Gil v. Lavi Apartments, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Juan Carlos Gil
Defendant: LAVI APARTMENTS, LLC and ADAM TRADING GROUP LLC
Case Number: 1:2021cv23156
Filed: September 1, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Beth Bloom
Referring Judge: Alicia M Otazo-Reyes
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 12182
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 17, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 19, 2021 Filing 19 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss #1 Complaint by Adam Trading Group LLC, Lavi Apartments, LLC. Responses due by 11/2/2021 (Pellingra, Jackson)
October 19, 2021 Filing 18 Defendant's Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by Adam Trading Group LLC, Lavi Apartments, LLC identifying Other Affiliate Manuel Quintero for Lavi Apartments, LLC; Other Affiliate Ameur Dziri for Adam Trading Group LLC (Pellingra, Jackson)
October 19, 2021 Filing 17 NOTICE of Striking #14 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement, filed by Adam Trading Group LLC, Lavi Apartments, LLC by Adam Trading Group LLC, Lavi Apartments, LLC. Attorney Jackson Alexander Pellingra added to party Adam Trading Group LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Jackson Alexander Pellingra added to party Lavi Apartments, LLC(pty:dft). (Pellingra, Jackson)
October 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER SETTING TRIAL AND PRE-TRIAL SCHEDULE, REQUIRING MEDIATION, AND REFERRING CERTAIN MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Amended Pleadings due by 12/20/2021., Discovery due by 3/22/2022., Fact Discovery due by 3/22/2022., Expert Discovery due by 3/22/2022., Joinder of Parties due by 12/20/2021., Mediation Deadline 4/5/2022., In Limine Motions due by 4/13/2022., Dispositive Motions due by 4/13/2022., Motions due by 4/13/2022., Pretrial Stipulation due by 7/5/2022., Jury Trial set for 7/18/2022 09:00 AM in Miami Division before Judge Beth Bloom., Calendar Call set for 7/12/2022 01:45 PM in Miami Division before Judge Beth Bloom. ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Alicia M. Otazo-Reyes for Discovery Matters. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 10/19/2021. See attached document for full details. (scn) #Pattern Jury Instruction Builder - To access the latest, up to date changes to the 11th Circuit Pattern Jury Instructions go to https://pji.ca11.uscourts.gov or click here.
October 18, 2021 Filing 15 Clerks Notice to Filer re #14 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement,. Login/Signature Block Violation; CORRECTIVE ACTION REQUIRED - The name of attorney e-filing this document via their CM/ECF login does not match the name of attorney on the signature block of the document. The name used for login must match the typed name on signature block of the document. This filing is a violation of Section 3J(1) of CM/ECF Admin Procedures and Local Rule 5.1(b). Filer must File a Notice of Striking, then refile document pursuant to CM/ECF Admin Procedures and Local Rules. (scn)
October 18, 2021 Filing 14 (STRICKEN PER DE#17) Defendant's Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by Adam Trading Group LLC, Lavi Apartments, LLC identifying Other Affiliate Manuel Quintero for Lavi Apartments, LLC; Other Affiliate Ameur Dziri for Adam Trading Group LLC (Minerley, Kenneth) Text Modified on 10/20/2021 (scn).
September 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER IN ACTIONS BROUGHT UNDER THE AMERICANS WITH DISABILITIES ACT. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 9/24/2021. See attached document for full details. (scn)
September 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 PAPERLESS ORDER granting ECF No. #11 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint by October 19, 2021. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom (ta00)
September 24, 2021 Filing 11 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #1 Complaint by ADAM TRADING GROUP LLC, LAVI APARTMENTS, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Minerley, Kenneth)
September 24, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Kenneth Louis Minerley on behalf of ADAM TRADING GROUP LLC, LAVI APARTMENTS, LLC. Attorney Kenneth Louis Minerley added to party ADAM TRADING GROUP LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Kenneth Louis Minerley added to party LAVI APARTMENTS, LLC(pty:dft). (Minerley, Kenneth)
September 10, 2021 Filing 9 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Juan Carlos Gil. LAVI APARTMENTS, LLC served on 9/7/2021, answer due 9/28/2021. (Perez, Anthony)
September 10, 2021 Filing 8 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Juan Carlos Gil. ADAM TRADING GROUP LLC served on 9/7/2021, answer due 9/28/2021. (Perez, Anthony)
September 8, 2021 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE of Counsel re #4 Order Requiring Joint Scheduling Report, by Anthony Joseph Perez on behalf of Juan Carlos Gil (Perez, Anthony)
September 8, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Striking #5 Certificate of Counsel filed by Juan Carlos Gil by Juan Carlos Gil (Perez, Anthony)
September 8, 2021 Filing 5 (STRICKEN PER DE#6) CERTIFICATE of Counsel re #4 Order Requiring Joint Scheduling Report, by Anthony Joseph Perez on behalf of Juan Carlos Gil (Perez, Anthony) Text Modified on 9/8/2021 (scn).
September 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REQUIRING VERIFIED CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL, SCHEDULING REPORT, AND CERTIFICATES OF INTERESTED PARTIES. Joint Scheduling Report and Certificates of Interested Parties due by 9/8/2021. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 9/1/2021. See attached document for full details. (scn)
September 1, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to ADAM TRADING GROUP LLC, LAVI APARTMENTS, LLC. (scn)
September 1, 2021 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Beth Bloom. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Alicia M. Otazo-Reyes is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (scn)
September 1, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ADAM TRADING GROUP LLC, LAVI APARTMENTS, LLC. Filing fees $ 402.00 receipt number AFLSDC-14976310, filed by Juan Carlos Gil. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s), #3 Summon(s))(Perez, Anthony)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gil v. Lavi Apartments, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Juan Carlos Gil
Represented By: Anthony Joseph Perez
Represented By: Beverly Virues
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LAVI APARTMENTS, LLC
Represented By: Kenneth Louis Minerley
Represented By: Jackson Alexander Pellingra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ADAM TRADING GROUP LLC
Represented By: Kenneth Louis Minerley
Represented By: Jackson Alexander Pellingra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?