Great American Insurance Company of New York v. AMERICAN CONSTRUCTION & ENGINEERING CO et al
Plaintiff: GREAT AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY OF NEW YORK a/s/o Sunset Harbour North Condominium Assoc. Inc. and Great American Insurance Company of New York
Defendant: ACG ENGINEERING SERVICES, INC. and AMERICAN CONSTRUCTION & ENGINEERING CO
Case Number: 1:2021cv21635
Filed: April 28, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Jacqueline Becerra
Referring Judge: Jose E Martinez
Nature of Suit: Torts to Land
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 21, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 21, 2021 Filing 16 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Great American Insurance Company of New York re #15 Plaintiff's MOTION for Default Judgment as to Defendant ACG ENGINEERING SERVICES, INC. (Abel, William)
June 8, 2021 Filing 15 Plaintiff's MOTION for Default Judgment as to Defendant ACG ENGINEERING SERVICES, INC. by Great American Insurance Company of New York. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Filed Complaint, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B - Affidavit of Service, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C - Clerks Default, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D - Policy, #5 Exhibit Exhibit E - Breakdown of Loss, #6 Exhibit Exhibit F - Extra Security and Repair Invoices, #7 Exhibit Exhibit G - Replacement Breakdown, #8 Exhibit Exhibit H - Sworn Statement in Proof of Loss, #9 Exhibit Exhibit I - Affidavit of Terry Eddington, #10 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Abel, William)
June 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER SETTING CIVIL TRIAL DATE AND PRETRIAL SCHEDULE, REQUIRING MEDIATION, AND REFERRING CERTAIN MOTIONS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE: ( Jury Trial set for 4/11/2022 09:30 AM in Miami Division before Judge Jose E. Martinez., Calendar Call set for 4/7/2022 01:30 PM in Miami Division before Judge Jose E. Martinez.), ( Mediation Deadline 11/29/2021.). Signed by Judge Jose E. Martinez on 6/8/2021. See attached document for full details. (drz) #Pattern Jury Instruction Builder - To access the latest, up to date changes to the 11th Circuit Pattern Jury Instructions go to https://pji.ca11.uscourts.gov or click here.
June 8, 2021 Filing 13 Clerks Entry of Default as to ACG ENGINEERING SERVICES, INC - Motions Terminated: #12 Motion for Clerks Entry of Default Signed by DEPUTY CLERK on 6/8/2021. (drz)
June 7, 2021 Filing 12 MOTION for Clerks Entry of Default as to ACG ENGINEERING SERVICES, INC. by Great American Insurance Company of New York. (Abel, William)
May 13, 2021 Filing 11 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Great American Insurance Company of New York. ACG ENGINEERING SERVICES, INC. served on 5/11/2021, answer due 6/1/2021. (Abel, William)
May 3, 2021 Filing 10 Summons Issued as to ACG ENGINEERING SERVICES, INC. (drz)
May 3, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons(es) by Great American Insurance Company of New York (Attachments: #1 Summon(s) Corrected Summons as to ACG) (Abel, William)
April 29, 2021 Filing 8 Statement of: RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Great American Insurance Company of New York (Abel, William)
April 29, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Nelson E. Canter. Filing Fee $ 200.00 Receipt # AFLSDC-14645533 by Great American Insurance Company of New York. Responses due by 5/13/2021 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certification of Nelson E. Canter, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac)(Abel, William)
April 29, 2021 Filing 6 Clerks Notice of Docket Correction re #4 Summons Issued. Document Restricted Due to Error; The correct document has been attached to this notice. (drz)
April 29, 2021 Filing 5 Clerks Notice to Filer re: Summons(es) cannot be issued. The party(ies) on the summons(es) does not match the initiating documents (Summons for ACG Engineering Services, Inc. listed party as ACV Engineering Services, Inc.) (drz)
April 29, 2021 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to ACG ENGINEERING SERVICES, INC., AMERICAN CONSTRUCTION & ENGINEERING CO. (drz)
April 29, 2021 Filing 3 Clerks Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case. Party(ies) Improperly Formatted. The Filer failed to enter the party name(s) in accordance with the CM/ECF Format for Adding Parties for Attorneys Guide. The correction was made. It is not necessary to re-file the document. (drz)
April 28, 2021 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Jose E. Martinez. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Becerra is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (drz)
April 28, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants. Filing fees $ 402.00 receipt number AFLSDC-14644345, filed by GREAT AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY OF NEW YORK a/s/o Sunset Harbour North Condominium Assoc. Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summon(s) Summons ACG, #4 Summon(s) Summons American)(Abel, William)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Great American Insurance Company of New York v. AMERICAN CONSTRUCTION & ENGINEERING CO et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ACG ENGINEERING SERVICES, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AMERICAN CONSTRUCTION & ENGINEERING CO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GREAT AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY OF NEW YORK a/s/o Sunset Harbour North Condominium Assoc. Inc.
Represented By: William Turner Abel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Great American Insurance Company of New York
Represented By: William Turner Abel
Represented By: Nelson E. Canter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?