Medlink Legal Systems, LLC v. QIMA Limited
Plaintiff: MEDLINK LEGAL SYSTEMS, LLC
Defendant: QIMA Limited doing business as QIMA (US) LLC
Case Number: 1:2021cv22168
Filed: June 11, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Cecilia M Altonaga
Referring Judge: Edwin G Torres
Nature of Suit: Negotiable Instrument
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1986
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 4, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER granting #30 Motion to Quash. Amended Complaint due by 8/18/2021. Plaintiff must perfect service upon the proper party or parties and file proof of service by September 10, 2021. Jurisdictional discovery is terminated. Signed by Chief Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 8/4/2021. See attached document for full details. (ps1)
July 29, 2021 Filing 41 REPLY to Response to Motion re #30 Defendant's MOTION to Quash Service of Summons filed by QIMA Limited. (Johnson, Latasha)
July 29, 2021 Filing 40 PAPERLESS Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Edwin G. Torres: Discovery Hearing held on 7/29/2021. Attorney Appearance(s): Jocelyne Anne Macelloni, Joshua E. Rasco, Michael David Ehrenstein, Latasha N Johnson. Total time in court: 1 hour(s) : 08 minutes.(Digital EGT-01/07-29-2021-11:41 am -AT&T Conference) (mdc)
July 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER granting #36 Motion for Extension of Time of Discovery Cutoff Deadline. Amended Complaint due by 9/7/2021. The parties shall complete jurisdictional discovery, including depositions, by by 8/30/2021. Defendant has until September 17, 2021 to file a motion to dismiss for lack of personal jurisdiction or until September 10, 2021 to file a notice indicating it will not be challenging personal jurisdiction. Signed by Chief Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 7/29/2021. See attached document for full details. (ps1)
July 28, 2021 Filing 38 RESPONSE to Motion re #36 First MOTION for Extension of Time of Discovery Cutoff Deadline DEFENDANTS RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO COMPLETE JURISDICTIONAL DISCOVERY filed by QIMA Limited. Replies due by 8/4/2021. (Ehrenstein, Michael)
July 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER Requiring expedited response/reply to #36 First MOTION for Extension of Time of Discovery Cutoff Deadline filed by Medlink Legal Systems, LLC: Responses due by 7/29/2021, Replies due by 7/30/2021. Signed by Chief Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 7/28/2021. See attached document for full details. (ps1)
July 28, 2021 Filing 36 First MOTION for Extension of Time of Discovery Cutoff Deadline by Medlink Legal Systems, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Composite Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Composite Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D)(Rasco, Joshua)
July 26, 2021 Filing 35 RESPONSE to Motion re #30 Defendant's MOTION to Quash Service of Summons filed by Medlink Legal Systems, LLC. Replies due by 8/2/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Composite Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit Composite Exhibit D)(Rasco, Joshua)
July 20, 2021 Filing 34 PAPERLESS NOTICE of Hearing: **TELEPHONIC CHANGE ONLY** The Discovery Hearing set for 7/29/2021 at 11:30 AM in the Miami Division before Magistrate Judge Edwin G. Torres shall be conducted by TELEPHONE. At the scheduled time, counsel for all parties shall call the following toll-free number: 1-888-684-8852 (access code 5264742#) (security code 1231#). Parties appearing at the telephonic hearing must be on a landline to facilitate communication. Any counsel appearing at the hearing that is not arguing may appear by cellular phone or other means so long as the device may be muted. (ahg)
July 15, 2021 Filing 33 NOTICE of Change of Address, Email or Law Firm Name by Joshua E. Rasco (Rasco, Joshua)
July 12, 2021 Filing 32 NOTICE of Compliance With Order Setting Discovery Procedures by QIMA Limited re 29 Notice re Hearing (Johnson, Latasha)
July 12, 2021 Filing 31 NOTICE of Compliance Regarding Jurisdictional Discovery by Medlink Legal Systems, LLC. Attorney Joshua E. Rasco added to party Medlink Legal Systems, LLC(pty:pla). (Rasco, Joshua)
July 12, 2021 Filing 30 Defendant's MOTION to Quash Service of Summons by QIMA Limited. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Johnson, Latasha)
July 8, 2021 Filing 29 PAPERLESS NOTICE of Discovery Hearing: A Discovery Hearing is set for 7/29/2021 at 11:30 AM in the Miami Division before Magistrate Judge Edwin G. Torres. (ahg)
July 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 28 PAPERLESS ORDER denying #27 Motion for Protective Order. Defendant is advised to read and follow the instructions contained in the June 16, 2021 Order [ECF No.15] pertaining to the handling of discovery disputes, including requests for protective order. Signed by Chief Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga (CMA)
July 2, 2021 Filing 27 Defendant's MOTION for Protective Order to Limit Jurisdictional Discovery by QIMA Limited. (Johnson, Latasha)
June 25, 2021 Filing 26 Corrected Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by Medlink Legal Systems, LLC identifying Corporate Parent MEDLINK LEGAL SYSTEMS, LLC for Medlink Legal Systems, LLC (Macelloni, Jocelyne)
June 24, 2021 Filing 25 Clerks Notice to Filer re #24 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement. Other Affiliates/Corporate Parents Not Entered; ERROR - The Filer failed to enter all Other Affiliates/Corporate Parents from the Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement. Filer is instructed to refile their Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement and enter the missing Other Affiliates/Corp Parents. Note - Other Affiliates/Corporate Parents do not appear on the docket sheet. (jas)
June 23, 2021 Filing 24 Plaintiff's Corporate Disclosure Statement by MEDLINK LEGAL SYSTEMS, LLC identifying Corporate Parent MEDLINK LEGAL SYSTEMS, LLC for MEDLINK LEGAL SYSTEMS, LLC (Attachments: #1 Certification)(Macelloni, Jocelyne)
June 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER SETTING DISCOVERY PROCEDURES. Signed by Magistrate Judge Edwin G. Torres on 6/23/2021. See attached document for full details. (mdc)
