Inc., Robinhood Securities, LLC, TD Ameritrade, Inc., Tastyworks, Inc.. (KNK)
March 12, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Ally Financial Inc., Alpaca Securities LLC, Cash App Investing LLC, Dough LLC, ETrade Financial Corporation, ETrade Financial Holdings, LLC, ETrade Securities LLC, Morgan Stanley Smith Barney LLC, Square Inc., eToro USA Securities, Inc.. (KNK)
March 12, 2021 Filing 2 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Susan Richard Nelson per 3rd, 4th - Antitrust, Securities list, referred to Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz. Please use case number 21-cv-689 (SRN/DTS). (KNK)
March 11, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Class Action Complaint against Ally Financial Inc., Alpaca Securities LLC, Apex Clearing Corporation, Barclays Bank PLC, Cash App Investing LLC, Charles Schwab & Co. Inc., Citadel Enterprise Americas, LLC, Citadel Securities LLC, Dough LLC, ETrade Financial Corporation, ETrade Financial Holdings, LLC, ETrade Securities LLC, FF Trade Republic Growth, LLC, Freetrade, LTD., Fumi Holdings, Inc., IG Group Holdings PLC, Interactive Brokers LLC, M1 Finance, LLC, Melvin Capital Management LP, Morgan Stanley Smith Barney LLC, Open to the Public Investing, Inc., Robinhood Financial LLC, Robinhood Markets, Inc., Robinhood Securities, LLC, Sequoia Capital Operations LLC, Square Inc., Stash Financial, Inc., TD Ameritrade, Inc., Tastyworks, Inc., The Charles Schwab Corporation, The Depository Trust & Clearing Corporation, Trading 212 Ltd., Trading 212 UK Ltd., Webull Financial LLC, eToro USA Securities, Inc. (filing fee $ 402, receipt number AMNDC-8590570) filed by Preenon Huq, Julie Fox. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Goodwin, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fox et al v. Ally Financial Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Square Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trading 212 LTD.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Citadel Enterprise Americas, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Freetrade Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barclays Bank P.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robinhood Securities, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E*Trade Securities LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stash Financial, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robinhood Financial LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fumi Holdings, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WeBull Financial LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ally Financial Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Morgan Stanley Smith Barney LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cash App Investing LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TD Ameritrade, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Interactive Brokers LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dough LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Depository Trust & Clearing Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Melvin Capital Management, LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M1 Finance LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E*TRADE Financial Holdings, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alpaca Securities LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Charles Schwab Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Open to the Public Investing, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sequoia Capital Operations LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tastyworks Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Citadel Securities LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: APEX CLEARING CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IG Group Holdings PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robinhood Markets, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: eToro USA Securities, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trading 212 UK Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles Schwab & Co. Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E*Trade Financial Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FF Trade Republic Growth, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Preenon Huq
Represented By: David A. Goodwin
Represented By: Daniel E. Gustafson
Represented By: Kaitlyn Leeann Dennis
Represented By: Daniel C. Hedlund
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julie Fox
Represented By: David A. Goodwin
Represented By: Daniel E. Gustafson
Represented By: Scott David Hirsch
Represented By: Kaitlyn Leeann Dennis
Represented By: Daniel C. Hedlund
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?