Clear Spring Property and Casualty Company v. Varmax Yacht Charters, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Clear Spring Property and Casualty Company
Defendant: Varmax Yacht Charters, LLC and Felicia Allen
Case Number: 1:2021cv22588
Filed: July 20, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Chris M McAliley
Referring Judge: Kathleen M Williams
Nature of Suit: Contract: Marine
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 8, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 8, 2021 Filing 19 ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint by Varmax Yacht Charters, LLC. (Stewart, Kelley)
September 8, 2021 Filing 18 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Clear Spring Property and Casualty Company. Felicia Allen waiver sent on 9/3/2021, answer due 11/2/2021. (Marcotte, Daniel)
September 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #15 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time. Defendant Varmax Yacht Charters, LLC shall respond to the Complaint no later than September 10, 2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Chris M. McAliley on 9/3/2021. (rr00)
September 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #11 Motion for Substitution of Counsel. Attorney Daniel S. Marcotte added. Signed by Magistrate Judge Chris M. McAliley on 9/3/2021. (rr00)
September 3, 2021 Filing 15 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #1 Complaint, by Varmax Yacht Charters, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Defendant's Motion for Extension of Time)(Stewart, Kelley)
August 31, 2021 Filing 14 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Kevin Anthony Malone on behalf of Varmax Yacht Charters, LLC. Attorney Kevin Anthony Malone added to party Varmax Yacht Charters, LLC(pty:dft). (Malone, Kevin)
August 30, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Kelley Badger Stewart on behalf of Varmax Yacht Charters, LLC. Attorney Kelley Badger Stewart added to party Varmax Yacht Charters, LLC(pty:dft). (Stewart, Kelley)
August 26, 2021 Filing 12 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Clear Spring Property and Casualty Company. Varmax Yacht Charters, LLC served on 8/14/2021, answer due 9/7/2021. (Attachments: #1 Verified Return of Service on Varmax Yacht Charters, LLC)(Marcotte, Daniel)
August 23, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE / Motion for Substitution of Counsel by Clear Spring Property and Casualty Company Change of Responsible Attorney (Marcotte, Daniel) Modified to convert to a motion. on 8/23/2021 (pcs).
August 23, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Daniel Scott Marcotte on behalf of Clear Spring Property and Casualty Company. Attorney Daniel Scott Marcotte added to party Clear Spring Property and Casualty Company(pty:pla). (Marcotte, Daniel)
August 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 PAPERLESS ORDER. Plaintiff Clear Spring Property and Casualty Company filed a Motion to Withdraw W. Cooper Jarnagin as counsel. (ECF Nos. 6, 7). The Court has reviewed the Motion, the record in this action and the applicable law, and finds good cause to grant the relief requested. In reaching this conclusion, the Court is mindful that Richard J. McAlpin of McAlpin Conroy, P.A. will remain counsel of record and continue to represent Plaintiff. Accordingly, the Court hereby ORDERS that the Motion to Withdraw, (ECF Nos. 6, 7), is GRANTED. W. Cooper Jarnagin is hereby relieved of all further responsibilities relating to Plaintiff. The Clerk of Court shall terminate W. Cooper Jarnagin as counsel of record in this matter. Signed by Magistrate Judge Chris M. McAliley on 8/16/2021. (rr00)
August 13, 2021 Filing 8 Clerks Notice to Filer re #6 Notice of Change of Address, Email or Law Firm Name. Two or More Document Events Filed as One; ERROR - Only one event was selected by the Filer but more than one event was applicable to the document filed. The docket entry was corrected by the Clerk SEE DE 7 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Walter Cooper Jarnagin. It is not necessary to refile this document but in the future, the Filer must select all applicable events. (ail)
August 12, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Walter Cooper Jarnagin for / by Clear Spring Property and Casualty Company. Responses due by 8/26/2021. SEE DE #6 IMAGE(ail)
August 12, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Change of Address, Email or Law Firm Name by Walter Cooper Jarnagin (Jarnagin, Walter)
August 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER OF REFERRAL AND NOTICE OF COURT PRACTICES AND PROCEDURES, referring case to Magistrate Judge Chris M. McAliley for all discovery disputes and Pretrial Non-Dispositive Matters. Signed by Judge Kathleen M. Williams on 8/4/2021. See attached document for full details. (pcs)
July 22, 2021 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Varmax Yacht Charters, LLC. (jas)
July 22, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons(es) (Varmax Yacht Charters, LLC) by Clear Spring Property and Casualty Company (Jarnagin, Walter)
July 20, 2021 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Kathleen M. Williams. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Chris M. McAliley is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (pcs)
July 20, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Declaratory Judgment against Felicia Allen, Varmax Yacht Charters, LLC. Filing fees $ 402.00 receipt number AFLSDC-14861123, filed by Clear Spring Property and Casualty Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - The Application, #2 Exhibit 2 - The Policy, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Jarnagin, Walter)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Clear Spring Property and Casualty Company v. Varmax Yacht Charters, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clear Spring Property and Casualty Company
Represented By: Walter Cooper Jarnagin
Represented By: Richard James McAlpin
Represented By: Daniel Scott Marcotte
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Varmax Yacht Charters, LLC
Represented By: Kelley Badger Stewart
Represented By: Kevin Anthony Malone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Felicia Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?