The Mad Room LLC et al v. The City of Miami
Plaintiff: The Mad Room LLC doing business as Ball and Chain, Altos Mexicano, LLC doing business as Taquerias El Mexicano, Little Havana Arts Building, LLC and La Gran Fiesta, LLC
Defendant: The City of Miami
Case Number: 1:2021cv23485
Filed: September 30, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Roy K Altman
Referring Judge: Lisette M Reid
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 24, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER SCHEDULING IN-PERSON DISCOVERY HEARING. (Discovery Hearing set for 12/9/2021 10:00 AM in Miami Division before Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid.) Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid on 11/24/2021. See attached document for full details. (Attachments: #1 Courtroom Procedures) (br)
November 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 26 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #25 the Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion for an Extension of Time to File their Response in Opposition to the Motion to Dismiss. The Plaintiffs shall file their Response to the Motion to Dismiss by December 11, 2021. Signed by Judge Roy K. Altman on 11/23/2021. (kmz)
November 18, 2021 Filing 25 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #23 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss #1 Complaint, by Altos Mexicano, LLC, La Gran Fiesta, LLC, Little Havana Arts Building, LLC, The Mad Room LLC. (Koslowe, Jason)
November 17, 2021 Filing 24 NOTICE of Mediator Selection. Selected/Added Altos Mexicano, LLC, La Gran Fiesta, LLC, Little Havana Arts Building, LLC, The Mad Room LLC, Frank A. Shepherd as Mediator. (Fehretdinov, Maria Macarena)
November 10, 2021 Filing 23 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss #1 Complaint, by The City of Miami. Responses due by 11/24/2021 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit Exhibit 20, #21 Exhibit Exhibit 21, #22 Exhibit Exhibit 22, #23 Exhibit Exhibit 23, #24 Exhibit Exhibit 24, #25 Exhibit Exhibit 25, #26 Exhibit Exhibit 26, #27 Exhibit Exhibit 27, #28 Exhibit Exhibit 28, #29 Exhibit Exhibit 29)(McNulty, Kerri)
November 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 PAPERLESS ORDER denying #20 the Defendant's Motion to Dismiss without prejudice and striking #21 the Defendant's Motion to Abstain. Some context might be helpful here. In its Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages [ECF No. 16], which the Court denied [ECF No. 19], the Defendant asked for leave to file a motion to dismiss of 40 pages. Unhappy with the Court's ruling, the Defendant decided to circumvent the order by filing a 20-page Motion to Dismiss and, four days later, a 19-page Motion to Abstain. But litigants may not evade this Court's page limitations by bifurcating it's motions into two docket entries. "Courts have inherent authority to control the proceedings before them," Martin v. Automobili Lamborghini Exclusive, Inc., 307 F.3d 1332, 1335 (11th Cir. 2002), and a "[v]iolation of Rule 7.0(c)(2) is cause for striking any unauthorized motions," Montgomery v. Great Am. Assurance Co., No. 12-20503, 2013 WL 12093808, at *4 (S.D. Fla. March 5, 2012) (striking a motion for summary judgment as successive and unauthorized under Local Rule 7.1(c)(2)). The Defendant's Motion to Abstain is just another attempt to get this case out of federal court--whether by abstention, stay, or dismissal. It thus should have been included in a single filing together with the Motion to Dismiss. And, in fact, federal courts routinely treat motions to dismiss and motions to abstain as Rule 12(b) motions. See, e.g., Cave v. Stone, No. 20-cv-61955, 2021 WL 4427451, at *14 n.27 (S.D. Fla. Sept. 27, 2021) (Altman, J.) (noting that "there's some debate as to whether [Younger abstention] should be considered under Rule 12(b)(1) or Rule 12(b)(6)" and finding, as other courts in this Circuit have done, that Younger abstention arguments may be considered under Rule 12(b)(1)); Allstate Ins. Co. v. Auto Glass Am., LLC, 418 F. Supp. 3d 1009, 1026 (M.D. Fla. 2019) (explaining that "rules governing dismissal for subject matter jurisdiction are generally accepted as the guidelines for a motion to dismiss on comity and/or abstention grounds"); Parker v. Jud. Inquiry Commn of the State of Ala., 212 F. Supp. 3d 1171, 1174 (M.D. Ala. 2016) ("[T]his action is to be dismissed under Rule 12(b)(1) based on Younger abstention."); Sullivan v. Saint-Gobain Performance Plastics Corp., 226 F. Supp. 3d 288, 293-294 (D. Vt. 2016) (considering a Burford abstention