Vuong v. Etro U.S.A., Inc.
Plaintiff: Diep Vuong
Defendant: Etro U.S.A., Inc.
Case Number: 1:2021cv21658
Filed: April 30, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Federico A Moreno
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 19, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 19, 2021 Filing 12 REPLY to Response to Motion re #6 Defendant's MOTION to Strike Plaintiff's Claim to Recover Attorneys' Fees as a Component of Damages for her Workers' Compensation Retaliation Claim with Incorporated Memorandum of Law filed by Etro U.S.A., Inc.. (Allen, Scott)
May 14, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE of Mediator Selection. Selected/Added Karen Evans as Mediator. (Brown, Christopher)
May 13, 2021 Filing 10 RESPONSE to Motion re #6 Defendant's MOTION to Strike Plaintiff's Claim to Recover Attorneys' Fees as a Component of Damages for her Workers' Compensation Retaliation Claim with Incorporated Memorandum of Law filed by Diep Vuong. Replies due by 5/20/2021. (Brown, Christopher)
May 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediation. Mediation Deadline 10/21/2021. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 5/13/2021. See attached document for full details. (zgz)
May 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 SCHEDULING ORDER: Jury Trial set for 12/20/2021 in Miami Division before Judge Federico A. Moreno. Calendar Call set for 12/14/2021 02:00 PM in Miami Division before Judge Federico A. Moreno. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 5/13/2021. See attached document for full details. (zgz) #Pattern Jury Instruction Builder - To access the latest, up to date changes to the 11th Circuit Pattern Jury Instructions go to https://pji.ca11.uscourts.gov or click here.
May 11, 2021 Filing 7 STATUS REPORT by Etro U.S.A., Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Allen, Scott)
May 7, 2021 Filing 6 Defendant's MOTION to Strike Plaintiff's Claim to Recover Attorneys' Fees as a Component of Damages for her Workers' Compensation Retaliation Claim with Incorporated Memorandum of Law by Etro U.S.A., Inc.. Responses due by 5/21/2021 (Allen, Scott)
May 7, 2021 Filing 5 Defendant's ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint re the Notice of Removal by Etro U.S.A., Inc.. (Allen, Scott)
May 3, 2021 Filing 4 Notice of Court Practice in Removal Cases. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 5/3/2021. See attached document for full details. (zgz)
May 3, 2021 Filing 3 Defendant's Corporate Disclosure Statement by Etro U.S.A., Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Etro SPA for Etro U.S.A., Inc. (Allen, Scott)
April 30, 2021 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Federico A. Moreno. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (pcs)
April 30, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (STATE COURT COMPLAINT - Complaint) Filing fee $ 402.00 receipt number AFLSDC-14649748, filed by Etro U.S.A., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Allen, Scott) No Answer/Motion to Dismiss filed. Modified on 4/30/2021 (pcs).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vuong v. Etro U.S.A., Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Etro U.S.A., Inc.
Represented By: Scott Stephan Allen
Represented By: Tiexin Yang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Diep Vuong
Represented By: Christopher David Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?