AXIS INSURANCE COMPANY v. OLIVIA YACHT LTD.
Plaintiff: AXIS INSURANCE COMPANY
Defendant: OLIVIA YACHT LTD.
Case Number: 1:2021cv23251
Filed: September 9, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Beth Bloom
Nature of Suit: Contract: Marine
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 24, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 24, 2021 Filing 5 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by AXIS INSURANCE COMPANY identifying Other Affiliate Gustavo Garcia-Montes, Other Affiliate Blue Water Marine Services, Inc. for AXIS INSURANCE COMPANY (Wahler, Madison)
September 17, 2021 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by AXIS INSURANCE COMPANY. OLIVIA YACHT LTD. waiver sent on 9/13/2021, answer due 11/12/2021. (Wahler, Madison)
September 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER REQUIRING SCHEDULING REPORT AND CERTIFICATES OF INTERESTED PARTIES. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 9/9/2021. See attached document for full details. (amb)
September 9, 2021 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Beth Bloom. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Alicia M. Otazo-Reyes is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (pes)
September 9, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against OLIVIA YACHT LTD.. Filing fees $ 402.00 receipt number AFLSDC-14995614, filed by AXIS INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Policy, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Wahler, Madison)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: AXIS INSURANCE COMPANY v. OLIVIA YACHT LTD.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AXIS INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: Robert B. Birthisel
Represented By: Madison Elizabeth Wahler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OLIVIA YACHT LTD.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?