Perlman v. American Express Company et al
Plaintiff: Jonathan E. Perlman
Defendant: American Express Company, American Express National Bank and American Express Travel Related Services Co., Inc.
Case Number: 1:2021cv22878
Filed: August 6, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Jonathan Goodman
Referring Judge: Robert N Scola
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Cause of Action: 12 U.S.C. ยง 0022
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 30, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 30, 2021 Filing 15 ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint with Jury Demand by American Express Company, American Express National Bank, American Express Travel Related Services Co., Inc.. (Green, Michael)
September 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 PAPERLESS ORDER: granting the Plaintiff's Renewed Motion to Withdraw as Counsel. #13 . The Clerk shall remove Irina R. Sadovnic, Esq. from the service list in this action. The law firm of Genovese Joblove & Battista, P.A. shall remain counsel for the Receiver. Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr. (ntd)
September 14, 2021 Filing 13 Renewed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Irina R. Sadovnic for / by Jonathan E. Perlman. Responses due by 9/28/2021 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Sadovnic, Irina)
September 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 PAPERLESS ORDER: The Court denies without prejudice the Plaintiff's Motion to Withdraw as Counsel #11 for failure to comply with Local Rule 7.1(a)(3). Local Rule 7.1(a)(3) requires an attorney filing a motion in a civil case to confer in a good-faith effort with all parties or non-parties who may be affected by the relief sought in an attempt to resolve by agreement the issues raised in the motion. The filing attorney must then include in the motion a statement certifying to the Court either that (1) counsel for the movant conferred with all parties or relevant non-parties in good faith but was unable to resolve the issues raised in the motion or (2) counsel for the movant made reasonable, identifiable efforts to confer with all parties and relevant non-parties but has been unable to do so. S.D. Fla. L.R. 7.1(a)(3). "The purpose of the rule is to ensure judicial economy and prevent courts from considering issues the parties could agree on independently, and to ascertain whether the Court need wait for a response from the opposing party before deciding the motion." Aguilar v. United Floor Crew, Inc., No. 14-Civ-61605, 2014 WL 6751663, at *1 (S.D. Fla. Dec. 1, 2014) (Bloom, J.). Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr. (ntd)
September 13, 2021 Filing 11 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Irina R. Sadovnic for / by Jonathan E. Perlman. Responses due by 9/27/2021 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Sadovnic, Irina)
September 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 PAPERLESS ORDER: granting the Defendants' Agreed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond. #9 . The Defendants must respond to the Complaint by October 1, 2021. Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr. (ntd)
September 1, 2021 Filing 9 Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #1 Complaint, by American Express Company, American Express National Bank, American Express Travel Related Services Co., Inc.. Attorney Michael Brandon Green added to party American Express Company(pty:dft), Attorney Michael Brandon Green added to party American Express National Bank (pty:dft), Attorney Michael Brandon Green added to party American Express Travel Related Services Co., Inc.(pty:dft). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Green, Michael)
August 23, 2021 Filing 8 Notice of Pending, Refiled, Related or Similar Actions by Jonathan E. Perlman (Jacobs, Eric)
August 23, 2021 Filing 7 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Jonathan E. Perlman. American Express Travel Related Services Co., Inc. served on 8/11/2021, answer due 9/1/2021. (Jacobs, Eric)
August 23, 2021 Filing 6 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Jonathan E. Perlman. American Express National Bank served on 8/12/2021, answer due 9/2/2021. (Jacobs, Eric)
August 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MAGISTRATE JUDGE GOODMAN'S DISCOVERY PROCEDURES ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman on 8/10/2021. See attached document for full details. (fbn)
August 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Requiring Discovery and Scheduling Conference and Order Referring Discovery Matters to the Magistrate Judge, referring case to Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman for Discovery Matters. Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr on 8/9/2021. See attached document for full details. (pcs)
August 9, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to American Express Company, American Express National Bank, American Express Travel Related Services Co., Inc.. (pcs)
August 6, 2021 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (pcs)
August 6, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Damages and Demand for Jury Trial against All Defendants. Filing fees $ 402.00 receipt number AFLSDC-14908743, filed by Jonathan E. Perlman. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Summon(s), #5 Summon(s), #6 Summon(s))(Friedman, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Perlman v. American Express Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jonathan E. Perlman
Represented By: Michael A Friedman
Represented By: Eric David Jacobs
Represented By: Irina Rebeca Sadovnic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Express Company
Represented By: Michael Brandon Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Express National Bank
Represented By: Michael Brandon Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Express Travel Related Services Co., Inc.
Represented By: Michael Brandon Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?