Dominicana Renovables, S.L. v. The Dominican Republic
Plaintiff: Dominicana Renovables, S.L.
Defendant: The Dominican Republic
Case Number: 1:2021cv21796
Filed: May 11, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Beth Bloom
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Arbitration
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 25, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 PAPERLESS ORDER granting ECF No. #19 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Attorney Michael Anthony Losco. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom (ta00)
June 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 PAPERLESS ORDER granting ECF No. #18 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Attorney Alexander de Gramont. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom (ta00)
June 25, 2021 Filing 19 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Michael Anthony Losco. Filing Fee $ 200.00 Receipt # CFLSDC-14796532 by The Dominican Republic. Responses due by 7/9/2021 (Attachments: #1 Certification of Michael Anthony Losco)(Vielleville, Daniel)
June 25, 2021 Filing 18 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Alexander de Gramont, Esq.. Filing Fee $ 200.00 Receipt # AFLSDC-14796472 by The Dominican Republic. Responses due by 7/9/2021 (Attachments: #1 Certification Certification of Alexander de Gramont)(Vielleville, Daniel)
June 25, 2021 Filing 17 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Daniel Eric Vielleville on behalf of The Dominican Republic. Attorney Daniel Eric Vielleville added to party The Dominican Republic(pty:dft). (Vielleville, Daniel)
June 1, 2021 Filing 16 NOTICE by Dominicana Renovables, S.L. re #1 Motion (Complaint) to Confirm/Vacate/Modify or Correct Arbitration Award of Filing (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Final Award - English, #2 Exhibit B - Addendum to Final Award - English, #3 Exhibit C - Final Award - Spanish, #4 Exhibit D - Addendum to Final Award - Spanish) (Rodriguez, Francisco)
May 21, 2021 Filing 15 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Motion (Complaint) to Confirm/Vacate/Modify or Correct Arbitration Award with a response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 15 as determined by the attorney/filer of July 20, 2021 by Dominicana Renovables, S.L.. Dominicana Renovables, S.L. served on 5/21/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Summons Returned Executed)(Rodriguez, Francisco)
May 21, 2021 Filing 14 NOTICE of Striking #12 Notice (Other) filed by Dominicana Renovables, S.L. by Dominicana Renovables, S.L. (Rodriguez, Francisco)
May 21, 2021 Filing 13 Clerks Notice to Filer re #12 Notice (Other). Wrong Event Selected; ERROR - The Filer selected the wrong event. The correct event is Summons (Affidavit) Returned Executed.; CORRECTIVE ACTION REQUIRED - The Filer must File a Notice of Striking, then refile the document using the correct event. (ls)
May 21, 2021 Filing 12 "STRICKEN" NOTICE by Dominicana Renovables, S.L. Notice of Filing (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Summons Returned Executed) (Rodriguez, Francisco) Modified on 5/21/2021 (ls). (per DE #14)
May 18, 2021 Filing 11 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed for Service Abroad/International Service The Dominican Republic served on 5/18/2021, answer due 7/19/2021. (scn)
May 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 PAPERLESS ORDER granting ECF No. #9 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Attorney Rebeca E. Mosquera. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom (ta00)
May 14, 2021 Filing 9 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Rebeca E. Mosquera. Pay.gov Agency Tracking ID FLSDC-AFLSDC-14682297. Filing Fee $ 200.00 by Dominicana Renovables, S.L.. Responses due by 5/28/2021 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Rodriguez, Francisco)
May 13, 2021 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to The Dominican Republic (ls)
May 12, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons(es) by Dominicana Renovables, S.L. re #1 Motion (Complaint) to Confirm/Vacate/Modify or Correct Arbitration Award filed by Dominicana Renovables, S.L. (Rodriguez, Francisco)
May 12, 2021 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement Rule 7.1 by Dominicana Renovables, S.L. (Rodriguez, Francisco)
May 12, 2021 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT / Declaration signed by: Francisco A. Rodriguez re #1 Motion (Complaint) to Confirm/Vacate/Modify or Correct Arbitration Award by Dominicana Renovables, S.L. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1- Original Final Award, #2 Exhibit 2 - Original Addendum to Final Award)(Rodriguez, Francisco)
May 12, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Filing Civil Cover Sheet by Dominicana Renovables, S.L. re #1 Motion (Complaint) to Confirm/Vacate/Modify or Correct Arbitration Award (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Rodriguez, Francisco) Modified Text on 5/13/2021 (ls).
May 12, 2021 Filing 3 Clerks Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case. No Civil Cover Sheet. Filer is instructed to file a Notice (Other) with the Civil Cover Sheet attached within 24 hours of the notice. (ail)
May 11, 2021 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Beth Bloom. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Alicia M. Otazo-Reyes is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (ail)
May 11, 2021 Filing 1 Motion (Complaint) to Confirm in Part and Set Aside in Part Arbitration Award. Filing fee $402.00 receipt number AFLSDC-14679943, filed by Dominicana Renovables, S.L..(Rodriguez, Francisco)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dominicana Renovables, S.L. v. The Dominican Republic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Dominican Republic
Represented By: Alexandre de Gramont
Represented By: Daniel Eric Vielleville
Represented By: Michael Anthony Losco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dominicana Renovables, S.L.
Represented By: Francisco A. Rodriguez
Represented By: Andrew J. Dominguez
Represented By: Rebeca E. Mosquera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?