N Consulting Group, LLC v. GCF Holdings, S.A.C. et al
Plaintiff: N Consulting Group, LLC
Defendant: GCF Holdings, S.A.C., Fernando Lopez de Castilla and Sandra Lucia Carillo Masa
Case Number: 1:2021cv22297
Filed: June 22, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Chris M McAliley
Referring Judge: Kathleen M Williams
Nature of Suit: Contract: Franchise
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 12, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 PAPERLESS ORDER DISMISSING AND CLOSING CASE. THIS MATTER is before the Court on the Parties' joint stipulation for dismissal with prejudice #15 . Upon review of the stipulation and the record, it is ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that this case is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE, each party to bear its own attorneys' fees and costs. All pending motions are DENIED AS MOOT. All hearings, trial settings, and deadlines are CANCELED. This case is CLOSED. Signed by Judge Kathleen M. Williams on 8/12/2021. (shy)
August 12, 2021 Filing 15 STIPULATION of Dismissal Jointly Filed by Plaintiff and Defendants by N Consulting Group, LLC (Hayes, Alec)
July 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 PAPERLESS ORDER. Defendants have filed a Second Motion for Extension of Time, seeking an additional two weeks to respond to the Complaint. (ECF No. 13). Defendants assert that the extension is necessary because the parties "are close to resolving the underlying dispute, but a few issues are still outstanding." (Id. at 2). Having carefully reviewed the Second Motion, the pertinent portions of the record and the applicable law, the Court finds good cause for the requested extension. Accordingly, the Court hereby ORDERS that the Second Motion for Extension of Time, (ECF No. 13), is GRANTED. Defendants shall respond to the Complaint NO LATER THAN AUGUST 12, 2021. The Court will not grant any further extensions of time to respond to the Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Chris M. McAliley on 7/28/2021. (nsy)
July 28, 2021 Reset Deadlines Sandra Lucia Carillo Masa answer due 8/12/2021; GCF Holdings, S.A.C. answer due 8/12/2021; Fernando Lopez de Castilla answer due 8/12/2021. (cqs)
July 27, 2021 Filing 13 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Plead in Response to re #1 Complaint, by Sandra Lucia Carillo Masa, GCF Holdings, S.A.C., Fernando Lopez de Castilla. Responses due by 8/10/2021 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Silva, Patricia)
July 14, 2021 Reset Deadlines All Defendants Per DE#12. (cqs)
July 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 PAPERLESS ORDER. Defendants filed an Unopposed Motion to Extend Time to Answer or Otherwise Plead in Response to the Complaint. (ECF No. 11). Having reviewed the Motion, the pertinent portions of the record and the applicable law, and noting that Plaintiff does not object to the relief sought, the Court finds good cause for the brief extension of time requested. Accordingly, the Court hereby ORDERS that the Unopposed Motion for to Extend Time (ECF No. 11), is GRANTED. Defendants shall file their response to the Complaint NO LATER THAN July 29, 2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Chris M. McAliley on 7/13/2021. (nsy)
July 13, 2021 Filing 11 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Plead in Response to re #1 Complaint, by Sandra Lucia Carillo Masa, GCF Holdings, S.A.C., Fernando Lopez de Castilla. Attorney Patricia Lehtinen Silva added to party Sandra Lucia Carillo Masa(pty:dft), Attorney Patricia Lehtinen Silva added to party GCF Holdings, S.A.C.(pty:dft), Attorney Patricia Lehtinen Silva added to party Fernando Lopez de Castilla(pty:dft). Responses due by 7/27/2021 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Silva, Patricia)
July 8, 2021 Filing 10 Clerks Notice to Filer re #6 Summons Returned Executed. Incorrect Service Date Entered; ERROR - The incorrect service date was entered. The correction was made by the Clerk and filing was re-docketed, see de# 9 Summons Returned Executed. It is not necessary to refile this document. (mee)
July 8, 2021 Filing 9 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by N Consulting Group, LLC. GCF Holdings, S.A.C. served on 6/24/2021, answer due 7/15/2021. For image see d.e. #6 . (mee)
July 8, 2021 Filing 8 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by N Consulting Group, LLC. Sandra Lucia Carillo Masa served on 6/24/2021, answer due 7/15/2021. (Hayes, Alec)
July 8, 2021 Filing 7 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by N Consulting Group, LLC. Fernando Lopez de Castilla served on 6/24/2021, answer due 7/15/2021. (Hayes, Alec)
July 8, 2021 Filing 6 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by N Consulting Group, LLC. GCF Holdings, S.A.C. served on 6/23/2021, answer due 7/14/2021. (Hayes, Alec)
June 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER OF REFERRAL AND NOTICE OF COURT PRACTICES AND PROCEDURES. Signed by Judge Kathleen M. Williams on 6/23/2021. See attached document for full details. (lbc)
June 23, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Sandra Lucia Carillo Masa, GCF Holdings, S.A.C., Fernando Lopez de Castilla. (mee)
June 22, 2021 Filing 4 Clerks Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case. Attorney information does not match initiating document. The name of the attorney submitting the complaint does not match the signature on the pdf document. The attorney listed on the initiating document has been added. It is not necessary to re-file this document. (mee)
June 22, 2021 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Kathleen M. Williams. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Chris M. McAliley is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (mee)
June 22, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants. Filing fees $ 402.00 receipt number AFLSDC-14788205, filed by N Consulting Group, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Compl. Ex. "A" - GNF Area Development Agreement, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summon(s) GCF Holdings, S.A.C., #4 Summon(s) Castilla, #5 Summon(s) Carillo Masa)(Hayes, Alec)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: N Consulting Group, LLC v. GCF Holdings, S.A.C. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GCF Holdings, S.A.C.
Represented By: Patricia Lehtinen Silva
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fernando Lopez de Castilla
Represented By: Patricia Lehtinen Silva
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sandra Lucia Carillo Masa
Represented By: Patricia Lehtinen Silva
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: N Consulting Group, LLC
Represented By: Alec Peyton Hayes
Represented By: Leon Francisco Hirzel, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?