request under Rule 12(b)(1)); Dwayne v. Granholm, No. 06-13548, 2007 WL 1140920, at *2 (E.D. Mich. April 17, 2007) (considering abstention under 12(b)(6)); Hill v. Whetsel, No. CIV-07-69-C, 2007 WL 963216, at *1 (W.D. Okla. Mar. 28, 2007) (noting that "Younger abstention implicated Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(1)" and citing cases holding that abstention issues should be raised in a Rule 12(b) motion to dismiss). The Defendant shall refile a single Motion to Dismiss of no more than 25 pages by November 10, 2021. The motion must contain all bases for dismissal, stay, abstention or other similar relief. Nothing in this Order precludes the Defendant from raising non-waivable jurisdictional defenses later. Signed by Judge Roy K. Altman on 11/6/2021. (kmz)
November 5, 2021 Filing 21 Defendant's MOTION to Stay by The City of Miami. Attorney Kerri Lauren McNulty added to party The City of Miami(pty:dft). Responses due by 11/19/2021 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit Exhibit 20, #21 Exhibit Exhibit 21, #22 Exhibit Exhibit 22, #23 Exhibit Exhibit 23, #24 Exhibit Exhibit 24, #25 Exhibit Exhibit 25, #26 Exhibit Exhibit 26, #27 Exhibit Exhibit 27, #28 Exhibit Exhibit 28)(McNulty, Kerri)
November 1, 2021 Filing 20 MOTION TO DISMISS #1 Complaint, FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by The City of Miami. Responses due by 11/15/2021 (Hunnefeld, Henry)
November 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 PAPERLESS ORDER denying #16 the Motion for an Extension of the Page Limit for the Motion to Dismiss. The Defendant's Motion to Dismiss must comply with the page limits set out in Local Rule 7.1(c)(2). Signed by Judge Roy K. Altman on 11/1/2021. (kmz)
October 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 PAPERLESS ORDER STRIKING #9 Expedited Motion, filed by Altos Mexicano, LLC, The Mad Room LLC, La Gran Fiesta, LLC, Little Havana Arts Building, LLC, #14 Motion to Stay, filed by The City of Miami. Pursuant to Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reids Discovery Procedures, [ECF No. 17], [n]o written discovery motions, including motions to compel and motions for protective order, shall be filed unless requested by Judge Reid. The Court has not requested written discovery motions, nor have the Parties sought permission to file written discovery motions. Thus, Plaintiffs Expedited Motion for Discovery and Briefing Schedule, [ECF No. 9], and Defendants Motion to Stay Discovery Pending Resolution of Motion to Dismiss and Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Expedited Discovery, [ECF No. 14], are STRICKEN from the record. Motions terminated: #14 Defendant's MOTION to Stay Discovery Pending Resolution of Motion to Dismiss and Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Expedited Discovery, with Supporting Memorandum of Law filed by The City of Miami, #9 Plaintiff's EXPEDITED MOTION for Discovery and Briefing Schedule filed by Altos Mexicano, LLC, The Mad Room LLC, La Gran Fiesta, LLC, Little Havana Arts Building, LLC. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid on 10/28/2021. (ktr)
October 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 STANDING DISCOVERY ORDER for Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid on 10/28/2021. See attached document for full details. (ktr)
October 27, 2021 Filing 16 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages Unopposed Motion For Extension OF Page Limit For Motion To Dismiss by The City of Miami. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Order Granting Unopposed Motion For Extension Of The Page Limit For The Motion To Dismiss)(Eves, Eric)
October 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER SETTING TRIAL AND PRE-TRIAL SCHEDULE, REQUIRINGMEDIATION, AND REFERRING CERTAIN MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE: ( Jury Trial set for 10/24/2022 in Miami Division before Judge Roy K. Altman., Calendar Call set for 10/18/2022 01:45 PM in Miami Division before Judge Roy K. Altman., Amended Pleadings due by 12/15/2021., Discovery due by 6/28/2022., Expert Discovery due by 6/28/2022., Joinder of Parties due by 12/15/2021., Mediation Deadline 7/12/2022., In Limine Motions due by 9/19/2022., Dispositive Motions due by 7/20/2022., Motions due by 7/20/2022., Pretrial Stipulation due by 10/10/2022.). Signed by Judge Roy K. Altman on 10/27/2021. See attached document for full details. (drz) #Pattern Jury Instruction Builder - To access the latest, up to date changes to the 11th Circuit Pattern Jury Instructions go to https://pji.ca11.uscourts.gov or click here.
