Naval Logistic, Inc. v. Gallardo et al
Plaintiff: Naval Logistic, Inc. and Naval Logistic, Inc. doing business as Middle Point Marina
Defendant: Carmen Gallardo and Alfred Nunez
Case Number: 1:2021cv23075
Filed: August 25, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Darrin P Gayles
Nature of Suit: Contract: Marine
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1333
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 19, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 PAPERLESS ORDER denying as moot #11 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint in light of #12 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint. Signed by Judge Darrin P. Gayles on 10/19/2021. (jsi)
October 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 PAPERLESS ORDER REQUIRING JOINT SCHEDULING REPORT AND PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER. Pursuant to S.D. Fla. Local Rule 16.1, on or before November 1, 2021, the parties shall prepare and file a Joint Scheduling Report, as well as Certificates of Interested Parties and Corporate Disclosure Statements.The parties shall also file a Proposed Scheduling Order, adhering to the format and guidance of the attached form. If the parties deviate in any way from that format and guidance, they shall contemporaneously submit a written explanation, which provides their purported justification for each and every deviation. If the parties fail to submit such written explanation, the Court may enter a Scheduling Order that does not take into account the parties' proposed dates.Failure to comply with this Order shall be grounds for dismissal without prejudice and without further notice. Signed by Judge Darrin P. Gayles on 10/18/2021. (jsi)
October 15, 2021 Filing 12 First MOTION TO DISMISS #11 Motion to Dismiss, 10 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer, FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM UPON WHICH RELIEF CAN BE GRANTED by Carmen Gallardo, Alfred Nunez. Responses due by 10/29/2021 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Vessel Registration)(Vargas-Mejia-Ricart, Maria)
October 14, 2021 Filing 11 Motion to Dismiss ANSWER to Complaint by Carmen Gallardo. (Vargas-Mejia-Ricart, Maria) Modified on 10/15/2021 (drz).
October 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 PAPERLESS ORDER granting Defendant Alfred Nuez's #9 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. Defendant Alfred Nuez shall file an answer or motion to dismiss in response to Plaintiff's #1 Complaint on or before October 14, 2021. Signed by Judge Darrin P. Gayles on 10/6/2021. (jsi)
October 5, 2021 Filing 9 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer Response by Alfred Nunez. (Vargas-Mejia-Ricart, Maria)
October 5, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Maria Rosa Vargas-Mejia-Ricart on behalf of Carmen Gallardo. Attorney Maria Rosa Vargas-Mejia-Ricart added to party Carmen Gallardo(pty:dft). (Vargas-Mejia-Ricart, Maria)
October 5, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Maria Rosa Vargas-Mejia-Ricart on behalf of Alfred Nunez. Attorney Maria Rosa Vargas-Mejia-Ricart added to party Alfred Nunez(pty:dft). (Vargas-Mejia-Ricart, Maria)
August 27, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE OF COURT PRACTICE. Unless otherwise specified by the Court, every motion shall be double-spaced in Times New Roman 12-point typeface. Multiple Plaintiffs or Defendants shall file joint motions with co-parties unless there are clear conflicts of position. If conflicts of position exist, parties shall explain the conflicts in their separate motions. Failure to comply with ANY of these procedures may result in the imposition of appropriate sanctions, including but not limited to, the striking of the motion or dismissal of this action. Signed by Judge Darrin P. Gayles (jsi)
August 26, 2021 Filing 5 Clerks Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case. Incorrect case opening information. The Filer selected the incorrect Cause of Action when filing. The correction was made. It is not necessary to re-file this document. (drz)
August 26, 2021 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Alfred Nunez. (drz)
August 26, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Carmen Gallardo. (drz)
August 25, 2021 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Darrin P. Gayles. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Edwin G. Torres is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (drz)
August 25, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Carmen Gallardo, Alfred Nunez. Filing fees $ 402.00. Pay.gov Agency Tracking ID FLSDC-14958579, payment transferred from : 21CV23075 Naval Logistic, Inc. v. Gallardo et al, filed by Naval Logistic, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Agreement, #2 Exhibit Invoice, #3 Exhibit Check, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Summon(s), #6 Summon(s))(Foreman, Zachary)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Naval Logistic, Inc. v. Gallardo et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Naval Logistic, Inc.
Represented By: Zachary Lincoln Foreman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Naval Logistic, Inc. doing business as Middle Point Marina
Represented By: Zachary Lincoln Foreman
Represented By: Jeffrey Eric Foreman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carmen Gallardo
Represented By: Maria Rosa Vargas-Mejia-Ricart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alfred Nunez
Represented By: Maria Rosa Vargas-Mejia-Ricart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?