June 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER re #6 Order Requiring the parties to file certificates of interested parties and corporate disclosure statements; Plaintiff shall comply with the Order by 6/23/2021. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 6/22/2021. See attached document for full details. (ps1)
June 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER re #14 Order permitting Plaintiff, Medlink Legal Systems, LLC to conduct jurisdictional discovery as to Defendant, QIMA Limited. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 6/22/2021. See attached document for full details. (ps1)
June 22, 2021 Filing 20 Clerks Notice to Filer re #17 Notice (Other). Wrong Event Selected - Document is a Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement; CORRECTIVE ACTION REQUIRED - The Filer must File a Notice of Striking, then refile the document using the Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement event and ensure all Other Affiliates/Corporate Parents are entered. Note - Other Affiliates/Corporate Parents do not appear on the docket sheet. (pcs)
June 21, 2021 Filing 19 Joint SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 16.1 by MEDLINK LEGAL SYSTEMS, LLC (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Macelloni, Jocelyne)
June 21, 2021 Filing 18 NOTICE by QIMA Limited Removal Status Report (Ehrenstein, Michael)
June 21, 2021 Filing 17 NOTICE by QIMA Limited Certificate of Interested Parties and Corp Disclosure (Ehrenstein, Michael)
June 17, 2021 Filing 16 Statement of: Corporate Disclosure by MEDLINK LEGAL SYSTEMS, LLC (Macelloni, Jocelyne)
June 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Edwin G. Torres for Discovery Matters. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 6/16/2021. See attached document for full details. (ps1)
June 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER denying #8 Motion to Dismiss, or in the Alternative, for a More Definite Statement. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 6/16/2021. See attached document for full details. (ps1)
June 16, 2021 Filing 13 PAPERLESS Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga: Motion Hearing held on 6/16/2021 re #8 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint), Defendant's MOTION TO DISMISS #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint), FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM FloridaFirst MOTION to Dismiss the State Court Complaint contained within the Notice of Removal #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint), Florida filed by QIMA Limited. Total time in court: 0 hour(s) : 15 minutes. Attorney Appearance(s): Jocelyne Anne Macelloni, Michael David Ehrenstein, Latasha N Johnson, Court Reporter: Stephanie McCarn, 305-523-5518 / Stephanie_McCarn@flsd.uscourts.gov. (pn00)
June 15, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE of Change of Address, Email or Law Firm Name by Latasha N Johnson (Johnson, Latasha)
June 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER denying #9 Motion to Quash. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 6/15/2021. See attached document for full details. (ps1)
June 15, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE of Hearing re: #8 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction #1 : Telephonic Status Conference, re: Plaintiff's need for jurisdictional discovery, set for 6/16/2021 11:00 AM in Miami Division before Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga. The parties shall appear by phone and are instructed to call 1-888-684-8852 on the date and time set forth above and wait for your case to be called. The access code is 3156459 and the security code is 5510. FOR CLARITY, PLEASE DO NOT USE A SPEAKER PHONE, AND AVOID USING A CELL PHONE IF POSSIBLE. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the court. (ps1)
June 14, 2021 Filing 9 Defendant's MOTION to Quash Service of Summons by QIMA Limited. (Attachments: #1 Summon(s) Exhibit A, #2 Affidavit Exhibit B)(Ehrenstein, Michael)
June 14, 2021 Filing 8 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint), , Defendant's MOTION TO DISMISS #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint), FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Florida, First MOTION to Dismiss the State Court Complaint contained within the Notice of Removal #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint), Florida by QIMA Limited. Responses due by 6/28/2021 (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Exhibit A, #2 Summon(s) Exhibit B)(Ehrenstein, Michael)
June 11, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE by QIMA Limited Civil Cover Sheet (Ehrenstein, Michael)
June 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order Requiring Joint Scheduling Report and Certificates of Interested Parties by 6/21/2021. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 6/11/2021. See attached document for full details. (ps1)
June 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER Requiring a Removal Status Report by 6/21/2021. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 6/11/2021. See attached document for full details. (ps1)
June 11, 2021 Filing 4 Clerks Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case. Alias Not Added. The Filer failed to add the alias information for the party(ies). The correction was made. It is not necessary to re-file this document. (pcs)
June 11, 2021 Filing 3 Clerks Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case. No Civil Cover Sheet. Filer is instructed to file a Notice (Other) with the Civil Cover Sheet attached within 24 hours of the notice. (pcs)
June 11, 2021 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Edwin G. Torres is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (pcs)
June 11, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (STATE COURT COMPLAINT - COMPLAINT) Filing fee $ 402.00 receipt number AFLSDC-14761091, filed by QIMA Limited. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Notice of Removal)(Ehrenstein, Michael) No Answer/Motion to Dismiss filed. Modified on 6/11/2021 (pcs).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Medlink Legal Systems, LLC v. QIMA Limited
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: QIMA Limited doing business as QIMA (US) LLC
Represented By: Michael David Ehrenstein
Represented By: Latasha N Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MEDLINK LEGAL SYSTEMS, LLC
Represented By: Brian Barakat
Represented By: Jocelyne Anne Macelloni
Represented By: Joshua E. Rasco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?