October 26, 2021 Filing 14 Defendant's MOTION to Stay Discovery Pending Resolution of Motion to Dismiss and Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Expedited Discovery, with Supporting Memorandum of Law by The City of Miami. Responses due by 11/9/2021 (Hunnefeld, Henry)
October 22, 2021 Filing 13 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement - NONE disclosed by The City of Miami (Hunnefeld, Henry)
October 21, 2021 Filing 12 Joint SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 26(f) by Altos Mexicano, LLC, La Gran Fiesta, LLC, Little Havana Arts Building, LLC, The Mad Room LLC (Koslowe, Jason)
October 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #10 the Unopposed Motion for an Extension of Time to File a Motion to Dismiss. The Defendant shall file its Motion to Dismiss by November 1, 2021. Signed by Judge Roy K. Altman on 10/21/2021. (kmz)
October 19, 2021 Filing 10 MOTION for Extension of Time To File Motion to Dismiss by The City of Miami. Attorney Eric John Eves added to party The City of Miami(pty:dft). Responses due by 11/2/2021 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Order Granting Unopposed Motion For Extension Of Time To File Motion To Dismiss)(Eves, Eric)
October 12, 2021 Filing 9 Plaintiff's EXPEDITED MOTION for Discovery and Briefing Schedule by Altos Mexicano, LLC, La Gran Fiesta, LLC, Little Havana Arts Building, LLC, The Mad Room LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Attached as Exh. A)(Fehretdinov, Maria Macarena)
October 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER REQUIRING SCHEDULING REPORT AND CERTIFICATES OF INTERESTED PARTIES. Joint Scheduling Report due by 10/23/2021 Signed by Judge Roy K. Altman on 10/5/2021. See attached document for full details. (drz)
October 5, 2021 Filing 7 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by The Mad Room LLC, La Gran Fiesta, LLC, Little Havana Arts Building, LLC, Altos Mexicano, LLC. The City of Miami served on 10/1/2021, answer due 10/22/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Fehretdinov, Maria Macarena)
October 1, 2021 Filing 6 Plaintiff's Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by Altos Mexicano, LLC, La Gran Fiesta, LLC, Little Havana Arts Building, LLC, The Mad Room LLC identifying Other Affiliate BNZ BAR, LLC, Other Affiliate Charlie Licksterz, LLC, Other Affiliate Bush, Ben, Other Affiliate Bush, Zack, Other Affiliate Fuller, William O. for The Mad Room LLC; Other Affiliate Fuller, William O., Other Affiliate Mazzei, Vincent for Little Havana Arts Building, LLC; Other Affiliate BNZ BAR, LLC, Other Affiliate CL Fiesta, LLC, Other Affiliate Bush, Ben, Other Affiliate Bush, Zack, Other Affiliate Fuller, William O. for Altos Mexicano, LLC; Other Affiliate BNZ Enterprises, LLC, Other Affiliate BNZ Fiesta, LLC, Other Affiliate JAD Calle Ocho, LLC, Other Affiliate Mipalumar Investment Trust, Other Affiliate Bush, Ben, Other Affiliate Bush, Zack, Other Affiliate Fuller, William O. for La Gran Fiesta, LLC (Fehretdinov, Maria Macarena)
September 30, 2021 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to The City of Miami (jbs)
September 30, 2021 Filing 4 Clerks Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case. Alias Not Added. The Filer failed to add the alias information for the party(ies). The correction was made. It is not necessary to re-file this document. (drz)
September 30, 2021 Filing 3 Clerks Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case. Party(ies) Improperly Formatted. The Filer failed to enter the party name(s) in accordance with the CM/ECF Format for Adding Parties for Attorneys Guide. The correction was made. It is not necessary to re-file the document. (drz)
September 30, 2021 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Roy K. Altman and Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (drz)
September 30, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against The City of Miami. Filing fees $ 402.00 receipt number AFLSDC-15055921, filed by The Mad Room LLC d/b/a Ball and Chain, La Gran Fiesta, LLC, Little Havana Arts Building, LLC, Altos Mexicano, LLC d/b/a Taquerias El Mexicano. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s), #3 Summon(s))(Fehretdinov, Maria Macarena)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: The Mad Room LLC et al v. The City of Miami
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Mad Room LLC doing business as Ball and Chain
Represented By: Jason Steven Koslowe
Represented By: Maria Macarena Arhancet Fehretdinov
Represented By: Coral Del Mar Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Altos Mexicano, LLC doing business as Taquerias El Mexicano
Represented By: Jason Steven Koslowe
Represented By: Maria Macarena Arhancet Fehretdinov
Represented By: Coral Del Mar Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Little Havana Arts Building, LLC
Represented By: Jason Steven Koslowe
Represented By: Maria Macarena Arhancet Fehretdinov
Represented By: Coral Del Mar Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: La Gran Fiesta, LLC
Represented By: Jason Steven Koslowe
Represented By: Maria Macarena Arhancet Fehretdinov
Represented By: Coral Del Mar Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The City of Miami
Represented By: Henry Joseph Hunnefeld
Represented By: Eric John Eves
Represented By: Kerri Lauren McNulty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?