Top Beam Inc. v. ShieldX2 LLC et al
Plaintiff: Top Beam Inc.
Defendant: ShieldX2 LLC and Cery Perle
Case Number: 1:2021cv23210
Filed: September 3, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Marcia G Cooke
Nature of Suit: Negotiable Instrument
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 11, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 11, 2021 Filing 11 RESPONSE to Motion re #10 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #1 Complaint, MOTION to Set Aside Default filed by Top Beam Inc.. Replies due by 11/18/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Sunbiz Entity Detail for ShieldX2 LLC, #2 Affidavit Declaration of Pedro Barbosa, #3 Exhibit Order Denying Motion to Set Aside Default)(Narula, Anthony)
November 3, 2021 Filing 10 MOTION/Request for Additional Time to Answer to #1 Complaint and MOTION to Set Aside Default by Cery Perle, ShieldX2 LLC. (jbs)
October 7, 2021 Filing 9 Clerks Entry of Default as to ShieldX2 LLC and Cery Perle - Motions Terminated: #8 Motion for Clerks Entry of Default. Signed by DEPUTY CLERK on 10/7/2021. (jbs)
October 7, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION for Clerks Entry of Default as to Cery Perle, ShieldX2 LLC by Top Beam Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Default Final Judgment Against Defendants ShieldX2 LLC and Cery Perle)(Narula, Anthony) Modified to unterminate motion on 10/18/2021 (mr1).
September 3, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Cery Perle, ShieldX2 LLC. Filing fees $ 402.00 receipt number AFLSDC-14986306, filed by Top Beam Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Civil Cover Sheet, #7 Summon(s), #8 Summon(s))(Narula, Anthony)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Top Beam Inc. v. ShieldX2 LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Top Beam Inc.
Represented By: Anthony Vicken Narula
Represented By: Alice Ferot
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ShieldX2 LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cery Perle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?